Medlin v. Ormandy et al
Plaintiff: |
Elliott C Medlin |
Defendant: |
Unknown Party, L Duncan, D Szoke, L. Ormandy, P Kelly and J Jarrett |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv00669 |
Filed: |
May 30, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Williamson |
Presiding Judge: |
G. Patrick Murphy |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 17, 2013 |
Filing
47
ORDER granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 9/17/2013. (ktc)
|
January 28, 2013 |
Filing
30
ORDER as to 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support.( Responses due by 3/1/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/28/13. (sgp)
|
August 8, 2012 |
Filing
9
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Unknown Party / Others not named from the docket. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to complete, on Plaintiffs behalf, a summons and form USM-285 for service of process on Defendants Ormandy, Kelly, Jarrett, Szoke, and Duncan. The Clerk shall issue the completed summons. The United States Marshal SHALL serve Defendants Ormandy, Kelly, Jarrett, Szoke and Duncan pursuant to Rule 4(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States, and the Clerk shall provide all necessary materials and copies to the United States Marshals Service. In addition, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i), the Cl erk shall (1) personally deliver to or send by registered or certified mail addressed to the civil-process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Illinois a copy of the summons, the complaint, and this Memorandum and Order; and (2) send by registered or certified mail to the Attorney General of the United States at Washington, D.C., a copy of the summons, the complaint, and this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 8/8/2012. (tjk, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?