Boyd et al v. Tornier, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Garry Boyd, Boyd Medical, Inc., Charles Wetherill and Addison Medical, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Tornier, Inc., Nexa Orthopedics, Inc., Archway Medical, Inc. and James O'Day |
Case Number: |
3:2007cv00751 |
Filed: |
October 25, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Clifford J. Proud |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Reagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 7, 2013 |
Filing
269
ORDER GRANTING IN PART 259 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Garry Boyd, Addison Medical, Inc., Boyd Medical, Inc., Charles Wetherill and GRANTING 263 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose Experts filed by Garry Boyd, Addison Medical, Inc., Boyd Medical, Inc., Charles Wetherill. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/29/2013 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/7/13. (sgp)
|
May 17, 2012 |
Filing
236
ORDER on damages award. GRANTING new trial. Parties are directed to submit a Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by 6/8/2012. Parties are further directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams to schedule a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/17/2012. (hbs)
|
June 18, 2009 |
Filing
135
MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Tornier. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 6/18/09. (See order for details.)(acm)
|
June 16, 2009 |
Filing
130
ORDER and MEMORANDUM, Granting 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to all Plaintiffs filed by Nexa Orthopedics, Inc. Defendant, Nexa Orthopedics, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 6/16/09. (acm)
|
June 12, 2009 |
Filing
126
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment: The Court hereby GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Tornier's motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs Garry Boyd and Boyd Medical (Doc. 98). See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 6/12/2009. (djp)
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing
92
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 42 Nexa's MOTION to Dismiss: The Court hereby GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Nexa's motion to dismiss (Doc. 42). The motion is GRANTED insofar as the Court DISMISSES Plaintiffs Gary Boyd and Charles Wetherill's tortious interference claims against Nexa Orthopedics (Counts 4 and 8) with prejudice. Additionally, the Court PARTIALLY DISMISSES Boyd Medical's tortious interference claim insofar as it relies on the allegation that N exa encouraged Boyd Medical's employees to quit and work for Archway Medical (Count 4) without prejudice. The Court DENIES Nexa's motion to dismiss in all other respects. An abbreviated pre-trial schedule, providing Plaintiffs a final opportunity to amend their complaint, and setting new deadlines for submitting any dispositive motions, shall be forthcoming. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 1/20/2009. (djp)
|
October 29, 2008 |
Filing
70
ORDER denying 58 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud on 10/29/08. (amv)
|
October 10, 2008 |
Filing
61
ORDER granting in part 58 Motion to Compel. The Court will defer ruling on the request to compel pending defendant's response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud on 10/10/08. (amv)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?