Sanderson v. McHenry villa LLC
Plaintiff: Kevin Sanderson
Defendant: McHenry villa LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv50434
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 12/7/2021: Electronic notice (sb, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard: On November 15, 2021, the court entered an order #5 directing plaintiff to file amended jurisdictional allegations on or before December 6, 2021, or this case would be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. No amended jurisdictional allegations have been filed. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case closed. Electronic notice (sb, )
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard: Plaintiff filed this action premised on diversity of citizenship jurisdiction. 28 U.S.C. 1332(a)(2). However, plaintiff failed to identify the members of defendant, a limited liability company, and each member's citizenship which is required to properly allege diversity of citizenship jurisdiction. Meyerson v. Showboat Marina Casino Partnership, 312 F.3d 318 (7th Cir. 2002). On or before December 6, 2021, plaintiff shall file amended jurisdictional allegations identifying each member of defendant and each member's citizenship, or this case will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Also, plaintiff has alleged he is a Canadian citizen. However, if plaintiff is lawfully admitted for permanent residence in the United States, he must identify, in his amended jurisdictional allegations, the state in which he is domiciled. Electronic notice (sb, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 INTRA district transfer from the Eastern Division 21cv6014. (jp, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER Notice. Case transferred to Western Division - Rockford. (nsf, )
November 12, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jp, )
November 12, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jp, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hanlon, Robert)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kevin Sanderson; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18859588.(Hanlon, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanderson v. McHenry villa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sanderson
Represented By: Robert Thomas Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McHenry villa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?