Shewmake v. AERCO International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Helen Pearl Shewmake
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, General Cable Industries, Inc., AERCO International, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Resco Holdings, LLC., Pfizer, Inc., Duro Dyne Corporation, Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Peerless Industries, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Beazer East, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Ferro Engineering, Compudyne Corporation, Milwaukee Valve Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, KCG, Inc., McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Sepco Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Bechtel Corporation, Young Group, LTD, Flowserve U.S., Inc, Viking Pump, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Imo Industries, Inc., Seco Warwick Corporation, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Burnham, LLC, Johnson Controls, Inc., Whiting Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., The WM Powell Company, American Optical Corporation, Bonney Forge Corporation, Special Electric Company, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Daniel International Corporation, Joy Technologies, Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Advanced Composites Group, Weil McLain, Nibco, Inc., CIBA Giegy, Henry Pratt Company, Dap, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., The Nash Engineering Company, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, ITT Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, The Fairbanks Company, Maremont Corporation, Hennessy Industries, Inc., FMC Corporation, Simpson Timber Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., XEF, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Navistar International, Riley Stoker Corporation, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Oakfabco, Inc., Trane US, Inc., Foxboro Company, Cummins, Inc., Motion Control Industries, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Johnston Boiler Company, American Cyanamid, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Deere & Company, Pratt & Whitney Company, Howden North America, Inc., Paccar, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Clark Equipment Company, Columbia Boiler Company, Curtiss Wright Corporation, All Acquisitions, LLC, Plastics Engineering Company, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., Pecora Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Flowserve Corporation, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc., Hyster Company, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Rogers Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Certainteed Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Grimes Aerospace Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Boeing Company, Rheem Manufacturing Company, BW/IP, Inc., Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Clow Corporation, York International Corporation, Greene Tweed & Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, The Sherwin Williams Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Owens Illinois Inc., Grinnell LLC, Goodyear Canada, Inc., McCord Gasket Corporation, J.H. France Refractories Co, Research-Cottrell, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Velan Valve Corporation, MW Custom Papers, LLC., Eaton Corporation, Dravo Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., The Coleman Company, Inc., Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Avocet Enterprises, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Richards Industries, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., McNally Industries, Inc., BASF Corporation, as successor by merger to BASF Performance Products, LLC, as successor in interest to Ciba Corporation, as successor in interest in part to Ciba-Geigy Corporation (incorrectly named, Ford Motor Company, A.O. Smith Corporation, General Electric Company, Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, AWC 1997 Corporation, RIC-WIL, Inc., Fluor Corporation, Sears Roebuck & Co., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Foseco, Inc., Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Dewitt Products Co., Caterpillar, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., CBS Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Dow Chemical Company, Watson McDaniel Company, Aurora Pump Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, J.A. Sexauer, Inc., Cytec Industries, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Carboline Company, Buffalo Air Handling, Carlisle Industrial Brake and Friction, Inc, Chicago Gasket Company, Homasote Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Co., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Dezurik, Harper International Corp., Lindberg, Asbestos Corporation Limited and Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01223
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Williams
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1204 ORDER This case is reopened for the limited purpose of CORRECTING Defendant KCG, Inc.s name in the Courts previous Order (Doc 1175 ) as follows: Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1071, 1075, 1077, 1106, 1108 1114, 1116 - 1159) and DISMISSES defendants AII Acquisitions, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems, Corp., American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., ArvinMeritor, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, AWC 1997 Corporation f/k/a Alpha Wire Corporation, Bird, Inc., The Boeing company, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, BW/IP, Inc., Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Ciba Giegy, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Conwed Corporation, Copes Vulcan, Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dap, Inc., DeZurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Flowserve, U.S., Inc., Flowserve Corporation SII to Durametallic Corporation, Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, FMC Corporation, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corp, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Henry Pratt Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Harco Laboratatories, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, IMO Industries, ITT Corporation, J.A. Sexauer, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Lennox Industries, Inc., McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., The Nash Engineering Company, Nooter Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Ric-Wil, Inc., Riley Stoker Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sepco Corporation, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems, USA, LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Tuthill Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, The Wm. Powell Company, York International Corp, and Zurn Industries, LLC. The Court DENIES as moot Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Georgia Pacific Corporation (Doc. 1115) because Plaintiff has filed an Amended Motion to Dismiss Georgia Pacific Corporation (Doc. 1170).Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/20/2015. (hjg)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 21, 2015 Filing 1203 Acknowledgment from Madison County Circuit Court re order of remand (lmb)
May 18, 2015 Filing 1202 Letter to Madison County Circuit Court re Order of Remand (lmb)
May 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 ORDER OF REMAND. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Remand (Doc. 1177) and REMANDS this case to the Third Judicial Circuit, Madison County, Illinois. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/16/15. (ajr)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1200 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Jeffrey Muskopf on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company (Muskopf, W.)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1199 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 1133) and DISMISSES defendant McNally Industries, Inc. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/28/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 24, 2015 Filing 1198 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1196 Notice (Other) filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #1197 Notice (Other) filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. See attached document for specifics (mar)
April 23, 2015 Filing 1197 STRICKEN AT DOC. 1198 - NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 4/24/2015 (mar).
April 23, 2015 Filing 1196 STRICKEN AT DOC. 1198 - NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 4/24/2015 (mar).
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1195 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 1193) and DISMISSES Defendant SPX Cooling Technologies without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/21/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 ORDER. Any defendant objecting to the dismissal of defendant SPX Cooling Technologies (Doc. 1193) shall file a response on or before April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/15/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 15, 2015 Filing 1193 MOTION to Dismiss SPX Cooling Technologies as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Docs. 1170) and DISMISSES Defendant Georgia-Pacific Corporation with prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/13/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1191 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1058-1066, 1068 & 1069) and DISMISSES Defendants Trane US, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Caterpilar, Inc., Crane Co., Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Ingersoll Rand Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Velan Valve Corp., General Cable Industries, Inc. and Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/13/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1178 ) and DISMISSES defendant CBS Corporation. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/8/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #1172 & #1173 ) and DISMISSES defendants Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. and Ciba Giegy. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/8/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 6, 2015 Filing 1188 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1177 Supplemental MOTION to Remand Joint Response filed by McCord Gasket Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
April 2, 2015 Filing 1187 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 4/2/2015. Allison Romani for Plaintiff. Ben Wilson, Stephanie Jones, Gary Smith, Julie Fix Meyer, Dennis Graber, Kyle Stevens, Brian Connolly, David Ybarra, Georgeanne Oliver, Kaitlyn Chenevert, and Sean Fergus for Defendants. Plaintiff shall have three weeks to provide expert reports to Defendants. Expert reports due April 23, 2015. Close of discovery remains July 9, 2015. (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.) (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 2, 2015 Filing 1186 NOTICE of Appearance by Georgiann Oliver on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Oliver, Georgiann)
March 31, 2015 Filing 1185 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Schag, Michael)
March 31, 2015 Filing 1184 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Schag, Michael)
March 25, 2015 Filing 1183 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 4/2/2015 03:30 PM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS the Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1180 ) and DISMISSES defendant Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/19/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 16, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1180 Joint MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice. Responses due by 3/17/2015 (jaj)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 ORDER. Any party objecting to the Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1180 ) defendant Honeywell International, Inc. shall file a response on or before March 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/13/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 12, 2015 Filing 1180 Joint MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Honeywell International, Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2015 (Hardee, Kathleen)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1178 ) defendant CBS Corporation. Any party objecting to the motion shall file a response on or before March 11, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/10/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 9, 2015 Filing 1178 MOTION to Dismiss CBS CORPORATION by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/13/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1177 Supplemental MOTION to Remand by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1161-68) and DISMISSES Defendants Grinnell, LLC, Simpson Timber Company, FL Smidt Dorr-Oliver, Inc., Kelsey-Hayes Company, Pratt & Whitney Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corp., American Cyanamid, and Owens-Illinois, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/6/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1071, 1075, 1077, 1106, 1108 1114, 1116 - 1159) and DISMISSES defendants AII Acquisitions, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems, Corp., American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., ArvinMeritor, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, AWC 1997 Corporation f/k/a Alpha Wire Corporation, Bird, Inc., The Boeing company, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, BW/IP, Inc., Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Ciba Giegy, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Conwed Corporation, Copes Vulcan, Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dap, Inc., DeZurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Flowserve, U.S., Inc., Flowserve Corporation SII to Durametallic Corporation, Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, FMC Corporation, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corp, Foxoboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Henry Pratt Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Harco Laboratatories, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, IMO Industries, ITT Corporation, J.A. Sexauer, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Joy Technologies, Inc., JCG, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Lennox Industries, Inc., McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., The Nash Engineering Company, Nooter Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Ric-Wil, Inc., Riley Stoker Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sepco Corporation, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems, USA, LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Tuthill Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, The Wm. Powell Company, York International Corp, and Zurn Industries, LLC. The Court DENIES as moot Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Georgia Pacific Corporation (Doc. 1115) because Plaintiff has filed an Amended Motion to Dismiss Georgia Pacific Corporation (Doc. 1170). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/6/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #1172 & #1173 ) defendants Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. and Ciba Giegy. Any party objecting to the Motions (Docs. #1172 & #1173 ) shall file a response on or before March 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/6/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 4, 2015 Filing 1173 MOTION to Dismiss Ciba Giegy by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 4, 2015 Filing 1172 MOTION to Dismiss Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Dismiss Georgia Pacific Corporation (Doc. #1170 ) with prejudice. Any party objecting to the Motion shall file a response on or before March 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/2/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 27, 2015 Filing 1170 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Georgia Pacific Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1161-68) Defendants Grinnell, LLC, Simpson Timber Company, FL Smidt Dorr-Oliver, Inc., Kelsey-Hayes Company, Pratt & Whitney Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corp., American Cyanamid, and Owens-Illinois, Inc. Any party objecting to the motions shall file a response on or before March 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/27/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 26, 2015 Filing 1168 MOTION to Dismiss Owens-Illinois, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1167 MOTION to Dismiss AMERICAN CYANAMID by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1166 MOTION to Dismiss Northrop Grumman Systems Corp. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1165 MOTION to Dismiss Pratt & Whitney Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1164 MOTION to Dismiss Kelsey-Hayes Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1163 MOTION to Dismiss FL Smidt Dorr-Oliver, Inc., as sucessor Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1162 MOTION to Dismiss Simpson Timber Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1161 MOTION to Dismiss Grinnell, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1071 1075, 1077 1106, 1108 - 1159) defendants AII Acquisitions, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems, Corp., American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., ArvinMeritor, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, AWC 1997 Corporation f/k/a Alpha Wire Corporation, Bird, Inc., The Boeing company, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, BW/IP, Inc., Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Ciba Giegy, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Conwed Corporation, Copes Vulcan, Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Dap, Inc., DeZurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Flowserve, U.S., Inc., Flowserve Corporation SII to Durametallic Corporation, Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, FMC Corporation, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corp, Foxoboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Henry Pratt Company, Georgia Pacific Corporation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Harco Laboratatories, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, IMO Industries, ITT Corporation, J.A. Sexauer, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Joy Technologies, Inc., JCG, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Lennox Industries, Inc., McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., The Nash Engineering Company, Nooter Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Ric-Wil, Inc., Riley Stoker Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sepco Corporation, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems, USA, LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Tuthill Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, The Wm. Powell Company, York International Corp, and Zurn Industries, LLC. Any party objecting to the motions shall file a response on or before March 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/25/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 25, 2015 Filing 1159 MOTION to Dismiss Zurn Industries, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1158 MOTION to Dismiss YORK INTERNATIONAL CORP. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1157 MOTION to Dismiss THE WM POWELL COMPANY by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1156 MOTION to Dismiss Welco Manufacturing Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1155 MOTION to Dismiss Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1154 MOTION to Dismiss Weil McLain by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1153 MOTION to Dismiss Watson McDaniel Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1152 MOTION to Dismiss Warren Pumps, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1151 MOTION to Dismiss Viking Pump, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1150 MOTION to Dismiss Tuthill Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1149 MOTION to Dismiss Stewart Warner Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1148 MOTION to Dismiss Sterling Fluid Systems, USA, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1147 MOTION to Dismiss Spirax Sarco, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1146 MOTION to Dismiss Special Electric Company, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1145 MOTION to Dismiss SEPCO CORPORATION by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1144 MOTION to Dismiss Schneider Electric USA, Inc., f/k/a Square D by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1143 MOTION to Dismiss RILEY STOKER CORPORATION by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1142 MOTION to Dismiss Ric-Wil, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1141 MOTION to Dismiss Pfizer, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1140 MOTION to Dismiss Peerless Industries, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1139 MOTION to Dismiss Pecora Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1138 MOTION to Dismiss Paccar, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1137 MOTION to Dismiss NOOTER CORPORATION by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1136 MOTION to Dismiss The Nash Engineering Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1135 MOTION to Dismiss Motion Control Industries, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1134 MOTION to Dismiss Mueller Steam Specialty Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1133 MOTION to Dismiss McNally Industries, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1132 MOTION to Dismiss MCMASTER-CARR SUPPLY COMPANY by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1131 MOTION to Dismiss Lennox Industries, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1130 MOTION to Dismiss The Kraissl Company, Incorporated by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1129 MOTION to Dismiss Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1128 MOTION to Dismiss KCG, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1127 MOTION to Dismiss Joy Technologies, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1126 MOTION to Dismiss J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1125 MOTION to Dismiss J.A. Sexauer, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1124 MOTION to Dismiss ITT Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1123 MOTION to Dismiss IMO Industries by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1122 MOTION to Dismiss Hyster Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1121 MOTION to Dismiss Howden North America, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1120 MOTION to Dismiss Henkel Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1119 MOTION to Dismiss Harco Laboratories, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1118 MOTION to Dismiss Greene Tweed & Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1117 MOTION to Dismiss Goulds Pumps, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1116 MOTION to Dismiss Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1115 MOTION to Dismiss Georgia Pacific Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1114 MOTION to Dismiss Henry Pratt Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1113 MOTION to Dismiss General Electric Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1112 MOTION to Dismiss Gardner Denver, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1111 MOTION to Dismiss Foxoboro Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1110 MOTION to Dismiss Foster Wheeler Energy Corp. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1109 MOTION to Dismiss Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1108 MOTION to Dismiss FMC Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 ORDER granting #1076 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gregory C Flatt terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 2/24/2015. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 24, 2015 Filing 1106 MOTION to Dismiss Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1105 MOTION to Dismiss Flowserve Corporation SII to Durametallic Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1104 MOTION to Dismiss FLOWSERVE U.S., INC. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1103 MOTION to Dismiss THE FAIRBANKS COMPANY by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1102 MOTION to Dismiss Eaton Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1101 MOTION to Dismiss Eaton Aeroquip, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1100 MOTION to Dismiss Dravo Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1099 MOTION to Dismiss The Dow Chemical Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1098 MOTION to Dismiss Domco Products Texas, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1097 MOTION to Dismiss DeZurik by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1096 MOTION to Dismiss Dap, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1095 MOTION to Dismiss Curtiss Wright Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1094 MOTION to Dismiss Cummins, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1093 MOTION to Dismiss Copes Vulcan by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1092 MOTION to Dismiss Conwed Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1091 MOTION to Dismiss CLEAVER-BROOKS, F/K/A CLEAVER BROOKS, a Division of AQUA CHEM, INC. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1090 MOTION to Dismiss Clark Equipment Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1089 MOTION to Dismiss Ciba Giegy by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1088 MOTION to Dismiss Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1087 MOTION to Dismiss Certainteed Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1086 MOTION to Dismiss Carrier Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1085 MOTION to Dismiss Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1084 MOTION to Dismiss BW/IP, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1083 MOTION to Dismiss Burnham, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1082 MOTION to Dismiss Buffalo Air Handling by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1081 MOTION to Dismiss The Boeing Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1080 MOTION to Dismiss Bird, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1079 MOTION to Dismiss AWC 1997 Corporation f/k/a Alpha Wire Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1078 MOTION to Dismiss Aurora Pump Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1077 MOTION to Dismiss ArvinMeritor, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1076 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Withdrawal and Designation of Counsel for Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1075 MOTION to Dismiss Armstrong Pumps, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1074 MOTION to Dismiss Armstrong International, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1073 MOTION to Dismiss American Optical Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1072 MOTION to Dismiss Air & Liquid Systems Corp. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Filing 1071 MOTION to Dismiss AII Acquisitions, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #1068 & #1069 ) Defendants General Cable Industries, Inc. and Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. Any party objecting to the motions shall file a response on or before February 25, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/23/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 20, 2015 Filing 1069 MOTION to Dismiss Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 20, 2015 Filing 1068 MOTION to Dismiss GENERAL CABLE INDUSTRIES INC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1058 - 1066) Defendants Trane US, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Caterpilar, Inc., Crane Co., Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Ingersoll Rand Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., and Velan Valve Corp. Any party objecting to the motions shall file a response on or before February 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/20/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 19, 2015 Filing 1066 MOTION to Dismiss Velan Valve Corp. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 19, 2015 Filing 1065 MOTION to Dismiss Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 19, 2015 Filing 1064 MOTION to Dismiss Ingersoll Rand Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 19, 2015 Filing 1063 MOTION to Dismiss Hollingsworth & Vose Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 19, 2015 Filing 1062 MOTION to Dismiss Illinois Tool Works Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Devcon Corp. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 19, 2015 Filing 1061 MOTION to Dismiss Crane Co. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 19, 2015 Filing 1060 MOTION to Dismiss Caterpilar Inc by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 19, 2015 Filing 1059 MOTION to Dismiss Industrial Holdings Corporation f/k/a Carborundum Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 19, 2015 Filing 1058 MOTION to Dismiss TRANE US, INC., f/k/a AMERICAN STANDARD INC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 ORDER granting #1056 Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Justin Welpy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 2/5/15. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 4, 2015 Filing 1056 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Records by Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., Flowserve U.S., Inc, Invensys Systems, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., Stewart Warner Corporation, Tuthill Corporation, Welco Manufacturing Company, York International Corporation. (Welply, Justin)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER. Having received no objection to Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss Defendants Deere & Company and Richards Industries, Inc. (Docs. #1048 & #1049 ), the Court hereby GRANTS the Motions (Docs. #1048 & #1049 ) and DISMISSES Defendants Deere & Company and Richards Industries, Inc. from this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/2/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 2, 2015 Filing 1054 NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 ORDER: It is ordered that any challenges to potential witness testimony brought pursuant to FED. R. EVID. 702 and FED. R. EVID. 703 (i.e., Daubert motions) SHALL be due on or before this cases deadline for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/29/15. (cmh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1046 ) Defendant Deer & Company. Any party objecting to the motion shall file a response on or before January 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/27/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 ORDER. Having received no objection to Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #1036 , #1040 , #1041 & #1042 ), the Court hereby GRANTS the Motions (Docs. #1036 , #1040 , #1041 & #1042 ) and DISMISSES defendants Metallo Gasket Co., Clow Corporation, MW Custom Papers, LLC, and Hyster Company from this case. The Court hereby DENIES as moot defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1038 ) and defendant Clow Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1039 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/27/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1049 ) Defendant Richards Industries, Inc. Any party objecting to the motion shall file a response on or before February 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/27/2015. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 26, 2015 Filing 1049 MOTION to Dismiss Richards Industries, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 3/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
January 23, 2015 Filing 1048 MOTION to Dismiss Deere & Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 2/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
January 23, 2015 Filing 1047 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #1046 Motion to Dismiss filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. See attached document for specifics (mar)
January 22, 2015 Filing 1046 MOTION to Dismiss Deere & Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 2/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 ORDER granting #1044 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Ryan T. Barke terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 1/12/2015. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 9, 2015 Filing 1044 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Maremont Corporation. (Ybarra, David)
December 24, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1042 MOTION to Dismiss Hyster Company, #1040 MOTION to Dismiss Clow Corporation, #1036 MOTION to Dismiss Metallo Gasket, #1041 MOTION to Dismiss MW Custom Papers, LLC. Responses due by 1/6/2015 (tkm )
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #1036 , #1040 , #1041 , & #1042 ). Any party objecting to the motions shall file a response on or before January 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/23/14. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 22, 2014 Filing 1042 MOTION to Dismiss Hyster Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1041 MOTION to Dismiss MW Custom Papers, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1040 MOTION to Dismiss Clow Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 17, 2014 Filing 1039 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Clow Corporation. Responses due by 1/20/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Geraci, Carl)
December 17, 2014 Filing 1038 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MW Custom Papers, LLC.. Responses due by 1/20/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Huelsmann, Brian)
December 17, 2014 Filing 1037 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Deere & Company by Deere & Company. (Reust, Davin)
December 16, 2014 Filing 1036 MOTION to Dismiss Metallo Gasket by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 1/20/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 ORDER STRIKING #1028 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Incorrect filing event used. Filer should have used the event "Motion to Dismiss." This document is to be refiled using the appropriate event. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/16/14. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 15, 2014 Filing 1034 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1033 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc. (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1032 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Rogers Corporation (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1031 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1030 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1029 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1028 STRICKEN NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 12/16/2014 (ajr, ).
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 ORDER granting #1026 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. By agreement of the parties, MW Custom Papers LLC's time to file a responsive pleading is extended until December 17, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/11/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2014 Filing 1026 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MW Custom Papers, LLC.. (Huelsmann, Brian)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 ORDER granting #1024 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. By agreement of the parties, Clow Corp.'s time to file a responsive pleading is extended until December 17, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/11/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2014 Filing 1024 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Clow Corporation. (Geraci, Carl)
December 10, 2014 Filing 1023 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of MW Custom Papers, LLC. (Geraci, Carl)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation of dismissal (Doc. #1018 ), Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Goodrich Corporation are hereby dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly at the close of this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/4/14. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 ORDER granting #1019 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin T. Dawson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/02/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 1, 2014 Filing 1020 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1017 Notice (Other) filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. See attached document for specifics (slh)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1019 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (Dawson, Kevin)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1018 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Goodrich Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
November 26, 2014 Filing 1017 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 1020 - NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 ORDER denying #705 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/25/14. (ajr)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 ORDER denying #884 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/25/14. (ajr)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on plaintiff Helen Pearl Shewmakes Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #944 ) defendant Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). The Court has received no response to the motion. The Court hereby GRANTS the motion (Doc. #944 ) and dismisses defendant Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. from this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/25/14. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 24, 2014 Filing 1013 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth on behalf of Helen Pearl Shewmake (Shuttlesworth, Robert)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 ORDER on 11/20/2014 discovery dispute conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 1/21/2014. (anj)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 11/20/2014. Allyson Romani for Plaintiff. Carl Geraci, Chris Threlkeld, Ben Wilson, Stephanie Jones, Nicole Rice, Sean Fergus, David Franklin, Haley Schumaker, Kyle Pozan, Mike Daniels, Ted Daniels, Julie Fix Meyer, James Telthorst, Matt Morris, Nicole Babin, Jessica Velez, Steve Walsh for various Defendants. (Court Reporter Laura Esposito.) (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 19, 2014 Filing 1010 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Brodzik on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Brodzik, James)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 ORDER granting #1008 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth on behalf of Helen Pearl Shewmake. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 18, 2014 Filing 1008 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2453038 by on behalf of Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Shuttlesworth, Robert)
November 14, 2014 Filing 1007 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 11/20/2014 at 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Call-in information remains the same. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 10, 2014 Filing 1006 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Cook, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1005 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Greene Tweed & Company (Cook, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1004 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Weil McLain (Cook, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1003 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Dezurik (Cook, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1002 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of RIC-WIL, Inc. (Cook, Samuel)
November 7, 2014 Filing 1001 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 11/14/2014 01:00 PM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 ORDER granting #999 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Karen E Bettcher terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 11/03/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 31, 2014 Filing 999 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Metallo Gasket Co.. (Morris, Matthew)
October 23, 2014 Filing 998 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson)
October 22, 2014 Filing 997 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Meyer, Julie)
October 22, 2014 Filing 996 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (King, Melanie)
October 22, 2014 Filing 995 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Kidd, Anita)
October 22, 2014 Filing 994 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Fournie, Raymond)
October 20, 2014 Filing 993 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #992 Notice (Other) filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Discovery documents, even certificates of service of same, are not to be filed in CM/ECF. Please refer to the Local Rules for the Southern District of Illinois, specifically Rule 26.1.(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 17, 2014 Filing 992 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 10/20/2014 (jaj).
October 3, 2014 Filing 991 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Hood on behalf of Special Electric Company, Inc. (Hood, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 990 ORDER granting #983 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David J. Page terminated; granting #984 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David J. Page terminated; granting #985 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David J. Page terminated; granting #986 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David J. Page terminated; granting #987 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David J. Page terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 10/01/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 989 ORDER granting #988 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jessica K. Velez terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 10/01/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 30, 2014 Filing 988 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Special Electric Company, Inc.. (Hood, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2014 Filing 987 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mueller Steam Specialty Company(a division of Watts Water Technologies, Inc.). (Kelly, Patricia)
September 30, 2014 Filing 986 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AWC 1997 Corporation. (Kelly, Patricia)
September 30, 2014 Filing 985 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by KCG, Inc.(successor by merger to KC Wall Products, Inc., and Ruco Drywall Products, Inc.). (Kelly, Patricia)
September 30, 2014 Filing 984 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Research-Cottrell, Inc.. (Kelly, Patricia)
September 30, 2014 Filing 983 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Pecora Corporation. (Kelly, Patricia)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 982 ORDER granting #981 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin F. O'Malley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 09/30/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 29, 2014 Filing 981 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Pfizer, Inc.. (O'Malley, Kevin)
September 29, 2014 Filing 980 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Voss on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Voss, Andrew)
September 29, 2014 Filing 979 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #974 Notice (Other) filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #975 Notice (Other) filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #976 Notice (Other) filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #977 Notice (Other) filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #978 Notice (Other) filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. See attached document for specifics. (cjo)
September 26, 2014 Filing 978 STRICKEN - NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Response to McCord Corporation's Interrogatories and Requests for Production (McLeod, Matthew) Modified on 9/29/2014 (cjo).
