Thigpen v. Inman et al
Plaintiff: Jerrod Harvey Thigpen
Defendant: Waltert, T. Albertson and Inman
Case Number: 3:2020cv50314
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
2 Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT by Jerrod Harvey Thigpen (Attachments: #1 Inmate Inquiry/Account Balances, #2 Envelope)(pg, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Jerrod Harvey Thigpen for leave to file an Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pg, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Jerrod Harvey Thigpen for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Envelope) (jp, )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER : In light of the reassignment of this case to Magistrate Judge Lisa A. Jensen, the parties are notified that all prior orders entered by Judge Iain D. Johnston remain in effect. Therefore, all hearings, settlement conferences, status report deadlines, discovery deadlines and briefing schedules shall stand, and all matters previously scheduled before Judge Johnston will now proceed before Judge Jensen, unless notified otherwise. Signed by the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 9/29/2020: Mailed notice. (docket2, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 20-0028: The Honorable lain D. Johnston has been confirmed as a United States District Judge for the Northern District of Illinois; therefore It is hereby ordered that all previously pending cases and referrals before the Honorable lain D. Johnston as a U.S. Magistrate Judge are to be reassigned to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen; and It is also ordered cases where Judge Johnston was the designated magistrate judge and requires further action, the Clerk shall assign the matter to Magistrate Judge Jensen; and It is also ordered that any case that is reassigned pursuant to this Order, and remains open at such time when the next magistrate judge in the Western Division is appointed, shall be reassigned to that magistrate judge. Case referred to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/29/2020.(docket2, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 9/14/2020: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice as incomplete. By October 14, 2020, plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit a renewed and complete application that includes a certified copy of his trust fund statement for the period indicated below; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by that date will result in summary dismissal of this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Plaintiff must promptly submit a written change-of address notification if he is released or transferred to another facility, or this case may be dismissed for want of prosecution. Mailed notice(sb, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (jp, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Jerrod Harvey Thigpen for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jp, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jp, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT by Jerrod Harvey Thigpen; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thigpen v. Inman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waltert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Albertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrod Harvey Thigpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?