Haney et al v. Winnebago County Board et al
Plaintiff: Frank Giammarese, Jackie Thompson, Ed Geeser, Brenda Christiansen, Jodi Amans, Bill Gelshen, Sarah Pipitone, Dominic Paladino, Jennifer Lavasseur, Barb Betts, Richard Crosby, Patricia Alms, Brendan Blackler, Leslie Haney, Jim Butitta, David Dale Johnson, Johanna Koslofski, William Gehlsen, Kristen Dixon, Anthony Pipitone, Phyllis Grisanzio, Jan Mansfield, Nick Paladino, Mary Jo Haney, Kevin Hortsman, Janice Butitta, Judy Greier, Janette Grisanzio, Ken Christiansen, Mark Beaulieu, Frank Haney, Dennis Greier, Dom Grisanzio, Becky Ecker, Brian Maier, Gerry Miller, Scott Anderson, Michael Grisanzio, John Paladino, Gary Alms, Dee Premo, Robert Haney, Marilyn Paladino, Mary Kay Gehlsen, Jackie Sciortino, Carol Miller and Vito Grisanzio
Defendant: Dorothy Redd, Joe Hoffman, County of Winnebago, David Boomer, Angie Goral, Burt Gerl, Dave Tassoni, Steve Schultz, Jamie Salgado, Jim Webster, Keith McDonald, Fred Wescott, Winnebago County Board, Paul Arena and Dave Fiduccia
Case Number: 3:2019cv50191
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to reply #17 is granted, and Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their motion for preliminary injunction #8 by 10/14/19. The 10/4/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The 10/4/19 status hearing is stricken and reset for 11/15/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Rockford, Illinois. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth M Florey for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply,,, #17 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/4/2019 at 12:30 PM. (Florey, Kenneth)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gary Alms, Patricia Alms, Jodi Amans, Scott Anderson, Mark Beaulieu, Barb Betts, Brendan Blackler, Jim Butitta, Janice Butitta, Brenda Christiansen, Ken Christiansen, Richard Crosby, Kristen Dixon, Becky Ecker, Ed Geeser, Mary Kay Gehlsen, William Gehlsen, Bill Gelshen, Frank Giammarese, Dennis Greier, Judy Greier, Dom Grisanzio, Janette Grisanzio, Michael Grisanzio, Phyllis Grisanzio, Vito Grisanzio, Frank Haney, Leslie Haney, Mary Jo Haney, Robert Haney, Kevin Hortsman, David Dale Johnson, Johanna Koslofski, Jennifer Lavasseur, Brian Maier, Jan Mansfield, Carol Miller, Gerry Miller, Dominic Paladino, John Paladino, Marilyn Paladino, Nick Paladino, Anthony Pipitone, Sarah Pipitone, Dee Premo, Jackie Sciortino, Jackie Thompson for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for preliminary injunction,,, #8 , memorandum in support of motion,,, #9 , response in opposition to motion,,, #16 (Florey, Kenneth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Paul Arena, David Boomer, County of Winnebago, Dave Fiduccia, Burt Gerl, Angie Goral, Joe Hoffman, Keith McDonald, Dorothy Redd, Jamie Salgado, Steve Schultz, Dave Tassoni, Jim Webster, Fred Wescott in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Gary Alms, Patricia Alms, Jodi Amans, Scott Anderson, Mark Beaulieu, Barb Betts, Brendan Blackler, Jim Butitta, Janice Butitta, Brenda Christiansen, Ken Christiansen, Richard Crosby, Kristen Dixon, Becky Ecker, Ed Geeser, #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W, #23 Exhibit X, #24 Exhibit Y, #25 Exhibit Z)(Kurlinkus, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Paul Arena, David Boomer, Dave Fiduccia, Burt Gerl, Angie Goral, Joe Hoffman, Keith McDonald, Dorothy Redd, Jamie Salgado, Steve Schultz, Dave Tassoni, Jim Webster, Fred Wescott by David Joseph Kurlinkus (Kurlinkus, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Paul Arena, David Boomer, Dave Fiduccia, Burt Gerl, Angie Goral, Joe Hoffman, Keith McDonald, Dorothy Redd, Jamie Salgado, Steve Schultz, Dave Tassoni, Jim Webster, Fred Wescott by Paul A Carpenter (Carpenter, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Motion hearing held on 8/22/2019. Briefing on the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #8 set as follows: response due by 9/16/2019 and reply due by 9/30/2019. The 10/3/2019 hearing set in open court is stricken. A status hearing on the briefing is set for 10/4/2019 at 12:30 PM before Honorable John Robert Blakey in Rockford, IL. Plaintiffs Carol Miller and Gerry Miller are dismissed pursuant to their verbal notice of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) and are terminated from this case. (yxp, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant County of Winnebago by David Joseph Kurlinkus (Kurlinkus, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant County of Winnebago by Paul A Carpenter (Carpenter, Paul)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth M Florey for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction,,, #8 before Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Florey, Kenneth)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Gary Alms, Patricia Alms, Jodi Amans, Scott Anderson, Mark Beaulieu, Barb Betts, Brendan Blackler, Jim Butitta, Janice Butitta, Brenda Christiansen, Ken Christiansen, Richard Crosby, Kristen Dixon, Becky Ecker, Ed Geeser, Mary Kay Gehlsen, William Gehlsen, Bill