Restricted Spending Solutions, LLC v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Restricted Spending Solutions LLC alleged that Defendant Apple Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7,143,064 entitled \"Controlled Entertainment Spending Account.\"

Plaintiff: Restricted Spending Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00093
Filed: February 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Clifford J. Proud
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Reagan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2008 Filing 32
CLERK'S JUDGMENT upon stipulation of the parties, this cause of action is dismissed with prejudice. (acm)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph P. Conran terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud on 5/13/08. (amv)
May 8, 2008 Filing 28
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Apple, Inc., by Apple, Inc.. (Conran, Joseph)
May 5, 2008 Filing 27
REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christina M. Finn, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Valentine, James)
May 1, 2008 Filing 26
ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Restricted Spending Solutions, LLC.(Lesko, Paul)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 5/19/2009 09:30 AM in East St. Louis Court House before Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud on 4/25/08. (amv)
April 24, 2008 Filing 22
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Restricted Spending Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - iTunes Store Top Music Retailer in the US, # 2 Exhibit B - Apple's Terms of Sale; Terms of Service, # 3 Exhibit C - iTunes Music Store Downloads Top 25 Million Songs, # 4 Exhibit D - Apple Reports Fourth Quarter Results, # 5 Exhibit E - Apple Inc.'s SEC Form 10-K, # 6 Exhibit F - Patent Reform Hits Wall in Senate, # 7 Exhibit G - Apple Store Locator for Zip Code 62201, # 8 Exhibit H - Why Apple Fans Hate Tech Reporters, # 9 Exhibit I - Group Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit J - Group Exhibit)(Lesko, Paul)
April 14, 2008 Filing 21
Motion and Order to Appear Pro Hac Vice granting appearance of Attorney James F. Valentine for Apple, Inc.. $100.00 fee paid,receipt number 34625005323 (tkm )
April 11, 2008 Filing 16
MOTION to Transfer Case by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Mirrashidi Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Valentine Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11)(Norman, Alan)
April 2, 2008 Filing 13
NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Telephone Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 5/2/2008 09:00 AM in East St. Louis Court House before Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud. (amv)
March 14, 2008 Filing 12
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Restricted Spending Solutions, LLC. Apple, Inc. served on 2/21/2008, answer due 4/11/2008. (Lesko, Paul)
March 13, 2008 Filing 9
CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2009, 10:00 AM in East St. Louis Court House before Judge Michael J. Reagan. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2009, 09:00 AM in East St. Louis Court House before Judge Michael J. Reagan. Assigned by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 3/13/08. (acm)
March 12, 2008 Filing 8
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Conran, Joseph)
February 7, 2008 Filing 5
Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (tkm )
February 6, 2008 Filing 4
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Restricted Spending Solutions, LLC. (Lesko, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Restricted Spending Solutions, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Restricted Spending Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?