September 26, 2014 Filing 977 STRICKEN - NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories and Requests for Production (McLeod, Matthew) Modified on 9/29/2014 (cjo).
September 26, 2014 Filing 976 STRICKEN - NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Responses to Honeywell International Inc.'s Interrogatories and Requests for Production (McLeod, Matthew) Modified on 9/29/2014 (cjo).
September 26, 2014 Filing 975 STRICKEN - NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Responses to Dana Companies Interrogatories and Requets for Production (McLeod, Matthew) Modified on 9/29/2014 (cjo).
September 26, 2014 Filing 974 STRICKEN - NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake Notice of Filing Plaintiffs Responses to Hennessy Industries Interrogatories and Requests for Production (McLeod, Matthew) Modified on 9/29/2014 (cjo).
September 23, 2014 Filing 973 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #961 Notice of Appearance filed by Pecora Corporation, #962 Notice of Appearance filed by Research-Cottrell, Inc., #963 Notice of Appearance filed by KCG, Inc., #964 Notice of Appearance filed by AWC 1997 Corporation, #965 Notice of Appearance filed by Mueller Steam Specialty Company. The filer attached the document requesting substitution of counsel at each notice of appearance entry, when an actual motion for substitution should be filed for each separarately using the motion event. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 23, 2014 Filing 972 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Mueller Steam Specialty Company(a division of Watts Water Technologies, Inc.) (Telthorst, James)
September 23, 2014 Filing 971 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of AWC 1997 Corporation (Telthorst, James)
September 23, 2014 Filing 970 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of KCG, Inc.(successor by merger to KC Wall Products, Inc., and Ruco Drywall Products, Inc.) (Telthorst, James)
September 23, 2014 Filing 969 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Research-Cottrell, Inc. (Telthorst, James)
September 23, 2014 Filing 968 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Pecora Corporation (Telthorst, James)
September 23, 2014 Filing 967 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. McLeod on behalf of Helen Pearl Shewmake (McLeod, Matthew)
September 22, 2014 Filing 966 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Hood on behalf of Sepco Corporation (Hood, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2014 Filing 965 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M Kelly on behalf of Mueller Steam Specialty Company(a division of Watts Water Technologies, Inc.) (Kelly, Patricia)
September 22, 2014 Filing 964 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M Kelly on behalf of AWC 1997 Corporation (Kelly, Patricia)
September 22, 2014 Filing 963 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M Kelly on behalf of KCG, Inc.(successor by merger to KC Wall Products, Inc., and Ruco Drywall Products, Inc.) (Kelly, Patricia)
September 22, 2014 Filing 962 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M Kelly on behalf of Research-Cottrell, Inc. (Kelly, Patricia)
September 22, 2014 Filing 961 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M Kelly on behalf of Pecora Corporation (Kelly, Patricia)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 960 ORDER granting #959 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney McLeod. (anm)
September 22, 2014 Filing 959 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew B. McLeod by on behalf of Helen Pearl Shewmake. (McLeod, Matthew)
September 19, 2014 Filing 958 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #957 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Document stricken pursuant to request of filer. Document will be correctly refiled. (anm)
September 19, 2014 Filing 957 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 958 - MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew McLeod by AttorneyMatthew B. McLeod $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2400476 by on behalf of Helen Pearl Shewmake. (McLeod, Matthew) Modified on 9/19/2014 (anm).
September 17, 2014 Filing 956 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 9/17/2014. Allyson Romani and Matt McLeod appear for Plaintiff. Julie Fix-Meyer, Bethany Jones, Kyle Stevens, Joe Brown, Debra Zahalsky, Michael Dauphin, Carl Geraci, Kathleen Hardee, Kirra Jones, Matt Alva, Margaret Foster, Bill Cross, Sean Fergus, Davin Reust, Brad Bultman, Haley Schumacher, Justin Zimmerman, Michael McGinley, Stephanie Jones, Amy Hanson, Ross Titzer, A.J. Brosnky, Gino Guzmano, Kelsey Hayes, Jasmine Piazz, Derek Ruzicka, Mark Sampson, Keith Schneider, Justin Welby, Jim Teltorse, Dave Ybarra, Keith Hill, and Nicole Rice appeared for various Defendants. Discovery Dispute Conference held. There was a supplemental disclosure made as to the auto mechanic issues, that made changes to the character of the witness noticed for deposition on September 23, 2014. For that reason, the deposition will be continued. Auto mechanic defendants shall send supplemental discovery by Monday, September 22, 2014. Plaintiff shall get their responses out within one week. (Court Reporter Liberty Recording.) (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 17, 2014 Filing 955 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Carlisle Industrial Brake and Friction, Inc.(Stevens, Kyler)
September 17, 2014 Filing 954 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Carrier Corporation.(Stevens, Kyler)
September 17, 2014 Filing 953 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 9/17/2014 04:30 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 16, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (See Doc. #951 for complete PDF document). Filer failed to additionally select "CrossClaim" upon docketing. (cjo)
September 16, 2014 Filing 952 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Stevens, Kyler)
September 16, 2014 Filing 951 Defendant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint at Law and Cross-Claims by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
September 15, 2014 Filing 950 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #949 Notice (Other) filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
September 12, 2014 Filing 949 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 950 - NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake To Take Discovery Deposition (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 9/16/2014 (anm).
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 948 ORDER granting #942 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Troy D. Hoyt terminated; granting #942 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Troy D. Hoyt terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 09/11/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 4, 2014 Filing 947 NOTICE of Appearance by A. J. Bronsky on behalf of Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (Bronsky, A.)
September 3, 2014 Filing 946 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Daniels, Michael)
September 3, 2014 Filing 945 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Coad Sampson on behalf of Boeing Company, The (Sampson, Mark)
September 2, 2014 Filing 944 MOTION to Dismiss by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Responses due by 10/6/2014 (Romani, Allyson)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 943 ORDER RESETTING HEARINGS: In light of the recent case reassignment to Judge Staci M. Yandle, a Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 10/14/2015 at 10:30 AM and Jury Trial is RESET for 11/9/2015 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/29/2014. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 29, 2014 Filing 942 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Hoyt, Troy)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 941 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 163 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings shall bear case number 13-1223-SMY-SCW. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/21/14. (car)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 25, 2014 Filing 940 RESPONSE in Opposition re #884 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction MW Custom Papers, LLC filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
August 25, 2014 Filing 939 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Renee Griebel on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks (Griebel, Erin)
August 22, 2014 Filing 938 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 937 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Invensys Systems, Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 936 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 935 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 934 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Stewart Warner Corporation (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 933 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 932 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of York International Corporation (Maschhoff, James)
August 20, 2014 Filing 931 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.(as successor-by-merger Borg Warner Corporation) (Maschhoff, James)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 930 ORDER granting Motions for Dismissal #853 ; #854 ; #855 ; #856 ; #857 ; #858 ; #859 ; #860 ; #861 ; #862 ; #863 ; #864 ; #865 ; #866 ; #867 ; #868 ; #869 ; #871 ; and #874 . Defendants Advanced Composites Group, Asbestos Corp Ltd., Avocet Enterprises, Chicago Gasket Co., Cooper Indust., LLC, Cytec Indust. Inc., Duro Dyne Corp., Goodyear Canada Inc., Harper Intl, J.H. France Refractories Co., Kelly More Paint Co., Nibco Inc., Resco Holdings LLC, Rogers Corp., Sears Roebuck & Co., Sprinkmann Sons Corp., Swindell Dressler Intl Co., The Coleman Co., and Treco Construction Services are DISMISSED without prejudice. Pursuant to the Courts Order at Doc. 835, the remaining Defendants crossclaims are deemed DISMISSED without prejudice as to the above named Defendants, unless the remaining Defendants should assert such crossclaims within five days of this order. The crossclaims of all dismissed Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 8/15/14. (amv)
August 15, 2014 Filing 929 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Amendment to #442 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Stevens, Kyler)
August 15, 2014 Filing 928 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #925 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by John Crane, Inc. See attached document for specifics. Docket entry modified to correctly reflect events contained in document filed. (mar)
August 14, 2014 Filing 927 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #926 Notice (Other) filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. See attached document for specifics (mar)
August 13, 2014 Filing 926 STRICKEN AT DOC. 927 - NOTICE by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 8/14/2014 (mar).
August 11, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by John Crane, Inc. (See Doc. #925 for complete PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket - see NOE #928 .(bkl)
August 11, 2014 Filing 925 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, and CROSSCLAIM by John Crane, Inc.(Fergus, Sean) Modified on 8/15/2014 (mar).
August 6, 2014 Filing 924 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #913 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by General Electric Company, #914 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, filed by Bird Incorporated. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
August 1, 2014 Filing 923 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by American Optical Corporation.(Zahalsky, Debra)
July 30, 2014 Filing 922 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Special Electric Company, Inc..(Velez, Jessica)
July 30, 2014 Filing 921 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #911 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by McNally Industries, Inc.. Per telephone call from Attorney Kaitlyn Chenevert, document stricken as a duplicate entry. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 29, 2014 Filing 920 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by McNally Industries, Inc..(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 29, 2014 Filing 919 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 29, 2014 Filing 918 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by FMC Corporation.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 29, 2014 Filing 917 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC.(Hansen, Amy)
July 29, 2014 Filing 916 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by McCord Gasket Corporation.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 29, 2014 Filing 915 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Hoyt, Troy)
July 29, 2014 Filing 914 DEFENDANT BIRD INCORPORATED ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, CROSSCLAIM AND ANSWERS TO CROSS-CLAIMS AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against All Defendants by Bird Incorporated.(Kidd, Anita) Modified on 8/6/2014 (bkl).
July 29, 2014 Filing 913 DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, CROSSCLAIM AND ANSWERS TO CROSS-CLAIMS AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Kidd, Anita) Modified on 8/6/2014 (bkl).
July 29, 2014 Filing 912 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC.(Hoyt, Troy)
July 29, 2014 Filing 911 ENTRY STRICKEN - ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by McNally Industries, Inc..(Chenevert, Kaitlyn) Modified on 7/30/2014 (jaj).
July 29, 2014 Filing 910 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Illinois Tool Works, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 909 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp..(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 908 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Trane US, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 907 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by Henkel Corporation(individually and as successor-in-interest to Dexter Hysol Aerospace, LLC).(Zimmerman, Justin)
July 29, 2014 Filing 906 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Zimmerman, Justin)
July 29, 2014 Filing 905 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by The Dow Chemical Company.(Zimmerman, Justin)
July 29, 2014 Filing 904 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Georgia-Pacific Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 903 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Crane Company.(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 902 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint Cross Claims, and Affirmative and Other Defenses to First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 901 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint Cross Claims, and Affirmative and Other Defenses to First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Caterpillar, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 900 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 899 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Hollingsworth & Vose Company.(Geraci, Carl)
July 29, 2014 Filing 898 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Geraci, Carl)
July 28, 2014 Filing 897 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by Copes-Vulcan.(McGrath, Daniel)
July 28, 2014 Filing 896 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel)
July 28, 2014 Filing 895 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by BASF Corporation, as successor by merger to BASF Performance Products, LLC, as successor in interest to Ciba Corporation, as successor in interest in part to Ciba-Geigy Corporation (incorrectly named.(Kilpatrick, Joseph)
July 25, 2014 Filing 894 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM For Contribution Or Indemnity And Answer To All Cross-Claims And Counterclaims Of / against All Defendants by Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
July 25, 2014 Filing 893 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM For Contribution Or Indemnity And Answer To All Cross-Claims And Counterclaims Of / against All Defendants by Navistar International.(Jones, Kirra)
July 25, 2014 Filing 892 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM For Contribution Or Indemnity And Answer To All Cross-Claims And Counterclaims Of / against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
July 25, 2014 Filing 891 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by Peerless Industries, Inc..(Alva, Charles)
July 25, 2014 Filing 890 The Nash Engineering Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by The Nash Engineering Company.(Foster, Margaret)
July 25, 2014 Filing 889 The Kraissl Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by The Kraissl Company, Incorporated.(Foster, Margaret)
July 25, 2014 Filing 888 Armstrong Pumps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Armstrong Pumps, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
July 24, 2014 Filing 887 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Watson McDaniel Company.(Blaser, Tucker)
July 24, 2014 Filing 886 RESPONSE in Opposition re #705 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Clow Corporation filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
July 24, 2014 Filing 885 Defendant McMaster-Carr Supply Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by McMaster-Carr Supply Company.(McGinley, Michael)
July 23, 2014 Filing 884 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction by MW Custom Papers, LLC.. Responses due by 8/25/2014 (Huelsmann, Brian)
July 23, 2014 Filing 883 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Huelsmann on behalf of MW Custom Papers, LLC. (Huelsmann, Brian)
July 22, 2014 Filing 882 Defendant Kelsey-Hayes Company's ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Crossclaims and Counterclaims or/ against All Defendants by Kelsey-Hayes Company.(Voss, Andrew)
July 22, 2014 Filing 881 NOTICE re #844 Amended Complaint. If the Amended Complaint (Doc. 844) does not raise new allegations against a particular defendant, then that defendant need not file an amended answer and the existing answer will serve as the answer to the Amended Complaint. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2014 Filing 880 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #853 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #854 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #871 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #860 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #867 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #862 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #864 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #859 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #855 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #868 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #858 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #861 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #865 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #869 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #874 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #857 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #866 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #863 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #856 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. See attached document for specifics (tkm )
July 21, 2014 Filing 879 Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC Inc's., ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 878 Defendant Welco Manufacturing Company's, ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Welco Manufacturing Company.(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 877 Defendant Stewart Warner Corporation's, ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Stewart Warner Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 876 Defendant J.A. Sexauer Inc's., ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by J.A. Sexauer, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 875 Defendant York International Corporation's, ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by York International Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 874 STIPULATION of Dismissal Treco Construction Services, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 873 Defendant Tuthill Corporation's, ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Tuthill Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 872 Defendant Invensys Systems, Inc fka The Foxboro Company's, ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Invensys Systems, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 871 STIPULATION of Dismissal The Coleman Company, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 870 Defendant Flowserve US Inc solely as successor to Edward Vavles, Rockwell Mfg and Nordstrom Valves Inc., ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Flowserve U.S., Inc.(Welply, Justin)
July 21, 2014 Filing 869 STIPULATION of Dismissal Swindell-Dressler International Co. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 868 STIPULATION of Dismissal Sprinkmann Sons Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 867 STIPULATION of Dismissal Sears Roebuck & Co. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 866 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rogers Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 865 STIPULATION of Dismissal Resco Holdings, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 864 STIPULATION of Dismissal Nibco, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 863 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kelly Moore Paint Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 862 STIPULATION of Dismissal J.H. France Refractories Co. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 861 STIPULATION of Dismissal Harper International by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 860 STIPULATION of Dismissal Goodyear Canada, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 859 STIPULATION of Dismissal Duro Dyne Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 858 STIPULATION of Dismissal Cytec Industries, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 857 STIPULATION of Dismissal Cooper Industries, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 856 STIPULATION of Dismissal Chicago Gasket Co. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 855 STIPULATION of Dismissal Avocet Enterprises by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 854 STIPULATION of Dismissal Asbestos Corporation Limited by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 21, 2014 Filing 853 STIPULATION of Dismissal Advanced Composites Group by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/21/2014 (tkm ).
