Boveri v. ConsenSys, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Boveri
Defendant: ConsenSys, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv50226
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Referring Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ConsenSys, Inc. (jp, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 12/2/2019 at 9:30AM in the Rockford Courthouse. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 11/20/2019. The parties are required to appear in person. The general referral to Magistrate Judge Lisa A. Jensen is terminated for all purposes. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019.(jp, )
September 12, 2019 paid filing fee of $400.00, #46243004547 (pg, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff David Boveri (pg, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David Boveri; Jury Demand. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boveri v. ConsenSys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConsenSys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Boveri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?