United States of America v. Sanders et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Frankie L. Sanders and State of Illinois Department of Revenue
Case Number: 3:2011cv00912
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William D. Stiehl
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2016 112 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING 87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. On October 19, 2016, the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals granted leave to file an amended order in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) for the purpose of correcting an error. The specifics of the amendment are outlined in the attached order. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/20/16. (klh2)
February 18, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 87 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/18/16. (klh2)
August 29, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 58 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/29/13. (sgp)
September 17, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 09/17/2012. (jst)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Larry S. Schifano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankie L. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?