July 18, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by General Cable Industries, Inc. (See Doc. 852 for complete PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket. (bkl)
July 18, 2014 Filing 852 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by General Cable Industries, Inc..(Bronsky, A.)
July 17, 2014 Filing 851 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Domco Products Texas, Inc..(Veath, Beth)
July 17, 2014 Filing 850 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Johnson, Dayna)
July 17, 2014 Filing 849 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles)
July 16, 2014 Filing 848 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Nooter Corporation.(Nieder, Douglas)
July 16, 2014 Filing 847 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #842 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Nooter Corporation. Incorrect filing event chosen. Document has been correctly filed at entry 843. No further action is required by the filer.(kek)
July 16, 2014 Filing 846 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #844 Amended Complaint filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. See attached document for specifics (kek)
July 16, 2014 Filing 845 ANSWER to #844 Amended Complaint by Pfizer, Inc..(O'Malley, Kevin)
July 15, 2014 Filing 844 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake.(Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/16/2014 (kek).
July 15, 2014 Filing 843 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nooter Corporation. (Nieder, Douglas)
July 15, 2014 Filing 842 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 847 - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Nooter Corporation.(Nieder, Douglas) Modified on 7/16/2014 (kek).
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER granting #840 Motion to Amend/Correct. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) and by agreement of the parties, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint instanter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 07/15/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 14, 2014 Filing 840 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER finding as moot #354 Motion; finding as moot #364 Motion; finding as moot #389 Motion; finding as moot #389 Motion to Continue; finding as moot #395 Motion for Joinder. Having entered an order regarding counterclaims in this case [Doc. 835], Defendants' Motions to have counterclaims deemed filed and/or denied are now MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 07/11/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 10, 2014 Filing 838 The Nash Engineering Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by The Nash Engineering Company.(Foster, Margaret)
July 10, 2014 Filing 837 Armstrong Pumps, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Armstrong Pumps, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
July 10, 2014 Filing 836 The Kraissl Company, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by The Kraissl Company, Incorporated.(Foster, Margaret)
July 9, 2014 Filing 834 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #830 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Proposed Order e-filed with document when it should be e-mailed. Please refer to Section 2.0: pages 2.6 & 2.7 of the User's Manual. No action required by filer. This notice is informational - for reference with future filings.(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 833 ORDER granting #827 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Troy D. Hoyt on behalf of Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC on 7/9/2014. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/8/14. (amv)
July 8, 2014 Filing 832 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 7/8/2014. Allyson Romani appears for Plaintiff. Anita Kidd, Carolyn Olsen, Rebecca Dircks, Derek Ruzicka, Joe Brown, Laura Beasley, Haley Schumacher, Meredith Hudgens, Michael Dauphin, Michael McGinley, Brian Watson, Stephanie Jones, Kyle Pozan, Denise Peterson, Matt Alva, Brad Bultman, Justin Zimmerman, Kyler Stevens, Gary Smith, Leslie Offergeld, Kevin Dawson, Dave Page, Agatha Petersy, William Irwin, Keith Hill, Karen Bettcher, Ben Wilson, Bill Cross, Elizabeth Nguyen, and Ken Neussbaumer appeared for various Defendants. Parties agree to a consolidated set of initial discovery requests from Defendants. Defendants have fourteen days in which to craft their own set of consolidated discovery requests. Plaintiff will then have fourteen days from the request to respond. Defendant specific interrogatories and requests to produce shall be served no later than 21 days after Defendants have received Plaintiffs responses to the consolidated discovery requests. (Court Reporter Liberty Recording.) (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 831 Order re #707 Order Granting Stipulations of Dismissal. There being no objections, all cross-claims filed by the dismissed Defendants and all cross-claims currently pending against the dismissed Defendants are DISMISSED. Thus, the Court FINDS AS MOOT the pending motions to dismiss all cross-claims against the Defendants and motions to voluntary dismiss cross-claims (Docs. #733 , #734 , #735 , #736 , #737 , #738 , #739 , #740 , #741 , #742 , and #743 ). With any future dismissals of Defendants, cross-claims filed by those Defendants will be automatically dismissed. All other Defendants will have five days to object before their cross-claims against the dismissed Defendants also will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 07/08/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 8, 2014 Filing 830 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Richards Industries, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
July 8, 2014 Filing 829 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metallo Gasket Co. identifying Corporate Parent Metallo Gasket Company for Metallo Gasket Co.. (Bettcher, Karen)
July 8, 2014 Filing 828 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy D Hoyt on behalf of Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (Hoyt, Troy)
July 8, 2014 Filing 827 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyTroy D Hoyt $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2338413 by on behalf of Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Hoyt, Troy)
July 8, 2014 Filing 826 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. (Szlanfucht, David)
July 8, 2014 Filing 825 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #817 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #818 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #819 Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures Designations and Objections filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. See attached document for specifics (kek)
July 7, 2014 Filing 824 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC identifying Other Affiliate Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) Holding, Inc. for Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 823 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McNally Industries, Inc.. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 822 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 821 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McCord Gasket Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Textron Inc. for McCord Gasket Corporation. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 820 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn N. Chenevert on behalf of FMC Corporation, McNally Industries, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Northern Pump Company), Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 819 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 825 - RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections byKaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. (Szlanfucht, David) Modified on 7/8/2014 (kek).
July 7, 2014 Filing 818 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 825 - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Richards Industries, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/8/2014 (kek).
July 7, 2014 Filing 817 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 825 - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/8/2014 (kek).
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 816 ORDER QUASHING #794 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply per 527 Order; QUASHING #804 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer per 527 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 07/07/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 7, 2014 Filing 815 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn N. Chenevert on behalf of McCord Gasket Corporation (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 814 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #804 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nooter Corporation. Filer attached proposed Answer as an Exhibit. Proposed documents do not get electronically filed, but rather sent to the appropriate Judge's e-mail address for proposed documents/orders. Notice to Errors for informational purposes only. No further action required by the filer as to this document (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 6, 2014 Filing 813 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to all Cross-Claims and all Counter-Claims for Contribution and Indemnity, ANSWER to #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by BASF Corporation, as successor by merger to BASF Performance Products, LLC, as successor in interest to Ciba Corporation, as successor in interest in part to Ciba-Geigy Corporation (incorrectly named.(Kilpatrick, Joseph)
July 6, 2014 Filing 812 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A Kilpatrick on behalf of BASF Corporation, as successor by merger to BASF Performance Products, LLC, as successor in interest to Ciba Corporation, as successor in interest in part to Ciba-Geigy Corporation (incorrectly named in Plaintiffs Complaint as Ciba Giegy) (Kilpatrick, Joseph)
July 3, 2014 Filing 811 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Nash Engineering Company. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 810 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of The Nash Engineering Company (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 809 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong Pumps, Inc.. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 808 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 807 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kraissl Company, Incorporated. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 806 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of The Kraissl Company, Incorporated (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 805 Defendant Nooter Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint and Cross-Claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Nooter Corporation.(Nieder, Douglas)
July 3, 2014 Filing 804 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nooter Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nieder, Douglas)
July 3, 2014 Filing 803 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pratt & Whitney Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
July 3, 2014 Filing 802 STIPULATION of Dismissal Northrop Grumman Systems Corp. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
July 3, 2014 Filing 801 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 7/8/2014 at 03:00 PM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; and when prompted enter Security Code 9467. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ORDER denying #699 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/2/14. (amv)
July 2, 2014 Filing 799 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Status Conference held on 7/2/2014. Allyson Romani appears for Plaintiff. Gregory Flatt, Julie Fix-Meyer, Joe Brown, Debra Zahalsky, Michael Dauphin, Carl Geraci, Kelly Liebra, Kathleen Hardee, Kira Jones, Gary Smith, John Hipskin, Kevin Dawson, Charles Alva, Christian Cagas, Sean Fergus Williams Starnes, William Irwin, Kyle Pozan, David Reust, Agatha Petersy, Brad Bultman, Ross Titzer, Haley Schumacher, Justin Zimmerman, Chris Lang, Elizabeth Ngyen, Michael McGinley, Stephanie Jones, Amy Hanson, and Georgeanne Oliver appeared for various Defendants. Status Conference held. The Court ruled on several issues on the record that will be reflected in a separate summary order. (Court Reporter Liberty Recording.) (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 2, 2014 Filing 798 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Nieder on behalf of Nooter Corporation (Nieder, Douglas)
July 2, 2014 Filing 797 CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Special Electric Company, Inc..(Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 796 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Special Electric Company, Inc.. (Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 795 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Special Electric Company, Inc..(Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 794 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Special Electric Company, Inc.. (Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 793 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica K. Velez on behalf of Special Electric Company, Inc. (Velez, Jessica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 792 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Szlanfucht on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Szlanfucht, David)
July 2, 2014 Filing 791 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Maassen on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. (Maassen, Stephen)
July 2, 2014 Filing 790 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paccar, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
July 2, 2014 Filing 789 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by Paccar, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
July 2, 2014 Filing 788 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The WM Powell Company. (Newport, Michael)
July 2, 2014 Filing 787 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Paccar, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
July 2, 2014 Filing 786 Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by The WM Powell Company.(Newport, Michael)
July 2, 2014 Filing 785 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of The WM Powell Company (Newport, Michael)
July 1, 2014 Filing 784 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Henry Pratt Company (Tayyab, Julia)
July 1, 2014 Filing 783 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Tayyab, Julia)
July 1, 2014 Filing 782 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of The WM Powell Company (Dauphin, Michael)
July 1, 2014 Filing 781 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi Kern Oertle on behalf of Deere & Company (Oertle, Heidi)
June 30, 2014 Filing 780 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Casmere on behalf of Owens Illinois Inc. (Casmere, Edward)
June 30, 2014 Filing 779 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian O'Connor Watson on behalf of Owens Illinois Inc. (Watson, Brian)
June 30, 2014 Filing 778 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Fischer on behalf of Owens Illinois Inc. (Fischer, Matthew)
June 30, 2014 Filing 777 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owens Illinois Inc.. (Fischer, Matthew)
June 30, 2014 Filing 776 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Buffalo Air Handling (Flatt, Gregory)
June 30, 2014 Filing 775 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Flatt, Gregory)
June 30, 2014 Filing 774 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Flatt, Gregory)
June 30, 2014 Filing 773 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Flatt, Gregory)
June 30, 2014 Filing 772 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Riley Stoker Corporation (Flatt, Gregory)
June 30, 2014 Filing 771 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Certainteed Corporation (Flatt, Gregory)
June 30, 2014 Filing 770 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Flatt, Gregory)
June 30, 2014 Filing 769 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Flatt, Gregory)
June 30, 2014 Filing 768 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Lennox Industries, Inc. (Flatt, Gregory)
June 30, 2014 Filing 767 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles)
June 27, 2014 Filing 766 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of The Fairbanks Company (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 765 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 764 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 763 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of All Acquisitions, LLC (Flatt, Gregory)
June 27, 2014 Filing 762 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Brummond on behalf of Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. (Brummond, Robert)
June 24, 2014 Filing 761 ANSWER to Crossclaim Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Cross-Claims by Fort Kent Holdings, Inc..(Pozan, Kyle)
June 24, 2014 Filing 760 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Pozan on behalf of Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. (Pozan, Kyle)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 759 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/9/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2015. Jury Trial set for month of 11/2015 in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 6/24/14. (amv)
June 24, 2014 Filing 758 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/2/2014 01:30 PM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. The Court will discuss the status of pending motions, with the exception of the pending Motion regarding personal jurisdiction, (Doc. 705) which will not be addressed until ripe. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 24, 2014 Filing 757 NOTICE by American Optical Corporation Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court MTD)(Zahalsky, Debra)
June 24, 2014 Filing 756 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Optical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Coast Holdings Inc for American Optical Corporation. (Zahalsky, Debra)
June 24, 2014 Filing 755 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra K. Zahalsky on behalf of American Optical Corporation (Zahalsky, Debra)
June 24, 2014 Filing 754 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Brown, Jr on behalf of American Optical Corporation (Brown, Joseph)
June 24, 2014 Filing 753 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #719 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Howden North America, Inc. Filer incorrectly added Howden North America, Inc., as Corporate Parent and should have added Colfax Corporation. Docket entry has been corrected. No further action required by filer. (mar)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 24, 2014 Filing 752 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Fischer on behalf of Deere & Company (Fischer, Matthew)
June 24, 2014 Filing 751 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Casmere on behalf of Deere & Company (Casmere, Edward)
June 24, 2014 Filing 750 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian O'Connor Watson on behalf of Deere & Company (Watson, Brian)
June 24, 2014 Filing 749 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deere & Company. (Reust, Davin)
June 24, 2014 Filing 748 NOTICE of Appearance by Davin Maitland Reust on behalf of Deere & Company (Reust, Davin)
June 24, 2014 Filing 747 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #715 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #725 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #716 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #728 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #713 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #722 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #708 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #714 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #726 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #718 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #729 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #721 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #724 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #723 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #727 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #720 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #711 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #712 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #709 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. See attached document for specifics (msd, )
June 24, 2014 Filing 746 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Cable Industries, Inc.. (Bronsky, A.)
