Fulwider v. AERCO International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Lewis Fulwider
Defendant: Ameron International Corporation, Welco Manufacturing Company, General Cable Industries, Inc., AERCO International, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Pfizer, Inc., Duro Dyne Corporation, Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Dap, Inc., The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Peerless Industries, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Custom-Aire, Inc., Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, The Dow Chemical Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Compudyne Corporation, XEF, Inc., Milwaukee Valve Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Sepco Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Bechtel Corporation, Kelly Moore Paint Company, Flowserve U.S., Inc, Viking Pump, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC., Zurn Industries, LLC, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, The WM Powell Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Imo Industries, Inc., Seco Warwick Corporation, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Fluor Constructors International Inc, Henry Pratt Company, Carrier Corporation, Lennox Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Burnham, LLC, Johnson Controls, Inc., Whiting Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, American Optical Corporation, Clark Equipment Company, Bonney Forge Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Special Electric Company, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Lindberg, Daniel International Corporation, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., Beazer East Inc, All Acquisitions, LLC, Certainteed Corporation, Nibco, Inc., Dezurik, KCG, Inc,, Metallo Gasket Co., Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Young Group, Ltd., ITT Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, The Fairbanks Company, Plastics Engineering Company, FMC Corporation, Simpson Timber Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Co., API Heat Transfer, Inc., Hyster Company, Domco Products Texas, Inc., McCord Gasket Corporation, Navistar International, Riley Stoker Corporation, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc., Oakfabco, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., Trane US, Inc., Foxboro Company, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Cummins, Inc., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Johnston Boiler Company, York International Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Deere & Company, Howden North America, Inc., Paccar, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Pecora Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Flowserve Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Baltimore Aircoil Company, Rockwell Automations, Inc., Rogers Corporation, Buffalo Air Handling, Greene Tweed & Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Universal Refractories, Inc., Chicago Gasket Company, Grimes Aerospace Corporation, Dravo Corporation, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Clow Corporation, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Pneumo Abex, LLC, The Sherwin Williams Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Carboline Company, Velan Valve Corporation, MW Custom Papers, LLC., The Nash Engineering Company, Eaton Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., RIC-WIL, Inc., AO Smith Corporation, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Kvaerner U.S., Inc., McNally Industries, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Sears Roebuck & Co, Joy Technologies, Inc., General Electric Company, Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, AWC 1997 Corporation, Fluor Corporation, Foseco, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Maremont Corporation, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Dewitt Products Co., Cytec Industries, Inc., CBS Corporation, Weil McLain, Watson McDaniel Company, Aurora Pump Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Tuthill Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Ferro Engineering, Homasote Company and Harper International Corp.
Cross Defendant: General Cable Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv01220
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Williams
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 ORDER FINDING as MOOT Motion to Dismiss (Doc #1144 ). This case was closed on July 9, 2015 (Doc. 1143 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/21/2016. (hjg) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2016 Filing 1144 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Responses due by 8/25/2016 (Pozan, Kyle)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 ORDER. The Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Motion for Dismissal as to All Remaining Defendants (Doc. 1140), DISMISSES all remaining defendants, and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/9/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 ORDER granting #1141 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney James A. Telthorst terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 6/26/2015. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 25, 2015 Filing 1141 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mueller Steam Specialty Company. (Shultz, William)
June 19, 2015 Filing 1140 MOTION to Dismiss ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 7/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
June 17, 2015 Filing 1139 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Status Conference held on 6/17/2015. Allyson Romoani for Plaintiff. Sean Fergus, Kyler Stevens, Malanie King, Amanda Weinberger, Kevin Newton, Keith Hill, James Brodzik, Brian Connolly, Justin Zimmerman and Ross Titzer for various Defendants. Plaintiff's counsel indicates their intention to dismiss the case in full having received the pathology report regarding Plaintiff's decedent. Parties to contact the Court for further conferences if needed. (Court Reporter Liberty Recording.) (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 16, 2015 Filing 1138 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Newton on behalf of The WM Powell Company (Newton, Kevin)
June 16, 2015 Filing 1137 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Newton on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Newton, Kevin)
June 16, 2015 Filing 1136 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Newton on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Newton, Kevin)
June 12, 2015 Filing 1135 ANSWER to Complaint Third Amended by Howden North America, Inc..(Brodzik, James)
June 12, 2015 Filing 1134 MOTION to Join Co-Defendants' Consent Motion to Continue Trial by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion)(Weinberger, Amanda)
June 9, 2015 Filing 1133 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #1132 Consent MOTION to Continue Trial : Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2015 at 03:00 PM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted, enter Access Code 6049846; and when prompted again enter Security Code 9467.(anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 8, 2015 Filing 1132 Consent MOTION to Continue Trial by Crane Company. (Wilson, Benjamin)
June 3, 2015 Filing 1131 ANSWER to #1110 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, Third CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Copes-Vulcan.(McGrath, Daniel)
June 3, 2015 Filing 1130 ANSWER to #1110 Amended Complaint (THIRD) Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by John Crane, Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
June 2, 2015 Filing 1129 ANSWER to #1110 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Company.(Geraci, Carl)
June 2, 2015 Filing 1128 ANSWER to #1110 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
June 1, 2015 Filing 1127 ANSWER to #1110 Amended Complaint (Third Amended), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Meyer, Julie)
June 1, 2015 Filing 1126 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by The Dow Chemical Company.(Zimmerman, Justin)
May 29, 2015 Filing 1125 Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Third Amended by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Newport, Michael)
May 29, 2015 Filing 1124 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grabowski on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc), Buffalo Air Handling (Grabowski, James)
May 29, 2015 Filing 1123 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grabowski on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Grabowski, James)
May 29, 2015 Filing 1122 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grabowski on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC. (Grabowski, James)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1121 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1120 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by The WM Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Newton, L.)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1120 MOTION to Transfer Case by The WM Powell Company. (Newton, L.)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1119 The Wm. Powell Company's ANSWER to #1110 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The WM Powell Company.(Newton, L.)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1118 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Requests for Admission filed by Crane Company. (Wilson, Benjamin)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1117 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1116 ANSWER to #1110 Amended Complaint Third by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles)
May 21, 2015 Filing 1115 ANSWER to Complaint Union Carbide Corporation's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Zimmerman, Justin)
May 21, 2015 Filing 1114 ANSWER to #1110 Amended Complaint by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Weinberger, Amanda)
May 19, 2015 Filing 1113 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps, LLC..(Hill, Keith)
May 19, 2015 Filing 1112 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc), Buffalo Air Handling.(Hill, Keith)
May 19, 2015 Filing 1111 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Imo Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
May 18, 2015 Filing 1110 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider.(Romani, Allyson)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 ORDER granting #1103 Motion to Amend/Correct. Amended Complaint due 5/22/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 5/15/2015. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 24, 2015 Filing 1108 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1107 Notice (Other) filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. A notice of filing is not required to be filed. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 23, 2015 Filing 1107 ENTRY STRICKEN: NOTICE by Ralph Lewis Fulwider (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 4/24/2015 (lmb).
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1100 & 1101) and DISMISSES defendants Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation and Columbia Boiler Company without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/22/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 1097) and DISMISSES defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC, f/k/a Georgia-Pacific Corporation, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/20/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 16, 2015 Filing 1104 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #1103 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. See attached document for specifics (anm)
April 15, 2015 Filing 1103 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 ORDER. Any defendant objecting to the dismissal of defendants Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation or Columbia Boiler Company (Docs. 1100-1101) shall file a response on or before April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/15/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 15, 2015 Filing 1101 MOTION to Dismiss Columbia Boiler Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
April 15, 2015 Filing 1100 MOTION to Dismiss Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1094 ) and DISMISSES defendant DAP Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/13/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 ORDER. Any defendant objecting to the dismissal of defendant Georgia-Pacific, LLC (Doc. 1097) shall file a response on or before April 15, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/13/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 10, 2015 Filing 1097 MOTION to Dismiss Georgia-Pacific, LLC, f/k/a Georgia-Pacific Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 5/14/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 ORDER. Any defendant objecting to the dismissal of defendant DAP Inc. (Doc. 1094) shall file a response on or before April 7, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/3/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 2, 2015 Filing 1095 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 4/2/2015. Allison Romani for Plaintiff. Ben Wilson, Julie Fix Meyer, Dennis Graber, Kyle Stevens, Brian Connolly, David Ybarra, Georgeanne Oliver and Sean Fergus for Defendants. Plaintiff shall have three weeks to provide expert reports to Defendants. Expert reports due April 23, 2015. Discovery deadline remains July 9, 2015. (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.) (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 2, 2015 Filing 1094 MOTION to Dismiss DAP Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 5/7/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 31, 2015 Filing 1093 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC. (Schag, Michael)
March 30, 2015 Filing 1092 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Schag, Michael)
March 30, 2015 Filing 1091 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Buffalo Air Handling (Schag, Michael)
March 30, 2015 Filing 1090 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc) (Schag, Michael)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1085 ) and DISMISSES defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/27/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 25, 2015 Filing 1088 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 4/2/2015 03:30 PM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 ORDER. Any party objecting to the dismissal of Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Doc. 1085) shall file a response on or before March 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/20/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS the Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1083 ) and DISMISSES defendant Honeywell International, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/19/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 19, 2015 Filing 1085 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. Responses due by 4/23/2015 (Hardee, Kathleen)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 ORDER. Any party objecting to the Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1083 ) defendant Honeywell International, Inc. shall file a response on or before March 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/13/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 12, 2015 Filing 1083 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Honeywell International, Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2015 (Hardee, Kathleen)
March 10, 2015 Filing 1082 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1079 ) and DISMISSES Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/6/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc. (Doc. 1079). Any party objecting to the Motion shall file a response on or before March 4, 2015.. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/27/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 26, 2015 Filing 1079 MOTION to Dismiss BorgWarner Morse Tec, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 16, 2015 Filing 1078 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint (Second), Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by John Crane, Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 ORDER granting #1076 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 2/5/2015. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 4, 2015 Filing 1076 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Records by Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc.. (Welply, Justin)
February 3, 2015 Filing 1075 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #1073 Notice (Other) filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.1(b), no discovery materials shall be filed. In this regard, no certificates of service or notices shall be filed regarding discovery on the docket as well. This notice is informational - for reference with future filings. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 ORDER. Having received no objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Deere & Company (Doc. #1048 ), the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion (Doc. #1048 ) and DISMISSES Defendant Deere & Company from this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/2/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 2, 2015 Filing 1073 NOTICE by Ralph Lewis Fulwider (Romani, Allyson)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 ORDER It is ordered that any challenges to potential witness testimony brought pursuant to FED. R. EVID. 702 and FED. R. EVID. 703 (i.e., Daubert motions) SHALL be due on or before this cases deadline for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/29/15. (cmh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 28, 2015 Filing 1071 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint Answer To Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Cross-Claims For Contribution Or Indemnity And Answer To All Cross-Claims And Counterclaims Of / against All Defendants by Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
January 28, 2015 Filing 1070 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint Answer To Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Cross-Claims For Contribution Or Indemnity And Answer To All Cross-Claims And Counterclaims Of / against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
January 28, 2015 Filing 1069 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
January 28, 2015 Filing 1068 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint by McNally Industries, Inc..(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
January 28, 2015 Filing 1067 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint by FMC Corporation.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
January 28, 2015 Filing 1066 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc), Buffalo Air Handling.(Hill, Keith)
January 28, 2015 Filing 1065 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Imo Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
January 28, 2015 Filing 1064 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps, LLC..(Hill, Keith)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 ORDER. Defendants MW Custom Papers, LLC and Clow Corporation have been dismissed from this case. As such, the Court hereby DENIES as moot MW Custom Papers, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #951 ) and Clow Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #952 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/27/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1048 ) Defendant Deere & Company. Any party objecting to the motion shall file a response on or before January 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/27/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 26, 2015 Filing 1061 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint Union Carbide Corporation's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Zimmerman, Justin)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1060 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1059 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1058 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Georgia-Pacific Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1057 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Company.(Geraci, Carl)
January 23, 2015 Filing 1056 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Newport, Michael)
January 23, 2015 Filing 1055 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #1048 Motion to Dismiss filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
January 23, 2015 Filing 1054 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles)
January 23, 2015 Filing 1053 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint Second by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles)
January 23, 2015 Filing 1052 NOTICE of Appearance by Georgiann Oliver on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Oliver, Georgiann)
January 23, 2015 Filing 1051 DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC.'S ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc..(Welply, Justin)
January 22, 2015 Filing 1050 ANSWER to #1049 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim,, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint, Answer to Cross-claims, Jury Trial Demand, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Kidd, Anita)
January 22, 2015 Filing 1049 ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint, Answer to Cross-claims, Jury Trial Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Chicago Bridge & Iron Company.(Kidd, Anita)
January 22, 2015 Filing 1048 MOTION to Dismiss Deere & Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 2/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
January 21, 2015 Filing 1047 The Wm. Powell Company's ANSWER to #1043 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answers to Anticipated, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The WM Powell Company.(Newton, L.)
January 21, 2015 Filing 1046 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answers to Anticipated, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The WM Powell Company.(Newton, L.)
