Mohler v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Elaine Mohler
Defendant: Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Welco Manufacturing Company, Murco Wall Products, Inc., Trane US, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Oakfabco, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Daniel International Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Rust International, Inc., The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Mueller Steam Speciality incorrectly sued as Watts Water Technologies, Inc., for its Mueller Steam Specialty division, BP Corporation North America, Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Honeywell International, Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company, Copes-Vulcan, Chevron USA, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Crane Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., John Crane, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Atlantic Richfield Company, Bird Incorporated, Cleaver-Brooks, KCG, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc., Fluor Corporation, Allied Manufacturing, Inc., Sunoco, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Gould's Pumps, Inc., J.H. France Refractories Company, Shell Oil Company, CBS Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP, Bechtel Construction Company, Eaton Corporation, Zurn Industries, LLC, Boise Cascade, LLC, Weil McLain, Lennox Industries, Inc., Bell & Gossett Deomestic Pump, URS Energy & Construction, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, General Electric Company, York International Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Burnham, LLC, Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Dap, Inc., Owens-Illinois Inc., Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Bechtel Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Meadwestvaco Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc, The WM. Powell Company, Research Cottrell, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Simpson Timber Company, A.O. Smith Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., The Fairbanks Company, FMC Corporation, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Rogers Corporation, Exxonmobil Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, BP Products North America, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, American Standard, Inc. and Cleaver-Brooks, a division of Aqua-Chem, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01221
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2015 Filing 771 Signed Letter from Madison County Circuit Clerk, acknolwedging remand of case to state court. (anm)
April 3, 2015 Filing 770 Letter to Circuit Clerk, Madison County regarding remand of civil case. (anm)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER OF REMAND: Case remanded to Madison County, Illinois. Granting #737 MOTION to Remand Renewed filed by Elaine Mohler. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/2/15. (ajr)
March 27, 2015 Filing 768 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/6/2015 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Plaintiff to set up the conference call. Plaintiff to file a notice indicating call in information prior to the call. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 27, 2015 Filing 767 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/27/2015. Attorneys Romani, Vantine, Maschhoff, Kent A. Plotner, Amanda Wienberger, Ben Ford, Applegate, Meyer, Hardee, Fergus, Michael Daniels, Titzer, Oliver, and Wilson, for their respective clients. Any attorney who has not entered an appearance shall do so by April 1, 2015. Plaintiff indicates that only 14 Defendants remain pending in this suit and that no objection to the motion to remand has been filed. Plaintiff SHALL file motions to dismiss as to any Defendant who is active in this suit but whom the Plaintiff no longer is pursing claims against, i.e. Metropolitan Life and Trane US, by April 3, 2015. This matter will be set for a status conference by separate docket entry. (Court Reporter n/a.) (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 26, 2015 Filing 766 NOTICE by Elaine Mohler (Romani, Allyson)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER GRANTING #741 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Witndrawal and Designation of Counsel for Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Attorney Keith B. Hill terminated as to Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 3/26/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 756 & 757) and DISMISSES defendants Simpson Timber Company and CBS Corporation. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/19/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 760 & 761) and DISMISSES defendants KCG, Inc. and Conwed Corporation. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/19/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER. Any party objecting to Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 760 & 761) defendants KCG, Inc. and Conwed Corporation shall file a response on or before March 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/16/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 13, 2015 Filing 761 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Conwed Corporation. Responses due by 4/16/2015 (Graber, Dennis)
March 13, 2015 Filing 760 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by KCG, Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2015 (Telthorst, James)
March 13, 2015 Filing 759 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #757 Motion to Dismiss filed by Elaine Mohler, #756 Motion to Dismiss filed by Elaine Mohler. See attached document for specifics (slh)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER. Any party objecting to Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 756 & 757) defendants Simpson Timber Company and CBS Corporation shall file a response on or before March 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/13/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 12, 2015 Filing 757 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant CBS Corporation by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 4/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 12, 2015 Filing 756 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Simpson Timber Company by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 4/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 11, 2015 Filing 755 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference RESET to 3/26/2015 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. The Court assumes that the previously provided call in information will be used: Dial-In Number: 712-775-7031; Meeting ID: 454-553-297 (followed by the # key)(sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #753 ) defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. Any party objecting to the Motion shall file a response on or before March 11, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/9/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 6, 2015 Filing 753 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #495 , #498 & #500 ) are DENIED as there is no Count IX or separately-pleaded Loss of Consortium claim in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/6/15. (ajr)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #742 ) and DISMISSES defendant Kelly Moore Paint Company, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/4/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER. The Court hereby GRANTS defendant Georgia-Pacific Corporation's Motion to Withdraw its Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Doc. #745 ). As such, the Court DENIES as moot Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (Doc. #740 ) to the Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/4/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #738 ) and DISMISSES Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/4/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff and defendant Trane U.S., Inc.s Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #747 ). Any party objecting to the Motion shall file a response on or before March 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/3/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 2, 2015 Filing 747 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Trane US, Inc.. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Wilson, Benjamin)
March 2, 2015 Filing 746 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #744 Motion to Withdraw filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Filer selected the incorrect party. Docket entry STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. Document has been re-filed at document 745. No further action required by the filer as to this document.(tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 27, 2015 Filing 745 Motion to Withdraw/NOTICE by Georgia-Pacific Corporation re #688 MOTION to Transfer Case to withdrawal of motion to transfer (Geraci, Carl) Modified on 3/2/2015 (tkm ).
February 27, 2015 Filing 744 ENTRY STRICKEN - Motion to Withdraw/NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation re #688 MOTION to Transfer Case to withdrawal of motion to transfer (Geraci, Carl) Modified on 3/2/2015 (tkm ).
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss defendant Kelly Moore Paint Company, Inc. (Doc. #742 ). Any party objecting to the Motion shall file a response on or before March 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/26/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 25, 2015 Filing 742 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kelly Moore Paint Company, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 741 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Witndrawal and Designation of Counsel for Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
February 20, 2015 Filing 740 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Georgia Pacific's Motion to Transfer by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 739 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on the Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #738 ) Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. Any party objecting to the motion shall file a response on or before February 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/20/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 19, 2015 Filing 738 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(f/k/a Square D). Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Hardee, Kathleen)
February 19, 2015 Filing 737 MOTION to Remand Renewed by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER. Having received no objection to Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 693 - 701, 703-726) the Court hereby GRANTS the Motions. The Court orders that the following Defendants are dismissed from this case: Armstrong International, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, Bird Incorporated, BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., Burnham, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP, Chevron USA, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Crane Co., Electrolux Homes Products, The Fairbanks Co., FMC Corporation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Grinnell, LLC, Ingersoll Rand Company, ITT Corporation, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., McNally Industries, Inc., Oakfabco, Inc., Pecora Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Sunoco, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, and Wm. Powell Company. The Court further DENIES as moot The Fairbanks Company's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #496 ), ConocoPhillips Company's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #497 ), Lennox Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #499 ), and Chevron USA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #563 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/19/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 18, 2015 Filing 735 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Meyer, Julie)
February 18, 2015 Filing 734 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Fournie, Raymond)
February 18, 2015 Filing 733 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (King, Melanie)
February 18, 2015 Filing 732 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Kidd, Anita)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. This matter comes before the Court on Defendant Georgia-Pacific Corporation's Motion to Transfer Case (Doc. #688 ). Plaintiff's response was due on or before February 12, 2015. To date, Plaintiff has failed to file a response. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE on or before February 23, 2015, why the Court should not construe Plaintiff's failure to timely respond as an admission of the merits of the motion and transfer this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/17/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER GRANTING #689 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Records filed by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company. Attorney Justin Andrew Welply terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 2/17/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER. Having received no objection to Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Doc. #690 & #691 ), the Court hereby GRANTS the Motions (Docs. #690 & #691 ) and DISMISSES Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation and AO Smith from this case without prejudice. The Court further DENIES as moot Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #494 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/17/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 10, 2015 Filing 728 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #713 , #698 , #697 , #695 , #704 , #711 , #710 , #723 , #719 , #701 , #693 , #706 , #721 , #722 , #712 , #708 , #717 , #725 , #703 , #716 , #724 , #720 , #718 , #700 , #699 , #714 , #705 , #709 , #696 , #726 , #715 , #694 , #707 Motions to Dismiss filed by Elaine Mohler. Proposed Order e-filed with document when it should be emailed. Please refer to Section 2.0: pages 2.6 & 2.7 of the User's Manual. Proposed Orders are to be emailed to the appropriate Judge by attorney. (anm)
February 10, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Objections re motions to dismiss due by 2/17/2015, as Court is closed on 2/16/2015, pursuant to Order at Doc. 272. (anm)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 727 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs.693 701, 703-726) Defendants Armstrong International, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, Bird Incorporated, BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., Burnham, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP, Chevron USA, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Crane Co., Electrolux Homes Products, The Fairbanks Co., FMC Corporation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Grinnell, LLC, Ingersoll Rand Company, ITT Corporation, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., McNally Industries, Inc., Oakfabco, Inc., Pecora Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Sunoco, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, and Wm Powell Company. Any party objecting to the motions shall file a response on or before February 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/10/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 9, 2015 Filing 726 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Wm Powell Company by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 725 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 724 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Watts Water Technologies, Inc. for its Mueller Steam Specialty Division by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 723 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Velan Valve Corp. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 722 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Texaco, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 721 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 720 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 719 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 718 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Pecora Corporation by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 717 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Oakfabco, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 716 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant McNally Industries, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 715 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lennox Industries, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 714 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 713 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ITT Corporation by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 712 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ingersoll Rand Company by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 711 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Grinnell, LLC by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 710 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 709 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 708 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant FMC Corporation by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 707 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The Fairbanks Co. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 706 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Electrolux Homes Products successor to Copes-Vulcan by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 705 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Crane Co. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 704 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ConocoPhillips Company by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 703 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 702 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #690 Motion to Dismiss filed by Elaine Mohler, #691 Motion to Dismiss filed by Elaine Mohler. Proposed order e-filed with document when it should be e-mailed. Please refer to Section 2.0: pages 2.6 & 2.7 of the User's Manual. Proposed Orders are to be e-mailed to the appropriate Judge by attorney. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 9, 2015 Filing 701 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 700 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 699 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Burnham, LLC by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 698 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant BP Products North America, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 697 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant BP Corporation North America, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 696 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant BP Amoco Chemical Company by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 695 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Bird Incorporated by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 694 MOTION to Dismiss Atlantic Richfield Company by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Filing 693 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 690 & 691) Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation and AO Smith. Any party objecting to the motions shall file a response on or before February 11, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/9/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 6, 2015 Filing 691 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant AO Smith by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/12/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 6, 2015 Filing 690 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 3/12/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 4, 2015 Filing 689 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Records by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company. (Welply, Justin)
January 29, 2015 Filing 688 MOTION to Transfer Case by Georgia-Pacific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Geraci, Carl)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER. Having been dismissed from this case, the Court hereby DENIES as moot Defendant Cleaver-Brooks' Motion to Strike (Doc. #570 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/27/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Defendant Exxonmobil Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition (Doc. #483 ). Plaintiff failed to timely respond and this Court entered an Order to Show Cause (Doc. 625 ) ordering Plaintiff to show cause why the Court should not construe Plaintiff's failure to respond as an admission of the merits of the motion. Plaintiff failed to timely respond to the Court's show cause order. As such, the Court GRANTS Defendant Exxonmobil Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #483 ) and DISMISSES Defendant Exxonmobil from this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/13/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 685 ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #682 ), Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. is hereby DISMISSED from this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/13/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER. The Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #680 ) and DISMISSES Defendant Flowserve US Inc. from this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/13/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER. The Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #681 ). Defendants Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Weil-McLain, and Zurn Industries, LLC, are hereby DISMISSED from this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/13/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 12, 2015 Filing 682 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. by Cleaver-Brooks. (Hudgens, Meredith)
December 19, 2014 Filing 681 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Weil McLain, Zurn Industries, LLC. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Bultman, Bradley)
December 16, 2014 Filing 680 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims against Defendant Flowserve US Inc, solely as successor to Rockwell Mfg Co and Edward Vogt Valve Co Only by Flowserve U.S., Inc. Responses due by 1/20/2015 (Welply, Justin)
December 11, 2014 Filing 679 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #678 Notice (Other) filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. Notice of filing/certificate of service related to serving discovery not required by this court. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 10, 2014 Filing 678 ENTRY STRICKEN: NOTICE by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. Certificate of Service of Kaiser Gypsum Company's Objections and Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Cross, William) Modified on 12/11/2014 (lmb).
