Chor et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Plaintiff: Katie Chor, Allison Wardingly, Lucille Price, Tshangie Smith, Imelda Santoyo, Patricia Martin, Selena Schubert, Unique Pirtle, Mya Morris, Candice Craig, Jennifer Kendall, Erica Juarez, Jessica Mauch, Loralee Ivkovic, Ginny Buxton, Jillian Morehead, Janet Young, Markee Catt, Maggie Yunker, Melissa Bozarth, Nancy Jones, Jada Anderson, Barbara Schwartz-Martinez, Julie Bradley, Jannette Shaw, April Christmas, Lacey Stone, Rebecca McKee, Robin Newman, Traci Nurse, Kathryn McAtee, Latia Jennings, Sandra Price, Ramieka Bowen, Amy Crider, Laura Monarrez, Mona Lisa Buchanan, Sheri Nilsson, Jennifer Bowling, Stephanie Furnish, Shauntara Chambers, Anna Smith, Athena Stowell, Jennifer Mills, Tammy Hijaz, Jessica Cuellar, Kellie Griener, Latosha Black, Anastasia Rubin, Valerie McCloud, Shannon Rachal, Roshanda Artis-Allison, Curtina Johnson, Sarah Black, Loreal Harris, Lindsay Moran, Cynthia Black, Chimere Comegys, Annette Boyle, Tamiko Conway, Barbara Sherman, Sarah Bennett, Annette Fontana, Barbara Hodges, Theawiana English, Sarah Parney, Caitlyn Kidle, Tara Cyphert, Julie Ryckman, Katie Larson, Elisa Cady, Robyn Grosenbacher, Donshae Harris, Michelle Porche, LaShanna Green, Catina GLaspie, Kimberly Griffin, Maxine Mitchell, Patricia Hartley, Toni McCarter, Randi Allen, Lisa Boyd, Crystal Roberts, Mary Marsalis, Katrina Nearing, Shakendra McLean, Elizabeth Hayes, Manuela Espinosa, Elizabeth Tricebock, Julie Johnson, Susan Collins, Christine Sumner, Sabina Opankovic and Sarah Weirsma
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc and Bayer Pharma AG
Case Number: 3:2011cv12891
Filed: September 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 34 Motion to Vacate. The order of dismissal as to plaintiffs Latosha Black, Julie Bradley, Jessica Cuellar, Tara Cyphert, and Jennifer Mills is VACATED. The Court instructs the Clerk of the Court to reinstate the claims of plaintiffs Latosha Black, Julie Bradley, Jessica Cuellar, Tara Cyphert, and Jennifer Mills. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/18/2013. (dsw)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Vacate. As to certain plaintiffs, movant seeks to vacate the order of dismissal without prejudice entered for failure to comply with PFS obligations 5 . Bayer has not responded to the motion to vacate. Accordingly, t he Court hereby vacates the order dismissing without prejudice the claims of the following plaintiffs and directs the Clerk of the Court to reinstate the same: Traci Nurse, Unique Pirtle,Shannon Rachal, Tshangie Smith, and Loralee Ivkovic. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/4/2012. (dsw)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Vacate. The Clerk of the Court shall reinstate plaintiffs Kellie Griener and Kathryn McAttee. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/10/2012. (dsw)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss. The order of dismissal without prejudice for failure to comply with PFS requirements applies to Bennett, Black, Bowen, Bradley, Buchanan, Cady, Crider, Cuellar, Cyphert, Espinosa, Glaspie, Griener, Harris, Ivkovic, Jennings, Kendall, Kidle, Marsalis, McAtee, Mills, Nilsson, Nurse, Parney, Pirtle, Porche, Price, S. Price, Rachal, T. Smith, Stone, Wardingley. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 2/28/2012. (dsw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chor et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Chor
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Wardingly
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Price
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tshangie Smith
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imelda Santoyo
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Martin
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Schubert
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unique Pirtle
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mya Morris
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Craig
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kendall
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Juarez
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Mauch
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loralee Ivkovic
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginny Buxton
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Morehead
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Young
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markee Catt
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Yunker
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Bozarth
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Jones
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jada Anderson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Schwartz-Martinez
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Bradley
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannette Shaw
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Christmas
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Stone
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca McKee
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Newman
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Nurse
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn McAtee
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latia Jennings
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Price
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramieka Bowen
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Crider
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Monarrez
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Lisa Buchanan
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Nilsson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bowling
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Furnish
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauntara Chambers
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Smith
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athena Stowell
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Mills
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Hijaz
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Cuellar
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Griener
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latosha Black
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia Rubin
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie McCloud
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Rachal
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roshanda Artis-Allison
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtina Johnson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Black
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loreal Harris
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Moran
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Black
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chimere Comegys
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Boyle
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamiko Conway
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Sherman
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Bennett
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Fontana
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hodges
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theawiana English
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Parney
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlyn Kidle
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Cyphert
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ryckman
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Larson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Cady
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Grosenbacher
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donshae Harris
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Porche
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaShanna Green
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catina GLaspie
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Griffin
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Mitchell
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hartley
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni McCarter
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Allen
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Boyd
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Roberts
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Marsalis
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Nearing
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shakendra McLean
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hayes
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuela Espinosa
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Tricebock
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Johnson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Collins
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Sumner
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabina Opankovic
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Weirsma
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: John E. Galvin
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Terry Lueckenhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?