Massenburg v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Eric Massenburg
Defendant: Steven Getty, Jacob Rubin, Judge Lowery, United States of America, Clifford and The State of Illinois
Case Number: 3:2019cv50202
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 MAILED Order dated 9/13/2019 to the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration. (jh, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT Order signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 9/13/2019. Mailed notice (jh, )
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff's renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis Dkt. #10 is granted. The Court waives payment of the initial, partial filing fee. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to make monthly deductions from Plaintiff's trust fund account and remit the funds to this Court as payment of Plaintiff's filing-fee obligations in accordance with this order. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer at the Winnebago County Jail and to this Court's fiscal department. However, summonses shall not issue. Plaintiff's amended complaint Dkt. #7 and this action are dismissed with prejudice as frivolous. Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend Dkt. #8 and motions for attorney representation Dkt. #4 , #9 are denied as moot. Final judgment shall be entered. This dismissal counts as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). If plaintiff accumulates three dismissals under 1915(g), he will not be able to file an action in federal court (except as a petition for habeas corpus relief) without prepaying the filing fee unless he demonstrates that he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. See id. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 9/13/2019. Mailed notice(jh, )
September 13, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (air, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Eric Massenburg for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Eric Massenburg for attorney representation (pg, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM Of Law In Support Of Motion To Amend Complaint (pg, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIVED Amended Complaint and 0 copies by Eric Massenburg (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pg, )
August 20, 2019 Sent plaintiff blank I.F.P. form and copy of 8/20/19 Order. (pg, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiffs application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit a renewed application in accordance with this order; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiffs failure to fully comply with this order by September 13, 2019, will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/20/2019:mailed notice(pg, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. and referred generally to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Eric Massenburg for attorney representation (jp, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Eric Massenburg for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (jp, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (jp, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT and (0) copies by Eric Massenburg; (Attachments: #1 Notice to the United States Attorney General, #2 Notice to Court, #3 Affidavit, #4 Content List, #5 Envelope) (jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massenburg v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Rockford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?