January 21, 2015 Filing 1045 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Alexa Newton on behalf of The WM Powell Company (Newton, L.)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. #1043 ), the Court notes that it omits multiple defendants that were included in the First Amended Complaint resulting in the termination of multiple defendants from this case. The Court ORDERS any cross-plaintiff objecting to the dismissal of those defendants omitted from the Second Amended Complaint to SHOW CAUSE on or before January 20, 2015, why the defendants omitted from the Second Amended Complaint should not be dismissed from this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/15/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 14, 2015 Filing 1043 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider.(Romani, Allyson)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 ORDER granting #1039 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Lawrence S. Denk terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 1/13/2015. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 ORDER granting #1035 Motion to Amend/Correct. Amended Complaint due 1/20/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 1/13/2015. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 ORDER. Having received no objection to Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #948 , #953 - #954 , #956 - #1009 , #1011 - #1015 , #1017 - #1034 ), the Court hereby GRANTS the motions (Docs. #948 , #953 - #954 , #956 - #1009 , #1011 - #1015 , #1017 - #1034 ), and DISMISSES defendants Metallo Gasket, Clow Corporation, MW Custom Papers, AII Acquisitions, LLC, Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Aurora Pump, AWC 1997 Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham LLC, BW/IP, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Ameron International Corp. Arvinmeritor, Inc., Conwed Corporation, Cummins, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Deer & Company, Dezuirk, Domco Products Texas, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, The Fairbanks Company, Flowserve US, Inc., Flowserve Corporation as SII to Durametallic Corp., Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Foxboro Company, Industrial Holdings corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Sepco Corporation, The Sherwin Williams Company, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Stewart Warner Corporation, Swindell Dressler International Co., Trane US, Inc., f/k/a American Standard, Tuthill Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Welco Manufacturing Company, York International Corporation, Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc., General Cable Industries, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, J.A. Sexauer, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Joy Technologies, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., The Kraissl Company, Inc, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., McCord Gasket Corp., Maremont Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Metallo Gasket Co., Mine Safety Appliance Company, Mueller Steam Specialty Company, The Nash Engineering Company, Navistar International, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., and Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. from this case. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to terminate the foregoing parties from the case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/13/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 13, 2015 Filing 1039 MOTION to Substitute Attorney John I. Schaberg by Ameron International Corporation. (Schaberg, John)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 ORDER granting #1037 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney David W. Ybarra for Maremont Corporation. Attorney Ryan T. Barke terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 1/12/2015. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 9, 2015 Filing 1037 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Maremont Corporation. (Ybarra, David)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #948 , #953 - #954 , #956 - #1009 , #1011 - #1015 , #1017 - #1034 ). Any party objecting to the motions shall file a response on or before January 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/23/14. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 22, 2014 Filing 1035 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1034 MOTION to Dismiss Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1033 MOTION to Dismiss Pfizer, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1032 MOTION to Dismiss Peerless Industries, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1031 MOTION to Dismiss Pecora Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1030 MOTION to Dismiss Parker Hannifin Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1029 MOTION to Dismiss Navistar International by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1028 MOTION to Dismiss The Nash Engineering company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1027 MOTION to Dismiss Mueller Steam Specialty Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1026 MOTION to Dismiss Mine Safety Appliances Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1025 MOTION to Dismiss Metallo Gasket Co. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1024 MOTION to Dismiss McMaster-Carr Supply Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1023 MOTION to Dismiss Maremont Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1022 MOTION to Dismiss McCord Gasket Corp. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1021 MOTION to Dismiss Lennox Industries, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1020 MOTION to Dismiss SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1019 MOTION to Dismiss The Kraissl Company, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1018 MOTION to Dismiss Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1017 MOTION to Dismiss Joy Technologies, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1016 MOTION to Dismiss by Deere & Company. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Reust, Davin)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1015 MOTION to Dismiss Johnson Controls, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1014 MOTION to Dismiss J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1013 MOTION to Dismiss J.A. Sexauer Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1012 MOTION to Dismiss ITT Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1011 MOTION to Dismiss Hyster Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1010 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #975 Motion to Dismiss filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Efiler attached the incorrect document. Efiler is instructed to refile. (jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 22, 2014 Filing 1009 MOTION to Dismiss Hollingsworth & Vose Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1008 MOTION to Dismiss Henry Pratt Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1007 MOTION to Dismiss Grinnell LLC by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1006 MOTION to Dismiss GREENE TWEED & COMPANY by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1005 MOTION to Dismiss Goulds Pumps, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1004 MOTION to Dismiss General Cable Industries, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1003 MOTION to Dismiss ZY-TECH GLOBAL INDUSTRIES, INC. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1002 MOTION to Dismiss ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1001 MOTION to Dismiss York International Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1000 MOTION to Dismiss Welco Manufacturing Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 999 MOTION to Dismiss Weil McLain by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 998 MOTION to Dismiss Watson McDaniel Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 997 MOTION to Dismiss Viking Pump Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 996 MOTION to Dismiss Tuthill Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 995 MOTION to Dismiss Trane US, Inc., f/k/a American Standard by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 994 MOTION to Dismiss Swindell Dressler International Co. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 993 MOTION to Dismiss Stewart Warner Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 992 MOTION to Dismiss Special Electric Company, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 991 MOTION to Dismiss Simpson Timber Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 990 MOTION to Dismiss The Sherwin Williams Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 989 MOTION to Dismiss Sepco Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 22, 2014 Filing 988 MOTION to Dismiss Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 987 MOTION to Dismiss ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS, INC. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 986 MOTION to Dismiss INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 985 MOTION to Dismiss INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 984 MOTION to Dismiss FOXBORO COMPANY by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 983 MOTION to Dismiss FLOWSERVE CORPORATION fka THE DURIRON COMPANY by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 982 MOTION to Dismiss FLOWSERVE CORPORATION AS SII TO DURAMETALLIC CORP. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 981 MOTION to Dismiss FLOWSERVE US, INC. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 980 MOTION to Dismiss THE FAIRBANKS COMPANY by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 979 MOTION to Dismiss THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 978 MOTION to Dismiss DOMCO PRODUCTS TEXAS, INC by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 977 MOTION to Dismiss DEZUIRK by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 976 MOTION to Dismiss DEERE & COMPANY by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 975 STRICKEN-MOTION to Dismiss DAP, INC by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 12/22/2014 (jlrr ).
December 19, 2014 Filing 974 MOTION to Dismiss DANA COMPANIES, LLC by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 973 MOTION to Dismiss CUMMINS, INC. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 972 MOTION to Dismiss CONWED CORPORATION by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 971 MOTION to Dismiss ARVINMERITOR, INC. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 970 MOTION to Dismiss AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 969 MOTION to Dismiss CLEAVER-BROOKS by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 968 MOTION to Dismiss CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 967 MOTION to Dismiss CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 966 MOTION to Dismiss CERTAINTEED CORPORATION by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 965 MOTION to Dismiss CATERPILLAR, INC. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 964 MOTION to Dismiss CARRIER CORPORATION by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 963 MOTION to Dismiss BW/IP, INC. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 962 MOTION to Dismiss BURNHAM, LLC by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 961 MOTION to Dismiss BUFFALO AIR HANDLING by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 960 MOTION to Dismiss BIRD INCORPORATED by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 959 MOTION to Dismiss AWC 1997 CORPORATION by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 958 MOTION to Dismiss AURORA PUMP by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 957 MOTION to Dismiss Armstrong Pumps, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2014 Filing 956 MOTION to Dismiss AII Acquisitons LLC by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 18, 2014 Filing 955 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #950 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Deere & Company. See attached document for specifics (slh)
December 18, 2014 Filing 954 MOTION to Dismiss MW Custom Papers by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 18, 2014 Filing 953 MOTION to Dismiss Clow Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 17, 2014 Filing 952 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Clow Corporation. Responses due by 1/20/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Geraci, Carl)
December 17, 2014 Filing 951 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MW Custom Papers, LLC.. Responses due by 1/20/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Huelsmann, Brian)
December 17, 2014 Filing 950 STRICKEN - STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Deere & Company by Deere & Company. (Reust, Davin)
December 16, 2014 Filing 949 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 12/16/2014. Plaintiffs appear by Allyson Romani and Bradley Ritter. Kirra Jones argued on behalf of Defendants. Jones points out that Navistar and Schneider were not given opportunity to question Rolla Foster at his deposition. Plaintiff stipulated on the record that Mr. Foster would not be able to provide any information connecting Plaintiffs injuries to these two Defendants. The Court advised the parties to meet and confer concerning the length of depositions in advance of any future depositions in order to avoid disagreement. (Court Reporter Chris Dohack.) (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 16, 2014 Filing 948 MOTION to Dismiss Metallo Gasket by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/20/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 947 ORDER #944 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Incorrect filing event used. Filer should have used the event "Motion to Dismiss." This document is to be refiled using the appropriate event. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/16/14. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 15, 2014 Filing 946 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 12/16/2014 04:00 PM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2014 Filing 945 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #923 Notice of Appearance filed by Eaton Corporation. Filer selected defendant Easton Corporation; however, the document states the notice of appearance is for defendant Hyster Company. Notice of Appearance has been filed for Hyster Company at docket entry 924. Docket entry 923 is STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. Document must be re-filed. (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2014 Filing 944 STRICKEN NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ralph Lewis Fulwider (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 12/16/2014 (ajr, ).
December 11, 2014 Filing 943 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 11, 2014 Filing 942 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 11, 2014 Filing 941 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Rogers Corporation (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 11, 2014 Filing 940 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc. (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 11, 2014 Filing 939 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 938 ORDER granting #925 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #929 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 12/17/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/11/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2014 Filing 937 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC. (Wolters, Kendra)
December 11, 2014 Filing 936 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Wolters, Kendra)
December 11, 2014 Filing 935 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Wolters, Kendra)
December 11, 2014 Filing 934 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Wolters, Kendra)
December 11, 2014 Filing 933 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Lennox Industries, Inc. (Wolters, Kendra)
December 11, 2014 Filing 932 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Wolters, Kendra)
December 11, 2014 Filing 931 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of All Acquisitions, LLC (Wolters, Kendra)
December 11, 2014 Filing 930 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of The Fairbanks Company (Wolters, Kendra)
December 11, 2014 Filing 929 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MW Custom Papers, LLC.. (Huelsmann, Brian)
December 11, 2014 Filing 928 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Wolters, Kendra)
December 11, 2014 Filing 927 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Certainteed Corporation (Wolters, Kendra)
December 11, 2014 Filing 926 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Wolters, Kendra)
December 11, 2014 Filing 925 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Clow Corporation. (Geraci, Carl)
December 10, 2014 Filing 924 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Connolly on behalf of Hyster Company (Connolly, Brian)
December 10, 2014 Filing 923 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Connolly on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Connolly, Brian) Modified on 12/11/2014 (tkm ).
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 922 ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation of dismissal (Doc. #919 ), Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Goodrich Corporation are hereby dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly at the close of this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/4/14. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 921 ORDER granting #918 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin T. Dawson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/2/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 1, 2014 Filing 920 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #917 Notice (Other) filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
December 1, 2014 Filing 919 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Goodrich Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
December 1, 2014 Filing 918 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (Dawson, Kevin)
November 26, 2014 Filing 917 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 920 - NOTICE by Ralph Lewis Fulwider (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 12/1/2014 (anm).
