Jefferson v. Hodge et al
Plaintiff: |
Walter Jefferson |
Defendant: |
AFSME, Assistant Warden Storm, Ernest Shelton, Gina Allen, Director Godinez and Marc Hodge |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00106 |
Filed: |
February 4, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Lawrence |
Presiding Judge: |
G. Patrick Murphy |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 12, 2014 |
Filing
69
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 64 in its entirety. The Court grants the motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Hodge, Densmore, Lingle and Kohn 37 . The Court denies the motion for summary judgment filed by plai ntiff Walter Jefferson 45 and dismisses without prejudice count 4 against defendants Densmore, Kohn, Lingle and Hodge (in his official capacity) to the extent it complains of unsanitary food trays, and directs the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/12/2014. (jdh)
|
January 15, 2014 |
Filing
63
ORDER GRANTING IN PART 56 Motion to Amend/Correct; DENYING 62 Motion for Reconsideration ; DENYING 62 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/15/14. (sgp)
|
November 5, 2013 |
Filing
53
ORDER re 7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and initial filing fee.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/5/13. (sgp)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
39
RULE 56 NOTICE and ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/30/13. (sgp)
|
May 22, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. The Fourteenth Amendment due process and equal protection claims in Counts 1 and 2, and the Eighth Amendment (non-food related) condition of confinement claims in Count 3 are DISMISSED w ith prejudice. The claims in Count 4 regarding the temperature of the breakfast meals and Plaintiff's inability to go to the dining hall to eat breakfast are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims in Count 4 regard ing inadequate nutrition are DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendants GODINEZ and STORM shall be DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendants DENSMORE, KOHN and LINGLE: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 5/21/2013. (tjk)
|
March 22, 2013 |
Filing
9
ORDER : Defendant AFSCME and all claims lodged against that union are DISMISSED with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claim is DISMISSED with prejudi ce for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's claim against Defendants SHELTON, HODGE, ALLEN and GODINEZ, regarding the denial of his December 4, 2012, grievance is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment conditions of confinement claims(s) shall beDISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted.Should Plaintiff wish to proceed with his Eighth Amendment conditions of confinement claim, the amended complaint shall be filed with this Court on or before April 22, 2013. (Action due by 4/22/2013). Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 3/22/2013. (tjk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?