June 24, 2014 Filing 745 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #744 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kelsey-Hayes Company. See attached document for specifics. (mar)
June 24, 2014 Filing 744 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 745 - Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kelsey-Hayes Company. (Voss, Andrew) Modified on 6/24/2014 (mar).
June 23, 2014 Filing 743 MOTION for Order toVoluntary Dismissal of Cross Claim against all Defendants by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 742 MOTION for Order toVoluntary Dismissal of Cross Claim against all Defendants by Fluor Constructors International, Inc.. (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 741 MOTION for Order toVoluntary Dismissal of Cross Claim against all Defendants by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc.. (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 740 MOTION for Order toVoluntary Dismissal of Cross Claim against all Defendants by Fluor Corporation. (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 739 MOTION for Order toVoluntary Dismissal of Cross Claim against all Defendants by Daniel International Corporation. (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 738 MOTION to Dismiss all Cross Claims against it as Moot by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 737 MOTION to Dismiss all Cross Claims against it as Moot by Fluor Constructors International, Inc.. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 736 MOTION to Dismiss all Cross Claims against it as Moot by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc.. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 735 MOTION to Dismiss all Cross Claims against it as Moot by Fluor Corporation. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 734 MOTION to Dismiss all Cross Claims against it as Moot by Daniel International Corporation. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Starnes, William)
June 23, 2014 Filing 733 MOTION to Dismiss Request for Order of Voluntary Dismissal of Crossclaims by Johnson Controls, Inc.. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Welply, Justin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 732 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Bauman on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Bauman, Mark)
June 23, 2014 Filing 731 RESPONSE to #620 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company). (Bronsky, A.)
June 23, 2014 Filing 730 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Thames, Earl)
June 23, 2014 Filing 729 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Treco Construction Services, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 728 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Swindell Dressler International Co. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 727 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Sprinkmann Sons Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 726 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Sears Roebuck & Co. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 725 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Rogers Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 724 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Resco Holdings, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 723 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Nibco, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 722 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Kelly Moore Painte Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 721 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal J.H. France Refractories Co. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 720 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Harper International, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 719 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Howden North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation (Dawson, Kevin) Modified on 6/24/2014 (mar).
June 23, 2014 Filing 718 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Goodyear Canada, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 717 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burnham, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Burnham Holdings, Inc. for Burnham, LLC. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 716 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Duro Dyne Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 715 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Cytec Industries, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 714 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal The Coleman Company, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 713 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Cooper Industries, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 712 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Chicago Gasket Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 711 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Avocet Enterprises, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 710 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Voss on behalf of Kelsey-Hayes Company (Voss, Andrew)
June 23, 2014 Filing 709 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Asbestos Corporation Limited by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 23, 2014 Filing 708 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOCUMENT 747 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Advanced Composites Group by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/24/2014 (msd).
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER re #609 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #648 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #616 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #618 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #632 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #640 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #605 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #641 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #637 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #620 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #611 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #627 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #652 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #635 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #623 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #647 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #650 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #642 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #621 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #639 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #630 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #645 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #651 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #638 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #613 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #614 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #628 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #622 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #608 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #612 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #626 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #619 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #625 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #624 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #633 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #631 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #629 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #634 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #606 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #615 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #617 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #646 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #643 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake, #607 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 6/20/14. (amv)
June 20, 2014 Filing 706 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint, Answers to Cross-claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bird Incorporated.(Kidd, Anita)
June 20, 2014 Filing 705 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Clow Corporation. Responses due by 7/24/2014 (Geraci, Carl)
June 20, 2014 Filing 704 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Answers to Cross-claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Kidd, Anita)
June 20, 2014 Filing 703 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #700 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
June 20, 2014 Filing 702 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #699 Motion for Discovery filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
June 20, 2014 Filing 701 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer, Inc.. (O'Malley, Kevin)
June 19, 2014 Filing 700 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC. 703 - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Helen Pearl Shewmake.(Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/20/2014 (bkl).
June 19, 2014 Filing 699 MOTION for Discovery by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/20/2014 (bkl).
June 19, 2014 Filing 698 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 19, 2014 Filing 697 RESPONSE to #640 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Universal Refractories, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 19, 2014 Filing 696 RESPONSE to #609 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Beazer East, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 19, 2014 Filing 695 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison K. Sonneveld on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Navistar International, Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Sonneveld, Allison)
June 19, 2014 Filing 694 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Navistar International, Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
June 19, 2014 Filing 693 RESPONSE to #636 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower). (Stevens, Kyler)
June 18, 2014 Filing 692 RESPONSE To Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Kvaerner U.S., Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 18, 2014 Filing 691 RESPONSE To Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Bonney Forge Corporation. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 18, 2014 Filing 690 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Navistar International, Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 17, 2014 Filing 689 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Gasket Company. (Callaghan, Amy)
June 17, 2014 Filing 688 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 687 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Navistar International (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 686 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 685 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 684 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 683 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole E. Rice on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Rice, Nicole)
June 17, 2014 Filing 682 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Howden North America, Inc..(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 681 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Conwed Corporation.(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 680 Burnham LLC's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Burnham, LLC.(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 679 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rogers Corporation. (Irwin, William)
June 17, 2014 Filing 678 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Rogers Corporation.(Irwin, William)
June 17, 2014 Filing 677 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dap, Inc.. (Irwin, William)
June 17, 2014 Filing 676 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Dap, Inc..(Irwin, William)
June 17, 2014 Filing 675 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Irwin, William)
June 17, 2014 Filing 674 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Rogers Corporation (Irwin, William)
June 17, 2014 Filing 673 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc. (Irwin, William)
June 17, 2014 Filing 672 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Irwin, William)
June 17, 2014 Filing 671 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Irwin on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Irwin, William)
June 17, 2014 Filing 670 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conwed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Leucadia, LLC for Conwed Corporation. (Graber, Dennis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 669 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Howden North America, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 668 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 667 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Copes-Vulcan, Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 666 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Conwed Corporation (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 665 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Burnham, LLC (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 664 STIPULATION of Dismissal Columbia Boiler Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 663 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K Beasley on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Beasley, Laura)
June 13, 2014 Filing 662 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor A. Sondag on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Sondag, Trevor)
June 12, 2014 Filing 661 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Marie Callaghan on behalf of Chicago Gasket Company (Callaghan, Amy)
June 12, 2014 Filing 660 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer To Cross Claims, Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Sepco Corporation.(Fergus, Sean)
June 12, 2014 Filing 659 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sepco Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc. for Sepco Corporation. (Fergus, Sean)
June 12, 2014 Filing 658 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Fergus on behalf of Sepco Corporation (Fergus, Sean)
June 12, 2014 Filing 657 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Copes-Vulcan, Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
June 11, 2014 Filing 656 ANSWER to Complaint by Metallo Gasket Co..(Bettcher, Karen)
June 10, 2014 Filing 655 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Cable Industries, Inc..(Bronsky, A.)
June 10, 2014 Filing 654 NOTICE of Appearance by A. J. Bronsky on behalf of General Cable Industries, Inc. (Bronsky, A.)
June 10, 2014 Filing 653 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Graber, Dennis)
June 10, 2014 Filing 652 STIPULATION of Dismissal Whiting Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 651 STIPULATION of Dismissal Fluor Enterprises, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 650 STIPULATION of Dismissal Fluor Daniel Illinois Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 649 Goulds Pumps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Graber, Dennis)
June 10, 2014 Filing 648 STIPULATION of Dismissal Fluor Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 647 STIPULATION of Dismissal Fluor Constructors International Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2014 Filing 646 STIPULATION of Dismissal Daniel International Corp. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 645 STIPULATION of Dismissal Baltimore Aircoil Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 644 CROSSCLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTIONS AND ANSWER TO ANTICIPATED CROSS-CLAIMS against All Defendants, filed by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
June 9, 2014 Filing 643 STIPULATION of Dismissal Young Group, LTD by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 642 STIPULATION of Dismissal XEF, Inc. fka Electric Furnace Co. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 641 STIPULATION of Dismissal Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 640 STIPULATION of Dismissal Universal Refractories, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 639 STIPULATION of Dismissal Thermwell Products Co., Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 638 STIPULATION of Dismissal Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 637 STIPULATION of Dismissal Superior Boiler Works, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 636 STIPULATION of Dismissal SPX Cooling TEchnologies, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 635 STIPULATION of Dismissal Seco Warwick Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 634 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rockwell Automation, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 633 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rheem Manufacturing by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 632 STIPULATION of Dismissal Research-Cottrell, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 631 STIPULATION of Dismissal Plastics Engineering Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 630 STIPULATION of Dismissal Milwaukee Valve Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 629 STIPULATION of Dismissal Lindberg by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 628 STIPULATION of Dismissal Lattner Boiler Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 627 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kvaerner U.S., Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 626 STIPULATION of Dismissal Johnston Boiler Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 625 STIPULATION of Dismissal Johnson Controls, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 624 STIPULATION of Dismissal Honeywell, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 623 STIPULATION of Dismissal Homsate Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 622 STIPULATION of Dismissal Grimes Aerospace Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 621 STIPULATION of Dismissal Graybar Electric Company, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 620 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ferro Engineering by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 619 STIPULATION of Dismissal DeWitt Products Co. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 618 STIPULATION of Dismissal Compudyne Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 617 STIPULATION of Dismissal Columbia Boiler Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 616 STIPULATION of Dismissal Chicago Bridge & Iron Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 615 STIPULATION of Dismissal Carboline Company by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 614 STIPULATION of Dismissal Brand Insulation, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 613 STIPULATION of Dismissal Bonney Forge Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 612 STIPULATION of Dismissal Bechtel Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 611 STIPULATION of Dismissal Bechtel Construction by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 610 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #604 Amended Complaint filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. Filer should have filed the document as a Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; however, the filer selected the event Amended Complaint. Docket entry STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. Document to be re-filed as a Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The proposed order and proposed Ameneded Complaint should be e-mailed to the appropriate Judge's e-mail address and NOT FILED with the Motion entry. (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 6, 2014 Filing 609 STIPULATION of Dismissal Beazer East, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 608 STIPULATION of Dismissal API Heat Transfer, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 607 STIPULATION of Dismissal A.O. Smith Corporation by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 606 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ajax Magnethermic Corp. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 605 STIPULATION of Dismissal Aerco International, Inc. by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
June 6, 2014 Filing 604 ENTRY STRICKEN - AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Parties, filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake.(Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/9/2014 (tkm ).
