Ford v. Winnebago County et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Ford
Defendant: Chad Bounds, Anthony Ponte, Gary Caruana, James Kennay, Eligio Rivas, Winnebago County, Jason Liston, Keacon Lee, Timi Moore, Tim Owens, Robert Redmond and Rob Lukowski
Case Number: 3:2019cv50056
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
2 Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 28 LETTER from Melvin Ford dated 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jp, )
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration #9 is granted in part and denied in part. The Court reinstates Winnebago County as a Defendant, but declines to certify a class at this time. In addition, the dismissal of Plaintiff's claim for intentional infliction of emotional distress stands. [see STATEMENT] Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 4/16/2019. Mailed notice (kms)
April 12, 2019 Filing 26 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that Lisa A. Jensen has been appointed as a United States Magistrate Judge for the Northern District of Illinois, Western Division; and It further appearing that Internal Operating Procedure 17(a) provides for the creation of an initial calendar for a newly-appointed magistrate judge by equalization; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the attached list of civil consent cases, civil referrals, miscellaneous cases, and criminal case referrals are hereby reassigned to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Case referred to the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/12/2019.(sm, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 25 Qualified HIPAA PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 4/9/2019:Mailed notice (yxp, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Defendant Lee's motion for a HIPAA order #22 is granted. The HIPAA order will issue separately. Presentment of the motion set for 4/16/2019 is stricken. (yxp, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Jordan William Emmert for presentment of motion for order #22 before Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Emmert, Jordan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Keacon Lee for order HIPAA Qualified Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Propoosed Order)(Emmert, Jordan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Keacon Lee by Jordan William Emmert (Emmert, Jordan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 20 JURY Demand (Salemi, Scott)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Keacon Lee by Scott George Salemi (Salemi, Scott)
April 8, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Keacon Lee. Keacon Lee waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Salemi, Scott)
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Melvin Ford. Gary Caruana waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Gary Caruana).(smm, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Melvin Ford. Winnebago County waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form returned executed)(jjr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Melvin Ford. Chad Bounds waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form returned executed)(jjr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Melvin Ford. Eligio Rivas waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form returned executed)(jjr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Melvin Ford. James Kennay waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form returned executed)(jjr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Melvin Ford. Jason Liston waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form returned executed)(jjr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Melvin Ford. Timi Moore waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form returned executed)(jjr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Melvin Ford. Tim Owens waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form returned executed)(jjr, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Melvin Ford for reconsideration regarding order, #7 (pg, )
March 11, 2019 MAILED copy of order dated 3/11/2019 #7 to Trust Fund Officer at Big Muddy River Correctional Center. (jk, )
March 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued along with USM 285 form(s), certified copy of order dated 3/11/2019 #7 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendants Chad Bounds, Gary Caruana, James Kennay, Keacon Lee, Jason Liston, Rob Lukowski, Timi Moore, Tim Owens, Anthony Ponte, Robert Redmond, Eligio Rivas, Winnebago County via email . (jk, ) Modified on 3/11/2019 (jk, ). Modified on 3/11/2019 (jk, ).
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT filed by Melvin Ford; Jury Demand. (jk, )
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is granted. The Court waives the initial partial filing fee pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4) but directs Plaintiff's custodian to begin making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. Plaintiff's trust fund officer must collect 100% of all income into Plaintiff's trust account until accrued filing fees are paid. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claim of intentional infliction of emotional distress on preliminary review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. The Court directs the Clerk to: (1) send a copy of this order to the trust account office at Plaintiffs place of confinement; (2) file Plaintiff's complaint #1 ; and (3) issue summonses for service on Defendants. The Court appoints the U.S. Marshal to serve Defendants. Plaintiff's motions for attorney representation #4 and for class certification #3 are denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 3/11/2019. Mailed notice (jk, ) Modified on 3/11/2019 (jp, ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Melvin Ford for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Melvin Ford for attorney representation (pg, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Melvin Ford to certify class (pg, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Melvin Ford (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Winnebago County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Ponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Caruana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kennay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eligio Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keacon Lee
Represented By: Scott George Salemi
Represented By: Jordan William Emmert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timi Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Lukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?