Kawasaki Heavy Industries, Ltd et al v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kawasaki Heavy Industries, Ltd and Kawasaki Motors Manufacturing Corp, USA
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc., BRP U.S., Inc., Bank of Montreal, Harry Marcus and Robert Goethals
Case Number: 3:2010cv00641
Filed: August 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/27/11. (klh, )
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Granting 83 MOTION for Protective Order with Consent filed by Robert Goethals, Harry Marcus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/12/2011. (hbs)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 35 Motion to Dismiss filed by the Bank of Montreal. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/9/11. (klh, )
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying 28 Motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' complaint, or in the alternative, to stay plaintiffs' action pending arbitration. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/5/11. (klh, )
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 42 MOTION for Discovery on Defendants In Order To Respond to Defendants Marcus and Goethals' Motion to Dismiss filed by Kawasaki Motors Manufacturing Corp, USA, Kawasaki Heavy Industries, Ltd. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 11/24/10. (skp)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING 7.1 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure disclosure statements. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 9/21/10. (klh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kawasaki Heavy Industries, Ltd et al v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawasaki Heavy Industries, Ltd
Represented By: Thomas Q. Keefe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawasaki Motors Manufacturing Corp, USA
Represented By: Thomas Q. Keefe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Montreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Goethals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?