Beasley v. Hairrs et al
Plaintiff: Jack A Beasley
Defendant: E Hairrs, Crisey Fenton, Olukunle Obadina, C/O Lutz, Dan Webb, Jackie Miller and Charles Dintelman
Case Number: 3:2010cv00587
Filed: August 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Livingston
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/jdh) in favor of C/O Lutz, Charles Dintelman, Crisey Fenton, Dan Webb, E Hairrs, E Harris, Jackie Miller, Olukunle Obadina against Jack A Beasley. The case is dimissed wih prejudice as to all defendants.Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/1/2012. (jdh)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 54 . The Court dismisses Harris and Obadina without prejudice. Beasley may move for reinstatement of Harris or Obadina if he obtains their current address. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/23/2011. (dka, )
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 26 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/23/2011. (tjk)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, Philip M. Frazier added. Dan Webb terminated without prejudice, C/O Lutz and Jackie Miller terminated with prejudice. Count 4 fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and thus is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall prepare for defendants Hairrs, Fenton, Obadina and Dintelman a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/25/2011. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Hairrs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack A Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Hairrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crisey Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olukunle Obadina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Dintelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?