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER granting #676 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Mary Price Birk on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation on 12/10/2014. (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 9, 2014 Filing 676 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mary Price Birk $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2471380 by on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation. (Birk, Mary)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 675 ORDER GRANTING #673 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin T. Dawson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/2/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 2, 2014 Filing 674 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #663 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #664 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #652 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #647 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #636 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #622 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #650 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #639 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #643 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #658 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #659 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #662 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #637 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #627 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #569 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Cleaver-Brooks, a division of Aqua-Chem, Inc., #642 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #646 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #563 Motion to Dismiss filed by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc., #634 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #656 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #649 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #667 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #562 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc., #669 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #660 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #626 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #624 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #655 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #623 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #648 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #635 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #654 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #630 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #653 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #632 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #665 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #638 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #631 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #640 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #633 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #629 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #628 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #641 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #666 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #645 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #661 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #657 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #668 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #644 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #651 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler. See attached document for specifics (trb)
December 1, 2014 Filing 673 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Gould's Pumps, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (Dawson, Kevin)
December 1, 2014 Filing 672 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth on behalf of Elaine Mohler (Shuttlesworth, Robert)
December 1, 2014 Filing 671 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley D. Peek on behalf of Elaine Mohler (Peek, Bradley)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER granting #621 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bradley D. Peek on behalf of Elaine Mohler.. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 25, 2014 Filing 669 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 668 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Wm Powell Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 667 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 666 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Weil McLain by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 665 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Watts Water Technologies, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 664 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Velan Valve Corp. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 663 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Trane US, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 662 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Texaco, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 661 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 660 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems USA, LLC by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 659 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 658 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Shell Oil Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 657 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Shell Chemical Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 656 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. f/k/a Square D by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 655 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Pecora Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 654 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Oakfabco, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 653 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant McNally Industries, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 652 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Lennox Industries, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 651 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 650 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant ITT Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 649 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 648 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Grinnell, LLC by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 647 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Greene Tweed & Co. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 646 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 645 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 644 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 643 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 642 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant FMC Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 641 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 640 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant The Fairbanks Co. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 639 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 638 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Electrolux Homes Products, Inc. as alleged successor to Copes Vulcan by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 637 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Crane Co. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 636 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant ConocoPhillips Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 635 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Cleaver Brooks, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 634 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 633 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 632 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 631 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Burnham, LLC by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 630 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant BP Products North America, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 629 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant BP Corporation North America, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 628 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant BP Amoco Chemical Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 627 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Bird Incorporated by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 626 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Atlantic Richfield Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. This matter comes before the Court on Defendant Exxonmobil Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #483 ). Plaintiff Elaine Mohler has failed to timely respond. The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE on or before December 12, 2014, why the Court should not construe her failure to file a response as an admission of the merits of the motion. Show Cause Response due by 12/12/2014. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/25/14. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 25, 2014 Filing 624 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 623 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant A O Smith Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 622 ENTRY STRICKEN: STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Filing 621 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bradley D. Peek $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2459353 by on behalf of Elaine Mohler. (Peek, Bradley)
November 25, 2014 Filing 620 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #619 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Elaine Mohler. Efiler did not pay the $100 filing fee when filing the Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Efiler is instructed to refile the Motion and pay the filing fee electronically.(jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 24, 2014 Filing 619 SRICKEN-MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bradley D. Peek by on behalf of Elaine Mohler. (Peek, Bradley) Modified on 11/25/2014 (jlrr ).
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER Granting #617 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth on behalf of Plaintiff Mohler.(mar) Modified on 11/24/2014 (jaj).
November 20, 2014 Filing 617 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth by on behalf of Elaine Mohler. (Shuttlesworth, Robert)
November 19, 2014 Filing 616 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Brodzik on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Gould's Pumps, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Brodzik, James)
November 19, 2014 Filing 615 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #613 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Elaine Mohler, #614 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Elaine Mohler. Filer and s/ signature do not match. Filer should file same using their own login and password. Since these pro hac motions have been paid, filer should refile motions using their own login and password and bypassing the payment screens. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 18, 2014 Filing 614 ENTRY STRICKEN: MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth by Attorney Allyson Michelle Romani $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2452570 by on behalf of Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 11/19/2014 (lmb).
November 18, 2014 Filing 613 ENTRY STRICKEN: MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bradley Dillon Peek by Attorney Allyson Michelle Romani $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2452554 by on behalf of Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 11/19/2014 (lmb).
October 20, 2014 Filing 612 RESPONSE in Opposition re #563 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
October 14, 2014 Filing 611 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #610 Notice (Other) filed by Welco Manufacturing Company, #609 Notice (Other) filed by Certainteed Corporation, #605 Notice (Other) filed by A.O. Smith Corporation. Notices of service regarding discovery documents shall not be filed with the court. Please see Rule 26.1(b). (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 13, 2014 Filing 610 ENTRY STRICKEN: NOTICE by Welco Manufacturing Company of Certificate of Service of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories (Maschhoff, James)
October 13, 2014 Filing 609 ENTRY STRICKEN:NOTICE by Certainteed Corporation Certificate of Service regarding serving Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production to CertainTeed Corporation (Hill, Keith)
October 13, 2014 Filing 608 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Mueller Steam Speciality incorrectly sued as Watts Water Technologies, Inc., for its Mueller Steam Specialty division (Telthorst, James)
October 13, 2014 Filing 607 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of KCG, Inc. (Telthorst, James)
October 13, 2014 Filing 606 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Pecora Corporation (Telthorst, James)
October 9, 2014 Filing 605 ENTRY STRICKEN:NOTICE by A.O. Smith Corporation of Objections to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Picou, Curtis)
October 9, 2014 Filing 604 RESPONSE in Opposition re #499 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
October 9, 2014 Filing 603 RESPONSE in Opposition re #498 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
October 9, 2014 Filing 602 RESPONSE in Opposition re #496 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
October 9, 2014 Filing 601 RESPONSE in Opposition re #497 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
October 9, 2014 Filing 600 RESPONSE in Opposition re #495 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
October 9, 2014 Filing 599 RESPONSE in Opposition re #494 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
October 9, 2014 Filing 597 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #595 Notice (Other) filed by Greene Tweed & Company. See attached document for specifics (msd)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER GRANTING #562 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Chevron USA, Inc. and Texaco, Inc. have filed their responsive pleading at Doc. #563 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/9/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 8, 2014 Filing 598 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #591 Notice (Other) filed by Gardner Denver, Inc. Notices of service regarding discovery documents shall not be filed with the court. Please see Rule 26.1(b). (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 8, 2014 Filing 595 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOC 595 - NOTICE by Greene Tweed & Company Certificate of Service to its Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents (Eckerly, Jason)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #587 Motion to Substitute Attorney, #588 Motion to Substitute Attorney, AND #589 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Ms. Kelly and Mr. Page are directed to file (one) Motion for Substitution of Counsel that sets forth each Defendant, by name, for which she seeks to enter an appearance and for which Mr. Page seeks to withdraw his appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/8/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER GRANTING #525 #531 #533 #537 #540 #549 #551 #571 #573 #577 and #579 . The answers/responsive pleadings and notices related to these motions are all deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/8/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER GRANTING #583 Motion for Consolidated Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/8/14. (sgp)
