Bartolini et al v. Abbott Laboratories Inc
Plaintiff: Stacy Bartolini, Laura Diane Barnes, Samantha Bryant, Jennifer Janecek, Michael Gates, Krista Kaye Howard, Charles H Jackson, II, Karen Kelly, Jarri and Clay Leighton, Renae Dell Mandery, Whitney L Middlebrook, Holly Lynn Russell, Patricia Rodriguez, Laura Parr, Rhonda Peeples, Nancy and Paul Prosence, Lisa Kay Schnarr, Rachel and Paul Springsteen, Tomiko Moore, Melissa A Wilkinson, Gloria Stampley, Angela and Scott Vaughn, Kelly Allen, Senqueita Ancrum, Hector and Guadalupe Baeza, Gary R and Mary E Barickman, Bethany Buck, Irina Burnett, Michelle Cassidy, Carolyn Pearson, Toni and Randy Ford, Crystal Kidd, April Harrigan, Sindy Salgado, Marthee Sansone, Angie Stevenson, Rosemary R and Rober Stoermann, Ryan Wakefield and Christina Zuniga
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv00053
Filed: January 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G. Patrick Murphy
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER DENYING with leave to refile, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Proximate Causation Evidence 107 . Each of the identified cases are cleared for fact and expert discovery related to causation. With the exception of t he Stampley case, the parties shall have until September 1, 2018 to complete the limited discovery. Defendants' renewed summary judgment motions shall be due on or before October 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/28/2017. (jmw)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING 106 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: INDIANA STATUTE OF REPOSE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly and terminate the applicable Plaintiffs from the lead case. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/11/2017. (jmw)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF REMAND. The Court GRANTS 22 Motion to Remand brought by Plaintiffs Stacy Bartolini, individually and as parent and next friend of H.B., a minor, Laura Diane Barnes, individually and as parent and next friend of Amberley Barnes, an incapac itated adult, Samantha Bryant, individually and as parent and next friend of P.B., a minor, Jennifer Janecek, individually and as parent and next friend of S.C., a minor, Michael Gates, individually and as parent and next friend of T.G., a minor, Kri sta Kaye Howard, Charles H. Jackson, II, individually and as legal guardian and next friend of G.J., a minor, Karen Kelly, individually and as parent and next friend of S.K., a minor, Jarri and Clay Leighton, individually and as parents and next frie nds of J.L., a minor, Renae Dell Mandery, individually and as parent and next friend of Kimberly Mandery, an incapacitated adult, Whitney L. Middlebrook, individually and as parent and next friend of C.M., a minor, Holly Lynn Russell, individually an d as parent and next friend of D.M., a minor, Patricia Rodriguez, individually and as parent and next friend of C.O., a minor, Laura Parr, individually and as parent and next friend of D.P., a minor, Rhonda Peeples, individually and as parent and nex t friend of Charles Peeples, an incapacitated adult, Nancy and Paul Prosence, individually and as adoptive parents of L.P., a minor, Lisa Kay Schnarr, individually and as parent and next friend of E.S., a minor, Rachel and Paul Springsteen, individua lly and as parents and next friends of R.S., a minor, Tomiko Moore, individually and as parent and next friend of L.W., a minor, Melissa A. Wilkinson, individually and as parent and next friend of J.W., a minor, Gloria Stampley, individually and as g uardian and next friend of R.W., a minor, Angela and Scott Vaughn, individually and as parents and next friends of G.V., a minor, Kelly Allen, individually and as parent and next friend of E.A., a minor, Senqueita Ancrum, individually and as parent a nd next friend of A.A., a minor, Hector and Guadalupe Baeza, individually and as legal guardians and next friends of A.B., a minor, Gary R. and Mary E. Barickman, individually and as parents and next friends of B.B., a minor, Bethany Buck, individual ly and as parent and next friend of A.B., a minor, Irina Burnett, individually and as parent and next friend of D.B., a minor, Michelle Cassidy, individually and as parent and next friend of H.C., a minor, Carolyn Pearson, individually and as legal g uardian and next friend of J.D., a minor, Toni and Randy Ford, individually and as parents and next friends of B.F., a minor, Crystal Kidd, individually and as parent and next friend of A K, a minor, and B.K., a minor, April Harrigan, individually an d as parent and next friend of A.K., a minor, Sindy Salgado, individually and as parent and next friend of O.R., a minor, Marthee Sansone, individually and as parent and next friend of A.S., a minor, Angie Stevenson. individually and as parent and ne xt friend of D.S., a minor, Rosemary R. and Rober Stoermann, individually and as parents and next friends of J.S., a minor, Ryan Wakefield, and Christina Zuniga, individually and as parent and next friend of C.Z., a minor. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c) this action is REMANDED to state court for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 4/17/2012. (jhs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartolini et al v. Abbott Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Bartolini
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Diane Barnes
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Bryant
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Janecek
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gates
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Kaye Howard
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles H Jackson, II
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Kelly
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarri and Clay Leighton
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renae Dell Mandery
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney L Middlebrook
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Lynn Russell
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Rodriguez
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Parr
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Peeples
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy and Paul Prosence
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kay Schnarr
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel and Paul Springsteen
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomiko Moore
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa A Wilkinson
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Stampley
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela and Scott Vaughn
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Allen
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senqueita Ancrum
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector and Guadalupe Baeza
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary R and Mary E Barickman
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Buck
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Burnett
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Cassidy
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Pearson
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni and Randy Ford
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Kidd
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Harrigan
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sindy Salgado
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marthee Sansone
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Stevenson
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary R and Rober Stoermann
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Wakefield
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Zuniga
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Kathleen B. Barry
Represented By: Michael B. MacWilliams
Represented By: Stephen E. Marshall
Represented By: Jason C. Rose
Represented By: Paul F. Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?