Ortiz et al v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Esperanza Ortiz and Jesus Rincon
Defendant: Javon Bea Hospital
3Rd Party Defendant: United States
Case Number: 3:2023cv50319
Filed: August 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Referring Judge: Margaret J Schneider
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Filing 17 WITHDRAWING John Kieran Murphy as counsel for Plaintiffs Esperanza Ortiz, Jesus Rincon and substituting Christopher Stephen Norman as counsel of record (Norman, Christopher)
October 3, 2023 Filing 16 REPLY by Esperanza Ortiz, Jesus Rincon to response to motion, #10 (Norman, Christopher)
October 2, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Esperanza Ortiz, Jesus Rincon by Christopher Stephen Norman (Norman, Christopher)
September 28, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Attorney Christopher S. Norman's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #11 , is granted. Attorney Norman is directed to file his appearance on behalf of Plaintiff Esperanza Ortiz by 10/04/23. Mailed notice. (jxk)
September 27, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Esperanza Ortiz, Jesus Rincon by John S LaMantia, II (LaMantia, John)
September 26, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY by United States to MOTION by Plaintiffs Esperanza Ortiz, Jesus Rincon to remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Presented before District Judge #5 UNITED STATES' MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION OF THE UNITED STATES TO DISMISS THE THIRD-PARTY CLAIM (Quaglia, Cassandra)
September 26, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21147352. Presented before District Judge (Norman, Christopher)
September 26, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Javon Bea Hospital to MOTION by Plaintiffs Esperanza Ortiz, Jesus Rincon to remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Presented before District Judge #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Supplement Case Law)(Orsi, Michael)
September 6, 2023 Filing 9 Western Division ADR Notification (jp, )
September 6, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: The Court has received Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction #5 . Defendants have until 09/26/23 to respond. Plaintiffs have until 10/03/23 to reply.Mailed notice. (jxk)
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Javon Bea Hospital, ThirdParty Plaintiff Javon Bea Hospital by Michael J Denning (Denning, Michael)
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Javon Bea Hospital, ThirdParty Plaintiff Javon Bea Hospital by Michael John Orsi (Orsi, Michael)
September 5, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiffs Esperanza Ortiz, Jesus Rincon to remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Presented before District Judge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Supplement)(Murphy, John)
September 5, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Esperanza Ortiz, Jesus Rincon by John Kieran Murphy (Murphy, John)
August 31, 2023 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Cassandra Lyn Quaglia as U.S. Attorney for Third Party Defendant United States (Quaglia, Cassandra)
August 31, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
August 31, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (pg, )
August 31, 2023 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel for plaintiffs. (jp, )
August 30, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Quaglia, Cassandra)
August 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of 17th Judicial Circuit Winnebago County, case number (2021-L-0000320) filed by United States (Quaglia, Cassandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz et al v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esperanza Ortiz
Represented By: Christopher Stephen Norman
Represented By: John Kieran Murphy
Represented By: John S LaMantia, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Rincon
Represented By: Christopher Stephen Norman
Represented By: John Kieran Murphy
Represented By: John S LaMantia, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javon Bea Hospital
Represented By: Michael J Denning
Represented By: Michael John Orsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: United States
Represented By: Cassandra Lyn Quaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?