October 7, 2014 Filing 591 NOTICE by Gardner Denver, Inc. Certificate of Service of its Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories; and Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents (Tomal, Stephanie)
October 7, 2014 Filing 590 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M Kelly on behalf of Mueller Steam Speciality incorrectly sued as Watts Water Technologies, Inc., for its Mueller Steam Specialty division (Kelly, Patricia)
October 7, 2014 Filing 589 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by KCG, Inc.(successor by merger to KC Wall Products, Inc. and Ruco Drywall Products, Inc.). (Kelly, Patricia)
October 7, 2014 Filing 588 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Pecora Corporation. (Kelly, Patricia)
October 7, 2014 Filing 587 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Pecora Corporation. (Kelly, Patricia)
October 2, 2014 Filing 586 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Tzall, Madeline)
October 2, 2014 Filing 585 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Tzall, Madeline)
October 2, 2014 Filing 584 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by Dap, Inc..(Tzall, Madeline)
September 29, 2014 Filing 583 Consent MOTION for Discovery Consolidated Written Discovery by Crane Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation. (Geraci, Carl)
September 26, 2014 Filing 582 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by John Crane, Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
September 24, 2014 Filing 581 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff, Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Domco Products Texas, Inc..(Veath, Beth)
September 22, 2014 Filing 580 NOTICE by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc. to Join Defendant's Agreed Order regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Welply, Justin)
September 22, 2014 Filing 579 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion to file instanter its Notice to Join in Def's Agreed Order re Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and affirmative Defs to Crossclaims as filed pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.5(C)(1)(B)by co-def Union Carbide Corp, et all and adopted by the court in its order of August 20, 2014 by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc.. (Welply, Justin)
September 19, 2014 Filing 578 NOTICE by Oakfabco, Inc. to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Ward, John)
September 19, 2014 Filing 577 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Notice to Join In Defandants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross Claims, Answers to Cross Claims, and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Ward, John)
September 19, 2014 Filing 576 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #535 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, filed by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc., #536 Notice (Other) filed by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc. Document attached is regarding Defendant Flowserve US Inc. Filer selected an incorrect party or attached the wrong document. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 18, 2014 Filing 575 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to All Cross-Claims by Shell Oil Company.(Shultz, James)
September 18, 2014 Filing 574 NOTICE of Appearance by James R Shultz on behalf of Shell Oil Company (Shultz, James)
September 17, 2014 Filing 573 MOTION for Joinder of Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Picou, Curtis)
September 17, 2014 Filing 572 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by A.O. Smith Corporation.(Picou, Curtis)
September 17, 2014 Filing 571 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition & To Join Defendant's Motion Concerning Crossclaims by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Picou, Curtis)
September 16, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.(see Doc. [567} for complete PDF document) Filer failed to additionally select "Crossclaim" upon docketing.(lmb)
September 16, 2014 Filing 570 MOTION to Strike #472 Amended Complaint counts II and VII and memorandum in support by Cleaver-Brooks. (Griebel, Erin)
September 16, 2014 Filing 569 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint and answer to all cross claims by Cleaver-Brooks.(Griebel, Erin)
September 16, 2014 Filing 568 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Warchol, Jerome)
September 16, 2014 Filing 567 Defendant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint at Law and Cross-Claims by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
September 16, 2014 Filing 566 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
September 16, 2014 Filing 565 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Greene Tweed & Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
September 16, 2014 Filing 564 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Weil McLain.(Bultman, Bradley)
September 16, 2014 Filing 563 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc.. Responses due by 10/20/2014 (Varney, Robert)
September 16, 2014 Filing 562 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleading by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc.. (Varney, Robert)
September 15, 2014 Filing 561 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by Oakfabco, Inc..(Ward, John)
September 15, 2014 Filing 560 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by Owens-Illinois Inc..(Watson, Brian)
September 15, 2014 Filing 559 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #545 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Allied Manufacturing, Inc. See attached document for specifics (mar)
September 12, 2014 Filing 558 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by CBS Corporation(a Deleware Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp., f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.).(Dauphin, Michael)
September 12, 2014 Filing 557 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ConocoPhillips Company.(Hansell, Erik)
September 12, 2014 Filing 556 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP.(Hansell, Erik)
September 12, 2014 Filing 555 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM Against All Defendants for Contribution against A.O. Smith Corporation, AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Allied Manufacturing, Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boise Cascade, LLC, Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc., Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP, Chevron USA, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, ConocoPhillips Company, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Domco Products Texas, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Exxonmobil Corporation, FMC Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Gould's Pumps, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.H. France Refractories Company, John Crane, Inc., Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Lennox Industries, Inc., McNally Industries, Inc., Meadwestvaco Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Mine Safety Appliances Company, Murco Wall Products, Inc., Oakfabco, Inc., Owens-Illinois Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Pneumo Abex, LLC, RIC-WIL, Inc., Research Cottrell, Inc., Riley Stoker Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Rust International, Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Simpson Timber Company, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Texaco, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, The Fairbanks Company, The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The WM. Powell Company, Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., URS Energy & Construction, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, York International Corporation, Zurn Industries, LLC by ITT Corporation.(Rogers, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Allied Manufacturing, Inc.(See Doc. 545 for complete PDF document) (mar)
September 11, 2014 Filing 554 Schneider Electric USA, Inc.'s ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and its Answer to all Cross-Claims and Counterclaims against All Defendants by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(f/k/a Square D).(Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 553 Honeywell International, Inc.'s ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and its Answer to all Cross-Claims and Counterclaims against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 552 NOTICE by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. re #551 MOTION for Leave to File Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims as Filed by Co-Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, et al. (Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 551 MOTION for Leave to File Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims as Filed by Co-Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, et al. by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 550 NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. re #549 MOTION for Leave to File It's Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims as Filed by Co-Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, et al. (Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 549 MOTION for Leave to File It's Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims as Filed by Co-Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, et al. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 548 Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Petition by The WM. Powell Company.(Newport, Michael)
September 11, 2014 Filing 547 Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Petition by Simpson Timber Company.(Newport, Michael)
September 11, 2014 Filing 546 Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.(f/k/a Atwood & Morrill).(Newport, Michael)
September 11, 2014 Filing 545 ALLIED MANUFACTURING'S ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claim and Answer to all Crross-Claims to #472 Amended Complaint by Allied Manufacturing, Inc. (Vantine, Marcie) Modified on 9/15/2014 (mar).
September 11, 2014 Filing 544 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #467 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice to Join Defendant's Agreed Order (Fournie, Raymond)
September 11, 2014 Filing 543 NOTICE by Bird Incorporated re #467 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Defendant's Agreed Order (Fournie, Raymond)
September 10, 2014 Filing 542 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Grinnell Corporation (Tayyab, Julia)
September 10, 2014 Filing 541 NOTICE by Welco Manufacturing Company Notice to Join Defendant's Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Welply, Justin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 540 MOTION for Joinder Motion to File Instanter its Notice to Join in Def's agreed Order regarding crossclaims, Answers to crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Welco Manufacturing Company. (Welply, Justin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 539 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Zimmerman, Justin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 538 NOTICE by Flowserve U.S., Inc solely as successor to Rockwell and Edward Vogt Valve Co's Notice to Join Def's agreed Order regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Welply, Justin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 537 MOTION for Joinder Motion to File Instanter its Notice to Join in Defendant's Agreed Order regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Welply, Justin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 536 ENTRY STRICKEN: NOTICE by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc. Notice to Join Defendants agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Welply, Justin) Modified on 9/19/2014 (lmb).
September 10, 2014 Filing 535 ENTRY STRICKEN: MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion to File instanter its Notice to Join in Def's Agreed Order regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims as filed Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.5 by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc.. (Welply, Justin) Modified on 9/19/2014 (lmb).
September 10, 2014 Filing 534 Defendant Flowserve US Inc, solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing and Edward Vogt Valve ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint,, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Flowserve U.S., Inc.(Welply, Justin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 533 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Answers to all CrossClaims by Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Welply, Justin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 532 Defendant Welco Manufacturing Company's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint,, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Welco Manufacturing Company.(Welply, Justin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 531 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Answers to all CrossClaims by Welco Manufacturing Company. (Welply, Justin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 530 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #516 Answer to Complaint filed by Copes-Vulcan, #517 Answer to Complaint filed by Spirax Sarco, Inc. See attached document for specifics (tkm )
September 10, 2014 Filing 529 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #528 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc., #527 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, filed by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc.. Per telephone call from Attorney;s Office, incorrect filer chosen when documents were filed. Documents striken and motion terminated. Documents to be refiled with the correct filer this date. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 10, 2014 Filing 528 ENTRY STRICKEN - Defendant Welco Manufacturing Company's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Firs Amended Complaint,Cross-Claims, Answers to all, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc..(Welply, Justin) Modified on 9/10/2014 (jaj ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 527 ENTRY STRICKEN - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Affirmative defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Answers to all CrossClaims by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc.. (Welply, Justin) Modified on 9/10/2014 (jaj).
September 10, 2014 Filing 526 Defendant Borg Warner Morse TEC Inc's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint,, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 525 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Answers to all Cross Claims by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc.. (Welply, Justin)
September 9, 2014 Filing 524 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #497 Motion to Dismiss filed by ConocoPhillips Company. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
September 9, 2014 Filing 523 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #500 Motion to Dismiss filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
September 9, 2014 Filing 522 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
September 9, 2014 Filing 521 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by McNally Industries, Inc..(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
September 9, 2014 Filing 520 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by FMC Corporation.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
September 9, 2014 Filing 519 Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc's ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc..(Cross, William)
September 9, 2014 Filing 518 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. re #467 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Joley, Charles)
September 9, 2014 Filing 517 ANSWER to re #472 Amended Complaint by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel) Modified on 9/10/2014 (tkm ).
September 9, 2014 Filing 516 ANSWER to re #472 Amended Complaint by Copes-Vulcan.(McGrath, Daniel) Modified on 9/10/2014 (tkm ).