June 6, 2014 Filing 603 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Dewitt Products Co. (Dauphin, Michael)
June 5, 2014 Filing 602 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Navistar International.(Jones, Kirra)
June 5, 2014 Filing 601 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Kvaerner U.S., Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
June 5, 2014 Filing 600 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Honeywell International, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
June 5, 2014 Filing 599 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
June 5, 2014 Filing 598 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Bonney Forge Corporation.(Jones, Kirra)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER quashing #588 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; quashing #593 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Pursuant to the Order at Doc. 527, these Motions are QUASHED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 06/04/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 3, 2014 Filing 596 CROSSCLAIM for Contibution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of any other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC.(Alva, Charles)
June 3, 2014 Filing 595 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC. (Alva, Charles)
June 3, 2014 Filing 594 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC.(Alva, Charles)
June 3, 2014 Filing 593 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC. (Alva, Charles)
June 3, 2014 Filing 592 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Alva on behalf of Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC (Alva, Charles)
June 3, 2014 Filing 591 CROSSCLAIM for Contibution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of any other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Peerless Industries, Inc..(Alva, Charles)
June 3, 2014 Filing 590 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peerless Industries, Inc.. (Alva, Charles)
June 3, 2014 Filing 589 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Peerless Industries, Inc..(Alva, Charles)
June 3, 2014 Filing 588 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Peerless Industries, Inc.. (Alva, Charles)
June 3, 2014 Filing 587 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Alva on behalf of Peerless Industries, Inc. (Alva, Charles)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER quashing #578 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Pursuant to the Court's order at Doc. 527, this Motion is QUASHED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 06/03/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 2, 2014 Filing 585 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Thermwell Products Co., Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
June 2, 2014 Filing 584 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pfizer, Inc..(O'Malley, Kevin)
June 2, 2014 Filing 583 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin F. O'Malley on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (O'Malley, Kevin)
June 2, 2014 Filing 582 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel)
June 2, 2014 Filing 581 CROSSCLAIM for Contibution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of any other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by AERCO International, Inc..(Eisenberg, Brent)
June 2, 2014 Filing 580 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AERCO International, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Brent)
June 2, 2014 Filing 579 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by AERCO International, Inc..(Eisenberg, Brent)
June 2, 2014 Filing 578 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by AERCO International, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Brent)
June 2, 2014 Filing 577 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Eisenberg on behalf of AERCO International, Inc. (Eisenberg, Brent)
June 2, 2014 Filing 576 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 30, 2014 Filing 575 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Filing 574 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Copes-Vulcan.(McGrath, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Filing 573 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Copes-Vulcan. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER denying #129 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 5/27/14. (amv)
May 29, 2014 Filing 571 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Superior Boiler Works, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 29, 2014 Filing 570 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Company (Dauphin, Michael)
May 28, 2014 Filing 569 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company) identifying Corporate Parent Oglebay Norton Company for Ferro Engineering. (Bronsky, A.)
May 27, 2014 Filing 568 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #564 Notice of Appearance filed by Conwed Corporation, #566 Notice of Appearance filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc., #563 Notice of Appearance filed by Howden North America, Inc., #565 Notice of Appearance filed by Burnham, LLC. See attached document for specifics (mar)
May 27, 2014 Filing 566 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Filing 565 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Burnham, LLC (Graber, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Filing 564 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Conwed Corporation (Graber, Dennis)
May 27, 2014 Filing 563 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Howden North America, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
May 23, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Ferro Engineering. (See Doc. 557 for complete PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket - see NOE at Doc. 567.(bkl)
May 23, 2014 Filing 567 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #557 Answer to Complaint filed by Ferro Engineering. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
May 23, 2014 Filing 562 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Research-Cottrell, Inc.. (Page, David)
May 23, 2014 Filing 561 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watson McDaniel Company. (Blaser, Tucker)
May 23, 2014 Filing 560 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff, Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Watson McDaniel Company.(Blaser, Tucker)
May 23, 2014 Filing 559 NOTICE of Appearance by Tucker Blaser on behalf of Watson McDaniel Company (Blaser, Tucker)
May 23, 2014 Filing 558 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Cunningham on behalf of Watson McDaniel Company (Cunningham, John)
May 23, 2014 Filing 557 ANSWER to Complaint cross-claims against all defendants and answer to all cross-claims; CROSSCLAIM against all defendants by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company).(Bronsky, A.) Modified on 5/27/2014 to reflect correct filing events (bkl).
May 22, 2014 Filing 556 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Pecora Corporation (Page, David)
May 22, 2014 Filing 555 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Research-Cottrell, Inc. (Page, David)
May 22, 2014 Filing 554 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of KCG, Inc. (Page, David)
May 22, 2014 Filing 553 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of AWC 1997 Corporation (Page, David)
May 22, 2014 Filing 552 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Mueller Steam Specialty Company (Page, David)
May 21, 2014 Filing 551 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. McGrath on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 21, 2014 Filing 550 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. McGrath on behalf of Copes-Vulcan (McGrath, Daniel)
May 20, 2014 Filing 549 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McMaster-Carr Supply Company. (McGinley, Michael)
May 20, 2014 Filing 548 McMaster-Carr Supply Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by McMaster-Carr Supply Company.(McGinley, Michael)
May 16, 2014 Filing 547 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2014 re #364 MOTION Motion for Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) filed by Brand Insulations, Inc., #389 MOTION MOTION to Continue filed by Honeywell International, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Homasote Company, The Dow Chemical Company, #395 MOTION for Joinder In Union Carbide Corp. Motion to Have Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to FRCP 5(c)(1)(B), Alternatively, Motion to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims filed by CBS Corporation, #354 MOTION Motion for Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) filed by Brand Insulations, Inc.. (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.) (amv)
May 16, 2014 Filing 546 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Cloud on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Buffalo Air Handling (Cloud, Patrick)
May 16, 2014 Filing 545 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Homasote Company, Honeywell, Inc. (Zimmerman, Justin)
May 16, 2014 Filing 544 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Morris on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Homasote Company, Honeywell, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation (Morris, Matthew)
May 16, 2014 Filing 543 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Zimmerman, Justin)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #524 , #525 , #530 . #535 and #536 , mooting #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Foseco, Inc., #304 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oakfabco, Inc., #299 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Sherwin Williams Company, and #154 MOTION to Dismiss Count V and VI filed by Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. and #310 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Harco Laboratories, Incorporated. Foseco, Inc., Harco Laboratories Incorporated, Oakfabco, Inc., The Sherwin Williams Company and Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. dismissed. Each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 5/15/14. (amv)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER withdrawing #391 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting #538 Motion to Withdraw; granting #539 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing #37 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 05/15/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 14, 2014 Filing 540 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Crane Company (Wilson, Benjamin)
May 14, 2014 Filing 539 MOTION to Withdraw #391 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. (Geraci, Carl)
May 14, 2014 Filing 538 MOTION to Withdraw #37 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, MW Custom Papers, LLC., Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Whiting Corporation. (Geraci, Carl)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER granting #534 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing #36 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 05/14/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 14, 2014 Filing 536 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson)
May 14, 2014 Filing 535 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson)
May 14, 2014 Filing 534 MOTION to Withdraw #36 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Illinois Tool Works, Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Devcon Corp.). (Geraci, Carl)
May 14, 2014 Filing 533 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 532 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Simpson Timber Company (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 531 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Johnston Boiler Company (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 530 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson)
May 14, 2014 Filing 529 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of XEF, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Filing 528 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER regarding filing of Answers and discovery requests. The Court ORDERS that Defendants need not seek leave to file an Answer if they have already filed an Answer in state court previously. All Defendants may file their Answers in this Court if they have previously filed an Answer in state court and the Answer will be deemed timely filed. As to discovery requests, the parties need not seek leave of Court to extend deadlines for discovery requests or responses to discovery requests if the parties agree to such extensions. Parties need only seek leave of Court if the parties cannot agree on the extension or if parties seek to extend the discovery cutoff date or dispositive motion deadline. Further motions seeking such relief will be QUASHED by this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 05/14/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER granting #503 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #504 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #505 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #506 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #507 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court deems the defendants' answers timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 05/14/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 14, 2014 Filing 525 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson)
May 14, 2014 Filing 524 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Helen Pearl Shewmake (Romani, Allyson)
May 14, 2014 Filing 523 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #500 Notice of Appearance filed by McMaster-Carr Supply Company. Attorney Michael McGinley was only added as Attorney of Record for 1 Cross Defendant appearance of McMaster-Carr Supply Company. Upon speaking with the office of Mr. McGinley, he should represent McMaster-Carr Supply Company in every instance. Attorney McGinley has been added to all McMaster-Carr Supply Company parties. This notice is for information only and no further action is required by the filer. (kek)
May 13, 2014 Filing 522 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen E Bettcher on behalf of Metallo Gasket Co. (Bettcher, Karen)
May 13, 2014 Filing 521 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Thomas Walsh on behalf of Curtiss Wright Corporation (Walsh, Steven)
May 13, 2014 Filing 520 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Starnes, II on behalf of Daniel International Corporation (Starnes, William)
May 13, 2014 Filing 519 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Starnes, II on behalf of Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Starnes, William)
May 13, 2014 Filing 518 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel International Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 517 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Constructors International, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 516 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Pump, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Houdaille Industries, Inc. for Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
May 13, 2014 Filing 515 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 514 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 513 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 512 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Daniel International Corporation.(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 511 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Constructors International, Inc..(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 510 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc..(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 509 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 508 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Corporation.(Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 507 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Daniel International Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 506 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Constructors International, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 505 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 504 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 503 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fluor Corporation. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 502 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Skelton on behalf of Daniel International Corporation (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 501 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Skelton on behalf of Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Skelton, Bryan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 500 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick McGinley on behalf of McMaster-Carr Supply Company (McGinley, Michael)
May 2, 2014 Filing 499 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XEF, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent XEF, Inc. for XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc., XEF, Inc.. (Newport, Michael)
April 30, 2014 Filing 498 ANSWER to Complaint by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Johnson, Dayna)
April 29, 2014 Filing 497 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grimes Aerospace Corporation. (Ruzicka, Derek)
April 23, 2014 Filing 496 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Thomas on behalf of Grimes Aerospace Corporation (Thomas, William)
April 23, 2014 Filing 495 CROSSCLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Any and All Cross-Claims and Cross-Claim for Contribution against All Defendants, filed by Grimes Aerospace Corporation.(Ruzicka, Derek)
April 23, 2014 Filing 494 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Grimes Aerospace Corporation.(Ruzicka, Derek)
April 23, 2014 Filing 493 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ruzicka on behalf of Grimes Aerospace Corporation (Ruzicka, Derek)
April 21, 2014 Filing 492 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ruzicka on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Ruzicka, Derek)
April 21, 2014 Filing 491 CROSSCLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Any and All Cross-Claims and Cross-Claim for Contribution against All Defendants, filed by Eaton Corporation.(Lang, Christopher)
April 21, 2014 Filing 490 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation. (Lang, Christopher)
April 21, 2014 Filing 489 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Lang on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Lang, Christopher)
April 21, 2014 Filing 488 CROSSCLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Any and All Cross-Claims and Cross-Claim for Contribution against All Defendants, filed by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC(successoe-by-merger to Eaton Aeroquip, Inc., f/k/a Aeroquip Corporation).(Lang, Christopher)
April 21, 2014 Filing 487 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Lang on behalf of Eaton Aeroquip, LLC(successoe-by-merger to Eaton Aeroquip, Inc., f/k/a Aeroquip Corporation) (Lang, Christopher)
April 21, 2014 Filing 486 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ruzicka on behalf of Eaton Aeroquip, LLC(successoe-by-merger to Eaton Aeroquip, Inc., f/k/a Aeroquip Corporation) (Ruzicka, Derek)
April 18, 2014 Filing 485 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, Answers to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Domco Products Texas, Inc..(Veath, Beth)
April 18, 2014 Filing 484 ANSWER to Complaint /All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Advanced Composites Group, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquisitions, LLC, American Cyanamid, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Bonney Forge Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, CIBA Giegy, Carboline Company, Carlisle Industrial Brake and Friction, Inc, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Cytec Industries, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dewitt Products Co., Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grimes Aerospace Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henkel Corporation, Hennessy Industries, Inc., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., J.H. France Refractories Co, John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Owens Illinois Inc., Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rogers Corporation, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Co., The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The Nash Engineering Company, The Sherwin Williams Company, The WM Powell Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, LTD, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Johnson, Dayna)
April 18, 2014 Filing 483 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Chicago Bridge & Iron Company (Meyer, Julie)
April 18, 2014 Filing 482 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Bird Incorporated (Meyer, Julie)
April 18, 2014 Filing 481 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Ajax Magnethermic Corp. (Meyer, Julie)
April 17, 2014 Filing 480 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward E. Johnston on behalf of Dewitt Products Co. (Johnston, Edward)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 479 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/9/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 4/16/14. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of the Parties)(amv)
April 16, 2014 Filing 478 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #310 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #389 MOTION MOTION to Continue , #129 MOTION to Remand , #36 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #37 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #354 MOTION Motion for Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) , #304 MOTION to Dismiss , #364 MOTION Motion for Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) , #391 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e), #395 MOTION for Joinder In Union Carbide Corp. Motion to Have Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to FRCP 5(c)(1)(B), Alternatively, Motion to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims, #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #154 MOTION to Dismiss Count V and VI, #299 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2014 at 11:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 16, 2014 Filing 476 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dewitt Products Co.. (Johnston, Edward)
April 14, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Maremont Corporation. (See Doc. 475 for complete PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket. (bkl)
April 14, 2014 Filing 477 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Discovery Hearing held on 4/14/2014. Allyson Romani for Plaintiff. Kyle Stevens, Will Irwin, Melanie Riley, Sean Fergus, Chuck Joley, Julia Douglas, Meredith Hudgens, Kirra Jones, Julie Fix Meyers, Stephanie Jones, Carl Geraci, Justin Weply, Derek Ruzicka, Ted Agniel, Keith Hill, Amy Hansen, Michael Dauphin for defendants. Court adopts proposed scheduling order as modified in pars. 3,4, and 8. Case set for in-court hearing on pending motions on 5/16/14 at 11:00 a.m. (Court Reporter n/a.) (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 14, 2014 Filing 475 ANSWER to Complaint , Cross-Claims, Answers to All, CROSSCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against Maremont Corporation by Maremont Corporation.(Barke, Ryan)
April 14, 2014 Filing 474 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan T. Barke on behalf of Maremont Corporation (Barke, Ryan)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER granting #433 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #437 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #443 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #447 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #451 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #455 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #455 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #459 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #464 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #469 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Pursuant to FRCP 81(c), repleading is unneccessary. Therefore, the Court deems Defendants' responsive pleadings timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 04/14/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 14, 2014 Filing 472 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Spitkovsky, Jr on behalf of Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spitkovsky, Robert)
April 14, 2014 Filing 471 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Carrier Corporation.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 470 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hansen, Amy) Modified on 4/15/2014 (jlrr ).
