Boykin v. Wexford Health Services et al
Plaintiff: Marshaun Boykin
Defendant: Dr. Jaime Chess, (6) John Doe, Dr. Doyle, Wexford Health Services and Dr. Gonzalez
Case Number: 3:2018cv50362
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 MAILED copy of Order #4 and an ifp application to Marshaun Boykin. (kms)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : Plaintiff is granted until January 18, 2019, either to file an in forma pauperis application on the enclosed form with the information required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2) or pay the full $400 filing fee. The Court directs the Clerk to send Plaintiff an i.f.p. application along with a copy of this order. Failure of Plaintiff to comply by the deadline will result in summary dismissal of this case. [see STATEMENT] signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 12/18/2018. Mailed notice (kms)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: At the request of the plaintiff in his case entitled Boykin v. Dixon, 16 CV 50160, this case is stayed. See Dkt. 133 in 16 CV 50160. The stay shall remain in place for 120 days through 3/18/2019. The Court will not address, and so the plaintiff should not file, any other motions, letters or other filings until the plaintiff has filed and the Court has granted a motion to lift the stay of this case. However, this order does not affect any screening of the complaint recently filed in this case.Mailed notice (yxp, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 2 copies by Marshaun Boykin (pg, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2018: #1 Envelope) (pg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boykin v. Wexford Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jaime Chess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (6) John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshaun Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?