Adams et al v. Armstrong International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Leonard R Adams and Marian M Adams
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company, Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Dravo Corporation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., General Refractories Company, Yarway Corporation, Industrial Holding Corporation, Zurn Industries, LLC, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Plastics Engineering Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Maremont Corporation, Ford Motor Company, William Powell Company, Pfizer, Inc., Crane Co., Duro Dyne Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Motion Control Industries Inc, Caterpillar Inc, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Terex Corporation, C.P. Hall Company, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, PPL Electric Utilities Corporation, Bridgestone/Firestone America's Holding, Inc., Honeywell Inc, Riley Power, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Conwed Corporation, NAPA Auto Parts, York International Corporation, J.M. Asbestos Sales, Inc., D & F Distributing, Inc., John Deere Company, Armstrong International, Inc., Avocet Enterprises, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Dap, Inc., Gardner-Gibson, Inc., ITT Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Carboline Company, CSR, Inc., Borg-Warner Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Pneumo Abex Corporation, John Crane, Inc., Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems USA, LLC, Cleaver-Brooks, Ferro Engineering, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Navistar, Inc., National Service Industries, Inc., Hitco Carbon Composites, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Beazer East, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Consolidated Rail Corporation, Essex Specialty Products, LLC, Mack Trucks Inc, Union Carbide Corporation, Kentile Floors, Inc., CBS Corporation, Square D, Imo Industries, Inc. and J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00857
Filed: September 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Philip M Frazier
Referring Judge: G Patrick Murphy
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2012 Filing 39 Acknowledgment Letter from Madison County State Court regarding Order of Remand. (tkm )
January 10, 2012 Filing 38 Letter to Madison County State Court regarding Order of Remand. (tkm )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF REMAND: Case remanded to Third Judicial Circuit, Madison County, Illinois. See Order at #36 . Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 1/10/2012. (ktc)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #26 #28 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 1/10/2012. (ktc)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #34 Stipulation of Dismissal jointly filed by Plaintiff and Consolidated Rail Corporation: Per this stipulation Plaintiff's claim as against Defendant Consolidated Rail Corporation is dismissed without prejudice. See e.g. Jenkins v. Village of Maywood, 506 F.3d 622, 624 (7th Cir. 2007). Consolidated Rail Corporation shall be terminated from this action. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 12/5/2011. (ktc)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 2, 2011 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Consolidated Rail Corporation by Consolidated Rail Corporation. (VanDorn, Erick)
December 2, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #31 Response filed by General Electric Company. See attached document for specifics (jlrr)
December 1, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis R. Picou on behalf of Mack Trucks Inc (Picou, Curtis)
December 1, 2011 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #28 Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Remand filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5.A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5.B, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5.C, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 5.D, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 5.E, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 5.F, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 5.G, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 5.H, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 5.I.A, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 5.I.B, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 5.I.C, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 5.I.D, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 5.I.E, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 5.I.F, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 5.I.G, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 5.J, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 5.K, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 5.L, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 5.M, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 5.N, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 5.O, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 5.P, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 5.Q, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 5.R, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 5.S, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 5.T, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 5.U, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 5.V, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 5.W, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 5.X, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 5.Y, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 5.Z, #38 Exhibit Exhibit 5.AA, #39 Exhibit Exhibit 5.BB, #40 Exhibit Exhibit 5.CC.A, #41 Exhibit Exhibit 5.CC.B, #42 Exhibit Exhibit 5.CC.C, #43 Exhibit Exhibit 5.CC.D, #44 Exhibit Exhibit 5.CC.E, #45 Exhibit Exhibit 5.CC.F, #46 Exhibit Exhibit 5.CC.G, #47 Exhibit Exhibit 5.CC.H, #48 Exhibit Exhibit 5.CC.I, #49 Exhibit Exhibit 5.DD, #50 Exhibit Exhibit 5.EE, #51 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #52 Exhibit Exhibit 7.A, #53 Exhibit Exhibit 7.B)(Fournie, Raymond) Modified on 12/2/2011 (jlrr).
October 28, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. O'Connell on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Connell, Daniel)
October 28, 2011 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Leonard R Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Mahoney, Ryan)
October 28, 2011 Filing 28 Amended MOTION to Remand by Leonard R Adams. Responses due by 12/1/2011 (Mahoney, Ryan)
October 21, 2011 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Leonard R Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mahoney, Ryan)
October 21, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION to Remand by Leonard R Adams. Responses due by 11/25/2011 (Mahoney, Ryan)
October 18, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #24 Notice of Appearance filed by Ferro Engineering, #23 Notice of Appearance filed by Cleaver-Brooks. See attached document for specifics. (jdh)
October 17, 2011 Filing 24 STRICKEN PER DOC#25-NOTICE of Appearance by A. J. Bronsky on behalf of Ferro Engineering (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bronsky, A.) Modified on 10/18/2011 (jdh).
October 6, 2011 Filing 23 STRICKEN PER DOC# 25-NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. O'Connell on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Connell, Daniel) Modified on 10/18/2011 (jdh).
October 6, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #21 Notice of Appearance filed by Cleaver-Brooks. See attached document for specifics (dka, )
October 5, 2011 Filing 21 STRICKEN PER DOCUMENT 22 - NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. O'Connell on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Connell, Daniel) Modified on 10/6/2011 (dka, ).
October 3, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #19 Notice of Appearance filed by Ferro Engineering. See attached document for specifics (dka, )
September 30, 2011 Filing 19 STRICKEN PER DOCUMENT 20 - NOTICE of Appearance by A. J. Bronsky on behalf of Ferro Engineering (Bronsky, A.) Modified on 10/3/2011 (dka, ).
