Vilacasillas v. Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Al Anthony Vilacasillas
Defendant: Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. administrator d/b/a Beacon Hill Apartment administrator d/b/a Edward Rose and Sons
Case Number: 3:2023cv50296
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Referring Judge: Margaret J Schneider
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: The parties' Proposed Case Management Order #23 is adopted as modified as follows: Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures exchanged by 10/24/23; 25 interrogatories and 25 requests for admission by each party to any other party; 5 depositions by Plaintiff and 5 depositions by Defendant, each deposition, limited to a maximum of 7 hours; file amended pleadings, add counts or parties, and file third-party complaints by 01/05/24; Rule 26(a)(2)(C) disclosures due by 02/09/24; Rule 26(e) supplements due by 04/10/24; fact discovery ends 05/10/24. Any retained expert discovery and dispositive motions are reserved at this time. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 12/01/23, updating the Court on the status of discovery. Mailed notice. (jxk)
October 3, 2023 Filing 23 PROPOSED Pretrial Order (Yono, Haba)
October 3, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE by Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Al Anthony Vilacasillas to remand for lack of subject matter jurisdiction Presented before District Judge #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 09.18.2023 Letter to Sheryl Weikal)(Disbrow, Matthew)
September 19, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Initial telephonic status conference held on 09/19/23. As to Plaintiff's motion to remand #20 , Defendant has until 10/03/23 to file a response; Plaintiff has until 10/10/23 to reply. Additionally, the parties are directed to file a proposed case management order by 10/03/23 using the form located on Judge Schneider's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The Court will set further dates following receipt of the proposed case management order. Mailed notice. (jxk)
September 15, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Al Anthony Vilacasillas to remand for lack of subject matter jurisdiction Presented before District Judge (Weikal, Sheryl)
September 15, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE by Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Al Anthony Vilacasillas to strike answer to complaint #9 Affirmative Defenses Presented before District Judge #11 (Disbrow, Matthew)
September 14, 2023 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. by Matthew Scott Disbrow (Disbrow, Matthew)
September 12, 2023 Filing 17 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. Presented before Magistrate Judge (Yono, Haba)
September 7, 2023 Filing 16 Western Division ADR Notification (jp, )
September 6, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. by Haba K. Yono (Yono, Haba)
September 5, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Attorney Haba K. Yono's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants #13 , is granted. Attorney Yono is directed to file her appearance on behalf of Defendants by 09/12/23. Mailed notice. (jxk)
September 1, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice AILNDC-21000164 Presented before District Judge (Yono, Haba)
September 1, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: As to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses #11 , Defendants have until 09/15/23 to respond. Plaintiff has until 09/22/23 to reply. Mailed notice. (jxk)
August 30, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Al Anthony Vilacasillas to strike answer to complaint #9 Affirmative Defenses Presented before District Judge (Weikal, Sheryl)
August 18, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Initial telephonic status hearing set for 09/19/23 at 9:15 a.m. The Court will be utilizing the Cisco Webex platform. Public access is available via the following call-in number: 1-(650)-479-3207 and enter ACCESS CODE: 180-822-8235#. All counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear at the initial status hearing. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Schneider's webpage and file by 09/12/23. Counsel of record will receive an email the day prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice. (jxk)
August 17, 2023 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint at Law and Equity by Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. (Moore, Emory)
August 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. (Moore, Emory)
August 14, 2023 Filing 7 INTRA district transfer from the Eastern Division 23cv5310. (jp, )
August 14, 2023 Filing 6 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER Notice. Case transferred to Western Division - Rockford. Pursuant to transfer order: #4 . (aee, )
August 14, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jp, )
August 14, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jp, )
August 11, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. by Emory Darnell Moore, Jr (Moore, Emory)
August 11, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: This case having been removed from the Circuit Court of Winnebago County, it should have been filed in the Western Division of this District. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Western Division for reassignment to a judge in that division. Mailed notice (air, )
August 10, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Al Anthony Vilacasillas by Sheryl Melanie Weikal (Weikal, Sheryl)
August 10, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Moore, Emory)
August 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal filed by Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BILNDC-20917285. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Moore, Emory)
August 10, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gmm)
August 10, 2023 NEW PARTIES: Al Anthony Vilacasillas added to case caption. (Moore, Emory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vilacasillas v. Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Anthony Vilacasillas
Represented By: Sheryl Melanie Weikal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Rose Associates, L.L.C. administrator d/b/a Beacon Hill Apartment administrator d/b/a Edward Rose and Sons
Represented By: Emory Darnell Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Haba K. Yono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?