Gelshen, Frank Giammarese, Dennis Greier, Judy Greier, Dom Grisanzio, Janette Grisanzio, Michael Grisanzio, Phyllis Grisanzio, Vito Grisanzio, Frank Haney, Leslie Haney, Mary Jo Haney, Robert Haney, Kevin Hortsman, David Dale Johnson, Johanna Koslofski, Jennifer Lavasseur, Brian Maier, Jan Mansfield, Carol Miller, Gerry Miller, Dominic Paladino, John Paladino, Marilyn Paladino, Nick Paladino, Anthony Pipitone, Sarah Pipitone, Dee Premo, Jackie Sciortino, Jackie Thompson in support of motion for preliminary injunction,,, #8 (Florey, Kenneth)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gary Alms, Patricia Alms, Jodi Amans, Scott Anderson, Mark Beaulieu, Barb Betts, Brendan Blackler, Jim Butitta, Janice Butitta, Brenda Christiansen, Ken Christiansen, Richard Crosby, Kristen Dixon, Becky Ecker, Ed Geeser, Mary Kay Gehlsen, William Gehlsen, Bill Gelshen, Frank Giammarese, Dennis Greier, Judy Greier, Dom Grisanzio, Janette Grisanzio, Michael Grisanzio, Phyllis Grisanzio, Vito Grisanzio, Frank Haney, Leslie Haney, Mary Jo Haney, Robert Haney, Kevin Hortsman, David Dale Johnson, Johanna Koslofski, Jennifer Lavasseur, Brian Maier, Jan Mansfield, Carol Miller, Gerry Miller, Dominic Paladino, John Paladino, Marilyn Paladino, Nick Paladino, Anthony Pipitone, Sarah Pipitone, Dee Premo, Jackie Sciortino, Jackie Thompson for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Florey, Kenneth)
August 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Paul Arena, David Boomer, County of Winnebago, Dave Fiduccia, Burt Gerl, Angie Goral, Joe Hoffman, Keith McDonald, Dorothy Redd, Jamie Salgado, Steve Schultz, Dave Tassoni, Jim Webster, Fred Wescott, Winnebago County Board (pg, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Appearance by Gary Alms, Patricia Alms, Jodi Amans, Scott Anderson, Mark Beaulieu, Barb Betts, Brendan Blackler, Jim Butitta, Janice Butitta, Brenda Christiansen, Ken Christiansen, Richard Crosby, Kristen Dixon, Becky Ecker, Ed Geeser, Mary Kay Gehlsen, William Gehlsen, Bill Gelshen, Frank Giammarese, Dennis Greier, Judy Greier, Dom Grisanzio, Janette Grisanzio, Michael Grisanzio, Phyllis Grisanzio, Vito Grisanzio, Frank Haney, Leslie Haney, Mary Jo Haney, Robert Haney, Kevin Hortsman, David Dale Johnson, Johanna Koslofski, Jennifer Lavasseur, Brian Maier, Jan Mansfield, Carol Miller, Gerry Miller, Dominic Paladino, John Paladino, Marilyn Paladino, Nick Paladino, Anthony Pipitone, Sarah Pipitone, Dee Premo, Jackie Sciortino, Jackie Thompson (MARK W. DANIEL) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Appearance)(Daniel, Mark)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey and referred generally to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Gary Alms, Patricia Alms, Jodi Amans, Scott Anderson, Mark Beaulieu, Barb Betts, Brendan Blackler, Jim Butitta, Janice Butitta, Brenda Christiansen, Ken Christiansen, Richard Crosby, Kristen Dixon, Becky Ecker, Ed Geeser, Mary Kay Gehlsen, William Gehlsen, Bill Gelshen, Frank Giammarese, Dennis Greier, Judy Greier, Dom Grisanzio, Janette Grisanzio, Michael Grisanzio, Phyllis Grisanzio, Vito Grisanzio, Frank Haney, Leslie Haney, Mary Jo Haney, Robert Haney, Kevin Hortsman, David Dale Johnson, Johanna Koslofski, Jennifer Lavasseur, Brian Maier, Jan Mansfield, Carol Miller, Gerry Miller, Dominic Paladino, John Paladino, Marilyn Paladino, Nick Paladino, Anthony Pipitone, Sarah Pipitone, Dee Premo, Jackie Sciortino, Jackie Thompson by Marshall Neal Smith, Jr (Smith, Marshall)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Gary Alms, Patricia Alms, Jodi Amans, Scott Anderson, Mark Beaulieu, Barb Betts, Brendan Blackler, Jim Butitta, Janice Butitta, Brenda Christiansen, Ken Christiansen, Richard Crosby, Kristen Dixon, Becky Ecker, Ed Geeser, Mary Kay Gehlsen, William Gehlsen, Bill Gelshen, Frank Giammarese, Dennis Greier, Judy Greier, Dom Grisanzio, Janette Grisanzio, Michael Grisanzio, Phyllis Grisanzio, Vito Grisanzio, Frank Haney, Leslie Haney, Mary Jo Haney, Robert Haney, Kevin Hortsman, David Dale Johnson, Johanna Koslofski, Jennifer Lavasseur, Brian Maier, Jan Mansfield, Carol Miller, Gerry Miller, Dominic Paladino, John Paladino, Marilyn Paladino, Nick Paladino, Anthony Pipitone, Sarah Pipitone, Dee Premo, Jackie Sciortino, Jackie Thompson by Kenneth M Florey (Florey, Kenneth)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Gary Alms, Patricia Alms, Jodi Amans, Scott Anderson, Mark Beaulieu, Barb Betts, Brendan Blackler, Jim Butitta, Janice Butitta, Brenda Christiansen, Ken Christiansen, Richard Crosby, Kristen Dixon, Becky Ecker, Ed Geeser, Mary Kay Gehlsen, William Gehlsen, Bill Gelshen, Frank Giammarese, Dennis Greier, Judy Greier, Dom Grisanzio, Janette Grisanzio, Michael Grisanzio, Phyllis Grisanzio, Vito Grisanzio, Frank Haney, Leslie Haney, Mary Jo Haney, Robert Haney, Kevin Hortsman, David Dale Johnson, Johanna Koslofski, Jennifer Lavasseur, Brian Maier, Jan Mansfield, Carol Miller, Gerry Miller, Dominic Paladino, John Paladino, Marilyn Paladino, Nick Paladino, Anthony Pipitone, Sarah Pipitone, Dee Premo, Jackie Sciortino, Jackie Thompson by Kenneth M