Smith v. United States
Plaintiff: Jonathan L. Smith
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 3:2020cv50269
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 MAILED copies of the docket, complaint, the 8/25/20 order, and the 09/09/20 order to plaintiff. (sb, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 9/9/2020: Plaintiff's motion for copies of the docket and his complaint #12 is granted. Plaintiff states he was unable to make a copy of his complaint prior to submitting it because of limitations on prison facilities due to COVID-19. Plaintiff is advised that this is a one-time courtesy. Even where an indigent plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis, fees for photocopies are not among the fees that are waivable pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. See Robinson v. Miscellaneous, No. 09C0148, 2009 WL 1649697, at *4 (E.D. Wis. June 11, 2009); In re Richard, 914 F.2d 1526, 1527 (6th Cir. 1990) ("Although the petitioner was granted leave to proceed in the district court as a pauper, that status waives only 'prepayment of fees and costs and security....' 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). It does not give the litigant a right to have documents copied and returned to him at government expense."). Plaintiff should be sure to make copies sufficient for his needs. Plaintiff's motion for a status update #13 is also granted to the extent this order informs him of the progress of his case. On August 25, 2020, the court entered an order allowing plaintiff to proceed on his complaint and summonses issued in accordance with the order's directives that same day. Plaintiff, however, indicates he did not receive a copy of the court's August 25, 2020 screening order ( #9 ). Therefore, the Clerk of Court shall send plaintiff copies of the docket, his complaint #10 , and the August 25, 2020 order. Mailed notice(sb, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Jonathan L. Smith For Date U. S. Attorney Was Served With Copy Of Summons And Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pg, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Jonathan L. Smith for Copy of Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jp, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 DESIGNATION of Monica V Mallory as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States (Mallory, Monica)
August 25, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Tom Walsh, United States Attorney via UPS with signature #1Z6E25203595974581, and U.S. Attorney General via UPS with signature #1Z6E25203599796392. (jp, )
August 25, 2020 sent plaintiff a magistrate judge consent form, instructions, and a copy of 8/25/2020 order (pg, )
August 25, 2020 sent copy of 8/25/2020 order to Trust Fund Officer at USP Thomson and the court's Fiscal Department (pg, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 COMPLAINT filed by Jonathan L. Smith; Jury Demand. (pg, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff's applications for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 , #6 are granted. The court waives the initial partial payment of the filing fee and directs the Clerk of Court to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer at USP Thomson and to the court's Fiscal Department. The Clerk of Court is further directed to: (1) file plaintiff's complaint #1 ; (2) issue summonses for service of the complaint on the United States; and (3) send plaintiff a magistrate judge consent form and filing instructions, along with a copy of this order. As for service on the United States, the Clerk of Court is directed to (1) send, by registered or certified mail, a copy of the summons for the United States and a copy of the complaint to the civil-process clerk at the United States Attorney for the Northern District of Illinois; (2) send, by registered or certified mail, a copy of the summons for the United States and the complaint to the Attorney General of the United States in Washington, D.C; and (3) send, by regular mail, a copy of this order along with a copy of the summons for the United States and the complaint to Tom Walsh, Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of Illinois. 'Plaintiff is advised that he has a continuing obligation to keep the court apprised of his current address, and failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and for want of prosecution. Plaintiff's motion to preserve evidence #4 is granted to the extent the evidence described in his motion exists and is in defendant's custody and control. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 8/25/2020:mailed notice(pg, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from Jonathan L. Smith dated 7/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pg, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER from Jonathan L. Smith dated 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pg, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Jonathan L. Smith for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jp, )
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (jp, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Jonathan L. Smith for an Order for the B.O.P. to Preserve Video Evidence. (jp, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Jonathan L. Smith for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jp, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jp, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT by Jonathan L. Smith; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Monica V Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?