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge David R. Herndon recused. Case reassigned to Judge G. Patrick Murphy for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 9/28/11. (skp)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William D. Stiehl recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge David R. Herndon for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 9/27/11. (bjw)
September 27, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Ybarra on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Ybarra, David)
September 27, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #13 Notice of Appearance filed by Ford Motor Company. See attached document for specifics (dka, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of General Electric Company (Kidd, Anita)
September 26, 2011 Filing 13 STRICKEN PER DOCUMENT 15 - NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Ybarra on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Ybarra, David) Modified on 9/27/2011 (dka, ).
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William D. Stiehl for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/26/2011. (dka, )
September 23, 2011 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk SD/IL to Attorney Robert Spitkovsky, Jr. re: attorney admission (bkl)
September 23, 2011 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk SD/IL to Attorney Robert J. Meyer re: attorney admission (bkl)
September 23, 2011 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk SD/IL to Attorney Jackie W. Miller re: attorney admission (bkl)
September 23, 2011 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk SD/IL to Attorney Kevin B. Dreher re: attorney admission (bkl)
September 23, 2011 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk SD/IL to Attorney Gregory L. Cochran re: attorney admission (bkl)
September 23, 2011 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk SD/IL to Attorney Jeffrey E. Rogers re: attorney admission (bkl)
September 22, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of General Electric Company (Fournie, Raymond)
September 22, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE by General Electric Company to Plaintiffs of Filing of Removal (Fournie, Raymond)
September 22, 2011 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
September 22, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company from Third Judicial Circuit, case number 11-L-508. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0754-1511965) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B.1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B.2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B.3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B.4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit Exhibit H.1, #12 Exhibit Exhibit H.2, #13 Exhibit Exhibit H.3, #14 Exhibit Exhibit H.4, #15 Exhibit Exhibit H.5, #16 Exhibit Exhibit H.6, #17 Exhibit Exhibit H.7, #18 Exhibit Exhibit H.8, #19 Exhibit Exhibit H.9, #20 Exhibit Exhibit H.10.A, #21 Exhibit Exhibit H.10.B, #22 Exhibit Exhibit H.10.C, #23 Exhibit Exhibit H.10.D, #24 Exhibit Exhibit H.10.E, #25 Exhibit Exhibit H.10.F, #26 Exhibit Exhibit H.10.G, #27 Exhibit Exhibit H.11, #28 Exhibit Exhibit H.12, #29 Exhibit Exhibit H.13, #30 Exhibit Exhibit H.14, #31 Exhibit Exhibit H.15, #32 Exhibit Exhibit H.16, #33 Exhibit Exhibit H.17, #34 Exhibit Exhibit H.18, #35 Exhibit Exhibit H.19, #36 Exhibit Exhibit H.20, #37 Exhibit Exhibit H.21, #38 Exhibit Exhibit H.22, #39 Exhibit Exhibit H.23, #40 Exhibit Exhibit H.24, #41 Exhibit Exhibit H.25, #42 Exhibit Exhibit H.26, #43 Exhibit Exhibit H.27, #44 Exhibit Exhibit H.28, #45 Exhibit Exhibit H.29, #46 Exhibit Exhibit H.30.A, #47 Exhibit Exhibit H.30.B, #48 Exhibit Exhibit H.30.C, #49 Exhibit Exhibit H.30.D, #50 Exhibit Exhibit H.30.E, #51 Exhibit Exhibit H.30.F, #52 Exhibit Exhibit H.30.G, #53 Exhibit Exhibit H.30.H, #54 Exhibit Exhibit H.30.I, #55 Exhibit Exhibit H.31, #56 Exhibit Exhibit H.32, #57 Exhibit Exhibit I.1, #58 Exhibit Exhibit I.2, #59 Exhibit Exhibit I.3, #60 Exhibit Exhibit I.4, #61 Exhibit Exhibit I.5)(Fournie, Raymond)
September 22, 2011 Filing 1 Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 11-857-JPG/PMF must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(bkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Armstrong International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dravo Corporation
Represented By: William F. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Refractories Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarway Corporation
Represented By: Kevin B. Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holding Corporation
Represented By: Brenda G. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: William F. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Boiler Works, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plastics Engineering Company
Represented By: William F. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Brenda G. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maremont Corporation
Represented By: David W. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: David W. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: Gregory L. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: David W. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Susan Gunty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duro Dyne Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Brenda G. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC
Represented By: Robert Spitkovsky, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Control Industries Inc
Represented By: Curtis R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terex Corporation
Represented By: Brenda G. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.P. Hall Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPL Electric Utilities Corporation
Represented By: Brenda G. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone/Firestone America's Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Woodrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Inc
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Charles L. Joley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conwed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPA Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Asbestos Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & F Distributing, Inc.
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Deere Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avocet Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory L. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dap, Inc.
Represented By: William F. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner-Gibson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda G. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carboline Company
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole C. Behnen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Jackie W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems USA, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks
Represented By: Jackie W. Miller
Represented By: Daniel J. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferro Engineering
Represented By: A. J. Bronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: William F. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Service Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitco Carbon Composites, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East
Represented By: Curtis R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nooter Corporation
Represented By: Douglas M. Nieder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Rail Corporation
Represented By: Erick E. VanDorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essex Specialty Products, LLC
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks Inc
Represented By: Curtis R. Picou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentile Floors, Inc.
Represented By: William F. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard R Adams
Represented By: Ryan J. Mahoney
Represented By: Elizabeth V. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian M Adams
Represented By: Elizabeth V. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?