Florey (Florey, Kenneth)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Florey, Kenneth)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Declaratory Relief filed by Ken Christiansen, Patricia Alms, Jackie Sciortino, Johanna Koslofski, Marilyn Paladino, Mark Beaulieu, Scott Anderson, Frank Haney, Janice Butitta, Barb Betts, Becky Ecker, Mary Kay Gehlsen, John Paladino, Leslie Haney, Nick Paladino, Frank Giammarese, Gerry Miller, Jodi Amans, Kristen Dixon, Sarah Pipitone, Brenda Christiansen, Bill Gelshen, Anthony Pipitone, Jackie Thompson, Mary Jo Haney, Jennifer Lavasseur, Brendan Blackler, Judy Greier, Dom Grisanzio, David Dale Johnson, Phyllis Grisanzio, Richard Crosby, Janette Grisanzio, Kevin Hortsman, Dennis Greier, Robert Haney, Carol Miller, Brian Maier, Dee Premo, Michael Grisanzio, Ed Geeser, Gary Alms, Dominic Paladino, Vito Grisanzio, Jim Butitta, William Gehlsen, Jan Mansfield ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16128476. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Florey, Kenneth)
August 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haney et al v. Winnebago County Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Giammarese
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Thompson
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Geeser
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Christiansen
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Amans
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Gelshen
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Pipitone
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Paladino
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lavasseur
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barb Betts
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Crosby
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Alms
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Blackler
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Haney
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Butitta
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dale Johnson
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanna Koslofski
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gehlsen
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Dixon
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Pipitone
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Grisanzio
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Mansfield
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Paladino
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jo Haney
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hortsman
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Butitta
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Greier
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette Grisanzio
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Christiansen
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Beaulieu
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Haney
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Greier
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dom Grisanzio
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Ecker
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Maier
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Miller
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Anderson
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grisanzio
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paladino
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Alms
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dee Premo
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Haney
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Paladino
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kay Gehlsen
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Sciortino
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Miller
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vito Grisanzio
Represented By: Kenneth M Florey
Represented By: Marshall Neal Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Redd
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Hoffman
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Winnebago
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Boomer
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Goral
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burt Gerl
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Tassoni
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Schultz
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Salgado
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Webster
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith McDonald
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Wescott
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago County Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Arena
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Fiduccia
Represented By: David Joseph Kurlinkus
Represented By: Paul A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?