Brown v. Ciolli
Petitioner: Timothy Demitri Brown
Respondent: Andrew Ciolli
Case Number: 3:2021cv50363
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Petitioner is given until October 27, 2021 to either pay the $5 filing fee or file a petition for leave to file in forma pauperis. Petitioner is warned that the court may dismiss this case if he fails to comply with this order. The Clerk shall send: (1) petitioner a blank in forma pauperis application form with instructions, and (2) update the docket to reflect that respondent is Andrew Ciolli, Warden, USP Thomson. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 9/22/2021:Docketing to mail notices (pg, )
September 22, 2021 MAILED Blank I.F.P. Form, Instructions, Copy Of 9/22/21 Order to Timothy Brown (pg, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 INTRA district transfer from the Eastern Division 21cv4868. (jp, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER Notice. Case transferred to Western Division - Rockford. Pursuant to transfer order: #4 . (gw, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Because Petitioner is confined at USP Thomson, which is in the Western Division of this District, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the Western Division of this District. Civil case transferred. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from Timothy Demitri Brown dated 8/27/2021 (Exhibits) (exr, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (exr, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Timothy Demitri Brown against Ciolli (Envelope postmarked 9/3/2021)(exr, )
September 14, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Ciolli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Demitri Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Ciolli
Represented By: AUSA - Rockford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?