April 27, 2016 |
Filing
110
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment on Count 1 in favor of the plaintiffs and against Freight Feeder at the close of this case. There remains outstanding the ques tion of the amount of the judgment that should be entered against Freight Feeder. The Court ORDERS that the plaintiffs shall have up to and including May 13, 2016, to submit proof of their damages from Freight Feeders breach. The Court further VACATES the final pretrial conference and trial dates in light of the foregoing disposition of the only remaining claim in this case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/27/2016. (jdh)
|
February 1, 2016 |
Filing
101
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/12/2016. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/1/2016. (jdh)
|
October 29, 2014 |
Filing
90
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/29/2014. (jdh)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court GRANTS the motion for partial summary judgment and/or to dismiss filed by Bridges and Littlefield (Doc. 72 ); DISMISSES Count 2 with prejudice as to Bridges and Littlefield; and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close of the case. Defendants Bridges and Littlefield are terminated as parties to this case. The only remaining claim is Count 1 for breach of contract against FFAC. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/21/2014. (jdh)
|
April 28, 2014 |
Filing
76
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court finds that this action against R. Darby Boland, Stephen Carmichael, H. Cliff Saylor, Edward F. Eaton and Will Weeks are DISMISSED without prejudice and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close this case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/28/2014. (jdh)
|
February 13, 2014 |
Filing
64
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 58 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by John J. Dupont, DENYING AS MOOT 61 Joint MOTION Rule 16 conference filed by Randy Moseley, Freight Feeder Aircraft Corporation, Inc., John J. Dupont. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/18/2014 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 2/13/14. (sgp)
|
October 24, 2013 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court GRANTS the motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for judgment on the pleadings as to the individual defendants (Doc. 43 ) filed by defendants Freight Feeder, L. David Bridges, Stephen Carmichael and H. Clif Saylor ; DISMISSES Count 1 against defendants L. David Bridges, Stephen Carmichael and H. Clif Saylor with prejudice; DISMISSES Count 2 without prejudice; and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close of the case. Defendants L. David Bridges, Stephen Carmichael and H. Clif Saylor are terminated as parties to this case. The only remaining claim is Count 1 for breach of contract against Freight Feeder. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/24/2013. (jdh)
|
October 18, 2013 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court GRANTS the motion to strike (Doc. 45 ). However, rather than striking the entire First Amended Complaint, it will simply STRIKE Utilicraft as a plaintiff and DISMISS without prejudice all claims purportedly brought by it in this case. Utilicraft is terminated as a party to this case. The claims of plaintiffs Dupont and Moseley contained in the First Amended Complaint are the only remaining claims in this case Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/18/2013. (jdh)
|
September 13, 2013 |
Filing
52
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court DISMISSES all claims in this case against defendants R. Darby Boland, Edward F. Eaton, Will Weeks and Kim Littlefield without prejudice for failure to timely effect service. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close of the case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/13/2013. (jdh)
|
August 20, 2013 |
Filing
42
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Striking the second amended complaint (Doc. 39) and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the claims against defendants should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to timely effect service. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/20/13. (bkl)
|
July 9, 2013 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Finding all claims against Defendant Williams are Dismissed without prejudice; Denying as moot 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Stephen Carmichael, Freight Feeder Aircraft Corporation, Inc. , H. Cliff Saylor, L. David Bridges, Granting 24 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by First National Bank of St. Louis ; Dismissing Count 3 without prejudice. Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close of the case. First National Bank of St. Louis and Kevin Williams terminated. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/9/13. (bkl)
|
April 1, 2013 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiffs to amend the faulty pleading to correct the jurisdictional defect. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/1/13. (bkl)
|