United States of America v. Valenta
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Karyl Valenta
Case Number: 3:2019cv50224
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT JUDGMENT Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 9/27/2019:Mailed notice(sb, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard: Pursuant to stipulation of parties, the agreed motion for entry of judgment #6 is granted. Consent Judgment to enter. The initial status hearing before Magistrate Judge Johnston on October 29, 2019, is canceled. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (sb, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for judgment by agreement (Heffron, Scott)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Entry of Consent Judgment (Heffron, Scott)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America. Karyl Valenta waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Heffron, Scott)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 10/29/2019 at 9:00 AM. By 10/23/2019, the parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. (yxp, )
September 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Heffron, Scott)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Heffron, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Valenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karyl Valenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Scott Dennis Heffron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?