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER denying #815 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/25/14. (ajr)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER denying #834 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/25/14. (ajr)
November 24, 2014 Filing 914 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth on behalf of Ralph Lewis Fulwider (Shuttlesworth, Robert)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 913 ORDER on 11/20/2014 discovery dispute conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 11/21/2014. (anj)
November 20, 2014 Filing 912 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 11/20/2014. Allyson Romani for Plaintiff. Carl Geraci, Chris Threlkeld, Ben Wilson, Stephanie Jones, Nicole Rice, Sean Fergus, David Franklin, Haley Schumaker, Kyle Pozan, Mike Daniels, Ted Daniels, Julie Fix Meyer, James Telthorst, Matt Morris, Nicole Babin, Jessica Velez, Steve Walsh for various Defendants. (Court Reporter Laura Esposito.) (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 19, 2014 Filing 911 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Brodzik on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Brodzik, James)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER granting #909 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shuttlesworth. (anm)
November 18, 2014 Filing 909 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2453070 by on behalf of Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Shuttlesworth, Robert)
November 14, 2014 Filing 908 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 11/20/2014 at 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Call-in information remains the same. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 10, 2014 Filing 907 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Cook, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 906 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Dezurik (Cook, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 905 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Greene Tweed & Company (Cook, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 904 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Weil McLain (Cook, Samuel)
November 7, 2014 Filing 903 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 11/14/2014 01:00 PM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER granting #901 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Karen E Bettcher terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 11/3/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 31, 2014 Filing 901 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Metallo Gasket Co.. (Morris, Matthew)
October 30, 2014 Filing 900 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley N. Ritter on behalf of Ralph Lewis Fulwider (Ritter, Bradley)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 899 ORDER granting #898 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Bradley N. Ritter on behalf of Ralph Lewis Fulwider on 10/30/14. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 28, 2014 Filing 898 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bradley N. Ritter $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2433730 by on behalf of Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Ritter, Bradley)
October 17, 2014 Filing 897 NOTICE by Ralph Lewis Fulwider (Romani, Allyson)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER granting #894 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jessica K. Velez terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 10/6/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 3, 2014 Filing 895 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Hood on behalf of Special Electric Company, Inc. (Hood, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2014 Filing 894 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jeffrey S. Hood and the firm O'Connell Tivin Miller and Burns as counsel. Jessica Velez and the firm Matushek Nilles and Sinars hereby withdraws as counsel by Special Electric Company, Inc.. (Hood, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ORDER granting #889 Motion to Substitute Attorney; granting #890 Motion to Substitute Attorney; granting #891 Motion to Substitute Attorney; granting #892 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David J. Page terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 9/30/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 30, 2014 Filing 892 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mueller Steam Specialty Company(a Division of Watts Water Technologies, Inc.). (Kelly, Patricia)
September 30, 2014 Filing 891 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mueller Steam Specialty Company(a Division of Watts Water Technologies, Inc.). (Kelly, Patricia)
September 30, 2014 Filing 890 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AWC 1997 Corporation. (Kelly, Patricia)
September 30, 2014 Filing 889 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Pecora Corporation. (Kelly, Patricia)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 888 ORDER granting #887 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin F. O'Malley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 9/30/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 29, 2014 Filing 887 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Pfizer, Inc.. (O'Malley, Kevin)
September 29, 2014 Filing 886 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Voss on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Voss, Andrew)
September 23, 2014 Filing 885 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #878 Notice of Appearance filed by AWC 1997 Corporation, #875 Notice of Appearance filed by Pecora Corporation, #877 Notice of Appearance filed by Mueller Steam Specialty Company. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
September 23, 2014 Filing 884 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Mueller Steam Specialty Company(a Division of Watts Water Technologies, Inc.) (Telthorst, James)
September 23, 2014 Filing 883 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of AWC 1997 Corporation (Telthorst, James)
September 23, 2014 Filing 882 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Pecora Corporation (Telthorst, James)
September 23, 2014 Filing 881 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. McLeod on behalf of Ralph Lewis Fulwider (McLeod, Matthew)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ORDER granting #876 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney McLeod. (anm)
September 22, 2014 Filing 879 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #875 Notice of Appearance filed by Pecora Corporation. Attorney Patricia M Kelly did not add herself as attorney of record to Defendant Pecora at the time she filed her Notice of Appearance. Attorney added this date by Clerk's Office staff. (jaj )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 22, 2014 Filing 878 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 885 - NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M Kelly on behalf of AWC 1997 Corporation (Kelly, Patricia) Modified on 9/23/2014 (anm).
September 22, 2014 Filing 877 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 885 - NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M Kelly on behalf of Mueller Steam Specialty Company(a Division of Watts Water Technologies, Inc.) (Kelly, Patricia) Modified on 9/23/2014 (anm).
September 22, 2014 Filing 876 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew B. McLeod $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2401236 by on behalf of Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (McLeod, Matthew)
September 19, 2014 Filing 875 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 885 - NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M Kelly on behalf of Pecora Corporation (Kelly, Patricia) Modified on 9/23/2014 (anm).
September 4, 2014 Filing 874 REPLY to Response to Motion re #815 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction filed by MW Custom Papers, LLC.. (Huelsmann, Brian)
September 3, 2014 Filing 873 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Daniels, Michael)
September 2, 2014 Filing 872 RESPONSE in Opposition re #834 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 871 ORDER RESETTING HEARINGS: In light of the recent case reassignment to Judge Staci M. Yandle, a Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 10/14/2015 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial is RESET for 11/2/2015 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/29/2014. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 28, 2014 Filing 870 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #868 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Document 868 is a duplicate document and the wrong event was selected. Docket entry 868 is STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. No futher action required by the filer as to this document. Filer has re-filed the document using the correct event at document 869. (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 28, 2014 Filing 869 RESPONSE in Opposition re #815 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
August 28, 2014 Filing 868 ENTRY STRICKEN - MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #815 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 8/28/2014 (tkm ).
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 163 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings shall bear case number 13-1220-SMY-SCW. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/21/14. (car)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 25, 2014 Filing 866 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Renee Griebel on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks (Griebel, Erin)
August 22, 2014 Filing 865 NOTICE by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. of Certificate of Service (Sonneveld, Allison)
August 22, 2014 Filing 864 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 863 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 862 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 861 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Invensys Systems, Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 860 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 859 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of York International Corporation (Maschhoff, James)
August 20, 2014 Filing 858 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 20, 2014 Filing 857 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 15, 2014 Filing 856 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Amendment to #392 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Stevens, Kyler)
August 14, 2014 Filing 855 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #854 Notice (Other) filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Notice of Filing is not required in this Court. Docket entry stricken. No further action required by the filer.(trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 13, 2014 Filing 854 ENTRY STRICKEN: NOTICE by Ralph Lewis Fulwider (Romani, Allyson)
August 11, 2014 Filing 853 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by John Crane, Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
July 31, 2014 Filing 852 Clark Equipment Co. ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #788 by Clark Equipment Company.(Williams, James)
July 31, 2014 Filing 851 Cummins, Inc ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #788 by Cummins, Inc..(Williams, James)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ORDER granting #811 Motion to Dismiss Bechtel Corp. All remaining Defendants have 5 days from the date of this Order to object, otherwise their cross-claims against this dismissed defendant will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/30/14. (amv)
July 30, 2014 Filing 849 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Special Electric Company, Inc..(Velez, Jessica)
July 30, 2014 Filing 848 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #839 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Cummins, Inc., #840 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Clark Equipment Company. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
July 29, 2014 Filing 847 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by McNally Industries, Inc..(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 29, 2014 Filing 846 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Fort Kent Holdings, Inc..(Pozan, Kyle)
July 29, 2014 Filing 845 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 29, 2014 Filing 844 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by FMC Corporation.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 29, 2014 Filing 843 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by McCord Gasket Corporation.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 29, 2014 Filing 842 GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, CROSSCLAIM , ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIM AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against All Parties by General Electric Company.(Kidd, Anita)
July 29, 2014 Filing 841 BIRD INCORPORATED ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, CROSSCLAIM , ANSWERS TO CROSS-CLAIMS AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against All Parties by Bird Incorporated.(Kidd, Anita)
July 29, 2014 Filing 840 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 848 - Clark Equipment Company ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint by Clark Equipment Company.(Kennedy, Jason) Modified on 7/30/2014 (anm).
July 29, 2014 Filing 839 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 848 - Cummins Inc. ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint by Cummins, Inc..(Kennedy, Jason) Modified on 7/30/2014 (anm).
July 29, 2014 Filing 838 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 837 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Caterpillar, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 836 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Company.(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 835 ANSWER to Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Zimmerman, Justin)
July 29, 2014 Filing 834 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction by Clow Corporation. Responses due by 9/2/2014 (Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 833 ANSWER to Complaint by The Dow Chemical Company.(Zimmerman, Justin)
July 29, 2014 Filing 832 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Illinois Tool Works, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 831 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint Cross Claims, and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Trane US, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 830 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM and Affiramtive and Other Defenses to First Amended Complaint against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 829 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Georgia-Pacific Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 828 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Hollingsworth & Vose Company.(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 827 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Geraci, Carl)
July 28, 2014 Filing 826 ANSWER to Complaint by Spirax Sarco, Inc.(McGrath, Daniel)
July 28, 2014 Filing 825 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint by Copes-Vulcan.(McGrath, Daniel)
July 25, 2014 Filing 824 ANSWER to Complaint Answer To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Cross-Claims For Contribution Or Indemnity And Answer To All Cross-Claims And Counterclaims Of / against All Defendants by Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
July 25, 2014 Filing 823 ANSWER to Complaint Answer To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM For Contribution Or Indemnity And Answer To All Cross-Claims And Counterclaims Of / against All Defendants by Navistar International.(Jones, Kirra)
July 25, 2014 Filing 822 Honeywell International Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Answer to First Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM For Contribution Or Indemnity, and Answer To All Cross-Claims And Counterclaims of/ against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
July 25, 2014 Filing 821 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint by Peerless Industries, Inc..(Alva, Charles)
July 25, 2014 Filing 820 The Kraissl Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by The Kraissl Company, Incorporated.(Foster, Margaret)
July 25, 2014 Filing 819 Armstrong Pumps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Armstrong Pumps, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
July 25, 2014 Filing 818 The Nash Engineering Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by The Nash Engineering Company.(Foster, Margaret)
July 24, 2014 Filing 817 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Watson McDaniel Company.(Blaser, Tucker)
July 24, 2014 Filing 816 Defendant McMaster-Carr Supply Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by McMaster-Carr Supply Company.(McGinley, Michael)
July 24, 2014 Filing 815 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction by MW Custom Papers, LLC.. Responses due by 8/28/2014 (Huelsmann, Brian)
July 24, 2014 Filing 814 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Huelsmann on behalf of MW Custom Papers, LLC. (Huelsmann, Brian)
July 23, 2014 Filing 813 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Schag, Michael)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER re #788 Amended Complaint filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. If the Amended Complaint (Doc. 788) does not raise new allegations against a particular defendant, then that defendant need not file an amended answer and the existing answer will serve as the answer to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/23/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 22, 2014 Filing 811 MOTION to Dismiss Bechtel Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 8/25/2014 (Romani, Allyson)
July 22, 2014 Filing 810 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Flowserve Corporation(as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
July 22, 2014 Filing 809 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
July 22, 2014 Filing 808 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by BW/IP, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
July 21, 2014 Filing 807 Defendant Johnson Controls Inc's, ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Johnson Controls, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 806 Defendant Invensys Systems, Inc fka The Foxboro Company's, ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Invensys Systems, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 805 Defendant J.A. Sexauer Inc's, ANSWER to Complaint and Complaint Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by J.A. Sexauer, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 804 Defendant Tuthill Corporation's, ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Tuthill Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 803 Defendant Welco Manufacturing Company's, ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Welco Manufacturing Company.(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 802 Defendant Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Edward Valve, Inc, Rockwell Manufacturing and Nordstrom Valves, Inc., ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Flowserve U.S., Inc.(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 801 Defendant York International Corporation's, ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complain by York International Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 800 Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC Inc., ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc..(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER striking #795 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer per Doc. 452. Defendant does not need to seek leave when it has already filed an answer in state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/21/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2014 Filing 798 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #793 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by General Cable Industries, Inc. See attached document for specifics (mar)
July 18, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by General Cable Corporation. See Document #793 for complete PDF document. Entry docketed to correct parties.(mar)
July 18, 2014 Filing 797 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nooter Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CIC Group, Inc. for Nooter Corporation. (Nieder, Douglas)
July 18, 2014 Filing 796 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Nooter Corporation.(Nieder, Douglas)
July 18, 2014 Filing 795 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #788 Amended Complaint by Nooter Corporation. (Nieder, Douglas)
July 18, 2014 Filing 794 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Nieder on behalf of Nooter Corporation (Nieder, Douglas)
July 18, 2014 Filing 793 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint , Crossclaim against all Defendants by General Cable Industries, Inc.(Bronsky, A.) Modified on 7/21/2014 (mar).
July 17, 2014 Filing 792 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Domco Products Texas, Inc..(Veath, Beth)
July 17, 2014 Filing 791 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 790 ORDER Stipulation of Dismissals re #685 , #675 , #671 , #687 , #690 , #686 , #678 , #676 , #692 , #677 , #682 , #673 , #689 , #688 , #681 , #683 , #680 , #672 , #679 , #684 , #674 , and #691 and filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/16/14. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 16, 2014 Filing 789 ANSWER to #788 Amended Complaint by Pfizer, Inc..(O'Malley, Kevin)
July 15, 2014 Filing 788 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider.(Romani, Allyson)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 787 ORDER granting #786 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff to file Amended Complaint by July 22, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/15/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 14, 2014 Filing 786 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
July 10, 2014 Filing 785 The Nash Engineering Company's ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Nash Engineering Company.(Foster, Margaret)
July 10, 2014 Filing 784 Armstrong Pumps, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Armstrong Pumps, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
July 10, 2014 Filing 783 The Kraissl Company, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Kraissl Company, Incorporated.(Foster, Margaret)
July 9, 2014 Filing 782 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Swindell-Dressler International Co.. (Hays, Keith)
July 9, 2014 Filing 781 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #778 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Metallo Gasket Co. See attached document for specifics (kek)
July 8, 2014 Filing 780 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 7/8/2014. Allyson Romani appears for Plaintiff. Anita Kidd, Carolyn Olsen, Rebecca Dircks, Derek Ruzicka, Joe Brown, Laura Beasley, Haley Schumacher, Meredith Hudgens, Michael Dauphin, Michael McGinley, Brian Watson, Stephanie Jones, Kyle Pozan, Denise Peterson, Matt Alva, Brad Bultman, Justin Zimmerman, Kyler Stevens, Gary Smith, Leslie Offergeld, Kevin Dawson, Dave Page, Agatha Petersy, William Irwin, Keith Hill, Karen Bettcher, Ben Wilson, Bill Cross, Elizabeth Nguyen, and Ken Neussbaumer appeared for various Defendants. Parties agree to a consolidated set of initial discovery requests from Defendants. Defendants have fourteen days in which to craft their own set of consolidated discovery requests. Plaintiff will then have fourteen days from the request to respond. Defendant specific interrogatories and requests to produce shall be served no later than 21 days after Defendants have received Plaintiffs responses to the consolidated discovery requests. (Court Reporter Liberty Recording.) (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 779 ORDER regarding crossclaims, answers and affirmative defenses to crossclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/8/2014. (anj)
July 8, 2014 Filing 778 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metallo Gasket Co. (Bettcher, Karen) Modified on 7/9/2014 (kek).
