USA v. Higgins

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Robert M. Higgins
Case Number: 3:2012cv00254
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Jersey
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/jdh) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs.Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/9/2013. (jdh)
July 31, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Granting 45 MOTION to Vacate 42 Clerk's Judgment filed by USA. Telephone Status Conference set for 8/16/2013 09:00 AM before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/31/2013. (jdh)
November 18, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Denying 51 MOTION to Vacate. The Court further sets a Status Conference for 12/13/2013 01:30 PM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/18/2013. (jdh)
December 13, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/13/2013. (jdh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: W. Damon Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.