September 8, 2014 Filing 515 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #506 Notice (Other) filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
September 8, 2014 Filing 514 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles)
September 8, 2014 Filing 513 ANSWER to #472 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles)
September 5, 2014 Filing 512 NOTICE by Eaton Corporation to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Connolly, Brian)
September 5, 2014 Filing 511 NOTICE by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. To Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Stevens, Kyler)
September 5, 2014 Filing 510 NOTICE by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Cross, William)
September 5, 2014 Filing 509 NOTICE by Allied Manufacturing, Inc. TO JOIN DEFENDANTS' AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS (Kernell, Thomas)
September 5, 2014 Filing 508 NOTICE by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crosslcaims (Stevens, Kyler)
September 5, 2014 Filing 507 NOTICE by Armstrong International, Inc., CBS Corporation, Simpson Timber Company, The WM. Powell Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crosslcaims (Dauphin, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Filing 506 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 515 - NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. re #467 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Joley, Charles) Modified on 9/9/2014 (anm).
September 5, 2014 Filing 505 NOTICE by Copes-Vulcan, Spirax Sarco, Inc. to Join Defendants Agreed Order regarding Cross Claims, Answers to Cross Claims and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims (Graber, Dennis)
September 5, 2014 Filing 504 Goulds Pumps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Gould's Pumps, Inc..(Graber, Dennis)
September 5, 2014 Filing 503 Burnham LLC.'s ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Burnham, LLC.(Graber, Dennis)
September 5, 2014 Filing 502 NOTICE by Crane Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Wilson, Benjamin)
September 5, 2014 Filing 501 Conwed Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint First Amended, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Conwed Corporation.(Graber, Dennis)
September 5, 2014 Filing 500 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Responses due by 10/9/2014 (Hill, Keith)
September 5, 2014 Filing 499 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Lennox Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 10/9/2014 (Hill, Keith)
September 5, 2014 Filing 498 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Imo Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 10/9/2014 (Hill, Keith)
September 5, 2014 Filing 497 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by ConocoPhillips Company. Responses due by 10/9/2014 (Hill, Keith)
September 5, 2014 Filing 496 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by The Fairbanks Company. Responses due by 10/9/2014 (Hill, Keith)
September 5, 2014 Filing 495 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Certainteed Corporation. Responses due by 10/9/2014 (Hill, Keith)
September 5, 2014 Filing 494 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successory-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.). Responses due by 10/9/2014 (Hill, Keith)
September 5, 2014 Filing 493 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
September 5, 2014 Filing 492 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Lennox Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
September 5, 2014 Filing 491 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Imo Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
September 4, 2014 Filing 490 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by The Fairbanks Company.(Hill, Keith)
September 4, 2014 Filing 489 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by ConocoPhillips Company.(Hill, Keith)
September 4, 2014 Filing 488 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Certainteed Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
September 4, 2014 Filing 487 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successory-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.).(Hill, Keith)
September 4, 2014 Filing 486 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint (first amended) by Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).(Kilpatrick, Joseph)
September 3, 2014 Filing 485 NOTICE by FMC Corporation, McNally Industries, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC re #467 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
September 3, 2014 Filing 484 NOTICE by Exxonmobil Corporation re #467 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Morris, H.)
September 3, 2014 Filing 483 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Petition by Exxonmobil Corporation. Responses due by 10/6/2014 (Morris, H.)
September 3, 2014 Filing 482 NOTICE by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc. Notice to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Varney, Robert)
September 3, 2014 Filing 481 NOTICE by John Crane, Inc. re #467 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, TO JOIN AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSS CLAIMS, ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSS CLAIMS (Fergus, Sean)
September 3, 2014 Filing 480 NOTICE by Gould's Pumps, Inc. Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross-Claims, Answers to Cross-Claims and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims (Dawson, Kevin)
September 3, 2014 Filing 479 NOTICE by Conwed Corporation Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross-Claims, Answers to Cross-Claims and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims (Dawson, Kevin)
September 3, 2014 Filing 478 NOTICE by Burnham, LLC Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross-Claims, Answers to Cross-Claims and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims (Dawson, Kevin)
September 2, 2014 Filing 477 NOTICE by Cleaver-Brooks to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross-Claims, Answers to Cross-Claims, and Affirmative Defenses to Cross-Claims (Griebel, Erin)
September 2, 2014 Filing 476 NOTICE by Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP re #467 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Hansell, Erik)
September 2, 2014 Filing 475 NOTICE by Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) to Join Agreed Order regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Kilpatrick, Joseph)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER RESETTING HEARINGS: In light of the recent case reassignment to Judge Staci M. Yandle, a Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 12/16/2015 at 9:30 AM and Jury Trial will remain SET for 1/11/2016 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/29/2014. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 28, 2014 Filing 473 NOTICE by Domco Products Texas, Inc. Notice to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Veath, Beth)
August 26, 2014 Filing 472 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Petition against All Defendants, filed by Elaine Mohler.(Romani, Allyson)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 163 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings shall bear case number 13-1221-SMY-DGW. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/21/14. (car)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 25, 2014 Filing 470 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Renee Griebel on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks (Griebel, Erin)
August 22, 2014 Filing 469 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 468 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Maschhoff, James)
August 20, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings:Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/18/2015 at 2:00 PM (and not 3/18/14) before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (sgp)
August 20, 2014 GRANTING #438 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleadings, instanter (Unopposed) filed by Exxonmobil Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/20/14. (sgp)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER GRANTING #219 MOTION to have all Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5(C)(1)(B), Alternatively MOTION to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims filed by Union Carbide Corporation, GRANTING #416 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleading filed by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc., MOOTING #418 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc., MOOTING #420 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc., MOOTING #432 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Velan Valve Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, MOOTING #436 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oakfabco, Inc., GRANTING #444 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Elaine Mohler. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/18/2014 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/20/14. (Attachments: #1 Rule 5(c)(1)(B) Stipulation)(sgp)
August 20, 2014 Filing 466 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 19, 2014 Filing 465 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Lively on behalf of Shell Oil Company (Lively, Jonathan)
August 15, 2014 Filing 464 NOTICE by Exxonmobil Corporation Filing Rule 26 Disclosures (Fanning, David)
August 15, 2014 Filing 463 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LLC for Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP. (Hansell, Erik)
August 15, 2014 Filing 462 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips Company identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips Company. (Hansell, Erik)
August 15, 2014 Filing 461 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections bySimpson Timber Company. (Newport, Michael)
August 15, 2014 Filing 460 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Fanning on behalf of Exxonmobil Corporation (Fanning, David)
August 15, 2014 Filing 459 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
August 15, 2014 Filing 458 NOTICE by Elaine Mohler of Filing Relevant Medical, Military & SSPO in Plaintiff's Possession (Romani, Allyson)
August 15, 2014 Filing 457 NOTICE by Elaine Mohler of Filing Rule 26 Disclosures (Romani, Allyson)
August 15, 2014 Filing 456 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Amendment to #233 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Stevens, Kyler)
August 14, 2014 Filing 455 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #451 Notice (Other) filed by Allied Manufacturing, Inc. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
August 13, 2014 Filing 454 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #453 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by General Electric Company, #452 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Bird Incorporated. Documents violate this Court's Local Rule 26.1(b). No discovery materials shall be filed. Docket entries 452 & 453 are STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. No further action required by the filer as to these documents. (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 13, 2014 Filing 453 ENTRY STRICKEN - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 26 by General Electric Company.(Kidd, Anita) Modified on 8/13/2014 (tkm ).
August 13, 2014 Filing 452 ENTRY STRICKEN - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 26 by Bird Incorporated.(Kidd, Anita) Modified on 8/13/2014 (tkm ).
August 13, 2014 Filing 451 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC. 455 - NOTICE by Allied Manufacturing, Inc. of Service of Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures (Kernell, Thomas) Modified on 8/14/2014 (bkl).
August 11, 2014 Filing 450 RESPONSE in Opposition re #436 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
August 7, 2014 Filing 449 RESPONSE in Opposition re #420 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
August 7, 2014 Filing 448 RESPONSE in Opposition re #418 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
August 5, 2014 Filing 447 Transcript of Motion Hearing, a.m. session, held on June 13, 2014, before Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Barbara Kniepmann, Telephone number 618-482-9482. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2014. (bkk, )
July 17, 2014 Filing 446 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc.. (Varney, Robert)
July 17, 2014 Filing 445 RESPONSE in Opposition re #352 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX (LOSS OF CONSORTIUM) as to Defendant DAP, Inc. filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
July 14, 2014 Filing 444 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
July 9, 2014 Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Crane Company (Wilson, Benjamin)
July 8, 2014 Filing 442 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. (Szlanfucht, David)
July 7, 2014 Filing 441 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC identifying Other Affiliate Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) Holding, Inc. for Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 440 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McNally Industries, Inc.. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 439 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 438 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleadings, instanter (Unopposed) by Exxonmobil Corporation. (Morris, H.)
July 7, 2014 Filing 437 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Patrick Morris on behalf of Exxonmobil Corporation (Morris, H.)
July 7, 2014 Filing 436 MOTION to Dismiss by Oakfabco, Inc.. Responses due by 8/11/2014 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Ward, John)
July 7, 2014 Filing 435 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn N. Chenevert on behalf of FMC Corporation, McNally Industries, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC(f/k/a Peerless Pump Co., Inc.) (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 434 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Kelly Moore Paint Company, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
July 7, 2014 Filing 433 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #412 Notice of Appearance. Attorney did not link nor list party he was representing in text of entry. Document correctly re-filed at #414 . No further action required.(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 7, 2014 Filing 432 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation. (Geraci, Carl)
July 7, 2014 Filing 431 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard J. Pikel on behalf of BP Products North America, Inc. (Pikel, Howard)
July 7, 2014 Filing 430 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard J. Pikel on behalf of BP Corporation North America, Inc. (Pikel, Howard)
July 7, 2014 Filing 429 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard J. Pikel on behalf of BP Amoco Chemical Company (Pikel, Howard)
July 6, 2014 Filing 428 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard J. Pikel on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company (Pikel, Howard)
July 6, 2014 Filing 427 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to all Cross-Claims and all Counter-Claims for Contribution and Indemnity ANSWER to Crossclaim by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).(Kilpatrick, Joseph)
July 6, 2014 Filing 426 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).(Kilpatrick, Joseph)
July 6, 2014 Filing 425 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A Kilpatrick on behalf of Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) (Kilpatrick, Joseph)
July 3, 2014 Filing 424 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ConocoPhillips Company.(Zellmer, Mark)
July 3, 2014 Filing 423 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Zellmer on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company (Zellmer, Mark)
July 3, 2014 Filing 422 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP.(Zellmer, Mark)
July 3, 2014 Filing 421 CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims against All Defendants, filed by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc..(Varney, Robert)
July 3, 2014 Filing 420 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc.. Responses due by 8/7/2014 (Varney, Robert)
July 3, 2014 Filing 419 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Zellmer on behalf of Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP (Zellmer, Mark)
July 3, 2014 Filing 418 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc.. Responses due by 8/7/2014 (Varney, Robert)
July 3, 2014 Filing 417 ANSWER to Complaint by Pharmacia Corporation(f/k/a Monsanto Company).(Ault, Jordan)
July 3, 2014 Filing 416 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleading by Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc.. (Varney, Robert)
July 3, 2014 Filing 415 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pharmacia Corporation(f/k/a Monsanto Company). (Ault, Jordan)
July 3, 2014 Filing 414 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Varney on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc., Texaco, Inc. (Varney, Robert)
July 3, 2014 Filing 413 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan T. Ault on behalf of Pharmacia Corporation(f/k/a Monsanto Company) (Ault, Jordan)
July 3, 2014 Filing 412 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance (Varney, Robert) Modified on 7/7/2014 (jaj).