July 8, 2014 Filing 777 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #766 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #767 Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures Designations and Objections filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., #765 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by The Sherwin Williams Company. See attached document for specifics (cds)
July 8, 2014 Filing 776 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. (Szlanfucht, David)
July 8, 2014 Filing 775 ANSWER to Complaint by Swindell-Dressler International Co..(Hays, Keith)
July 8, 2014 Filing 774 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Hays on behalf of Swindell-Dressler International Co. (Hays, Keith)
July 8, 2014 Filing 773 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Flatt, Gregory)
July 7, 2014 Filing 772 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McNally Industries, Inc.. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 771 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 770 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McCord Gasket Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Textron Inc. for McCord Gasket Corporation. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 769 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn N. Chenevert on behalf of FMC Corporation, McNally Industries, Inc.(as Successor-in-Interest to Northern Pump Company) (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 768 ANSWER to Complaint by Metallo Gasket Co..(Bettcher, Karen)
July 7, 2014 Filing 767 STRICKEN - RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections byKaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. (Szlanfucht, David) Modified on 7/8/2014 (cds).
July 7, 2014 Filing 766 STRICKEN - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Swindell Dressler International Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/8/2014 (cds).
July 7, 2014 Filing 765 STRICKEN - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Sherwin Williams Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Bruegger, John) Modified on 7/8/2014 (cds).
July 7, 2014 Filing 764 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn N. Chenevert on behalf of McCord Gasket Corporation (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 3, 2014 Filing 763 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong Pumps, Inc.. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 762 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 761 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Nash Engineering Company. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 760 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of The Nash Engineering Company (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 759 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kraissl Company, Incorporated. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 758 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of The Kraissl Company, Incorporated (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responsive pleading and Rule 26 disclosures for Defendant Sherwin-Williams Company due by 7/8/2014. (tkm )
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER finding as moot #751 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The parties agree to the leave and Defendants have already filed their answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/3/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 3, 2014 Filing 756 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 7/8/2014 at 03:00 PM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; and when prompted enter Security Code 9467. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 2, 2014 Filing 755 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Status Conference held on 7/2/2014. Allyson Romani appears for Plaintiff. Gregory Flatt, Julie Fix-Meyer, Joe Brown, Debra Zahalsky, Michael Dauphin, Carl Geraci, Kelly Liebra, Kathleen Hardee, Kira Jones, Gary Smith, John Hipskin, Kevin Dawson, Charles Alva, Christian Cagas, Sean Fergus Williams Starnes, William Irwin, Kyle Pozan, David Reust, Agatha Petersy, Brad Bultman, Ross Titzer, Haley Schumacher, Justin Zimmerman, Chris Lang, Elizabeth Ngyen, Michael McGinley, Stephanie Jones, Amy Hanson, and Georgeanne Oliver appeared for various Defendants. Status Conference held. The Court ruled on several issues on the record that will be reflected in a separate summary order. (Court Reporter Liberty Recording.) (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 2, 2014 Filing 754 CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Special Electric Company, Inc..(Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 753 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Special Electric Company, Inc.. (Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 752 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Special Electric Company, Inc..(Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 751 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Special Electric Company, Inc.. (Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 750 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica K. Velez on behalf of Special Electric Company, Inc. (Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 749 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Szlanfucht on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Szlanfucht, David)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 748 Order re #695 Order Granting Stipulations of Dismissal. There being no objections, all cross-claims filed by the dismissed Defendants and all cross-claims currently pending against the dismissed Defendants are DISMISSED. Thus, the Court finds as moot #700 Motion to Dismiss, #701 Motion to Dismiss, #702 Motion to Dismiss, #703 Motion to Dismiss, #704 Motion to Dismiss, #705 Motion for Order, #706 Motion for Order, #707 Motion for Order, #708 Motion for Order, and #709 Motion for Order. With any future dismissals of Defendants, cross-claims filed by those Defendants will be automatically dismissed. All other Defendants will have five days to object before their cross-claims against the dismissed Defendants also will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/2/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 2, 2014 Filing 747 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Maassen on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. (Maassen, Stephen)
July 2, 2014 Filing 746 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Henry Pratt Company (Tayyab, Julia)
July 2, 2014 Filing 745 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Tayyab, Julia)
July 2, 2014 Filing 744 Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by The WM Powell Company.(Newport, Michael)
July 2, 2014 Filing 743 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of The WM Powell Company (Newport, Michael)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER granting #720 Motion for Extension of Time. Responsive pleading and Rule 26 disclosures for Defendant Sherwin-Williams Company due July 8, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/2/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 1, 2014 Filing 741 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of The WM Powell Company (Dauphin, Michael)
July 1, 2014 Filing 740 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi Kern Oertle on behalf of Deere & Company (Oertle, Heidi)
June 30, 2014 Filing 739 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #731 Notice of Appearance. See attached document for specifics (kek)
June 30, 2014 Filing 738 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles)
June 30, 2014 Filing 737 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Flatt, Gregory)
June 30, 2014 Filing 736 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Flatt, Gregory)
June 30, 2014 Filing 735 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 734 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC. (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 733 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of The Fairbanks Company (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 732 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of All Acquisitions, LLC (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 731 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc), and Buffalo Air Handling (Flatt, Gregory) Modified on 6/30/2014 (kek).
June 27, 2014 Filing 730 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 729 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Certainteed Corporation (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 728 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 727 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Lennox Industries, Inc. (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 726 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Brummond on behalf of Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. (Brummond, Robert)
June 26, 2014 Filing 725 NOTICE by American Optical Corporation Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court MTD)(Zahalsky, Debra)
June 26, 2014 Filing 724 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Optical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Coast Holdings Inc for American Optical Corporation. (Zahalsky, Debra)
June 26, 2014 Filing 723 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra K. Zahalsky on behalf of American Optical Corporation (Zahalsky, Debra)
June 26, 2014 Filing 722 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Brown, Jr on behalf of American Optical Corporation (Brown, Joseph)
June 24, 2014 Filing 721 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan on behalf of The Sherwin Williams Company (Cowan, Tracy)
June 24, 2014 Filing 720 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and File Responsive Pleadings by The Sherwin Williams Company. (Bruegger, John)
June 24, 2014 Filing 719 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Sherwin Williams Company. (Bruegger, John)
June 24, 2014 Filing 718 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Bruegger on behalf of The Sherwin Williams Company (Bruegger, John)
June 24, 2014 Filing 717 ANSWER to Crossclaim, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint and all Cross-Claims by Fort Kent Holdings, Inc..(Pozan, Kyle)
June 24, 2014 Filing 716 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Pozan on behalf of Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. (Pozan, Kyle)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER denying #668 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 6/24/2014. (anj)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 714 Amended SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 6/24/2014. (anj)
June 24, 2014 Filing 713 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/2/2014 at 01:30 PM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. The Court will discuss all pending motions at that time. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted, enter Access Code 6049846; and when prompted again enter Security Code 9467. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 24, 2014 Filing 712 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Connolly on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Connolly, Brian)
June 24, 2014 Filing 711 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Todd Applegate on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Applegate, J.)
June 24, 2014 Filing 710 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Cable Industries, Inc.. (Bronsky, A.)
June 23, 2014 Filing 709 MOTION for Order toVoluntary Dismiss Cross Claim against all Defendants by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 708 MOTION for Order toVoluntary Dismiss Cross Claim against all Defendants by Fluor Constructors International Inc. (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 707 MOTION for Order toVoluntary Dismiss Cross Claim against all Defendants by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc.. (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 706 MOTION for Order toVoluntary Dismissal of Cross Claim against all Defendants by Fluor Corporation. (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 705 MOTION for Order toVoluntary Dismissal of Cross Claim against all Defendants by Daniel International Corporation. (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 704 MOTION to Dismiss all Cross Claims against it as Moot by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 703 MOTION to Dismiss all Cross Claims against it as Moot by Fluor Constructors International Inc. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 702 MOTION to Dismiss all Cross Claims against it as Moot by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc.. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 701 MOTION to Dismiss all Cross Claims against It as Moot by Fluor Corporation. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 700 MOTION to Dismiss All Cross Claims against it as Moot by Daniel International Corporation. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 699 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Bauman on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Bauman, Mark)
June 23, 2014 Filing 698 RESPONSE to #695 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company). (Bronsky, A.)
June 23, 2014 Filing 697 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Howden North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Howden North America, Inc. for Howden North America, Inc.. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 696 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burnham, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Burnham Holdings, Inc. for Burnham, LLC. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER GRANTING #611 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #588 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #620 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #600 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #614 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #605 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #615 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #596 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #599 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #594 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #602 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #598 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #631 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #595 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #613 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #589 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #607 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #633 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #629 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #617 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #610 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #606 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #627 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #584 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #628 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #597 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #618 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #603 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #590 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #583 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #632 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #592 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #587 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #630 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #619 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #585 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #625 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #593 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #612 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #601 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #609 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #626 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #623 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #591 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #616 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #608 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #604 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #586 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider, #582 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 6/20/14. (amv)
June 20, 2014 Filing 694 ANSWER to Complaint & Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Answers to Cross-claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Kidd, Anita)
June 20, 2014 Filing 693 ANSWER to Complaint & Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Answers to Cross-claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bird Incorporated.(Kidd, Anita)
June 20, 2014 Filing 692 STIPULATION of Dismissal Treco Construction Service, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 691 STIPULATION of Dismissal Sprinkmann Sons Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 690 STIPULATION of Dismissal Sears Roebuck by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 689 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rheem Manufacturing Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 688 STIPULATION of Dismissal Resco Holdings, LLC by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 687 STIPULATION of Dismissal Paccar, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 686 STIPULATION of Dismissal Oakfabco, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 685 STIPULATION of Dismissal Nooter Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 684 STIPULATION of Dismissal Nibco, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 683 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kelly Moore Paint Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 682 STIPULATION of Dismissal Goodyear Canada by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 681 STIPULATION of Dismissal Duro Dyne Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 680 STIPULATION of Dismissal Cytech Industries, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 679 STIPULATION of Dismissal Custom-Aire, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 678 STIPULATION of Dismissal Cooper Industries, LLC by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 677 STIPULATION of Dismissal Chicago Gasket Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 676 STIPULATION of Dismissal Bridgestone Americas by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 675 STIPULATION of Dismissal Avocet Enterprieses, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 674 STIPULATION of Dismissal Asbestos Corporation Limited by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 673 STIPULATION of Dismissal AO Smith Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 672 STIPULATION of Dismissal American Optical Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 671 STIPULATION of Dismissal Harper International by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 20, 2014 Filing 670 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer, Inc.. (O'Malley, Kevin)
June 19, 2014 Filing 669 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ralph Lewis Fulwider.(Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 668 Proposed MOTION for Discovery by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 667 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Rockwell Automations, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 19, 2014 Filing 666 RESPONSE to #625 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Beazer East Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 19, 2014 Filing 665 RESPONSE to #618 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Universal Refractories, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 19, 2014 Filing 664 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Motion Control Industries, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 19, 2014 Filing 663 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison K. Sonneveld on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation, Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Sonneveld, Allison)
June 19, 2014 Filing 662 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation, Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
June 18, 2014 Filing 661 RESPONSE To Plaintiff's Sitpulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Kvaerner U.S., Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 18, 2014 Filing 660 RESPONSE To Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Bonney Forge Corporation. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 18, 2014 Filing 659 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Navistar International, Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 18, 2014 Filing 658 Howden North America, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Howden North America, Inc..(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 657 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Gasket Company. (Callaghan, Amy)
June 17, 2014 Filing 656 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 655 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Navistar International (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 654 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 653 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 652 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 651 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole E. Rice on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Rice, Nicole)
June 17, 2014 Filing 650 Conwed Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Conwed Corporation.(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 649 Burnham, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Burnham, LLC.(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 648 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conwed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Leucadia, LLC for Conwed Corporation. (Graber, Dennis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 647 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Howden North America, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 646 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 645 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Copes-Vulcan, Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 644 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K Beasley on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Beasley, Laura)
June 16, 2014 Filing 643 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Conwed Corporation (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 642 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Burnham, LLC (Dawson, Kevin)
June 13, 2014 Filing 641 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor A. Sondag on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Sondag, Trevor)
June 12, 2014 Filing 640 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Marie Callaghan on behalf of Chicago Gasket Company (Callaghan, Amy)
June 12, 2014 Filing 639 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer To Cross Claims, Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Sepco Corporation.(Fergus, Sean)
June 12, 2014 Filing 638 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sepco Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc. for Sepco Corporation. (Fergus, Sean)
June 12, 2014 Filing 637 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Fergus on behalf of Sepco Corporation (Fergus, Sean)
June 12, 2014 Filing 636 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Copes-Vulcan, Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
June 11, 2014 Filing 635 NOTICE of Appearance by Davin Maitland Reust on behalf of Deere & Company (Reust, Davin)
June 11, 2014 Filing 634 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #622 Notice of Appearance filed by General Cable Industries, Inc. When Document was filed Attorney Bronsky was only added as Attorney of Record for one of the Cross Defendant parties for General Cable Industries, Inc. Clerk's Office has confirmed with Mr. Bronsky's office that he should represent General Cable Industries, Inc. in all capacities. Docket sheet has been corrected. This notice is for information only and no further action is required by the filer. (kek)
June 10, 2014 Filing 633 STIPULATION of Dismissal Whiting Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 632 STIPULATION of Dismissal Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 631 STIPULATION of Dismissal Motion Control Industries, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 630 STIPULATION of Dismissal Fluor Enterprises, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 629 STIPULATION of Dismissal Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 628 STIPULATION of Dismissal Fluor Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 627 STIPULATION of Dismissal Fluor Constructors International Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 626 STIPULATION of Dismissal Daniel International Corp. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 625 STIPULATION of Dismissal Beazer East, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 624 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Cable Industries, Inc..(Bronsky, A.)
