CitiMortgage, Inc. v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Defendant: Lynne Ternoir Davis, Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants and Jerome M. Davis
Case Number: 3:2019cv50278
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Referring Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CitiMortgage, Inc. by Michael Brett Kind (Kind, Michael)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Defendants Jerome M. Davis, Lynne Ternoir Davis to motion to dismiss #5 Response and notice of filing motion to consolidate cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Davis, Jerome)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's motion to dismiss #5 . Plaintiff is advised to review the Court's standing order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Court's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The Court's Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether it will amend the current complaint (in which case the Court will deny without prejudice the pending motion to dismiss) or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the pending motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint or a response to the motion to dismiss by 12/20/2019. If, after making the required election, Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Defendant shall file its responsive pleading 21 days after being served with the amended complaint. If, on the other hand, Plaintiff files a response to the pending motion to dismiss, Defendant shall file a reply within 14 days of service of the response. The 12/13/2019 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory Tyler Noorigian for presentment of motion to dismiss #5 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 12/13/2019 at 01:00 PM. (Noorigian, Gregory)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CitiMortgage, Inc. by Gregory Tyler Noorigian (Noorigian, Gregory)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CitiMortgage, Inc. by Ryan Matthew Holz (Holz, Ryan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff CitiMortgage, Inc. to dismiss pending Motion to Withdraw Reference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Dashevsky, Irina)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CitiMortgage, Inc. by Irina Dashevsky (Dashevsky, Irina)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019.(jp, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to motion to withdraw reference #1 Docket Sheet (USBC-Rivera, )
October 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to withdraw reference (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Exhibit)(USBC-Rivera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CitiMortgage, Inc. v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Holz
Represented By: Irina Dashevsky
Represented By: Gregory Tyler Noorigian
Represented By: Michael Brett Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne Ternoir Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?