Rodriguez v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Rodriguez
Defendant: Cuauhtemoc Cabral, United States of America, Magdalena Gazdowicz and Omar Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2019cv50282
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Phillip Rodriguez of Filing of Response to Motion to Dismiss (Bayer, Karl)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Phillip Rodriguez to MOTION by Defendant United States of America to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies #5 (Bayer, Karl)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Status and motion hearing held on 11/26/2019. No appearance on behalf of defendants Hernandez and Cabral. Briefing on the motion to dismiss #5 set as follows: response due 12/24/2019 and the reply is due by 1/17/2020. Telephonic status hearing set for 2/13/2020 at 9:00 AM. By 2/11/2020 counsel shall review the Court's standing order on telephonic status hearings and provide direct-dial phone numbers to the Court's operations specialist who will initiate the call. (yxp, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS Report (Initial) by United States of America (Mallory, Monica)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: An initial status hearing is set for 11/26/2019 at 10:00 AM to coincide with the motion presentment already set for the same day and time. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file it by 11/22/2019. Lead counsel shall appear in person. (yxp, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Monica V Mallory for presentment of motion to dismiss #5 before Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 11/26/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Mallory, Monica)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant United States of America to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Mallory, Monica)
November 1, 2019 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Counsel for plaintiff and defendant. (jp, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. and referred generally to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, )
October 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Monica V Mallory as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Magdalena Gazdowicz, United States of America (Mallory, Monica)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mallory, Monica)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of McHenry County, case number (19LA000238) filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mallory, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuauhtemoc Cabral
Represented By: Shipra Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Monica V Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magdalena Gazdowicz
Represented By: Monica V Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Hernandez
Represented By: Shipra Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Rodriguez
Represented By: Karl Edwin Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?