Chencinski v. Reeder et al
Plaintiff: Robert Chencinski
Defendant: Michael Reeder, Lt Berkley, Timothy R Quigley, Marcus T Marvin and Andrew Henry Tilden
Case Number: 3:2012cv00817
Filed: July 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Livingston
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Reagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 JUDGMENT in favor of Andrew Henry Tilden, Lt Berkley against Robert Chencinski. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/24/15. (amv)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. The only claim that remains is the claim of retaliation against Defendant Berkley relating to his LTS gym porter job. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 07/16/2013. (bak)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING ; 44 Report and Recommendations.; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 41 Motion to Stay. The only remaining claims are retaliation claims against Defendants Reeder and Berkley. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 05/30/13. (dkd )
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim against DEFENDANT TILDEN for deliberate indifference to medical needs (COUNT 3) is SEVERED into a new case. The new case SHALL B E ASSIGNED to the undersigned District Judge for further proceedings. In the new case, the Clerk is DIRECTED to file the following documents: (1) This Memorandum and Order (2) The Original Complaint (Doc. 1) (3) Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2) Plaintiff is ADVISED that if, for any reason, he does not wish to proceed with the newly opened case, he must notify the Court in writing on or before September 21, 2012. As to COUNTS 1 and 2, which remain in the instant case, the C lerk of Court shall prepare for Defendants REEDER, BERKLEY, QUIGLEY and MARVIN (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). (Action due by 9/21/2012). Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 8/23/2012. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chencinski v. Reeder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Chencinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Berkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy R Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus T Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Henry Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?