Mohammad v. Prim et al

Petitioner: Alhan Mousa Mohammad
Respondent: Jefferson Sessions, Ricardo Wong, Kristjen Nielsen, Bill Prim and David Devane
Case Number: 3:2018cv50357
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
0 Judge: Iain D Johnston
1 Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2018 7 RESPONSE by Respondent David Devane to petition for writ of habeas corpus #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Deportation Officer)(Mallory, Monica)
December 19, 2018 6 DESIGNATION of Monica V Mallory as U.S. Attorney for Respondent David Devane (Mallory, Monica)
December 3, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER: Mohammads 2241 petition for a writ of habeas corpus is taken under advisement. The Seventh Circuit has held that the person responsible for maintaining custody, not the person responsiblefor authorizing custody, is the immediate custodian and therefore the proper respondent in a federal habeas action by an alien held in a state jail awaiting deportation. Kholyavskiy v. Achim, 443 F.3d 946 (2006). In a case such as this, where the prisoner lodges a core challenge to his present physical confinement, the petition must be directed at the person with immediate custody of the detained person, with day-to-day control over him and the power to physically produce him before the court. Id. at 952-53; see also Rumsfeld v. Padilla, 542 U.S. 426, 444 (2004) (noting that core habeas challenges must be brought in the district court with territorial jurisdiction over the detainees immediate custodian). The authority of any federal immigration official to authorize the detainees release does not make h[im] [the] immediate custodian for habeas purposes. Kholyavskiy, 443 F.3d at 953. Accordingly, the court directs the clerk to substitute David Devane, Chief Administrative Officer for the McHenry County Sheriffs Office, for Sheriff Prim and all other respondents are terminated from this case. DeVane is directed to file a response by 1/11/2019. Any reply to be filed by 2/11/2019. Service on Devane shall constitute sufficient service and the clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to the United States Attorney for this District. Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 12/3/2018:mailed notice(pg, )
November 8, 2018 paid filing fee of 5.00, #46243004038 (pg, )
November 8, 2018 4 PRO SE Appearance by Petitioner Alhan Mousa Mohammad (pg, )
November 8, 2018 3 APPLICATION by Petitioner Alhan Mousa Mohammad for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, )
November 8, 2018 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, )
November 8, 2018 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Alhan Mousa Mohammad against Alhan Mousa Mohammad, Kristjen Nielsen, Bill Prim, Jefferson Sessions (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammad v. Prim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ricardo Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kristjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bill Prim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Devane
Represented By: Monica V Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alhan Mousa Mohammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?