Mike's, Inc. v. Vessel White Star One et al
Plaintiff: Mike's, Inc.
Defendant: Regions Bank, John Joslyn, Vessel White Star One and White Star Line, LLC
Creditor: ACF Property Management, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00232
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/1/14. (cekf)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AGREED ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS OF SALE OF VESSEL.Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/18/2014. (mtm)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Confirm the April 4, 2014 U.S. Marshal's Sale of the vessel White Star One by Mike's, Inc.Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 4/9/2014. (mtm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mike's, Inc. v. Vessel White Star One et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: David G. Wasinger
Represented By: James S. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joslyn
Represented By: Theodore H. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vessel White Star One
Represented By: Theodore H. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Star Line, LLC
Represented By: Theodore H. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: ACF Property Management, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike's, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Nienhuis
Represented By: Neal W Settergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?