Hines v. United States of America

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: Corey Louis Hines
Case Number: 3:2011cv01064
Filed: December 5, 2011
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Reagan
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER: The Court hereby SUBSTITUTES this CORRECTED ORDER for the Order entered March 18, 2013 (Doc. 59). Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 3/22/13. (caa)
September 20, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 29 Notice of Appeal and 30 Notice of Appeal filed by Corey Louis Hines: The Court orders that a certificate of appealability shall not be issued as to either Notice of Appeal (Docs. 29, 30). Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 9/20/12. (caa)
August 8, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the United States to respond to Hines' petition and motion to diqualify; denying as moot Hines' motion requesting disposition of his petition (Doc. 2). Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 8/8/12. (caa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: James M. Cutchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Corey Louis Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?