June 10, 2014 Filing 623 STIPULATION of Dismissal API Heat Transfer Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 622 NOTICE of Appearance by A. J. Bronsky on behalf of General Cable Industries, Inc. (Bronsky, A.)
June 9, 2014 Filing 621 CROSSCLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTIONS AND ANSWER TO ANTICIPATED CROSS-CLAIMS against All Defendants, filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
June 9, 2014 Filing 620 STIPULATION of Dismissal Young Group LTD by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 619 STIPULATION of Dismissal XEF, Inc., f/k/a Electric Furnace by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 618 STIPULATION of Dismissal Universal Refractories Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 617 STIPULATION of Dismissal Thermwell Products Co., Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 616 STIPULATION of Dismissal Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 615 STIPULATION of Dismissal Superior Boiler Works, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 614 STIPULATION of Dismissal Seco Warwick Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 613 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rogers Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 612 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rockwell Automation, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 611 STIPULATION of Dismissal Riley Stoker Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 610 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ric-Wil Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 609 STIPULATION of Dismissal Research Cottrell, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 608 STIPULATION of Dismissal Plastics Engineering Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 607 STIPULATION of Dismissal Milwaukee Valve Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 606 STIPULATION of Dismissal Lindberg by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 605 STIPULATION of Dismissal Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 604 STIPULATION of Dismissal Lattner Boiler Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 603 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kvaerner U.S., Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 602 STIPULATION of Dismissal KCG, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 601 STIPULATION of Dismissal Johnston Boiler Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 600 STIPULATION of Dismissal Honeywell, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 599 STIPULATION of Dismissal Homasote Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 598 STIPULATION of Dismissal Hennessy Industries, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 597 STIPULATION of Dismissal Grimes Aerospace Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 596 STIPULATION of Dismissal Graybar Electric Company, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 595 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ford Motor Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 594 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ferro Engineering by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 593 STIPULATION of Dismissal Dravo Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 592 STIPULATION of Dismissal Dewitt Products Co. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 591 STIPULATION of Dismissal Compudyne Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 590 STIPULATION of Dismissal Chicago Bridge & Iron Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 589 STIPULATION of Dismissal Carboline Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 588 STIPULATION of Dismissal Brand Insulations, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 587 STIPULATION of Dismissal Bonney Forge Corporation by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 586 STIPULATION of Dismissal Bechtel Construction by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 585 STIPULATION of Dismissal Baltimore Aircoil Company by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 584 STIPULATION of Dismissal ArvinMeritor, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 583 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ajax Magnethermic Corp. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 582 STIPULATION of Dismissal Aerco International, Inc. by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 581 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #579 Amended Complaint filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Efiler selected the incorrect event. The attached document is a Motion for Leave to Amend with the proposed Amended Complaint and Order attached. The correct event is Motion to Amend/Correct. Efiler is instructed to refile the document using the correct event and email the appropriate Judge the proposed Amended Complaint and Order for review and approval.(jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER finding as moot #566 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; finding as moot #571 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant has already filed its Answer and Plaintiff consented to the filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 6/9/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 6, 2014 Filing 579 STRICKEN-AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Parties, filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider.(Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/9/2014 (jlrr ).
June 6, 2014 Filing 578 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Graber, Dennis)
June 6, 2014 Filing 577 Goulds Pumps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Graber, Dennis)
June 6, 2014 Filing 576 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Dewitt Products Co. (Dauphin, Michael)
June 6, 2014 Filing 575 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #555 Answer to Complaint filed by Peerless Industries, Inc., #560 Answer to Complaint filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC. Documents have been refiled correctly at Documents #567 & #572 respectively. This notice is for information only; no further action is required by the filer. (kek)
June 5, 2014 Filing 574 CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC.(Alva, Charles)
June 5, 2014 Filing 573 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC. (Alva, Charles)
June 5, 2014 Filing 572 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC.(Alva, Charles)
June 5, 2014 Filing 571 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC. (Alva, Charles)
June 5, 2014 Filing 570 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Alva on behalf of Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC (Alva, Charles)
June 5, 2014 Filing 569 CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Peerless Industries, Inc..(Alva, Charles)
June 5, 2014 Filing 568 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peerless Industries, Inc.. (Alva, Charles)
June 5, 2014 Filing 567 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Peerless Industries, Inc..(Alva, Charles)
June 5, 2014 Filing 566 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Peerless Industries, Inc.. (Alva, Charles)
June 5, 2014 Filing 565 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Alva on behalf of Peerless Industries, Inc. (Alva, Charles)
June 5, 2014 Filing 564 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #560 Answer to Complaint filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, #555 Answer to Complaint filed by Peerless Industries, Inc.. Efiler selected the incorrect defendant when filing the Answer. Clerk's office has modified the docket text to reflect the correct defendant filing their Answer. No further action required by efiler at this time. (jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 5, 2014 Filing 563 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #561 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, #557 Crossclaim filed by Peerless Industries, Inc., #562 Crossclaim filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, #554 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Peerless Industries, Inc., #556 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Peerless Industries, Inc., #558 Notice of Appearance filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, #553 Notice of Appearance filed by Peerless Industries, Inc., #559 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC. Efiler attached the incorrect documents. The events chosen and the.pdf documents do not match. Efiler is instructed to refile all documents using the correct event and attaching the correct documents. (jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 4, 2014 Filing 562 STRICKEN-CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC.(Alva, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2014 (jlrr ).
June 4, 2014 Filing 561 STRICKEN-Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC. (Alva, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2014 (jlrr ).
June 4, 2014 Filing 560 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 575 - ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Peerless Industries, Inc.(Alva, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2014 (jlrr ). Modified on 6/6/2014 (kek).
June 4, 2014 Filing 559 STRICKEN-MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC. (Alva, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2014 (jlrr).
June 4, 2014 Filing 558 STRICKEN-NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Alva on behalf of Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC (Alva, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2014 (jlrr).
June 4, 2014 Filing 557 STRICKEN-CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Peerless Industries, Inc..(Alva, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2014 (jlrr ).
June 4, 2014 Filing 556 STRICKEN-Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peerless Industries, Inc.. (Alva, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2014 (jlrr).
June 4, 2014 Filing 555 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 575 - ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC. Alva, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2014 (jlrr ). Modified on 6/6/2014 (kek).
June 4, 2014 Filing 554 STRICKEN-MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Peerless Industries, Inc.. (Alva, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2014 (jlrr ).
June 4, 2014 Filing 553 STRICKEN-NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Alva on behalf of Peerless Industries, Inc. (Alva, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2014 (jlrr ).
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER finding as moot #548 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant has already filed his Answer and Plaintiff consented to the filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 6/3/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 3, 2014 Filing 551 CROSSCLAIM for Contibution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of any other Defendant against AERCO International, Inc., filed by AERCO International, Inc..(Eisenberg, Brent)
June 3, 2014 Filing 550 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AERCO International, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Brent)
June 3, 2014 Filing 549 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by AERCO International, Inc..(Eisenberg, Brent)
June 3, 2014 Filing 548 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by AERCO International, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Brent)
June 3, 2014 Filing 547 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Eisenberg on behalf of AERCO International, Inc. (Eisenberg, Brent)
June 2, 2014 Filing 546 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #539 Motion for Disclosure filed by CBS Corporation. See attached document for specifics (tkm )
June 2, 2014 Filing 545 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Thermwell Products Co., Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
June 2, 2014 Filing 544 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pfizer, Inc..(O'Malley, Kevin)
June 2, 2014 Filing 543 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin F. O'Malley on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (O'Malley, Kevin)
June 2, 2014 Filing 542 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel)
June 2, 2014 Filing 541 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 30, 2014 Filing 540 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Filing 539 ENTRY STRICKEN - MOTION for Disclosure Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 26(a)(1) by CBS Corporation(a Deleware Corporation). (Donahue, Daniel) Modified on 6/2/2014 (tkm ).
May 30, 2014 Filing 538 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Copes-Vulcan.(McGrath, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Filing 537 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Copes-Vulcan. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 29, 2014 Filing 536 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Superior Boiler Works, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 29, 2014 Filing 535 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Company (Dauphin, Michael)
May 29, 2014 Filing 534 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Ameron International Corporation (Dauphin, Michael)
May 28, 2014 Filing 533 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ferro Engineering identifying Corporate Parent Oglebay Norton Company for Ferro Engineering. (Bronsky, A.)
May 27, 2014 Filing 532 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Howden North America, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Filing 531 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Filing 530 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Conwed Corporation (Graber, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Filing 529 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Burnham, LLC (Graber, Dennis)
May 23, 2014 Filing 528 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. McGrath on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 23, 2014 Filing 527 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. McGrath on behalf of Copes-Vulcan (McGrath, Daniel)
May 23, 2014 Filing 526 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Research-Cottrell, Inc.. (Page, David)
May 23, 2014 Filing 525 ANSWER to Complaint cross-claims against all defendants and answer to all cross-claims by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company).(Bronsky, A.)
May 21, 2014 Filing 524 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watson McDaniel Company. (Blaser, Tucker)
May 21, 2014 Filing 523 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff, Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Watson McDaniel Company.(Blaser, Tucker)
May 21, 2014 Filing 522 NOTICE of Appearance by Tucker Blaser on behalf of Watson McDaniel Company (Blaser, Tucker)
May 21, 2014 Filing 521 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Cunningham on behalf of Watson McDaniel Company (Cunningham, John)
May 20, 2014 Filing 520 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
May 20, 2014 Filing 519 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Bonney Forge Corporation.(Jones, Kirra)
May 20, 2014 Filing 518 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Kvaerner U.S., Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
May 20, 2014 Filing 517 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Navistar International.(Jones, Kirra)
May 20, 2014 Filing 516 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Honeywell International, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
May 20, 2014 Filing 515 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McMaster-Carr Supply Company. (McGinley, Michael)
May 20, 2014 Filing 514 McMaster-Carr Supply Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by McMaster-Carr Supply Company.(McGinley, Michael)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting #340 Motion to have all counterclaims deemed filed; granting #340 Motion to Continue; granting #315 Motion for institution of denials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 5/20/2014. (anj)
May 20, 2014 Filing 512 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation(a Deleware Corporation). (Donahue, Daniel)
May 16, 2014 Filing 511 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2014 re #340 MOTION to have all Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5(C)(1)(B), Alternatively MOTION to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims filed by Union Carbide Corporation, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Homasote Company, The Dow Chemical Company, #315 MOTION Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) filed by Brand Insulations, Inc. (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.) (amv)
May 16, 2014 Filing 510 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Cloud on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc), Buffalo Air Handling (Cloud, Patrick)
May 16, 2014 Filing 509 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman on behalf of Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Homasote Company, Honeywell, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company (Zimmerman, Justin)
May 16, 2014 Filing 508 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Morris on behalf of Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Homasote Company, Honeywell, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Union Carbide Corporation (Morris, Matthew)
May 16, 2014 Filing 507 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Zimmerman, Justin)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting Notice of Voluntary Dismissals #493 and #492 , finding as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #136 Motion to Dismiss. Foseco, Inc. and Young Insulation Group of St. Louis dismissed without prejudice, parties to bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 5/15/2014. (anj)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER withdrawing #345 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting #499 Motion to Withdraw ; granting #500 Motion to Withdraw ; granting #501 Motion to Withdraw ; withdrawing #32 Motion for More Definite Statement; withdrawing #33 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 5/15/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 15, 2014 Filing 504 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #482 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. Filer selected an incorrect document when using this event. Filer should refile if so desired using the correct document. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 15, 2014 Filing 503 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #470 Notice of Appearance filed by McMaster-Carr Supply Company. Attorney Michael McGinley was only added as Attorney of Record for Defendant McMaster-Carr Supply Company. Upon speaking with the office of Mr. McGinley, he should represent McMaster-Carr Supply Company in every instance. Attorney McGinley has been added to all McMaster-Carr Supply Company parties. This notice is for information only and no further action is required by the filer. (kek)
May 14, 2014 Filing 502 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Crane Company (Wilson, Benjamin)
May 14, 2014 Filing 501 MOTION to Withdraw #32 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, MW Custom Papers, LLC., Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Whiting Corporation. (Geraci, Carl)
May 14, 2014 Filing 500 MOTION to Withdraw #33 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Illinois Tool Works, Inc.. (Geraci, Carl)
May 14, 2014 Filing 499 MOTION to Withdraw #345 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. (Geraci, Carl)
May 14, 2014 Filing 498 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 497 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Simpson Timber Company (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 496 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Johnston Boiler Company (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 495 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of XEF, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 494 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 493 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ralph Lewis Fulwider (Romani, Allyson)
May 14, 2014 Filing 492 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ralph Lewis Fulwider (Romani, Allyson)
May 13, 2014 Filing 491 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen E Bettcher on behalf of Metallo Gasket Co. (Bettcher, Karen)
May 13, 2014 Filing 490 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Starnes, II on behalf of Daniel International Corporation (Starnes, William)
May 13, 2014 Filing 489 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Starnes, II on behalf of Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Starnes, William)
May 13, 2014 Filing 488 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Fairbanks Company. (Hill, Keith)
May 13, 2014 Filing 487 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Pump, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Houdaille Industries, Inc. for Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER striking #471 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; striking #472 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; striking #473 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; striking #474 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; striking #475 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Motions stricken per Order at Doc. 452 . Defendant need not seek leave when Answer was already filed in state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 5/13/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 13, 2014 Filing 485 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel International Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 484 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Constructors International Inc. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 483 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 482 ENTRY STRICKEN: Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Skelton, Bryan) Modified on 5/15/2014 (lmb).
