Haley et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Thompson, Shelly Cluff, Rebecca Hill, Andrea Ferris, Sylvia Kingery, Natasha Haley, Twanna Rouser, Rhonda Salyers, Misty Brehm, Samantha Morgan, Jessica Westendorf, Jereese Barrett, Tanisha Mauk, Heather Lascelles, Danielle Clark, Nicole Subler, Anstin Frazier, Sarah Hastings, Laurie Nenadovich, Janice Kitchen, Aretha Johnson, Kathy Smith, Christine Grim, Racheal Bahe, Chandra Sampson, Tacha Lesley, Edwina Burrows, Starlet Etheridge, Nicole Love, Emmaly Tugman, Angela Hill, Amy Farris, Azita Zavari, Rebecca McMahan, Jennifer Monia, Megan Tripp, Jaime Herrington, Audria Kuykendoll, Michelle Rhodes, Jessica Walden, LaWanda Elvira, Lakesha Franklin, Allison Tinder, Sarah Vine, Kimberly Hicks, Aquarius Armstrong, Amy Jacobs, Michelle Murray, Kathleen Fallon, Janet Dammann, Sylvia Cruz, Gabriella Castellano, Diana Medina, Patricia Garcia, Bebe Flores, Britania Velarde, Tina Whetstone, Shayna Starkey, Talia Riffe, Lauren Rogers, Rachel Locken, Elizabeth Grainger, Kylie Pulliam, Ashlee Wilson, Ksee Ashcraft, Melissa Maria Padron, Gabriela Salinas, Rebekah Crosser, Kristina Glidewell, Sarah Fleck, Liz Ramirez-Valencia, Yvonne Reyes, Amy Brose, Anna Middleton, Melissa Howard, Emily De La Cruz, Judy Barker, Tracy Lambert, Quanna Colby, Nicole McLelland, Alaina Adams, Amber Howard, Misty Thompson, Yvette Bolden, Michelle Henderson, Morgan Chiti, Justine Lackey, Jessica Bullock, Mary Eshbaugh, Lisa Hunter, Barbara Lizotte, Amber Hinchman and Kayla Toth
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Pharma AG
Case Number: 3:2011cv12892
Filed: September 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 34 Motion to Vacate. The order of dismissal as to plaintiffs Alaina Adams, Sarah Hastings, Samantha Morgan, and Yvonne Reyes is VACATED. The Court instructs the Clerk of the Court to reinstate the claims of plaintiffs Alaina Adams, Sarah Hastings, Samantha Morgan, and Yvonne Reyes. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/18/2013. (dsw)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Vacate. Movant seeks to vacate the without prejudice dismissal 5 entered for failure to comply with PFS obligations as to certain plaintiffs. Bayer states that it is not opposed to the motion to vacate. Accordingly the Court hereby vacates the order of dismissal 5 as to the following plaintiffs and directs the Clerk of the Court to reinstate the same: Emily De La Cruz, Andrea Ferris, Sarah Fleck, Austin Frazier, Patricia Garcia, Rachel Locken, Nicole Love, Kylie Pulliam, Michelle Rhodes, Allison Tinder, and Sarah Vine. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/5/2012. (dsw)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Vacate. As to the following 13 plaintiffs the Court VACATES the order of dismissal and ORDERS the Clerk of the Court to reinstate each plaintiff's case: (1) Ksee Ashcraft, (2) Judy Barke r, (3) Misty Brehm, (4) Morgan Chiti, (5) Rebekah Crosser, (6) Mary Eshbaugh, (7) Starlet Etheridge, (8) Elizabeth Grainger, (9) Diana Medina, (10) Talia Riffe, (11) Nicole Subler, (12) Kathy Thompson, and (13) Jessica Walden. These plaintiffs must cure any minor PFS delinquencies noted in the Court's order within 14 days. The motion to vacate the dismissal of the remaining plaintiffs is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/10/2012. (dsw)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss. The order of dismissal for failure to comply with PFS obligations applies to plaintiffs (1) Alaina Adams, (2) Aquarius Armstrong, (3) Ksee Ashcraft, (4) Racheal Bahe, (5) Judy Barker, (6) Misty Brehm, (7) Edwina Burrows, (8) Morgan Chiti, (9) Rebekah Crosser, (10) Sylvia Cruz, (11) Emily De La Cruz, (12) Mary Eshbaugh, (13) Starlet Etheridge, (14) Kathleen Fallon, (15) Andrea Ferris, (16) Sarah Fleck, (17) Lakesha Franklin, (18) Austin Frazier, (19) Patrici a Garcia, (20) Kristina Glidewell, (21) Elizabeth Grainger, (22) Natasha Haley, (23) Sarah Hastings, (24) Jaime Herrington, (25) Kimberly Hicks, (26) Rebecca Hill, (27) Lisa Hunter, (28) Aretha Johnson, (29) Sylvia Kingery, (30) Janice Kitchen, (31) Justine Lackey, (32) Tracy Lambert, (33) Heather Lascelles, (34) Barbara Lizotte, (35) Rachel Locken, (36) Nicole Love, (37) Diana Medina, (38) Samantha Morgan, (39) Michelle Murray, (40) Kylie Pulliam, (41) Liz Ramirez-Valencia, (42) Yvonne Reyes, ( 43) Michelle Rhodes, (44) Talia Riffe, (45) Rhonda Salyers, (46) Kathy Smith, (47) Nicole Subler, (48) Kathy Thompson, (49) Allison Tinder, (50) Kayla Toth, (51) Megan Tripp, (52) Sarah Vine, and (53) Jessica Walden. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/1/2012. (dsw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haley et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Thompson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Cluff
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Hill
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Ferris
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Kingery
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Haley
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twanna Rouser
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Salyers
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Brehm
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Morgan
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Westendorf
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jereese Barrett
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanisha Mauk
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Lascelles
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Clark
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Subler
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anstin Frazier
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hastings
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Nenadovich
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Kitchen
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aretha Johnson
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Smith
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Grim
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Racheal Bahe
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra Sampson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tacha Lesley
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwina Burrows
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starlet Etheridge
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Love
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmaly Tugman
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Hill
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Farris
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azita Zavari
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca McMahan
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Monia
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Tripp
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Herrington
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audria Kuykendoll
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Rhodes
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Walden
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaWanda Elvira
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakesha Franklin
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Tinder
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Vine
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Hicks
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aquarius Armstrong
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Jacobs
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Murray
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Fallon
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Dammann
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Cruz
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriella Castellano
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Medina
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Garcia
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bebe Flores
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britania Velarde
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Whetstone
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayna Starkey
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talia Riffe
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Rogers
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Locken
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Grainger
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylie Pulliam
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlee Wilson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ksee Ashcraft
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Maria Padron
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriela Salinas
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Crosser
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Glidewell
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Fleck
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz Ramirez-Valencia
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Reyes
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Brose
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Middleton
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Howard
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily De La Cruz
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Barker
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lambert
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quanna Colby
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole McLelland
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaina Adams
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Howard
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Thompson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Bolden
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Henderson
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Chiti
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Lackey
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Bullock
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Eshbaugh
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hunter
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Lizotte
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Hinchman
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Toth
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John E. Galvin
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Terry Lueckenhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?