Newstrand v. Saul
Plaintiff: Randy Newstrand
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv50305
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file #10 is granted. By 12/18/2020, Defendant shall file the electronic certified administrative record. Mailed notice (jp, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Andrew M. Saul for extension of time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Mallory, Monica)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Parties consent to exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge. This case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 8/31/2020. (jp, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Seibold, Stephanie)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Monica V Mallory as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Mallory, Monica)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of AUSA-SSA as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (AUSA-SSA, )(refile) Modified on 8/28/2020 (pg, ).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (jp, )
August 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Randy Newstrand by Stephanie Renee Seibold (Seibold, Stephanie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Randy Newstrand by Tracy Lynn Jones (Jones, Tracy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jones, Tracy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Randy Newstrand; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17340649.(Jones, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newstrand v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Monica V Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Newstrand
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Jones
Represented By: Stephanie Renee Seibold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?