May 13, 2014 Filing 481 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 480 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Daniel International Corporation.(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 479 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Constructors International Inc.(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 478 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc..(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 477 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 476 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Corporation.(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 475 ENTRY STRICKEN PER ORDER 486 : MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Daniel International Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan) Modified on 5/15/2014 (lmb).
May 13, 2014 Filing 474 ENTRY STRICKEN PER ORDER 486 : MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Constructors International Inc. (Skelton, Bryan) Modified on 5/15/2014 (lmb).
May 13, 2014 Filing 473 ENTRY STRICKEN PER ORDER 486 : MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan) Modified on 5/15/2014 (lmb).
May 13, 2014 Filing 472 ENTRY STRICKEN PER ORDER 486 : MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Skelton, Bryan) Modified on 5/15/2014 (lmb).
May 13, 2014 Filing 471 ENTRY STRICKEN PER ORDER 486 : MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan) Modified on 5/15/2014 (lmb).
May 13, 2014 Filing 470 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick McGinley on behalf of McMaster-Carr Supply Company (McGinley, Michael)
May 13, 2014 Filing 469 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Skelton on behalf of Daniel International Corporation (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 468 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Skelton on behalf of Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 8, 2014 Filing 467 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mueller Steam Specialty Company. (Page, David)
May 7, 2014 Filing 466 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #465 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by XEF, Inc.. See attached document for specifics. (cjo)
May 2, 2014 Filing 465 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by XEF, Inc. (Newport, Michael) Modified on 5/7/2014 (cjo).
May 2, 2014 Filing 464 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simpson Timber Company identifying Corporate Parent Simpson Investment Company for Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company. (Newport, Michael)
April 30, 2014 Filing 463 ANSWER to Complaint by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Johnson, Dayna)
April 29, 2014 Filing 462 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grimes Aerospace Corporation. (Ruzicka, Derek)
April 28, 2014 Filing 461 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Fischer on behalf of Deere & Company (Fischer, Matthew)
April 28, 2014 Filing 460 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Casmere on behalf of Deere & Company (Casmere, Edward)
April 28, 2014 Filing 459 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deere & Company. (Watson, Brian)
April 28, 2014 Filing 458 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian O'Connor Watson on behalf of Deere & Company (Watson, Brian)
April 28, 2014 Filing 457 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Irwin, William)
April 28, 2014 Filing 456 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Rogers Corporation (Irwin, William)
April 28, 2014 Filing 455 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc. (Irwin, William)
April 28, 2014 Filing 454 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Irwin, William)
April 28, 2014 Filing 453 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Irwin, William)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER regarding filing of Answers and discovery requests. The Court ORDERS that Defendants need not seek leave to file an Answer if they have already filed an Answer in state court previously. All Defendants may file their Answers in this Court if they have previously filed an Answer in state court and the Answer will be deemed timely filed. As to discovery requests, the parties need not seek leave of Court to extend deadlines for discovery requests or responses to discovery requests if the parties agree to such extensions. Parties need only seek leave of Court if the parties cannot agree on the extension or if parties seek to extend the discovery cutoff date or dispositive motion deadline. Further motions seeking such relief will be QUASHED by this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 4/25/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 24, 2014 Filing 451 Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to Complaint , Answers to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against AERCO International, Inc., AO Smith Corporation, API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc), Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquisitions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East Inc, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Bonney Forge Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc.(successor-by-merger Borg Warner Corporation), Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation(a Deleware Corporation), Carboline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Clow Corporation, Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Custom-Aire, Inc., Cytec Industries, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dewitt Products Co., Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, Eaton Corporation, FMC Corporation, Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company), Flowserve Corporation(as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc(as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Co,. and Edward Valve Co., and Nordstrom Valve), Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grimes Aerospace Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Harper International Corp., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc.(individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Devcon Corp.), Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc,(successor by merger to KC Wall Products, Inc. and Ruco Drywall Products, Inc.), Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc.(as Successor-in-Interest to Northern Pump Company), Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company(a Division of Watts Water Technologies, Inc.), Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc.(individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Peerless Heater Company), Pfizer, Inc., Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automations, Inc., Rogers Corporation, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower), Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co, Seco Warwick Corporation(as succesor-In-interest to Sunbeam Furnaces), Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc.(individually and as alter-ego and successor-in-interest to Special-Materials-Ohio, Inc., Special -Materials Illinois, Inc and Special Materials-Wisconsin, Inc., f/k/a Specials Materials, Inc., f/ka Special Asbestors Company, Inc.), Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Co., Terlins Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, The Fairbanks Company, The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The Nash Engineering Company, The Sherwin Williams Company, The WM Powell Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.(individually and for its subsidiary Loftus Furnace Company), Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC., Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Ford Motor Company.(Ybarra, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 450 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Mueller Steam Specialty Company (Page, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 449 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of AWC 1997 Corporation (Page, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 448 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of KCG, Inc, (Page, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 447 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Research-Cottrell, Inc. (Page, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 446 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Pecora Corporation (Page, David)
April 23, 2014 Filing 445 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of CBS Corporation(a Deleware Corporation) (Dauphin, Michael)
April 23, 2014 Filing 444 ANSWER to Complaint by CBS Corporation(a Deleware Corporation).(Donahue, Daniel)
April 23, 2014 Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Donahue on behalf of CBS Corporation(a Deleware Corporation) (Donahue, Daniel)
April 22, 2014 Filing 442 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Thomas on behalf of Grimes Aerospace Corporation (Thomas, William)
April 22, 2014 Filing 441 CROSSCLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Any and All Cross-Claims and Cross-Claim for Contribution against All Defendants, filed by Grimes Aerospace Corporation.(Ruzicka, Derek)
April 22, 2014 Filing 440 Defendant Grimes Aerospace Corporation f/k/a Surface Combustion Group's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Grimes Aerospace Corporation.(Ruzicka, Derek)
April 22, 2014 Filing 439 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ruzicka on behalf of Grimes Aerospace Corporation (Ruzicka, Derek)
April 21, 2014 Filing 438 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, Answers to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Domco Products Texas, Inc..(Veath, Beth)
April 18, 2014 Filing 437 ANSWER to Complaint /All Cross-Claims by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Johnson, Dayna)
April 18, 2014 Filing 436 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Ajax Magnethermic Corp. (Meyer, Julie)
April 18, 2014 Filing 435 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Chicago Bridge & Iron Company (Meyer, Julie)
April 18, 2014 Filing 434 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Bird Incorporated (Meyer, Julie)
April 17, 2014 Filing 433 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward E. Johnston on behalf of Dewitt Products Co. (Johnston, Edward)
April 16, 2014 Filing 432 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower).(Stevens, Kyler)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 431 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/9/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 4/16/14. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of the Parties)(amv)
April 16, 2014 Filing 430 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #136 MOTION to Dismiss Counts V and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint, #33 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #340 MOTION to have all Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5(C)(1)(B), Alternatively MOTION to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims, #315 MOTION Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) , #32 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #345 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e), #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2014 at 11:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 16, 2014 Filing 428 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dewitt Products Co.. (Johnston, Edward)
April 14, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Maremont Corporation. (See Doc. #425 for complete PDF document.) Entry docketed to correct parties on docket. (bkl)
April 14, 2014 Filing 429 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Discovery Hearing held on 4/14/2014. Allyson Romani for Plaintiff. Kyle Stevens, Will Irwin, Melanie Riley, Sean Fergus, Chuck Joley, Julia Douglas, Leslie Offergeld, Meredith Hudgens, Kirra Jones, Julie Fix Meyers, Stephanie Jones, Carl Geraci, Justin Weply, Derek Ruzicka for defendants. Court adopts proposed scheduling order as modified in pars. 3,4, and 8. Case set for hearing on pending motions on 5/16/14 at 11:00 a.m. (Court Reporter n/a.) (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting #386 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #389 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #393 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #397 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting [ #406 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #410 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answers are deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 4/14/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER granting #417 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #421 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #423 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court notes that SPX Cooling Technologies has not yet filed an Answer and is given until 4/18/2014 to do so. The other two Answers are already filed and the Court deems them timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 4/14/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 14, 2014 Filing 425 ANSWER to Complaint , Cross-Claims, Answers to All, CROSSCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against All Defendants by Maremont Corporation.(Barke, Ryan) Modified on 7/16/2014 (bkl).
April 14, 2014 Filing 424 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan T. Barke on behalf of Maremont Corporation (Barke, Ryan)
April 14, 2014 Filing 423 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower). (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 422 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Carrier Corporation.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 421 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Crossclaims, and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Carrier Corporation. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 420 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Carrier Corporation. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 419 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 418 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Motion Control Industries, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 417 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Crossclaims, and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Motion Control Industries, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 416 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motion Control Industries, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 415 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Motion Control Industries, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 414 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of General Electric Company (Meyer, Julie)
April 14, 2014 Filing 413 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #401 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.. Efiler's signature does not match the login/password. Efiler is instructed to refile using the correct login/password for the signing attorney. (jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 14, 2014 Filing 412 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Illinois Tool Works, Inc.(individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Devcon Corp.), Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., MW Custom Papers, LLC., Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Whiting Corporation (Geraci, Carl)
April 11, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Universal Refractories, Inc. (See Doc. #411 for complete PDF document.) Entry docketed to correct parites on docket.(bkl)
April 11, 2014 Filing 411 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Universal Refractories, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler) Modified on 7/16/2014 (bkl).
April 11, 2014 Filing 410 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Universal Refractories, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 409 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Universal Refractories, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 408 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Universal Refractories, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 407 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Beazer East Inc.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 406 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Beazer East Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 405 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beazer East Inc identifying Corporate Parent HBMA HOLDINGS LLC for Beazer East Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 404 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Beazer East Inc (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 403 ANSWER to #398 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower).(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ruzicka on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Ruzicka, Derek)
April 11, 2014 Filing 401 STRICKEN-MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower). (Stevens, Kyler) Modified on 4/14/2014 (jlrr ).