July 2, 2014 Filing 411 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Maassen on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. (Maassen, Stephen)
July 2, 2014 Filing 410 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Szlanfucht on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Szlanfucht, David)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER re Stipulations of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 7/2/14. (sgp)
July 2, 2014 Filing 408 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The WM. Powell Company. (Newport, Michael)
July 2, 2014 Filing 407 Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by The WM. Powell Company.(Newport, Michael)
July 2, 2014 Filing 406 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of The WM. Powell Company (Newport, Michael)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER re #398 Notice (Other) filed by Oakfabco, Inc.: Defendant shall FILE its Motion to Dismiss that was originally filed in state court on November 27, 2013, as a seperate docket entry by July 7, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 7/2/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 1, 2014 Filing 404 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of The WM. Powell Company (Dauphin, Michael)
June 30, 2014 Filing 403 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Casmere on behalf of Owens-Illinois Inc. (Casmere, Edward)
June 30, 2014 Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Fischer on behalf of Owens-Illinois Inc. (Fischer, Matthew)
June 30, 2014 Filing 401 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian O'Connor Watson on behalf of Owens-Illinois Inc. (Watson, Brian)
June 30, 2014 Filing 400 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owens-Illinois Inc.. (Watson, Brian)
June 27, 2014 Filing 399 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Ward, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 398 NOTICE by Oakfabco, Inc. of Filing Motion to Adopt State Court Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Oakfabco's Motion to Adopt State Court Motions)(Ward, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 397 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Ward on behalf of Oakfabco, Inc. (Ward, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 396 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan on behalf of Oakfabco, Inc. (Cowan, Tracy)
June 27, 2014 Filing 395 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Joley, Charles) Modified on 6/30/2014 (jlrr ).
June 23, 2014 Filing 394 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #386 Motion for Discovery filed by Elaine Mohler. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
June 23, 2014 Filing 393 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Bauman on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Gould's Pumps, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Bauman, Mark)
June 23, 2014 Filing 392 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gould's Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Gould's Pumps, Inc.. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 391 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burnham, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Burnham Holdings, Inc. for Burnham, LLC. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 20, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by A.O. Smith Corporation. (See Doc. #389 for complete PDF document.) Entry docketed to correct parties on docket. (bkl)
June 20, 2014 Filing 390 NOTICE by A.O. Smith Corporation of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Picou, Curtis)
June 20, 2014 Filing 389 ANSWER to Complaint ,Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants & Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims by A.O. Smith Corporation.(Picou, Curtis) CROSSCLAIM against all defendants. Modified on 7/17/2014 (bkl).
June 20, 2014 Filing 388 NOTICE re 361 Motion Hearing (Amended Minutes): Also present at the hearing held on June 13, 2014 was attorney Kevin Dawson on behalf of his client(s). (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER MOOTING #20 Motion for More Definite Statement, GRANTING IN PART #87 Motion to Dismiss; #91 Motion to Dismiss; #99 Motion to Dismiss; #103 Motion to Dismiss; #106 Motion to Dismiss; #110 Motion to Dismiss; #149 Motion to Dismiss; #150 Motion to Dismiss; #151 Motion to Dismiss; #169 Motion to Dismiss; #352 Motion to Dismiss; #355 Motion to Dismiss. MOOTING #95 Motion to Dismiss; #114 Motion to Dismiss; #118 Motion to Dismiss. TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #219 Motion. GRANTING #222 Motion for Joinder. Count IX is DISMISSED as noted in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/20/14. (sgp)
June 19, 2014 Filing 386 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 394 - Proposed MOTION for Discovery by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/23/2014 (anm).
June 19, 2014 Filing 385 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles)
June 19, 2014 Filing 384 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles)
June 19, 2014 Filing 383 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Joley on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Joley, Charles)
June 19, 2014 Filing 382 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Zimmerman, Justin)
June 19, 2014 Filing 381 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison K. Sonneveld on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(f/k/a Square D) (Sonneveld, Allison)
June 19, 2014 Filing 380 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(f/k/a Square D) (Jones, Kirra)
June 19, 2014 Filing 379 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(f/k/a Square D) (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 378 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/25/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2015 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2016 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/17/14. (sgp)
June 18, 2014 Filing 377 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(f/k/a Square D) (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 18, 2014 Filing 376 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 375 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole E. Rice on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Gould's Pumps, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Rice, Nicole)
June 17, 2014 Filing 374 STIPULATION of Dismissal The Kraissl Company, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 17, 2014 Filing 373 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rogers Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 17, 2014 Filing 372 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pharmacia Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 17, 2014 Filing 371 STIPULATION of Dismissal J.H. France Refractories Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 17, 2014 Filing 370 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rust International, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 17, 2014 Filing 369 Conwed Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Conwed Corporation.(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 368 Burnham, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Burnham, LLC.(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 367 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #357 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #356 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #360 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #359 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler, #358 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Elaine Mohler. Efiler attached the Proposed Order to the Stipulations of Dismissal. Proposed documents are not to be efiled, but emailed to the appropriate Judge. Efiler is instructed to email the Proposed Order to the appropriate Judge for review and approval. (jlrr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 17, 2014 Filing 366 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conwed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Leucadia, LLC for Conwed Corporation. (Graber, Dennis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 365 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Gould's Pumps, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Copes-Vulcan, Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 363 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Conwed Corporation (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 362 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Burnham, LLC (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 361 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2014 re #20 #87 #91 #95 #99 #103 #106 #110 #114 #118 #149 #150 #151 #169 #219 #222 (Court Reporter Barb Kniepmann.) Attorneys present: Bradley R. Bultman, Michael Dauphin, Sean P. Fergus, Carl J. Geraci, Keith B. Hill, Melanie R. King, Julie Fix Meyer, David J. Page, Allyson Michelle Romani, Gary L. Smith, Allison K. Sonneveld, William B. Starnes, II, Ross S. Titzer, Jerome S. Warchol, Jr., Benjamin J. Wilson. Order on Motions and Scheduling Order to issue. If an attorney was present but does not appear on the above list, he/she should contact chambers by June 18, 2014. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 16, 2014 Filing 360 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rogers Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 359 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pharmacia Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 358 STIPULATION of Dismissal The Kraissl Company, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 357 STIPULATION of Dismissal J.H. France Refractories, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 356 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rust International, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 13, 2014 Filing 355 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX (LOSS OF CONSORTIUM) by Rogers Corporation. Responses due by 7/17/2014 (Tzall, Madeline)
June 13, 2014 Filing 354 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rogers Corporation. (Tzall, Madeline)
June 13, 2014 Filing 353 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, by Rogers Corporation .(Tzall, Madeline) Modified on 7/17/2014 to correctly reflect No Crossclaim alleged. (bkl).
June 13, 2014 Filing 352 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX (LOSS OF CONSORTIUM) by Dap, Inc.. Responses due by 7/17/2014 (Tzall, Madeline)
June 13, 2014 Filing 351 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dap, Inc.. (Tzall, Madeline)
June 13, 2014 Filing 350 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, by Dap, Inc..(Tzall, Madeline) Modified on 7/17/2014 to correctly reflect No Crossclaim alleged (bkl).
June 13, 2014 Filing 349 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Victoria Tzall on behalf of Rogers Corporation (Tzall, Madeline)
June 13, 2014 Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Victoria Tzall on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Tzall, Madeline)
June 13, 2014 Filing 347 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor A. Sondag on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Gould's Pumps, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Sondag, Trevor)
June 13, 2014 Filing 346 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #345 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Allied Manufacturing, Inc. Filer inadvertently selected Allied Manufacturing, Inc., as to whom Crossclaim is filed against. Filer should have chosen against all defendants. Clerk's Office has corrected docket sheet to properly show Crossclaim: Allied Manufacturing, Inc., against all other defendants. Docket text modified to reflect corrections.(mar)
June 12, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Allied Manufacturing, Inc. See Document #345 for complete Crossclaim. (mar)
June 12, 2014 Filing 345 Allied Manufacturing Company's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against all defendants by Allied Manufacturing, Inc.(Vantine, Marcie) Modified on 6/13/2014 (mar).
June 12, 2014 Filing 344 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 343 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 342 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Copes-Vulcan, Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
June 11, 2014 Filing 341 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Crane Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation (Geraci, Carl)
June 11, 2014 Filing 340 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Crane Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation (Wilson, Benjamin)
June 11, 2014 Filing 339 STATUS REPORT on Remaining and Dismissed Defendants by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 338 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #335 Status Report filed by Elaine Mohler, #334 Status Report filed by Elaine Mohler. Documents stricken pursuant to request from chambers. (anm)
June 11, 2014 Filing 337 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 11, 2014 Filing 336 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant URS Energy & Construction, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 335 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO REQUEST FROM CHAMBERS - STATUS REPORT Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/11/2014 (anm).