April 14, 2014 Filing 469 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, Crossclaims, and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Carrier Corporation. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 468 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Carrier Corporation. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 467 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 466 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of General Electric Company (Meyer, Julie)
April 14, 2014 Filing 465 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Carlisle Industrial Brake and Friction, Inc.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 464 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, Crossclaims, and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Carlisle Industrial Brake and Friction, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 463 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carlisle Industrial Brake and Friction, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 462 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Carlisle Industrial Brake and Friction, Inc (Stevens, Kyler)
April 14, 2014 Filing 461 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Illinois Tool Works, Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Devcon Corp.), Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., MW Custom Papers, LLC., Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Whiting Corporation (Geraci, Carl)
April 11, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. (See Doc. 436 for comple6e PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket. (bkl)
April 11, 2014 Filing 460 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Universal Refractories, Inc. by Universal Refractories, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 459 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Universal Refractories, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 458 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Universal Refractories, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 457 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Universal Refractories, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 456 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Beazer East, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 455 MOTION for Extension of Time , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Beazer East, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 454 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beazer East, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HBMA HOLDINGS LLC for Beazer East, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 453 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Beazer East, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 452 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower).(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 451 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower). (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 450 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower). (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 449 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Marley Cooling Tower) (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 448 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Crossclaims; against A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Advanced Composites Group, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquisitions, LLC, American Cyanamid, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Bonney Forge Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, CIBA Giegy, Carboline Company, Carlisle Industrial Brake and Friction, Inc, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Cytec Industries, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dewitt Products Co., Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grimes Aerospace Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henkel Corporation, Hennessy Industries, Inc., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., J.H. France Refractories Co, John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Owens Illinois Inc., Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rogers Corporation, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Co., The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The Nash Engineering Company, The Sherwin Williams Company, The WM Powell Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, LTD, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Columbia Boiler Company.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 447 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Columbia Boiler Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 446 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbia Boiler Company identifying Corporate Parent Vari Corporation for Columbia Boiler Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 445 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Columbia Boiler Company (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 444 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM to all defendants, and Answers to Crossclaims against A.O. Smith Corporation, AERCO International, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Advanced Composites Group, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., All Acquisitions, LLC, American Cyanamid, American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Boeing Company, The, Bonney Forge Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, CIBA Giegy, Carboline Company, Carlisle Industrial Brake and Friction, Inc, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Clark Equipment Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Clow Corporation, The Coleman Company, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Curtiss Wright Corporation, Cytec Industries, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Deere & Company, Dewitt Products Co., Dezurik, Domco Products Texas, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Fairbanks Company, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foxboro Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grimes Aerospace Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Harco Laboratories, Incorporated, Harper International Corp., Henkel Corporation, Hennessy Industries, Inc., Henry Pratt Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Hyster Company, ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., J.H. France Refractories Co, John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Kvaerner U.S., Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers, LLC., Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Navistar International, Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Owens Illinois Inc., Paccar, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Company, RIC-WIL, Inc., Resco Holdings, LLC., Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rogers Corporation, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sears Roebuck & Co., Seco Warwick Corporation, Simpson Timber Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Stewart Warner Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Co., The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The Nash Engineering Company, The Sherwin Williams Company, The WM Powell Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co., Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Inc., Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Whiting Corporation, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, LTD, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 443 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 442 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 441 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 440 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Curtiss Wright Corporation. (Sugg, Reed)
April 11, 2014 Filing 439 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Curtiss Wright Corporation.(Sugg, Reed)
April 11, 2014 Filing 438 NOTICE of Appearance by Reed W. Sugg on behalf of Curtiss Wright Corporation (Sugg, Reed)
April 11, 2014 Filing 437 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law and Cross-Claims by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 436 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 435 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 434 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 433 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law and Cross-Claims by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 432 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Rockwell Automation, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 431 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
April 11, 2014 Filing 430 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 429 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Navistar International (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 428 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 427 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 426 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation (Dobbels, Dennis)
April 10, 2014 Filing 425 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Domco Products Texas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tarkett Enterprises Inc. for Domco Products Texas, Inc.. (Veath, Beth)
April 10, 2014 Filing 424 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Domco Products Texas, Inc.. (Veath, Beth)
April 10, 2014 Filing 423 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Kamp Veath on behalf of Domco Products Texas, Inc. (Veath, Beth)
April 10, 2014 Filing 422 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #421 Notice of Appearance filed by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. The incorrect party was selected by filer. Both the docket sheet and the docket entry have been corrected to reflect Carla C. Storm enters her appearance on behalf of Armstrong International Inc. THIS NOTICE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY.(drb)
April 10, 2014 Filing 421 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla C. Storm on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Storm, Carla) Modified on 4/10/2014 (drb).
April 10, 2014 Filing 420 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #417 Notice of Appearance filed by Armstrong International, Inc.. Signature or "s/ " signature omitted from document. Entry stricken. Document to be refiled with proper signature.(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 9, 2014 Filing 419 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Storm, Carla)
April 9, 2014 Filing 418 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross Claim against All Defendants by Armstrong International, Inc..(Storm, Carla)
April 9, 2014 Filing 417 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Carla C. Storm on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Storm, Carla) Modified on 4/10/2014 (jaj).
April 9, 2014 Filing 416 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #403 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Pneumo Abex, LLC. Filer selected "all parties" instead of "all defendants" at the time of filing. This created a cross-defendant designation for the plaintiff. Clerk's office has removed the plaintiff's party designation as cross-defendant. (anm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 8, 2014 Filing 415 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #406 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Ford Motor Company. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
April 8, 2014 Filing 414 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of York International Corporation (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 413 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 412 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Invensys Systems, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 411 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 410 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 409 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 408 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Stewart Warner Corporation (Welply, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Filing 407 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc (Welply, Justin)
April 7, 2014 Filing 406 ANSWER to Complaint Answers to All Cross Claims, Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ford Motor Company.(Ybarra, David)
April 7, 2014 Filing 405 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #388 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Motion to Continue filed by Honeywell, Inc. Filer did not select all parties represented and document is duplicative of Doc. 389. Doc. 389 is filed correctly. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 4, 2014 Filing 404 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simpson Timber Company. (Newport, Michael)
April 4, 2014 Filing 403 Pneumo Abex LLC ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pneumo Abex, LLC.(Titzer, Ross) Modified on 7/16/2014 (kek).
April 1, 2014 Filing 402 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Plastics Engineering Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
April 1, 2014 Filing 401 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Plastics Engineering Company (Bultman, Bradley)
March 31, 2014 Filing 400 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Bridge & Iron Company identifying Corporate Parent Chicago Bridge & Iron Company N.V., a Dutch Company for Chicago Bridge & Iron Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 31, 2014 Filing 399 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 31, 2014 Filing 398 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bird Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France for Bird Incorporated. (Fournie, Raymond)
March 28, 2014 Filing 397 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Corporate Parent The Weir Group PLC for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (Newport, Michael)
March 28, 2014 Filing 396 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnston Boiler Company. (Newport, Michael)
March 28, 2014 Filing 395 MOTION for Joinder In Union Carbide Corp. Motion to Have Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to FRCP 5(c)(1)(B), Alternatively, Motion to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims by CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
March 28, 2014 Filing 394 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #390 Notice of Appearance filed by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
March 27, 2014 Filing 393 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. (Chessler, Michael)
March 27, 2014 Filing 392 CROSSCLAIM Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses to any Counterclaims and Cross Claims for Contribution and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp..(Chessler, Michael)
March 27, 2014 Filing 391 WITHDRAWN per Order at Doc. 541: MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp.. (Chessler, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2014 (lmm).
March 27, 2014 Filing 390 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Chessler on behalf of Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp. (Chessler, Michael)
March 25, 2014 Filing 389 MOTION , MOTION to Continue by The Dow Chemical Company, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Homasote Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2014 Filing 388 ENTRY STRICKEN: MOTION to have all Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5(C)(1)(B), Alternatively, MOTION to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims by Honeywell, Inc.. (Bash, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/7/2014 (lmb).
March 25, 2014 Filing 387 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation(a Delaware corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp., f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp). (Donahue, Daniel)
March 24, 2014 Filing 386 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex, LLC. (Titzer, Ross)
March 24, 2014 Filing 385 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross S. Titzer on behalf of Pneumo Abex, LLC (Titzer, Ross)
March 20, 2014 Filing 384 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Henkel Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2014 Filing 383 REPLY to Response to Motion re #304 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Cowan, Tracy)
March 17, 2014 Filing 382 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of CBS Corporation (Dauphin, Michael)
March 17, 2014 Filing 381 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Superior Boiler Works, Inc.. (Denk, Lawrence)
March 14, 2014 Filing 380 RESPONSE in Opposition re #310 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Harco Laboratories, Inc. filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
March 14, 2014 Filing 379 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #373 Notice of Appearance filed by Milwaukee Valve Company. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
March 13, 2014 Filing 378 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Henkel Corporation (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2014 Filing 377 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Honeywell International Inc. for Honeywell, Inc.. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2014 Filing 376 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Honeywell Inc. for Honeywell, Inc.. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2014 Filing 375 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by Milwaukee Valve Company.(Denk, Lawrence)
March 13, 2014 Filing 374 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Milwaukee Valve Company. (Denk, Lawrence)
March 13, 2014 Filing 373 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Denk on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Company (Denk, Lawrence)
March 12, 2014 Filing 372 Corporate Disclosure Statement by API Heat Transfer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Danaher Corporation for API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER granting #359 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael F. Daniels terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 3/12/13.(amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 12, 2014 Filing 370 RESPONSE in Opposition re #299 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Sherwin-Williams Company filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
March 12, 2014 Filing 369 RESPONSE in Opposition re #304 MOTION to Dismiss Oakfabco, Inc. filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
March 10, 2014 Filing 368 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 4/14/2014 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #358 Motion to Continue Telephone Scheduling and Discovery Conference currently set for March 12, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Scheduling Conference will be reset by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 3/10/14. (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 10, 2014 Filing 366 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Nussbaumer on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
March 10, 2014 Filing 365 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Orris, Thomas)
March 10, 2014 Filing 364 MOTION Motion for Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) by Brand Insulations, Inc.. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 10, 2014 Filing 363 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brand Insulations, Inc.. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 10, 2014 Filing 362 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary D. Rychnovsky on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 10, 2014 Filing 361 Defendant Brand Insulations, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Brand Insulations, Inc..(Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 6, 2014 Filing 360 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #356 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Caterpillar, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Clow Corporation. See attached document for specifics (drb)
March 6, 2014 Filing 359 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), All Acquisitions, LLC, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Buffalo Air Handling, Carboline Company, Certainteed Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, The Fairbanks Company, Goodrich Corporation, Imo Industries, Inc., Lattner Boiler Company, Lennox Industries, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Riley Stoker Corporation, Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Seco Warwick Corporation(as successor-in-interest to Sunbeam Furnaces), Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC. (Daniels, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 358 MOTION to Continue Scheduling and Discovery Conference and to Extend Filing Date for Scheduling and Discovery Joint Report by Ajax Magnethermic Corp., Bird Incorporated, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, General Electric Company. (King, Melanie)
March 5, 2014 Filing 357 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Hultquist on behalf of Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. (Hultquist, Michael)
March 5, 2014 Filing 356 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION for More Definite Statement In Opposition filed by Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Chessler, Michael)
March 3, 2014 Filing 355 NOTICE by Brand Insulations, Inc. Notice of Filing (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 3, 2014 Filing 354 MOTION Motion for Institution of Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) by Brand Insulations, Inc.. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 3, 2014 Filing 353 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brand Insulations, Inc.. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 3, 2014 Filing 352 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary D. Rychnovsky on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
March 3, 2014 Filing 351 NOTICE by Brand Insulations, Inc. Notice of Filing (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
March 3, 2014 Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Nussbaumer on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
March 3, 2014 Filing 349 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Brand Insulations, Inc. (Orris, Thomas)
February 28, 2014 Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Donahue on behalf of CBS Corporation (Donahue, Daniel)
February 28, 2014 Filing 347 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #346 Supplement filed by CBS Corporation. See attached document for specifics (kek)
February 27, 2014 Filing 346 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 347 - SUPPLEMENT by CBS Corporation. Supplement to #280 Notice of Appearance . (Donahue, Daniel) Modified on 2/28/2014 (kek).
