Betts et al v. Boone County et al
Plaintiff: Gary Betts and Earl Betts
Defendant: Boone County, Boone County Coroner and The Estate of Wesley Hyland
Case Number: 3:2023cv50418
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lisa A Jensen
Referring Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Boone Countyin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Earl Betts for entry of default Presented before District Judge #11 (Emmert, Jordan)
January 10, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Earl Betts (Kelly, James)
January 10, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Earl Betts for entry of default Presented before District Judge (Kelly, James)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Boone County by Jordan W. Emmert (Emmert, Jordan)
December 14, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Boone County by Christopher John Drinkwine (Drinkwine, Christopher)
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Betts as to The Estate of Wesley Hyland on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. (Kelly, James)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Earl Betts, Gary Betts by James M Kelly (Kelly, James)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gary Betts. Boone County waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Kelly, James)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Attorney Boyd O. Robert's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #3 is granted. Mr. Robert shall file his appearance for Plaintiffs. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 01/22/2024. Plaintiffs are directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice. (vk)
November 20, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21350227. Presented before District Judge (Kelly, James)
November 20, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Earl Betts, Gary Betts by James M Kelly (Kelly, James)
November 20, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Estate of Wesley Hyland (jcc, )
November 20, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jp, )
November 20, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jp, )
November 20, 2023 MAILED Local Rule 83.16 to counsel for plaintiff. (jp, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gary Betts, Earl Betts; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21343599. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betts et al v. Boone County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Betts
Represented By: James M Kelly
Represented By: Boyd O Roberts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Betts
Represented By: James M Kelly
Represented By: Boyd O Roberts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boone County
Represented By: Christopher John Drinkwine
Represented By: Jordan W. Emmert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boone County Coroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Wesley Hyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?