Munoz v. Ye and Lin, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Delfino Zarate Munoz
Defendant: Desheng Ye and Ye and Lin, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv50222
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Referring Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Telephone status hearing held on 9/9/2020. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint #18 is denied without prejudice. Telephone Conference set for 9/30/2020 at 9:30 AM. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Attorneys/Parties/Members of the public shall dial in using the Court's conference call-in number. The conference call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Mailed notice (rj, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court enters and continues Defendants' motion to dismiss #18 and orders the parties to discuss the attached documents to Defendants' motion. The Court sets a telephone status date for 9/9/2020 at 9:30 AM where Plaintiff should be prepared to address Defendants' claim that he was not an employee reflected in their records. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Soo Yeon Lee for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #18 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/2/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Lee, Soo Yeon)
August 25, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by All Defendants re MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Desheng Ye, Ye and Lin, Inc. #18 (Lee, Soo Yeon)
August 25, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Desheng Ye, Ye and Lin, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Declaration of Desheng Ye, #2 Exhibit B)(Lee, Soo Yeon)
August 20, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Desheng Ye, Ye and Lin, Inc. by Terry Shing-Ren Lu (Lu, Terry)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #11 . Defendants' responsive pleading is due by 8/25/2020. The Court strikes the telephonic status date set for 8/21/2020 and resets it to 9/16/2020 at 9:30 a.m. with an initial joint status report due by 9/9/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Desheng Ye, Ye and Lin, Inc. by Andrew Scott Willis (Willis, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 Western Division ADR Notification (jp, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Soo Yeon Lee for presentment of extension of time #11 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/28/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Lee, Soo Yeon)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Soo Yeon Lee for presentment of (see #13 )
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Desheng Ye, Ye and Lin, Inc. for extension of time (Lee, Soo Yeon)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Desheng Ye, Ye and Lin, Inc. by Soo Yeon Lee (Lee, Soo Yeon)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Desheng Ye, Ye and Lin, Inc. by Soo Yeon Lee (Lee, Soo Yeon)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Delfino Zarate Munoz as to Desheng Ye on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Nolan, Timothy)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Delfino Zarate Munoz as to Ye and Lin, Inc. on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Nolan, Timothy)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 8/21/2020 at 9:30 AM to be held via teleconference. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 8/14/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Desheng Ye, Ye and Lin, Inc. (ng, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, )
June 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jp, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Delfino Zarate Munoz by Timothy Michael Nolan (Nolan, Timothy)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nolan, Timothy)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Delfino Zarate Munoz; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17119298.(Nolan, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz v. Ye and Lin, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desheng Ye
Represented By: Soo Yeon Lee
Represented By: Andrew Scott Willis
Represented By: Terry Shing-Ren Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ye and Lin, Inc.
Represented By: Soo Yeon Lee
Represented By: Andrew Scott Willis
Represented By: Terry Shing-Ren Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delfino Zarate Munoz
Represented By: Timothy Michael Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?