April 11, 2014 Filing 400 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower). (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 399 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower) (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 398 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Crossclaims; against AERCO International, Inc., AO Smith Corporation, API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquisitions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East Inc, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Bonney Forge Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carboline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Clow Corporation, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Custom-Aire, Inc., Cytec Industries, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dewitt Products Co., Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, Eaton Corporation, FMC Corporation, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve Corporation(as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve U.S., Inc, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grimes Aerospace Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Harper International Corp., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc,, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automations, Inc., Rogers Corporation, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co, Seco Warwick Corporation, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Co., Terlins Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, The Fairbanks Company, The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The Nash Engineering Company, The Sherwin Williams Company, The WM Powell Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC., Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Columbia Boiler Company.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 397 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Columbia Boiler Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 396 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbia Boiler Company identifying Corporate Parent Vari Corporation for Columbia Boiler Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 395 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Columbia Boiler Company (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 394 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defensesto Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Crossclaims; against AERCO International, Inc., AO Smith Corporation, API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquisitions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East Inc, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Bonney Forge Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carboline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Clow Corporation, Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Custom-Aire, Inc., Cytec Industries, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dewitt Products Co., Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, Eaton Corporation, FMC Corporation, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve Corporation(as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve U.S., Inc, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grimes Aerospace Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Harper International Corp., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc,, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automations, Inc., Rogers Corporation, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co, Seco Warwick Corporation, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Co., Terlins Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, The Fairbanks Company, The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The Nash Engineering Company, The Sherwin Williams Company, The WM Powell Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC., Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 393 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 392 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 391 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 390 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Automations, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 389 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law and Cross-Claims by Rockwell Automations, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 388 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Rockwell Automations, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 387 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Rockwell Automations, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 386 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law and Cross-Claims by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 385 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 384 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER denying #115 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 4/11/2014. (anj)
April 11, 2014 Filing 382 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 381 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Navistar International (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 380 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 379 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 378 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 10, 2014 Filing 377 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Domco Products Texas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tarkett Enterprises Inc. for Domco Products Texas, Inc.. (Veath, Beth)
April 10, 2014 Filing 376 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Domco Products Texas, Inc.. (Veath, Beth)
April 10, 2014 Filing 375 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Kamp Veath on behalf of Domco Products Texas, Inc. (Veath, Beth)
April 8, 2014 Filing 374 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arvinmeritor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Meritor, Inc. for Arvinmeritor, Inc.. (Johnson, Dayna)
April 8, 2014 Filing 373 NOTICE of Appearance by Dayna L. Johnson on behalf of Arvinmeritor, Inc. (Johnson, Dayna)
April 8, 2014 Filing 372 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Ybarra on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Ybarra, David)
April 8, 2014 Filing 371 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 370 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Invensys Systems, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 369 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 368 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 367 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 366 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of York International Corporation (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 365 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc. (Welply, Justin)
April 7, 2014 Filing 364 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #359 Answer filed by Eaton Corporation. After review with chambers, entry modified to read ANSWER and the links to all complaints, cross compliants, etc. were removed from the text entry, as there were multiple duplicate links. The links exist behind the scenes. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 7, 2014 Filing 363 Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Pneumo Abex, LLC.(Titzer, Ross)
April 7, 2014 Filing 362 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #358 Notice of Appearance filed by Eaton Corporation. Attorney Christopher J Lang did not add himself to Defendant Eaton Corporation when filing his Notice of Appearance. Attorney added this date by Clerk's Office staff. This notice is informational - for reference with future filings. No further action required.(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 7, 2014 Filing 361 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Eaton Corporation. Amendment to #360 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Lang, Christopher)
April 4, 2014 Filing 360 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation. (Lang, Christopher)
April 4, 2014 Filing 359 Eaton Corporation's ANSWER (Lang, Christopher) Modified on 4/7/2014 (jaj).
April 4, 2014 Filing 358 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Lang on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Lang, Christopher)
April 2, 2014 Filing 357 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #352 Notice of Appearance filed by Armstrong International, Inc. See attached document for specifics (drb)
April 1, 2014 Filing 356 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Plastics Engineering Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
April 1, 2014 Filing 355 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Plastics Engineering Company (Bultman, Bradley)
April 1, 2014 Filing 354 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Storm, Carla)
April 1, 2014 Filing 353 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CrossClaim and Answer to CrossClaims by Armstrong International, Inc..(Storm, Carla)
April 1, 2014 Filing 352 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Carla C. Storm on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Storm, Carla) Modified on 4/2/2014 (drb).
March 31, 2014 Filing 351 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #350 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. The corporate parent was only added to the Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. and not to all Cross Defendants in this case. In the future, when adding corporate parents, please add to each time the party is listed in the case. This notice is informational - for reference with future filings.(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 28, 2014 Filing 350 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Weir Group PLC, a United Kingdom public company for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (Newport, Michael)
March 28, 2014 Filing 349 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnston Boiler Company. (Newport, Michael)
March 27, 2014 Filing 348 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. (Chessler, Michael)
March 27, 2014 Filing 347 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Chessler on behalf of Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp. (Chessler, Michael)
March 27, 2014 Filing 346 CROSSCLAIM Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses to any Counterclaims and Cross Claims for Contribution and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp..(Chessler, Michael)
March 27, 2014 Filing 345 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. (Chessler, Michael)
March 26, 2014 Filing 344 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Bridge & Iron Company identifying Corporate Parent Chicago Bridge & Iron Company N.V., Corporate Parent CB&I Holdings B.V. for Chicago Bridge & Iron Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 26, 2014 Filing 343 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 26, 2014 Filing 342 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bird Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Certainteed Corporation, Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain for Bird Incorporated. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 26, 2014 Filing 341 BIRD INCORPORATED ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Answer to Cross-Claims and Jury Demand against All Parties by Bird Incorporated.(Kidd, Anita)
March 25, 2014 Filing 340 MOTION to have all Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5(C)(1)(B), Alternatively, MOTION to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims by Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Homasote Company, Honeywell, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2014 Filing 339 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex, LLC. (Titzer, Ross)
March 24, 2014 Filing 338 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross S. Titzer on behalf of Pneumo Abex, LLC (Titzer, Ross)
March 24, 2014 Filing 337 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #335 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by John Crane, Inc.. See attached document for specifics. (cjo)
March 21, 2014 Filing 336 ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER to Cross Claims, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM For Contributions against AERCO International, Inc., AO Smith Corporation, API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquisitions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East Inc, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Bonney Forge Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carboline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Clow Corporation, Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Custom-Aire, Inc., Cytec Industries, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dewitt Products Co., Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, Eaton Corporation, FMC Corporation, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve Corporation(as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve U.S., Inc, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grimes Aerospace Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Harper International Corp., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc,, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automations, Inc., Rogers Corporation, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co, Seco Warwick Corporation, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Co., Terlins Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, The Fairbanks Company, The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The Nash Engineering Company, The Sherwin Williams Company, The WM Powell Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC., Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC by John Crane, Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
March 21, 2014 Filing 335 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliates John Crane Group, Ltd.(UK), Smith Groups Inter. Holdings, Ltd., and Smiths Group PLC, filed by John Crane, Inc.(Fergus, Sean) Modified on 3/24/2014 (cjo).
March 21, 2014 Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Fergus on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Fergus, Sean)
March 17, 2014 Filing 333 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Superior Boiler Works, Inc.. (Denk, Lawrence)
March 17, 2014 Filing 332 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by Ameron International Corporation.(Denk, Lawrence)
March 17, 2014 Filing 331 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ameron International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Grant Prideco, Inc. for Ameron International Corporation. (Denk, Lawrence)
March 17, 2014 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Denk on behalf of Ameron International Corporation (Denk, Lawrence)
March 13, 2014 Filing 329 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Honeywell International Inc. for Honeywell, Inc.. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #327 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. Stricken per efiler's request.(jlrr,)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 12, 2014 Filing 327 STRICKEN-Corporate Disclosure Statement by API Heat Transfer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Danaher Corporation for API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie) Modified on 3/12/2014 (jlrr ).
March 12, 2014 Filing 326 Corporate Disclosure Statement by API Heat Transfer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Danaher Corporation for API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
March 12, 2014 Filing 325 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by Milwaukee Valve Company.(Denk, Lawrence)
March 12, 2014 Filing 324 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Milwaukee Valve Company. (Denk, Lawrence)
March 12, 2014 Filing 323 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Denk on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Company (Denk, Lawrence)
March 7, 2014 Filing 322 Defendant Brand Insulations, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Brand Insulations, Inc..(Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER regarding #319 Notice filed by Brand Insulations, Inc. Defendant Brand Insulations today has filed a "NOTICE" advising that it "incorporates by reference" into the record in this U.S. District Court a "Motion to Dismiss" previously filed in "the original State Court litigation." Brand Insulations may simply be alerting the Court that Brand Insulations already filed a responsive pleading to the complaint (and thus need not do so here). But counsel are admonished that there is no dismissal motion by Brand Insulations which is a part of the record before this Court. And if a ruling is sought (i.e., if the motion was not disposed of in state court), Brand Insulations must freshly file a proper dismissal motion under the appropriate Federal Rule of Civil Procedure. State court and federal court, of course, apply different pleading systems (fact pleading vs. notice leading), and a dismissal motion filed in a state circuit court cannot simply be re-filed here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 3/7/14. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 6, 2014 Reset Hearings: Scheduling/Discovery Conference RESET for 4/14/2014 at 9:30 AM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Joint Report shall be submitted by 4/7/14. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; and when prompted enter Security Code 9467. (amv)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #318 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Scheduling conference will be reset by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 3/6/14. (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 5, 2014 Filing 319 NOTICE by Brand Insulations, Inc. of adoption of pleadings previously filed (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 5, 2014 Filing 318 MOTION to Continue Scheduling and Discovery Conference and to Extend Filing Date for Scheduling and Discovery Joint Report by Ajax Magnethermic Corp., Bird Incorporated, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, General Electric Company. (King, Melanie)
March 5, 2014 Filing 317 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Hultquist on behalf of Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. (Hultquist, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 316 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #314 Notice (Other) filed by Brand Insulations, Inc. See attached document for specifics (kek)
March 4, 2014 Filing 315 MOTION Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) by Brand Insulations, Inc.. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 4, 2014 Filing 314 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 316 - NOTICE by Brand Insulations, Inc. Notice of Filing (Rychnovsky, Mary) Modified on 3/5/2014 (kek).
March 4, 2014 Filing 313 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brand Insulations, Inc.. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 4, 2014 Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary D. Rychnovsky on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 4, 2014 Filing 311 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Nussbaumer on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
March 4, 2014 Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Orris, Thomas)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting #308 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael F. Daniels terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 3/4/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 28, 2014 Filing 308 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc), All Acquisitions, LLC, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Buffalo Air Handling, Carboline Company, Certainteed Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Goodrich Corporation, Imo Industries, Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lennox Industries, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Seco Warwick Corporation(as succesor-In-interest to Sunbeam Furnaces), The Fairbanks Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC.. (Daniels, Michael)
February 25, 2014 Filing 307 ANSWER to Complaint , Afifirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Thermwell Products Co., Inc..(Bunnell, Nicholas)
February 25, 2014 Filing 306 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas B Bunnell on behalf of Thermwell Products Co., Inc. (Bunnell, Nicholas)
February 21, 2014 Filing 305 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #301 Notice of Appearance filed by Superior Boiler Works, Inc.. See attached document for specifics (cjo )
February 20, 2014 Filing 304 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Riley on behalf of McMaster-Carr Supply Company (Riley, Melanie)
February 19, 2014 Filing 303 ANSWER to Complaint by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
February 19, 2014 Filing 302 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Superior Boiler Works, Inc..(Denk, Lawrence)
February 19, 2014 Filing 301 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Denk on behalf of Superior Boiler Works, Inc. (Denk, Lawrence)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting #297 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 2/14/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 14, 2014 Filing 299 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.. (Douglas, Celia)
February 14, 2014 Filing 298 Defendant Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Individually And For Its Subsidiary Loftus Furnace Company's Answer And Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc..(Douglas, Celia)
February 14, 2014 Filing 297 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Individually And For Its Subsidiary Loftus Furnace Company's Motion For Extension Of Time To File Responsive Pleading by Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.. (Douglas, Celia)
February 14, 2014 Filing 296 NOTICE of Appearance by Celia K. Douglas on behalf of Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. (Douglas, Celia)
February 14, 2014 Filing 295 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger K. Heidenreich on behalf of Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. (Heidenreich, Roger)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting #283 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brett Carl Randol; Allison K. Sonneveld; Kathleen Ann Hardee and Kirra N. Jones terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 2/13/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 12, 2014 Filing 293 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Dezurik.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 12, 2014 Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Dezurik (Bultman, Bradley)
February 12, 2014 Filing 291 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Lindberg.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 12, 2014 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Lindberg (Bultman, Bradley)
February 11, 2014 Filing 289 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Hatch, Mary)
February 11, 2014 Filing 288 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Smith, Gary)
February 11, 2014 Filing 287 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to All Cross Claims and Jury Demand against All Defendants by J.A. Sexauer, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
February 11, 2014 Filing 286 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.A. Sexauer, Inc.. (Welply, Justin)
February 11, 2014 Filing 285 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
February 11, 2014 Filing 284 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie F. Jones on behalf of API Heat Transfer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
February 11, 2014 Filing 283 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Crane Company. (Jones, Kirra)
February 10, 2014 Filing 282 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 281 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 280 RESPONSE in Opposition re #136 MOTION to Dismiss Counts V and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. (Romani, Allyson)
February 7, 2014 Filing 279 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #278 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Company. See attached document for specifics (kek)
February 6, 2014 Filing 278 NOTICE of Appearance by Noel L. Smith, Jr on behalf of Crane Company (Smith, Noel)
February 6, 2014 Filing 277 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 3/12/2014 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)
February 6, 2014 Filing 276 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Jury Trial set for month of 5/1/2015 in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 2/6/14. (amv)
February 4, 2014 Filing 275 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homasote Company identifying Corporate Parent Homasote Company for Homasote Company. (Morris, Matthew)
February 4, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Morris on behalf of Homasote Company (Morris, Matthew)
January 31, 2014 Filing 273 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
January 31, 2014 Filing 272 ANSWER to Complaint by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
January 31, 2014 Filing 271 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #264 Notice of Appearance filed by Simpson Timber Company, #263 Answer to Complaint filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. See attached document for specifics (cekf)
January 30, 2014 Filing 270 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc.. (Newton, Lise)
January 30, 2014 Filing 269 ANSWER to Complaint by Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc..(Newton, Lise)
January 30, 2014 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance by Lise A. Newton on behalf of Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. (Newton, Lise)
January 30, 2014 Filing 267 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Newport, Michael)
January 30, 2014 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Newport, Michael)
January 30, 2014 Filing 265 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Simpson Timber Company.(Newport, Michael)
January 30, 2014 Filing 264 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Simpson Timber Company (Newport, Michael) Modified on 1/31/2014 (cekf).
