Thrivent Investment Management, Inc. et al v. The Vernon W. Woellert Revocable Trust et al
Plaintiff: Thrivent Financial For Lutherans and Thrivent Investment Management, Inc.
Defendant: The Vernon W. Woellert Revocable Trust and Sandra Woellert
Case Number: 3:2019cv50048
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
2 Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: In light of the reassignment of this case to Judge Jensen, the status hearing set for 4/25/2019 is stricken. The hearing will be reset by entry from Judge Jensen's chambers. (yxp, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that Lisa A. Jensen has been appointed as a United States Magistrate Judge for the Northern District of Illinois, Western Division; and It further appearing that Internal Operating Procedure 17(a) provides for the creation of an initial calendar for a newly-appointed magistrate judge by equalization; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the attached list of civil consent cases, civil referrals, miscellaneous cases, and criminal case referrals are hereby reassigned to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Case referred to the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/12/2019.(sm, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The initial status hearing previously set for 4/4/2019 is stricken and reset to 4/25/2019 at 9:00 AM; the completed joint initial status report form is now due 4/19/2019. (yxp, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Stefanie Lynn Ferrari on behalf of Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Investment Management, Inc. regarding amended complaint #6 (Ferrari, Stefanie)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of Service of Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Reformation served on Sandra Woellert, individually, and as Trustee of the Vernon W. Woellert Revocable Trust on March 13, 2019, filed by Plaintiffs Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Investment Management, Inc.. (Ferrari, Stefanie)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Reformation AMENDED complaint by Thrivent Investment Management, Inc., Thrivent Financial For Lutherans against The Vernon W. Woellert Revocable Trust, Sandra Woellert (Ferrari, Stefanie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 4/4/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 3/29/2019. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. (yxp, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Ferrari, Stefanie)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Investment Management, Inc. by Stefanie Lynn Ferrari (Ferrari, Stefanie)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ferrari, Stefanie)
February 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader Relief and Other Equitable Relief filed by Thrivent Investment Management, Inc., Thrivent Financial For Lutherans; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15504444.(Ferrari, Stefanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrivent Investment Management, Inc. et al v. The Vernon W. Woellert Revocable Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vernon W. Woellert Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Woellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thrivent Financial For Lutherans
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Ferrari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thrivent Investment Management, Inc.
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Ferrari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?