Burgard v. USA

Petitioner: Joshua Burgard
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2013cv00450
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Judge David R. Herndon on 1/22/16. (cekf)
January 21, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), DENYUNG 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct, DISMISSING CASE and DECLINING to issue certificate of appealability. Further, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 12/21/16. (lmp)
May 13, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING the government to file a response to petitioner's motion on or before June 12, 2013. The government shall, as part of its response, attach all relevant portions of the record. Petitioner's request for counsel is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/13/2013. (mtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgard v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Burgard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Michael J. Quinley
Represented By: Stephanie N. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?