Wilbanks v. Rock Falls Illinois Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Winston R Wilbanks
Defendant: Rock Falls Illinois Police Department, Officer Jim Holloway and Chief of Police Tammy Nelson
Case Number: 3:2020cv50304
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 9/30/2020:Plaintiff's renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #8 is denied without prejudice. If plaintiff wants to proceed with his case, he must submit another application that discloses his income beginning twelve months prior to the filing of this action and ending on the date of compliance. Plaintiff must also explain how he spent deposits to his jail trust fund account and why that income should not be counted against his ability to pay the filing fee. Alternatively, plaintiff may pre-pay the $400.00 filing fee. The court will summarily dismiss this case should plaintiff fail to comply by October 30, 2020. The court defers screening of plaintiff's complaint #1 until his fee status is resolved. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If plaintiff fails to keep the court informed of his address, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a court order and for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of this order and a blank in forma pauperis application (prisoner version). mailed/emailed notice notice(sb, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Winston R Wilbanks for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jp, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 9/1/2020: Plaintiff's motion for a copy of his complaint or a court order allowing him to make copies #6 so that he can serve defendants is denied without prejudice. Summons has not yet issued in this case. At this point, plaintiff must submit a properly completed in forma pauperis application by Sept. 21, 2020 if he wants to proceed with this case. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this matter. Mailed notice(sb, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Winston R Wilbanks for Copies of the Original Complaint or a Court Order (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jp, )
August 21, 2020 mailed copy of 8/21/2020 order and blank I.F.P. Application to plaintiff (pg, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 8/21/2020: Plaintiff=s application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit a renewed application that is certified by a trust fund officer and that includes a copy of plaintiff's prison trust fund statement showing activity in his account for the six months immediately preceding his filing of his complaint; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by September 21, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis (prisoner version) and a copy of this order. Mailed notice(sb, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (jp, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Winston R Wilbanks for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (No envelope postmark date). (gcy, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Winston R Wilbanks. (No Envelope postmark date). (gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilbanks v. Rock Falls Illinois Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Falls Illinois Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jim Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Tammy Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston R Wilbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?