Boyd v. United States of America
Petitioner: Shabaka K Boyd
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv50028
Filed: January 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Referring Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 Exhibit by Shabaka K Boyd (Herman, Joshua)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Petitioner's unopposed motion to supplement habeas petition #8 is granted and any supplement shall be filed as a separate docket entry. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Petitioner Shabaka K Boyd to supplement Habeas Petition with Additional Exhibit (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Joshua)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Michael Love as U.S. Attorney for Respondent United States of America (Love, Michael)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 INTRA district transfer from the Eastern Division 21cv281. (jp, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER Notice. Case transferred to Western Division - Rockford. Pursuant to transfer order: #4 . (gcy, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: This case was designated in error as an Eastern Division case. The Clerk is directed to transfer the case to the Western Division for assignment to the District and Magistrate Judges to whom the underlying criminal case is assigned and to close this matter as an Eastern Division case.Mailed notice (air, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Shabaka K Boyd by Joshua G. Herman (Herman, Joshua)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herman, Joshua)
January 19, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
January 16, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0752-17835636. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Herman, Joshua) Modified on 1/20/2021 (bg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shabaka K Boyd
Represented By: Joshua G. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Rockford
Represented By: Michael Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?