June 9, 2014 Filing 334 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO REQUEST FROM CHAMBERS - STATUS REPORT Joint Report of the Parties and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/11/2014 (anm)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER DENYING #73 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/9/14. (sgp)
June 9, 2014 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of York International Corporation (Welply, Justin)
June 9, 2014 Filing 331 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Welply, Justin)
June 9, 2014 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc (Welply, Justin)
June 9, 2014 Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
June 6, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Kernell on behalf of Allied Manufacturing, Inc. (Kernell, Thomas)
June 6, 2014 Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcie J. Vantine on behalf of Allied Manufacturing, Inc. (Vantine, Marcie)
June 6, 2014 Filing 326 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied Manufacturing, Inc.. (Kernell, Thomas)
June 6, 2014 Filing 325 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant York International Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 324 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Thermwell Products Co., Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 323 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Riley Stoker Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 322 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Ric Wil, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 321 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Research-Cottrell by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 320 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Meadwestvaco Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 319 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Joy Global Underground Mining, LLC by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 318 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Industrial Holdings Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 317 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Hollingsworth & Vose by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 316 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Fluor Enterprises, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 315 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Fluor Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 314 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant The Dow Chemical Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 313 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Daniel International Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 312 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant BW/IP, Inc. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 311 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Boise Cascade, LLC by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 310 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Bechtel Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 309 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Bechtel Construction Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 308 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant AWC 1997 Corporation by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 307 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Aurora Pump Company by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 306 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Ameron International Corp. by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 305 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gould's Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Gould's Pumps, Inc.. (Graber, Dennis)
June 6, 2014 Filing 304 Goulds Pumps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Gould's Pumps, Inc..(Graber, Dennis)
June 5, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (See Doc. #303 for complete PDF document.) Entry docketed to correct parties on docket.(bkl)
June 5, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (See Doc. #302 for complete PDF document.) Entry docketed to correct parties on docket.(bkl)
June 5, 2014 Filing 303 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Honeywell International, Inc..(Jones, Kirra) CROSSCLAIM against all defendants. Modified on 7/17/2014 (bkl).
June 5, 2014 Filing 302 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(f/k/a Square D).(Jones, Kirra) CROSSCLAIM against all Defendants. Modified on 7/17/2014 (bkl).
June 2, 2014 Filing 301 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #298 Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents. Incorrect document was inadvertently attached. Correct document has been attached and re-filed. (anm)
June 2, 2014 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Thermwell Products Co., Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
June 2, 2014 Filing 299 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel)
June 2, 2014 Filing 298 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #295 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Copes-Vulcan. See attached document for specifics. (anm) (Main Document 298 replaced on 6/2/2014) (anm, ).
May 30, 2014 Filing 297 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Filing 296 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Copes-Vulcan.(McGrath, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Filing 295 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 298 - Corporate Disclosure Statement by Copes-Vulcan. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified on 6/2/2014 (anm).
May 29, 2014 Filing 294 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcie J. Vantine on behalf of Boise Cascade, LLC (Vantine, Marcie)
May 29, 2014 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Ameron International Corporation (Dauphin, Michael)
May 27, 2014 Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Conwed Corporation (Graber, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Burnham, LLC (Graber, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Gould's Pumps, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
May 23, 2014 Filing 289 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Research Cottrell, Inc.. (Page, David)
May 21, 2014 Filing 288 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. McGrath on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 21, 2014 Filing 287 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. McGrath on behalf of Copes-Vulcan (McGrath, Daniel)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING #271 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; GRANTING #272 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; GRANTING #273 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Fluor Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., and Daniel International Corporations, responsive pleading deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/20/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 20, 2014 Filing 285 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference and Hearing on Motion #151 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IX of Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support, #222 MOTION for Joinder In Union Carbide Corp. Motion to Have Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to FRCP 5(c)(1)(B), Alternatively, Motion to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims, #95 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX, #106 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX, #169 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX, #150 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiff's Complaint, #103 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX, #219 MOTION to have all Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5(C)(1)(B), Alternatively MOTION to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims, #99 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX, #114 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX, #149 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiff's Complaint, #73 MOTION to Remand, #118 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX, #87 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX, #110 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX, #20 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #91 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX : Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2014 at 10:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (sgp, )
May 14, 2014 Filing 284 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.(f/k/a Atwood & Morrill) (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Simpson Timber Company (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 282 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 13, 2014 Filing 281 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Starnes, II on behalf of Daniel International Corporation (Starnes, William)
May 13, 2014 Filing 280 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Starnes, II on behalf of Fluor Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Starnes, William)
May 13, 2014 Filing 279 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel International Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 278 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 277 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 276 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Daniel International Corporation.(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 275 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 274 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Corporation.(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 273 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Daniel International Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 272 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 271 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 270 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Skelton on behalf of Daniel International Corporation (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 269 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Skelton on behalf of Fluor Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 8, 2014 Filing 268 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watts Water Technologies, Inc.. (Page, David)
May 7, 2014 Filing 267 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver-Brooks identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings for Cleaver-Brooks. (Hudgens, Meredith)
May 7, 2014 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith S Hudgens on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks (Hudgens, Meredith)
May 7, 2014 Filing 265 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KCG, Inc.. (Page, David)
May 7, 2014 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Watts Water Technologies, Inc. (Page, David)
May 7, 2014 Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of AWC 1997 Corporation (Page, David)
May 7, 2014 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of KCG, Inc. (Page, David)
May 7, 2014 Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Research Cottrell, Inc. (Page, David)
May 7, 2014 Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Pecora Corporation (Page, David)
May 7, 2014 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Bird Incorporated (Meyer, Julie)
May 7, 2014 Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of General Electric Company (Meyer, Julie)
May 5, 2014 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Connolly on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Connolly, Brian)
May 5, 2014 Filing 256 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation. (Applegate, J.)
May 5, 2014 Filing 255 First CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Eaton Corporation.(Applegate, J.)
May 5, 2014 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Todd Applegate on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Applegate, J.)
May 2, 2014 Filing 253 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simpson Timber Company identifying Corporate Parent Simpson Investment Company for Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company, Simpson Timber Company. (Newport, Michael)
April 30, 2014 Filing 252 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims and Answers to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by URS Energy & Construction, Inc..(Burke, Kenneth)
April 30, 2014 Filing 251 Corporate Disclosure Statement by URS Energy & Construction, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent URS Energy & Construction Inc. for URS Energy & Construction, Inc.. (Burke, Kenneth)
April 23, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: J-M Manufacturing's Answer and Affirmative Defense due by 4/25/2014. (jaj)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #234 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses are deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 04/22/2014. (jdp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting #240 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant J-M Manufacturing has until 4/25/2014 to file its Answer and Affirmative Defenses which have not been filed with the Court as indicated in its motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 04/22/2014. (jdp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #243 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant SPX's Answer and Affirmative Defenses are deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 04/22/2014. (jdp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 21, 2014 Filing 247 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, Answers to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Domco Products Texas, Inc.(f/k/a Domco Inc. Floor Products (Texas) f/k/a Azrock Industries, Inc.).(Veath, Beth)
April 18, 2014 Filing 246 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by URS Energy & Construction, Inc.. (Burke, Kenneth)
April 18, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Burke on behalf of URS Energy & Construction, Inc. (Burke, Kenneth)
April 11, 2014 Filing 244 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor in interest to Marley Cooling Tower).(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 243 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor in interest to Marley Cooling Tower). (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 242 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor in interest to Marley Cooling Tower). (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 241 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor in interest to Marley Cooling Tower) (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 240 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Crossclaims, and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 239 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 235 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims; against A.O. Smith Corporation, AWC 1997 Corporation(f/k/a Alpha Wire Coporation), Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successory-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Allied Manufacturing, Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bell & Gossett Deomestic Pump, Bird Incorporated, Boise Cascade, LLC, Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc.(as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corp.), Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation(a Deleware Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp., f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.), Certainteed Corporation, Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP, Chevron USA, Inc.(successor-in-interest to Standar Oil Company), Cleaver-Brooks, ConocoPhillips Company, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Domco Products Texas, Inc.(f/k/a Domco Inc. Floor Products (Texas) f/k/a Azrock Industries, Inc.), Eaton Corporation(individually and as successor-in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.), Exxonmobil Corporation, FMC Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc(as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Co., and Edward Vogt Valve Co.), Fluor Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Gould's Pumps, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, Inc., ITT Corporation, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation(f/k/a Carborundum Company), Ingersoll-Rand Company, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.H. France Refractories Company, John Crane, Inc., Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc.(successor by merger to KC Wall Products, Inc. and Ruco Drywall Products, Inc.), Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Lennox Industries, Inc., McNally Industries, Inc., Meadwestvaco Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Mine Safety Appliances Company, Murco Wall Products, Inc., Oakfabco, Inc., Owens-Illinois Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation(f/k/a Monsanto Company), Pneumo Abex, LLC, RIC-WIL, Inc., Research Cottrell, Inc., Riley Stoker Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Rust International, Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor in interest to Marley Cooling Tower), Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(f/k/a Square D), Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Simpson Timber Company, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC(f/k/a Peerless Pump Co., Inc.), Sunoco, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, The Fairbanks Company, The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The WM. Powell Company, Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., URS Energy & Construction, Inc.(Individually and as successor in interest to Catalytic, Inc.), Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Watts Water Technologies, Inc.(for its Mueller Steam Specialty division), Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.(f/k/a Atwood & Morrill), Welco Manufacturing Company, York International Corporation, Zurn Industries, LLC by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 234 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 233 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Stevens, Kyler)
April 10, 2014 Filing 231 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Domco Products Texas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tarkett Enterprises Inc. for Domco Products Texas, Inc.. (Veath, Beth)
April 10, 2014 Filing 230 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Domco Products Texas, Inc.. (Veath, Beth)
April 10, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Kamp Veath on behalf of Domco Products Texas, Inc. (Veath, Beth)
April 9, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Armstrong International, Inc. (See Doc. #227 for complete PDF docuemnt). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket.(bkl)
April 9, 2014 Filing 228 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Storm, Carla)
April 9, 2014 Filing 227 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to CrossClaims against All Defendants by Armstrong International, Inc.(Storm, Carla) Modified on 5/28/2014 (bkl).