January 30, 2014 Filing 263 STRICKEN - ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Newport, Michael) Modified on 1/31/2014 (cekf).
January 30, 2014 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Simpson Timber Company (Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 261 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Johnston Boiler Company.(Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Johnston Boiler Company (Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 259 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by XEF, Inc..(Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of XEF, Inc. (Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 257 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Dewitt Products Co..(Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Dewitt Products Co. (Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 255 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
January 29, 2014 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie F. Jones on behalf of Hennessy Industries, Inc. (Jones, Stephanie)
January 28, 2014 Filing 253 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AO Smith Corporation. (Picou, Curtis)
January 28, 2014 Filing 252 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Joley, Charles)
January 28, 2014 Filing 251 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles)
January 28, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Joley on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Joley, Charles)
January 28, 2014 Filing 249 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by All Acquisitions, LLC.(Hill, Keith)
January 28, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #246 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Union Carbide Corporation. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
January 27, 2014 Filing 247 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #227 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by All Acquisitions, LLC. Document contains either wrong heading or is filed in the incorrect case. Filer should refile same including a correct style heading or refile in correct case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 27, 2014 Filing 246 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Union Carbide Corporation for Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2014 Filing 244 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Dow Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for The Dow Chemical Company. (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2014 Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2014 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Honeywell, Inc. (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2014 Filing 241 RESPONSE in Opposition re #115 MOTION to Remand filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hardee, Kathleen)
January 23, 2014 Filing 240 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC.. (Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 239 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Warren Pumps, LLC..(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 238 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Viking Pump, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 237 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 236 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Stoker Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 235 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Riley Stoker Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 234 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Lattner Boiler Company.(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 233 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imo Industries, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 232 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Imo Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 231 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodrich Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 230 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Goodrich Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 229 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by The Fairbanks Company.(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 228 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Acquisitions, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 227 ENTRY STRICKEN: ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by All Acquisitions, LLC.(Hill, Keith) Modified on 1/27/2014 (lmb).
January 23, 2014 Filing 226 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Morris, Matthew)
January 23, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Morris on behalf of Graybar Electric Company, Inc. (Morris, Matthew)
January 23, 2014 Filing 224 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clark Equipment Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 23, 2014 Filing 223 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Clark Equipment Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 23, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Clark Equipment Company (Bultman, Bradley)
January 21, 2014 Filing 221 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis R. Picou on behalf of AO Smith Corporation (Picou, Curtis)
January 17, 2014 Filing 220 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clow Corporation. (Chessler, Michael)
January 17, 2014 Filing 219 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hollingsworth & Vose Company. (Chessler, Michael)
January 17, 2014 Filing 218 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #209 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Certainteed Corporation. See attached document for specifics (drb)
January 16, 2014 Filing 217 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seco Warwick Corporation(as succesor-In-interest to Sunbeam Furnaces). (Hill, Keith)
January 16, 2014 Filing 216 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Seco Warwick Corporation(as succesor-In-interest to Sunbeam Furnaces).(Hill, Keith)
January 16, 2014 Filing 215 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 16, 2014 Filing 214 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Cross-Claim against All Defendants by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
January 16, 2014 Filing 213 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lennox Industries, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
January 16, 2014 Filing 212 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Lennox Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
January 16, 2014 Filing 211 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dana Companies, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
January 16, 2014 Filing 210 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Dana Companies, LLC.(Hill, Keith)
January 16, 2014 Filing 209 ENTRY STRICKEN - ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Certainteed Corporation.(Hill, Keith) Modified on 1/17/2014 (drb).
January 16, 2014 Filing 208 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certainteed Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 16, 2014 Filing 207 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Devenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-claims against All Defendants by Certainteed Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
January 15, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Buffalo Air Handling. (See Doc. #201 for complete PDF document.) Entry docketed to correct parties on docket. (bkl)
January 15, 2014 Filing 206 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carboline Company. (Hill, Keith)
January 15, 2014 Filing 205 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Carboline Company by Carboline Company.(Hill, Keith)
January 15, 2014 Filing 204 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 15, 2014 Filing 203 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
January 15, 2014 Filing 202 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc). (Hill, Keith)
January 15, 2014 Filing 201 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Buffalo Air Handling.(Hill, Keith) Modified on 7/11/2014 (bkl).
January 15, 2014 Filing 200 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bonney Forge Corporation. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 199 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kvaerner U.S., Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 198 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navistar International. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation (Jones, Kirra)
January 15, 2014 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Navistar International (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Navistar International (Jones, Kirra)
January 15, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
January 15, 2014 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 191 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
January 10, 2014 Filing 188 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
January 10, 2014 Filing 185 Hyster Company, N/K/A NACCO Materials Handling Group, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Any and All Cross Claims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution against All Defendants by Hyster Company.(Ruzicka, Derek)
January 10, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #143 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Zurn Industries, LLC, #146 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Weil McLain, #152 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Joy Technologies, Inc., #158 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Hyster Company, #161 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, #167 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Flowserve U.S., Inc, #171 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dravo Corporation, #180 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Aurora Pump Company, #183 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by BW/IP, Inc.. See attached document for specifics. (cjo, )
January 8, 2014 Filing 183 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate, Flowserve Corporation, by BW/IP, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/10/2014 (cjo ).
January 8, 2014 Filing 182 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by BW/IP, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of BW/IP, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 180 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate, Pentair, by Aurora Pump Company. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/10/2014 (cjo ).
January 8, 2014 Filing 179 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Aurora Pump Company.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed(bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 177 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Compudyne Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 176 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Compudyne Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed(bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Compudyne Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 174 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cummins, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 173 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Cummins, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Cummins, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 171 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent, Carmeuse Lime, Inc., by Dravo Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/10/2014 (cjo ).
January 8, 2014 Filing 170 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Dravo Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed(bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Dravo Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Dravo Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 167 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent, Flowserve Corporation, by Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/10/2014 (cjo ).
January 8, 2014 Filing 166 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Flowserve U.S., Inc.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed(bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 164 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 163 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Flowserve Corporation(as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation).(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 161 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate, Foster Wheeler LLC, by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/10/2014 (cjo ).
January 8, 2014 Filing 160 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 158 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc. and identifying Corporate Parent NACCO Materials Handling Group Inc. for Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company. (Ruzicka, Derek) Modified on 1/10/2014 (cjo ).
January 8, 2014 Filing 157 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 156 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed(bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 155 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greene Tweed & Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 154 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Greene Tweed & Company.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Greene Tweed & Company (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 152 Corporate Disclosure Statement indentifying Corporate Parent, Joy Global Inc., by Joy Technologies, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/10/2014 (cjo ).
January 8, 2014 Filing 151 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Joy Technologies, Inc.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed(bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 149 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RIC-WIL, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 148 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by RIC-WIL, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of RIC-WIL, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 146 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate, The Marley-Wylain Company, by Weil McLain. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/10/2014 (cjo ).
January 8, 2014 Filing 145 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Weil McLain.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Weil McLain (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 143 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent, Rexnord-Zurn Holdings, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/10/2014 (cjo).
January 8, 2014 Filing 142 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 140 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Young Group, Ltd.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 139 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Young Group, Ltd.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed(bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Young Group, Ltd. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 137 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 136 MOTION to Dismiss Counts V and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint by Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 135 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 7, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Crane Company (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 7, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Crane Company (Jones, Kirra)
January 6, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #128 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Company, #129 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Company. Attorrneys Jones and Hardee did not link to all parties in case they represent. Per telephone call with Attorney Hardee, documents stricken and attorneys to refile Notices of Appearance and link to all parties represented. (jaj),THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 3, 2014 Filing 130 Crane Co's ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS OF ANY OTHER DEFENDANT, CROSSCLAIM CROSS-CLAIMS FOR CONTRIBUTION OR INDEMNITY against All Defendants by Crane Company.(Hardee, Kathleen)
January 3, 2014 Filing 129 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Crane Company (Hardee, Kathleen) Modified on 1/6/2014 (jaj).
January 3, 2014 Filing 128 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Crane Company (Jones, Kirra) Modified on 1/6/2014 (jaj ).
December 31, 2013 Filing 127 ANSWER to #63 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #88 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #74 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #64 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #68 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #63 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #88 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #74 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #64 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #68 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #63 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #88 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #74 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #64 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #68 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #63 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #88 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #74 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #64 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #68 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #63 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #88 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #74 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #64 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #68 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #63 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #88 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #74 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #64 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #68 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #63 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #88 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #74 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #64 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #68 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #63 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #88 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #74 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #64 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #68 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #63 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #88 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #94 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #74 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #64 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #68 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against AERCO International, Inc., AO Smith Corporation, API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquisitions, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East Inc, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Bonney Forge Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carboline Company, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Clow Corporation, Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Custom-Aire, Inc., Cytec Industries, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dewitt Products Co., Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, Eaton Corporation, FMC Corporation, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve Corporation(as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve U.S., Inc, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grimes Aerospace Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Harper International Corp., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc,, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automations, Inc., Rogers Corporation, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co, Seco Warwick Corporation, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Co., Terlins Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, The Fairbanks Company, The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The Nash Engineering Company, The Sherwin Williams Company, The WM Powell Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC., Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by ITT Corporation.(Rogers, Jeffrey)
December 26, 2013 Filing 126 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #123 Expert Witness Designation filed by Cleaver-Brooks. See attached document for specifics (msd)
December 23, 2013 Filing 125 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver-Brooks identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver-Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hudgens, Meredith)
December 23, 2013 Filing 124 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver-Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.)(Hudgens, Meredith)
December 23, 2013 Filing 123 STRICKEN PER ENTRY AT DOC 126 - Expert Witness Designation Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Cleaver-Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hudgens, Meredith)
December 23, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith S Hudgens on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hudgens, Meredith)
December 23, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Lang on behalf of Hyster Company (Lang, Christopher)
December 23, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ruzicka on behalf of Hyster Company (Ruzicka, Derek)
December 23, 2013 Filing 119 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #117 Notice of Appearance filed by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. The case number listed on the Notice of Appearance is incorrect. All future pleadings must list the correct case number of 13-1220-SCW-PMF. No further action required by efiler at this time. (jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 20, 2013 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Carl Randol on behalf of Crane Company (Randol, Brett)
December 20, 2013 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Michelle Romani on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romani, Allyson)
December 20, 2013 Filing 116 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC. (Offergeld, Leslie)
December 20, 2013 Filing 115 MOTION to Remand by Ralph Lewis Fulwider. Responses due by 1/24/2014 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Allyson Romani, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 31)(Romani, Allyson)
December 19, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #95 Motion for Disclosure filed by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC. Document is not a Motion and should have been filed as a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerk's Office has corrected the entry. No further action is required. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 18, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Riley Stoker Corporation (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Lennox Industries, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Lattner Boiler Company (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Certainteed Corporation (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Carboline Company (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Bechtel Corporation (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Bechtel Construction Company (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc), Buffalo Air Handling (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Seco Warwick Corporation(as succesor-In-interest to Sunbeam Furnaces) (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of All Acquisitions, LLC (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of The Fairbanks Company (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 95 Disclosure Statement by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC. (Offergeld, Leslie) Modified on 12/19/2013 (cds, ).
December 16, 2013 Filing 94 Tuthill Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross Claims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Tuthill Corporation.(Smith, Gary)
December 16, 2013 Filing 93 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #66 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Tuthill Corporation. Filer selected their own party as cross defendant instead of all cross defendants they wish to bring suit against. Filer should refile same correctly selecting all parties they wish to file the cross claim against.(lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 16, 2013 Filing 92 Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC.(Offergeld, Leslie)
December 16, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie G. Offergeld on behalf of Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC (Offergeld, Leslie)
December 16, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J. Dahlmann on behalf of Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC (Dahlmann, Donald)
December 13, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Invensys Systems, Inc. (Hatch, Mary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 88 Invensys Systems, Inc. f/k/a The Foxboro Company ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross Claims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Invensys Systems, Inc..(Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Invensys Systems, Inc. (Smith, Gary)
December 12, 2013 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Ward on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec., Inc. (Ward, Donald)
December 12, 2013 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tuthill Corporation. (Ward, Donald)
December 12, 2013 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Ward on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Ward, Donald)