Morrey v. Pro Com Services of Illinois, Inc.

Plaintiff: Paula D Morrey
Defendant: Pro Com Services of Illinois, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv50390
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Western Division ADR Notification (jp, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pro Com Services of Illinois, Inc. by Devin B. Noble (Noble, Devin)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS Report INITIAL by Paula D Morrey (McCarrell, Geoffrey)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Paula D Morrey. Pro Com Services of Illinois, Inc. waiver sent on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (McCarrell, Geoffrey)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 2/7/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 2/1/2019. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. (yxp, )
December 7, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Pro Com Services of Illinois, Inc. (mc, )
December 7, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paula D Morrey by David Scott Klain (Klain, David)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paula D Morrey by Geoffrey Bernard McCarrell (McCarrell, Geoffrey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McCarrell, Geoffrey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Paula D Morrey; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15253270. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Credit Report)(McCarrell, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrey v. Pro Com Services of Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Com Services of Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Devin B. Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula D Morrey
Represented By: David Scott Klain
Represented By: Geoffrey Bernard McCarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?