April 9, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla C. Storm on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Storm, Carla)
April 7, 2014 Filing 225 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex, LLC. (Titzer, Ross)
April 7, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross S. Titzer on behalf of Pneumo Abex, LLC (Titzer, Ross)
March 28, 2014 Filing 223 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Weir Group PLC, a United Kingdom public company for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (Newport, Michael)
March 28, 2014 Filing 222 MOTION for Joinder In Union Carbide Corp. Motion to Have Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to FRCP 5(c)(1)(B), Alternatively, Motion to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims by CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
March 28, 2014 Filing 221 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bird Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Certainteed Corporation, Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain for Bird Incorporated. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 28, 2014 Filing 220 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 25, 2014 Filing 219 MOTION to have all Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5(C)(1)(B), Alternatively, MOTION to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims by Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2014 Filing 218 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation(a Deleware Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp., f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.). (Donahue, Daniel)
March 25, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Donahue on behalf of CBS Corporation(a Deleware Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp., f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.) (Donahue, Daniel)
March 25, 2014 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of CBS Corporation (Dauphin, Michael)
March 13, 2014 Filing 215 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Ameron International Corporation.(Denk, Lawrence)
March 13, 2014 Filing 214 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ameron International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Grant Prideco, Inc. for Ameron International Corporation. (Denk, Lawrence)
March 13, 2014 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Denk on behalf of Ameron International Corporation (Denk, Lawrence)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #211 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael F. Daniels terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 03/13/2014. (jdp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 3, 2014 Filing 211 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company, Imo Industries, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, The Fairbanks Company. (Daniels, Michael)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #203 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brett Carl Randol; Allison K. Sonneveld; Kathleen Ann Hardee and Kirra N. Jones terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 02/25/2014. (jdp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 25, 2014 Filing 209 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Thermwell Products Co., Inc..(Bunnell, Nicholas)
February 25, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas B Bunnell on behalf of Thermwell Products Co., Inc. (Bunnell, Nicholas)
February 13, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #189 Response filed by Elaine Mohler. Filer selected an incorrect event and should have selected either Response to Motion or Response in Opposition to Motion. By doing so, filer could have linked to the motion they were responding to. Filer should refile document using the correct event.(lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 11, 2014 Filing 206 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successory-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.). (Hill, Keith)
February 11, 2014 Filing 205 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successory-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.).(Hill, Keith)
February 11, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successory-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.) (Hill, Keith)
February 11, 2014 Filing 203 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Crane Company. (Jones, Kirra)
February 10, 2014 Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 199 RESPONSE in Opposition re #169 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 198 RESPONSE in Opposition re #95 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 197 RESPONSE in Opposition re #99 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition re #151 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IX of Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 195 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 194 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #110 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 192 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 191 RESPONSE in Opposition re #114 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 190 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 189 ENTRY STRICKEN: RESPONSE Response in Opposition (Subject to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) to Defendants Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Elaine Mohler. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 2/13/2014 (lmb).
February 7, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #184 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Company. See attached document for specifics (kek)
February 7, 2014 Filing 187 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imo Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent Imo Holdings, Inc., and Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Imo Industries, Inc.,(Daniels, Michael)
February 7, 2014 Filing 186 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips Company. (Daniels, Michael)
February 7, 2014 Filing 185 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Fairbanks Company. (Daniels, Michael)
February 6, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Noel L. Smith, Jr on behalf of Crane Company (Smith, Noel)
January 30, 2014 Filing 183 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, And Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Newport, Michael)
January 30, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Newport, Michael)
January 30, 2014 Filing 181 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Simpson Timber Company.(Newport, Michael)
January 30, 2014 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Simpson Timber Company (Newport, Michael)
January 28, 2014 Filing 179 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Picou, Curtis)
January 28, 2014 Filing 178 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #176 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Murco Wall Products, Inc.. See attached document for specifics (trb)
January 28, 2014 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Odom, II on behalf of Murco Wall Products, Inc. (Odom, Gregory)
January 27, 2014 Filing 176 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Murco Wall Products, Inc.. (Odom, Gregory)
January 27, 2014 Filing 175 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Union Carbide Corporation for Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2014 Filing 173 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Dow Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for The Dow Chemical Company. (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2014 Filing 171 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION to Remand filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hardee, Kathleen)
January 23, 2014 Filing 170 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 23, 2014 Filing 169 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX by Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company. Responses due by 2/27/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 23, 2014 Filing 168 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 23, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company (Bultman, Bradley)
January 21, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis R. Picou on behalf of A.O. Smith Corporation (Picou, Curtis)
January 17, 2014 Filing 165 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hollingsworth & Vose Company. (Chessler, Michael)
January 15, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Riley Stoker Corporation. (See Doc. #163 for complete PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket. (bkl)
January 15, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (See Doc. #161 for complete PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket.(bkl)
January 15, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Lennox Industries, Inc. (See Doc. #159 for complete PDF document) Entry docketed to correct parties on docket.(bkl)
January 15, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Certainteed Corporation. (See Doc. #157 for complete PDF document.) Entry docketed to correct parties on docket. (bkl)
January 15, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation. (See Doc. #155 for complete PDF document) Entry docketed to correct parties on docket.(bkl)
January 15, 2014 Filing 164 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Stoker Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 15, 2014 Filing 163 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Riley Stoker Corporation.(Hill, Keith) Modified on 5/28/2014 (bkl).
January 15, 2014 Filing 162 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 15, 2014 Filing 161 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Hill, Keith) Modified on 5/28/2014 (bkl).
January 15, 2014 Filing 160 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lennox Industries, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
January 15, 2014 Filing 159 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lennox Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith) Modified on 5/28/2014 (bkl).
January 15, 2014 Filing 158 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certainteed Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 15, 2014 Filing 157 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Certainteed Corporation.(Hill, Keith) Modified on 5/28/2014 (bkl).
January 15, 2014 Filing 156 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 15, 2014 Filing 155 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation.(Hill, Keith) Modified on 5/28/2014 (bkl).
January 15, 2014 Filing 154 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, Counter Claims, Answers to Counter Claims by ConocoPhillips Company.(Daniels, Michael)
January 15, 2014 Filing 153 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Cross Claim Against All Defendants by Imo Industries, Inc..(Daniels, Michael)
January 15, 2014 Filing 152 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Cross-Claim Against All Defendants by The Fairbanks Company.(Daniels, Michael)
January 15, 2014 Filing 151 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IX of Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Imo Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 2/18/2014 (Daniels, Michael)
January 15, 2014 Filing 150 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiff's Complaint by The Fairbanks Company. Responses due by 2/18/2014 (Daniels, Michael)
January 15, 2014 Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of Plaintiff's Complaint by ConocoPhillips Company. Responses due by 2/18/2014 (Daniels, Michael)
January 13, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #143 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Riley Stoker Corporation, #136 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Certainteed Corporation, #138 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Lennox Industries, Inc., #140 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation, #134 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Construction Company. See attached document for specifics (jaj)
January 12, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(f/k/a Square D) (Jones, Kirra)
January 12, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
January 10, 2014 Filing 145 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Stoker Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 10, 2014 Filing 144 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 143 ENTRY STRICKEN - ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Riley Stoker Corporation by Riley Stoker Corporation.(Hill, Keith) Modified on 1/13/2014 (jaj, ).
January 10, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 141 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 10, 2014 Filing 140 ENTRY STRICKEN - ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Parker-Hannifin Corporation by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Hill, Keith) Modified on 1/13/2014 (jaj, ).
January 10, 2014 Filing 139 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lennox Industries, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
January 10, 2014 Filing 138 ENTRY STRICKEN - ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Lennox Industries, Inc. by Lennox Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith) Modified on 1/13/2014 (jaj, ).
January 10, 2014 Filing 137 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certainteed Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 10, 2014 Filing 136 ENTRY STRICKEN - ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Certainteed Corporation by Certainteed Corporation.(Hill, Keith) Modified on 1/13/2014 (jaj, ).
January 10, 2014 Filing 135 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 10, 2014 Filing 134 ENTRY STRICKEN - ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation.(Hill, Keith) Modified on 1/13/2014 (jaj, ).
January 10, 2014 Filing 133 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(f/k/a Square D). (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(f/k/a Square D) (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #130 Notice of Appearance filed by Zurn Industries, LLC. Duplicate filing of document 121. Docket entry STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. No further action required by the filer as to this document. (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 9, 2014 Filing 130 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/10/2014 (tkm ).
January 9, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of BW/IP, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Greene Tweed & Company (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of RIC-WIL, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Weil McLain (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #116 Notice of Appearance filed by Aurora Pump Company, #97 Notice of Appearance filed by Joy Technologies, Inc., #85 Notice of Appearance filed by Zurn Industries, LLC, #93 Notice of Appearance filed by RIC-WIL, Inc., #101 Notice of Appearance filed by Greene Tweed & Company, #112 Notice of Appearance filed by BW/IP, Inc., #108 Notice of Appearance filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, #89 Notice of Appearance filed by Weil McLain. See attached document for specifics. (jaj, )
January 8, 2014 Filing 119 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Pump Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 118 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX by Aurora Pump Company. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 117 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Aurora Pump Company.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/28/2014 (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 116 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/9/2014 (jaj).
January 8, 2014 Filing 115 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BW/IP, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX by BW/IP, Inc.. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 113 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by BW/IP, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/28/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document and filing party (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 112 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of BW/IP, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/9/2014 (jaj).
January 8, 2014 Filing 111 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 110 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 109 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/28/2014 (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 108 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/9/2014 (jaj).
January 8, 2014 Filing 107 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 106 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX by Gardner Denver, Inc.. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 105 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Gardner Denver, Inc.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/28/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greene Tweed & Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 103 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX by Greene Tweed & Company. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 102 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Greene Tweed & Company.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/28/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 101 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Greene Tweed & Company (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/9/2014 (jaj).
January 8, 2014 Filing 100 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joy Technologies, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 99 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX by Joy Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 98 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Joy Technologies, Inc.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/28/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 97 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/9/2014 (jaj).
