Lauren Combs v. Makes Cents, Inc., dba MaxLend et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Combs
Defendant: Makes Cents, Inc. doing business as MaxLend, Uetsa Tsakits, Inc., David Johnson, Kirk Michael Chewning and Cane Bay Partners VI, LLLP
Case Number: 3:2022cv50006
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Makes Cents, Inc., Uetsa Tsakits, Inc. by Leonika R. Charging-Davison (Charging-Davison, Leonika)
March 3, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Makes Cents, Inc., Uetsa Tsakits, Inc. by Nicole E Ducheneaux (Ducheneaux, Nicole)
March 2, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Attorneys Nicole Ducheneaux and Leonika Charging-Davison's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #8 #9 are granted. By 3/7/2022, Attorneys Nicole Ducheneaux and Leonika Charging-Davison shall file their appearances for Defendants. The parties' joint initial status report remains due 3/10/2022. Mailed notice. (vk)
March 1, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19201084. (Charging-Davison, Leonika)
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19201012. (Ducheneaux, Nicole)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Makes Cents, Inc., Uetsa Tsakits, Inc. by Joel M. L. Huotari (Huotari, Joel)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Makes Cents, Inc., Uetsa Tsakits, Inc. by Troy E. Haggestad (Haggestad, Troy)
January 11, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant David Johnson. (lxk, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 3/10/2022. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice. (vk)
January 7, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cane Bay Partners VI, LLLP, Kirk Michael Chewning, Makes Cents, Inc., Uetsa Tsakits, Inc. (cxr, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lauren Combs by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lauren Combs by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lauren Combs by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Lauren Combs; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19030195. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelman, Daniel)
January 6, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
January 6, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauren Combs v. Makes Cents, Inc., dba MaxLend et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Combs
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makes Cents, Inc. doing business as MaxLend
Represented By: Leonika R. Charging-Davison
Represented By: Nicole E Ducheneaux
Represented By: Joel M. L. Huotari
Represented By: Troy E. Haggestad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uetsa Tsakits, Inc.
Represented By: Leonika R. Charging-Davison
Represented By: Nicole E Ducheneaux
Represented By: Joel M. L. Huotari
Represented By: Troy E. Haggestad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Michael Chewning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cane Bay Partners VI, LLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?