Wicker v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Sally Wicker
Defendant: Alex Azar, Maximus Federal Services, Seema Verma and Kohl's Department Store
Case Number: 3:2019cv50223
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 32 AGREED MOTION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS HEARING AND EXTEND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINES PENDING SETTLEMENT NOTICE of Motion by Jana L Brady for presentment of extension of time #31 before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Brady, Jana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION by Defendants Alex Azar, Maximus Federal Services, Seema Verma for extension of time Agreed Motion to Continue Status Hearing and Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Settlement (Brady, Jana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 30 STATUS Report by Alex Azar, Maximus Federal Services, Seema Verma (Brady, Jana)
October 11, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The minute entry #28 is corrected as follows. The motion for extension of time to file answer by Defendants Azar and Verma #19 will be addressed at the 11/18/2019 initial status hearing. The Clerk is directed to modify the motion entry #19 to appear as a pending motion and to update the docket text of entry #28 accordingly. The status hearing set for 11/18/2019 at 9:00 AM is moved to 10:00 AM that same day to address Defendant's pending motion for extension of time #19 . Counsel shall appear in person. Mailed notice (jk, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time to file answer #19 will be addressed at the 11/18/2019 status hearing. Plaintiff's agreed motion to extend time for Kohl's Department Stores to plead #25 is granted. Kohls' answer is now due 11/18/2019. Any further extensions will be addressed at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff's agreed motion to reset the initial status hearing #22 is granted. The initial status hearing set for 10/16/2019 is stricken and reset for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM. The joint status report is now due 11/12/2019. Counsel shall appear in person. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed before then, the hearing will be stricken and no appearance will be necessary. Mailed notice (jk, ) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/11/2019 (jk, ).
October 10, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sally Wicker. Maximus Federal Services waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Seibold, Stephanie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Renee Seibold for presentment of extension of time #25 before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Seibold, Stephanie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Sally Wicker for extension of time for Kohl's Department Stores to Plead (agreed) (Seibold, Stephanie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The initial status hearing set for 10/16/2019 at 9:00 AM is moved to 10:00 AM to coincide with presentment of defendants' motion for extension of time #19 . Defendant's original motion for extension of time #17 is stricken as superseded by #19 . Mailed notice (jp, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Renee Seibold for presentment of extension of time #22 before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Seibold, Stephanie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff Sally Wicker for extension of time of initial status date (agreed) (Seibold, Stephanie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS Report (Joint, Initial) by Sally Wicker (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Seibold, Stephanie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 Amended Notice of Hearing NOTICE of Motion by Jana L Brady for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #19 before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Brady, Jana)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendants Alex Azar, Seema Verma for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Amended Agreed Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline (Brady, Jana) Modified on 10/11/2019 (jk, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Hearing for Agreed Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline NOTICE of Motion by Jana L Brady for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #17 before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Brady, Jana)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants Alex Azar, Seema Verma for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Agreed Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline (Brady, Jana)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time #15 was not noticed for presentment as required under Local Rule 5.3(b). Accordingly, the motion #15 is denied without prejudice. See Local Rule 78.2. Any renewed motion for extension of time to answer will be addressed at the initial status hearing. The initial status hearing previously set for 10/28/2019 is reset to 10/16/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties' joint initial status report is now due by noon on 10/15/2019. By 10/15/2019, Kohl's Department Store shall file an appearance. Plaintiff is directed to notify Kohl's to the entry of this order. Mailed notice (jk, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Sally Wicker for extension of time to file answer for Kohl's Department Store (Agreed) (Seibold, Stephanie)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Sally Wicker to John R. Lausch (Seibold, Stephanie)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Sally Wicker to Defendant Seema Verma (Seibold, Stephanie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Sally Wicker to Kohl's Agent Corporate Creations Network (Seibold, Stephanie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Sally Wicker Kohl's Agent CT Corporation System (Seibold, Stephanie)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Sally Wicker to AUSA office Western division (Seibold, Stephanie)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Pursuant to IOP 11(d), this case is generally referred to the magistrate judge, except for the following types of hearings and motions: (1) initial review of complaints in cases filed by prisoners or persons seeking a waiver of the filing fee; (2) dispositive motions; (3) Daubert motions and related hearings; (4) any motions filed while a summary judgment motion is pending or thereafter; (5) motions concerning the scheduling or conduct of the trial; (6) all final pretrial motions, including motions in limine; and (7) trial. These excluded matters will be handled by Judge Lee, absent further order of the Court. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Jana L Brady as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Alex Azar, Maximus Federal Services, Seema Verma (Brady, Jana)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019.(jp, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Initial status hearing set for 10/28/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 10/16/2019. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice (jk, )
September 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Alex Azar, Kohl's Department Store (Chicago), Maximus Federal Services, Seema Verma, U.S. Attorney (Chicago), Kohl's Department Store (Park Ridge),U.S. Attorney (Rockford), U.S. Department of Justice. (daj, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Sally Wicker of filing of Complaint and Exhibits (Seibold, Stephanie)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sally Wicker by Stephanie Renee Seibold (Seibold, Stephanie)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sally Wicker by Tracy Lynn Jones (Jones, Tracy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jones, Tracy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sally Wicker; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16223259. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jones, Tracy)
September 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wicker v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Jana L Brady
Represented By: AUSA - Rockford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximus Federal Services
Represented By: Jana L Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Represented By: Jana L Brady
Represented By: AUSA - Rockford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Wicker
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Jones
Represented By: Stephanie Renee Seibold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?