January 8, 2014 Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RIC-WIL, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 95 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX by RIC-WIL, Inc.. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 94 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by RIC-WIL, Inc.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/28/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 93 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of RIC-WIL, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/9/2014 (jaj).
January 8, 2014 Filing 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weil McLain. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX by Weil McLain. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 90 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Weil McLain.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/28/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 89 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Weil McLain (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/9/2014 (jaj).
January 8, 2014 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss Count IX by Zurn Industries, LLC. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 86 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 5/28/2014 to correctly reflect events contained in document filed (bkl). Modified on 5/28/2014 (bkl, ).
January 8, 2014 Filing 85 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/9/2014 (jaj).
January 7, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Crane Company (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 7, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Crane Company (Jones, Kirra)
January 3, 2014 Filing 82 Defendant Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity against All Defendants by Crane Company.(Hardee, Kathleen)
January 3, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Crane Company (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 3, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Crane Company (Jones, Kirra)
December 31, 2013 Filing 79 ANSWER to #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #47 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #41 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Allied Manufacturing, Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boise Cascade, LLC, Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc., Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP, Chevron USA, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, ConocoPhillips Company, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Domco Products Texas, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Exxonmobil Corporation, FMC Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc, Fluor Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.H. France Refractories Company, John Crane, Inc., Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Lennox Industries, Inc., McNally Industries, Inc., Meadwestvaco Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Mine Safety Appliances Company, Murco Wall Products, Inc., Oakfabco, Inc., Owens-Illinois Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Pneumo Abex, LLC, RIC-WIL, Inc., Research Cottrell, Inc., Riley Stoker Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Rust International, Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Simpson Timber Company, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Sunoco, Inc., Texaco, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, The Fairbanks Company, The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The WM. Powell Company, Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., URS Energy & Construction, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, York International Corporation, Zurn Industries, LLC by ITT Corporation.(Rogers, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2013 Filing 78 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER TO ALL CROSSCLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTIONS against All Defendants by John Crane, Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
December 20, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Carl Randol on behalf of Crane Company (Randol, Brett)
December 20, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Michelle Romani on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romani, Allyson)
December 20, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #74 Motion to Remand, filed by Elaine Mohler. Efiler inadverently refiled a duplicate Motion to Remand. Clerk's office will modify the text to reflect that this entry is only supplement exhibits to the original Motion to Remand. No further action required by efiler. (jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 20, 2013 Filing 74 EXHIBITS to Motion to Remand #73 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 31)(Romani, Allyson) Modified on 12/20/2013 (jlrr ).
December 19, 2013 Filing 73 MOTION to Remand by Elaine Mohler. Responses due by 1/24/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(jlrr )
December 18, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of The Fairbanks Company (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Riley Stoker Corporation (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Lennox Industries, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Certainteed Corporation (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Bechtel Construction Company (Hill, Keith)
December 18, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Brandon Hill on behalf of Bechtel Corporation (Hill, Keith)
December 17, 2013 Filing 63 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boise Cascade, LLC.(Kernell, Thomas)
December 17, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Kernell on behalf of Boise Cascade, LLC (Kernell, Thomas)
December 16, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #52 Notice of Appearance filed by Welco Manufacturing Company. E-filer selected the wrong defendant when filing the Notice of Appearance. Correct Notice of Appearance has already been filed at Doc. #54 . No further action required from filer.(cekf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 13, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Ward on behalf of Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc. (Ward, Donald)
December 13, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc. (Hatch, Mary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc (Hatch, Mary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Hatch, Mary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of York International Corporation (Hatch, Mary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls, Inc. for York International Corporation. (Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of York International Corporation (Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 53 York International, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross Claims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by York International Corporation.(Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 52 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Smith, Gary) Modified on 12/16/2013 (cekf).
December 13, 2013 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Welco Manufacturing Company. (Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 50 Welco Manufacturing Company's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross Claims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Welco Manufacturing Company.(Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve U.S., Inc identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 47 Flowserve US Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross Claims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Flowserve U.S., Inc.(Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc (Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Borg Warner Inc for Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc.. (Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 44 BorgWarner Morse TEC, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross Claims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc..(Smith, Gary)
December 13, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc. (Smith, Gary)
December 12, 2013 Filing 42 GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ANSWER to Complaint AND, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Kidd, Anita)
December 12, 2013 Filing 41 BIRD INCORPORATED ANSWER to Complaint AND, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bird Incorporated.(Kidd, Anita)
December 12, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels on behalf of The Fairbanks Company (Daniels, Michael)
December 12, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels on behalf of Bechtel Corporation (Daniels, Michael)
December 12, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels on behalf of Bechtel Construction Company (Daniels, Michael)
December 12, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Daniels, Michael)
December 12, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels on behalf of Certainteed Corporation (Daniels, Michael)
December 12, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels on behalf of Lennox Industries, Inc. (Daniels, Michael)
December 12, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels on behalf of Riley Stoker Corporation (Daniels, Michael)
December 12, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company (Daniels, Michael)
December 12, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Daniels, Michael)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Ross Stomel on behalf of Elaine Mohler. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 9, 2013 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT Corporation. (Rogers, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Rogers on behalf of ITT Corporation (Rogers, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of ITT Corporation (Wilks, Undray)
December 9, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyRoss D. Stomel $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2140930 by on behalf of Elaine Mohler. (Stomel, Ross)
December 5, 2013 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meadwestvaco Corporation. (Chessler, Michael)
December 3, 2013 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velan Valve Corporation. (Chessler, Michael)
December 2, 2013 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Meadwestvaco Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation. (See Doc. #19 for complete PDF document) Entry docketed to correct parties on docket. (bkl)
December 2, 2013 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Chessler, Michael)
December 2, 2013 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane US, Inc.. (Chessler, Michael)
December 2, 2013 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Chessler, Michael)
December 2, 2013 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia-Pacific Corporation. (Chessler, Michael)
December 2, 2013 Filing 20 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Meadwestvaco Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Chessler, Michael)
December 2, 2013 Filing 19 CROSSCLAIM , Answer, and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Any Counterclaims and Cross Claims against All Defendants, filed by Industrial Holdings Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Meadwestvaco Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Corporation.(Chessler, Michael) Modified on 5/28/2014 (bkl).
December 2, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Chessler on behalf of Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Meadwestvaco Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation (Chessler, Michael)
December 2, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of Bird Incorporated (King, Melanie)
December 2, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of Bird Incorporated (Kidd, Anita)
December 2, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of Bird Incorporated (Fournie, Raymond)
December 2, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of General Electric Company (King, Melanie)
December 2, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of General Electric Company (Kidd, Anita)
December 2, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of General Electric Company (Fournie, Raymond)
December 2, 2013 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Sonneveld, Allison)
December 2, 2013 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Crane Company.(Sonneveld, Allison)
December 2, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Action due by 12/16/2013. (dkd )
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael J. Reagan recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 12/2/13. (dkd )
December 2, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
November 27, 2013 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane, Inc.. (Fergus, Sean)
November 27, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Fergus on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Fergus, Sean)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge David R. Herndon recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael J. Reagan for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 11/26/2013. (slj)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge J. Phil Gilbert recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge David R. Herndon for all further proceedings. All future filings in this case shall bear the case number 13-1221 DRH/SCW.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/26/2013. (jdh)
November 25, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Company from Madison County, Illinois, case number 13-CV-1221. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C1, #5 Exhibit C2a, #6 Exhibit C2b, #7 Exhibit C3a, #8 Exhibit C3b, #9 Exhibit C4a, #10 Exhibit C4b, #11 Exhibit C5, #12 Exhibit C6, #13 Exhibit D1, #14 Exhibit D2, #15 Exhibit D3, #16 Exhibit D4, #17 Exhibit D5, #18 Exhibit E)(Sonneveld, Allison)
November 25, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison K. Sonneveld on behalf of Crane Company (Sonneveld, Allison)
November 25, 2013 Filing 1 Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 13-1221-JPG-SCW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(anm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohler v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco, Inc. (R&M)
Represented By: Joseph A Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welco Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murco Wall Products, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory W. Odom, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakfabco, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Ward
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel International Corporation
Represented By: William B. Starnes, II
Represented By: Bryan L. Skelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pecora Corporation
Represented By: James A. Telthorst
Represented By: David J. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conwed Corporation
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Kevin T. Dawson
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rust International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kraissl Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollingsworth & Vose Company
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIC-WIL, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mueller Steam Speciality incorrectly sued as Watts Water Technologies, Inc., for its Mueller Steam Specialty division
Represented By: Patricia M. Kelly
Represented By: James A. Telthorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Corporation North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameron International Corporation
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Represented By: Lawrence S. Denk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Chemical Company
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Allison K. Sonneveld
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Michael F. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Mark G. Zellmer
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Erik L. Hansell
Represented By: Michael F. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Kevin T. Dawson
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert T. Varney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Carla C. Storm
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Allison K. Sonneveld
Represented By: Noel L. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Brett Carl Randol
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Maassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: Howard J. Pikel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird Incorporated
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks
Represented By: Meredith S Hudgens
Represented By: Erin Renee Griebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCG, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Telthorst
Represented By: David J. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Wagner Morse Tec, Inc.
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Corporation
Represented By: William B. Starnes, II
Represented By: Bryan L. Skelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Marcie J. Vantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Madeline V. Tzall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Jordan T. Ault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould's Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Kevin T. Dawson
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. France Refractories Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Jonathan M. Lively
Represented By: James R Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Kevin T. Dawson
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP
Represented By: Mark G. Zellmer
Represented By: Erik L. Hansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Construction Company
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Michael F. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Brian J. Connolly
Represented By: J. Todd Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Madeline V. Tzall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boise Cascade, LLC
Represented By: Marcie J. Vantine
Represented By: Thomas J. Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil McLain
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennox Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Michael F. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell & Gossett Deomestic Pump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS Energy & Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Michael F. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: William B. Starnes, II
Represented By: Bryan L. Skelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham, LLC
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Kevin T. Dawson
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Company
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Mary Price Birk
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex, LLC
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News |