February 25, 2014 Filing 345 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated Crossclaims by Thermwell Products Co., Inc..(Bunnell, Nicholas)
February 25, 2014 Filing 344 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas B Bunnell on behalf of Thermwell Products Co., Inc. (Bunnell, Nicholas)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting #340 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court finds Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Co.'s Answer timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 02/24/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 21, 2014 Filing 342 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Thames, Earl)
February 21, 2014 Filing 341 ANSWER to Complaint by Rheem Manufacturing Company.(Thames, Earl)
February 21, 2014 Filing 340 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Thames, Earl)
February 20, 2014 Filing 339 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #335 Notice of Appearance filed by Superior Boiler Works, Inc. See attached document for specifics.(bkl)
February 20, 2014 Filing 338 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Riley on behalf of McMaster-Carr Supply Company (Riley, Melanie)
February 19, 2014 Filing 337 ANSWER to Complaint by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
February 19, 2014 Filing 336 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Superior Boiler Works, Inc..(Denk, Lawrence)
February 19, 2014 Filing 335 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Denk on behalf of Superior Boiler Works, Inc. (Denk, Lawrence)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting #316 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brett Carl Randol; Allison K. Sonneveld; Kathleen Ann Hardee and Kirra N. Jones terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 02/18/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER finding as moot #330 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. As Defendant filed their responsive pleading contemporeanously with this Motion, the Motion is moot. Since the Plaintiffs agreed to the Motion, the Court considers the responsive pleading timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 02/18/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 14, 2014 Filing 332 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.. (Douglas, Celia)
February 14, 2014 Filing 331 Defendant Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Individually And For Its Subsidiary Loftus Furnace Company's Answer And Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc..(Douglas, Celia)
February 14, 2014 Filing 330 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Individually And For Its Subsidiary Loftus Furnace Company's Motion For Extension Of Time To File Responsive Pleading by Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.. (Douglas, Celia)
February 14, 2014 Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by Celia K. Douglas on behalf of Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. (Douglas, Celia)
February 14, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger K. Heidenreich on behalf of Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. (Heidenreich, Roger)
February 12, 2014 Filing 327 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Dezurik.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 12, 2014 Filing 326 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Dezurik (Bultman, Bradley)
February 12, 2014 Filing 325 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Lindberg.(Bultman, Bradley)
February 12, 2014 Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Lindberg (Bultman, Bradley)
February 12, 2014 Filing 323 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #311 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Harco Laboratories, Incorporated. See attached document for specifics (tkm )
February 11, 2014 Filing 322 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Hatch, Mary)
February 11, 2014 Filing 321 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Smith, Gary)
February 11, 2014 Filing 320 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to All Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by J.A. Sexauer, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
February 11, 2014 Filing 319 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.A. Sexauer, Inc.. (Welply, Justin)
February 11, 2014 Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
February 11, 2014 Filing 317 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie F. Jones on behalf of API Heat Transfer, Inc. (Jones, Stephanie)
February 11, 2014 Filing 316 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Crane Company. (Jones, Kirra)
February 11, 2014 Filing 315 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Defendant, Foseco, Inc. filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
February 11, 2014 Filing 314 RESPONSE in Opposition re #154 MOTION to Dismiss Count V and VI as to Defendant Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
February 11, 2014 Filing 313 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
February 11, 2014 Filing 312 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Defendant Illinois Tool Works, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Devcon Corp. filed by Helen Pearl Shewmake. (Romani, Allyson)
February 10, 2014 Filing 311 MEMORANDUM in Support re #310 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Harco Laboratories, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ruzicka, Derek)
February 10, 2014 Filing 310 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Harco Laboratories, Incorporated. Responses due by 3/17/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ruzicka, Derek)
February 10, 2014 Filing 309 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re 303 Stipulation filed by Oakfabco, Inc. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting #302 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court will construe Oakfabco's responsive pleading at Doc. 304 timely filed. No other responsive pleading is required at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 02/10/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant shall file their responsive pleading instanter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 02/10/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 7, 2014 Filing 306 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Cowan, Tracy)
February 7, 2014 Filing 305 MEMORANDUM in Support re #304 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Cowan, Tracy)
February 7, 2014 Filing 304 MOTION to Dismiss by Oakfabco, Inc.. Responses due by 3/13/2014 (Cowan, Tracy)
February 7, 2014 Filing 303 STIPULATION for Consent to File Motion in Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Cowan, Tracy)
February 7, 2014 Filing 302 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Cowan, Tracy)
February 7, 2014 Filing 301 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #300 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Company. See attached document for specifics (kek)
February 6, 2014 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by Noel L. Smith, Jr on behalf of Crane Company (Smith, Noel)
February 6, 2014 Filing 299 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Sherwin Williams Company. Responses due by 3/13/2014 (Bruegger, John)
February 6, 2014 Filing 298 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Sherwin Williams Company. (Bruegger, John)
February 6, 2014 Filing 297 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 3/12/2014 at 10:30 AM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)
February 6, 2014 Filing 296 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Jury Trial set for month of 5/2015 in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 2/6/14. (amv)
February 5, 2014 Filing 295 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Fairbanks Company. (Daniels, Michael)
February 4, 2014 Filing 294 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homasote Company identifying Corporate Parent Homasote Company for Homasote Company. (Morris, Matthew)
February 4, 2014 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Morris on behalf of Homasote Company (Morris, Matthew)
January 31, 2014 Filing 292 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
January 31, 2014 Filing 291 ANSWER to Complaint by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
January 30, 2014 Filing 290 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc.. (Newton, Lise)
January 30, 2014 Filing 289 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc..(Newton, Lise)
January 30, 2014 Filing 288 NOTICE of Appearance by Lise A. Newton on behalf of Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. (Newton, Lise)
January 30, 2014 Filing 287 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Simpson Timber Company (Newport, Michael)
January 30, 2014 Filing 286 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, And Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Newport, Michael)
January 30, 2014 Filing 285 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Clark Equipment Company (Bultman, Bradley)
January 30, 2014 Filing 284 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Morris, Matthew)
January 30, 2014 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Morris on behalf of Graybar Electric Company, Inc. (Morris, Matthew)
January 30, 2014 Filing 282 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by CBS Corporation.(Sanderson, Robert)
January 30, 2014 Filing 281 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arvinmeritor, Inc.. (Johnson, Dayna)
January 30, 2014 Filing 280 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Sanderson on behalf of CBS Corporation (Sanderson, Robert)
January 29, 2014 Filing 279 NOTICE. Plaintiff is notified that in this judicial district, failure to timely respond to a motion may be considered an admission of the motion's merits. SDIL-LR 7.1(c); Whitfield v. Snyder, 263 Fed.Appx. 518, 521 (7th Cir. 2008). (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 29, 2014 Filing 278 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 277 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Simpson Timber Company.(Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 276 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Simpson Timber Company (Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 275 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Johnston Boiler Company.(Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Johnston Boiler Company (Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 273 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by XEF, Inc..(Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of XEF, Inc. (Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 271 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Dewitt Products Co..(Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 270 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of Dewitt Products Co. (Newport, Michael)
January 29, 2014 Filing 269 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
January 29, 2014 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie F. Jones on behalf of Hennessy Industries, Inc. (Jones, Stephanie)
January 28, 2014 Filing 267 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Picou, Curtis)
January 28, 2014 Filing 266 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles)
January 28, 2014 Filing 265 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles)
January 27, 2014 Filing 264 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Dow Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for The Dow Chemical Company. (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2014 Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2014 Filing 262 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Union Carbide Corporation for Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2014 Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2014 Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Honeywell, Inc. (Bash, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2014 Filing 259 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #241 Notice of Appearance filed by Clark Equipment Company. See attached document for specifics (msd)
January 24, 2014 Filing 258 RESPONSE in Opposition re #129 MOTION to Remand filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hardee, Kathleen)
January 23, 2014 Filing 257 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 256 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 255 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Viking Pump, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 254 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 253 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Stoker Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 252 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Riley Stoker Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 251 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Lattner Boiler Company.(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 250 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imo Industries, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 249 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Imo Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 248 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodrich Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 247 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Goodrich Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 246 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by The Fairbanks Company.(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 245 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Acquisitions, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 244 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by All Acquisitions, LLC.(Hill, Keith)
January 23, 2014 Filing 243 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clark Equipment Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 23, 2014 Filing 242 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Clark Equipment Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 23, 2014 Filing 241 STRICKEN PER NOTICE AT DOC 259 - NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Clark Equipment Company (Bultman, Bradley)
January 21, 2014 Filing 240 RESPONSE in Opposition re #129 MOTION to Remand filed by Boeing Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Irwin, William)
January 21, 2014 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis R. Picou on behalf of A.O. Smith Corporation (Picou, Curtis)
January 17, 2014 Filing 238 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seco Warwick Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 237 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answe4r to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Seco Warwick Corporation(as successor-in-interest to Sunbeam Furnaces).(Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 236 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 235 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 234 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lennox Industries, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 233 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Lennox Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 232 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dana Companies, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 231 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Dana Companies, LLC.(Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 230 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certainteed Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 229 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Certainteed Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 228 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carboline Company. (Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 227 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Carboline Company.(Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 226 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 225 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 224 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.). (Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 223 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.).(Hill, Keith)
January 17, 2014 Filing 222 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clow Corporation. (Chessler, Michael)
January 17, 2014 Filing 221 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hollingsworth & Vose Company. (Chessler, Michael)
January 17, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #219 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company. Document contains incorrect information and is being stricken per efiler's request. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 17, 2014 Filing 219 STRICKEN - Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hollingsworth & Vose Company. (Chessler, Michael) Modified on 1/17/2014 (cds, ).
January 15, 2014 Filing 218 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navistar International. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 217 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bonney Forge Corporation. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 216 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kvaerner U.S., Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation (Jones, Kirra)
January 15, 2014 Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Navistar International (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
January 15, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Kvaerner U.S., Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 12, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
January 12, 2014 Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
January 10, 2014 Filing 208 EXHIBIT by Crane Company. Exhibit to #1 Case Opened, #8 Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents Amended Exhibits as Requested by the Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C3a - Amended / Revised, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C3b - Amended / Revised, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D2 - Amended / Revised, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D3 (Part 1 of 2) - Amended / Revised, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D3 (Part 2 of 2) - Amended / Revised, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D4 - Amended / Revised)(Randol, Brett)
January 10, 2014 Filing 207 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 206 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
January 10, 2014 Filing 203 Hyster Company, N/K/A NACCO Materials Handling Group, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Any and All Cross Claims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM For Contribution against All Defendants by Hyster Company.(Ruzicka, Derek)
January 10, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #164 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Zurn Industries, LLC. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
January 9, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Bruegger on behalf of The Sherwin Williams Company (Bruegger, John)
January 9, 2014 Filing 200 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weil McLain. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 199 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Pump Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 198 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Aurora Pump Company by Aurora Pump Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 196 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BW/IP, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 195 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against BW/IP, Inc. by BW/IP, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of BW/IP, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 193 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Compudyne Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 192 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Compudyne Corporation by Compudyne Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Compudyne Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 190 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cummins, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 189 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Cummins, Inc. by Cummins, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Cummins, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 187 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dravo Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 186 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Dravo Corporation by Dravo Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Dravo Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 184 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 183 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Flowserve U.S., Inc by Flowserve U.S., Inc.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 181 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 180 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Flowserve Corporation by Flowserve Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 178 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 177 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 175 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 174 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Gardner Denver, Inc. by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 173 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greene Tweed & Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 172 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Greene Tweed & Company by Greene Tweed & Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Greene Tweed & Company (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 170 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joy Technologies, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 169 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Joy Technologies, Inc. by Joy Technologies, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 167 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RIC-WIL, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 166 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against RIC-WIL, Inc. by RIC-WIL, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of RIC-WIL, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 164 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC. 202 - Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Bultman, Bradley) Modified on 1/10/2014 (bkl).
January 9, 2014 Filing 163 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Weil McLain by Weil McLain.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Weil McLain (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 161 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 160 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Zurn Industries, LLC by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 158 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Young Group, LTD. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 157 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Young Group, LTD by Young Group, LTD.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Young Group, LTD (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 155 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 154 MOTION to Dismiss Count V and VI by Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.. Responses due by 2/13/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 153 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. by Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
January 9, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
January 8, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan on behalf of The Sherwin Williams Company (Cowan, Tracy)
January 8, 2014 Filing 150 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hyster Company identifying Corporate Parent NACCO Materials Handling Group Inc. for Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company, Hyster Company. (Ruzicka, Derek)
January 7, 2014