Denton v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Billie Denton
Defendant: URS Energy & Construction, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Exxon Mobile Corporation, Welco Manufacturing Company, General Cable Industries, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Allied Manufacturing Company, Ameron International Corporation, Daniel International Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Duro Dyne Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, Tuthill Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, Shell Chemical Company, Kennedy Valve Company, a division of McWane, Valero Energy Corporation, Universal Refactories, Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc., Crane Company, The Dow Chemical Company, Beazer East, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Occidental Chemical Corporation, John Crane, Inc., Nash Engineering Company, E.I. DuPont De Nemours Company, Research-Cottrell, Inc., Compudyne Corporation, XEF, Inc., Chevron Philips Co, Schnieder Electric USA, Inc., Motion Control Industries, Inc., FMC Corporation, KCG, Inc., Seco Warwick Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Conwed Corporation, Essex Specialty Products, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Crosby Valve, Inc., Flowserve Corporation F/K/A, Viking Pump, Inc., Wallace Industries, Inc., TA Company, Treco Construction Services, Inc., Alcoa Inc, Richards Industries, Inc., Oakfabco, Inc., Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Bechtel Construction Company, Imo Industries, Inc., Kraissel Company, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Rohm & Haas Co., BP Products North America, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Carrier Corporation, Lennox Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Burnham, LLC, Nooter Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Spence Engineering Co., Inc., Eastern Products Corp., Dewitt Products Co., Arvinmeritor Inc, Texaco, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., The WM Powell Company, American Optical Corporation, Chevron Corporation, Bonney Forge Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Peerless Industries, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Lindberg, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Lattner Boiler Company, Swindell-Dressler International Co.., Celanese Corporation, Natkin Service Co., Certainteed Corporation, Nibco, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Nalco Company, Ref-Chem Corporation, Metallo Gasket Co., Rheem Manufacturing Company, ITT Controls, Eaton Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, NRG Texas Power, LLC, The Fairbanks Company, Hennessy Industries, Inc., Dap, Inc., Simpson Timber Company, Grimes Aeropsace Corporation, API Heat Transfer, Inc., Domco Products Texas, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Ladish Valve Company, LLC, Plastics Engineering Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Milwaukee Valve Co., BASF Corporation, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Atlantic Richfield Company, Dal-Tile Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Johnston Boiler Company, York International Corporation, Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Ethyl Corporation, CBS Corporation, Hitachi America LTD, Resco Holdings LLC, Howden North America, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Chevron USA, Inc., Washington Group International, Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., Neles-Jamesbury, Inc., Kunkle Valve, SB Decking, Inc., International Paper Company, Greene Tweed & Co., Inc, Columbia Boiler Company, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., Pecora Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Flowserve Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Catalytic Construction Company, Kvaerner U.S. Inc., Buffalo Air Handling, Weil McLain, Flowserve US Inc., RME Petroleum Company, Shintech, Inc., Ericsson, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Dravo Corporation, Kitz Corporation of America, Elof Hansson USA Inc., Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Armstrong International Inc, Conoco Phillips Company, Sargent & Lundy LLC, Sherwin-Williams Company, Coastal Refining and Marketing, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric USA, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Clow Corporation, The J.R. Clarkson Company, Metso Minerals Industries, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Owens-Illinois, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Vanderbilt Minerals LLC, Crown Cork & Seal USA Inc, Gardner Denver Inc, Pharmacia Corporation, Kelly Moore Paint Company, Velan Valve Corporation, BF Shaw, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Avocet Enterprises, Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, EEIC, Inc, Cummins Inc., NRG Texas Power, MW Custom Papers LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Blue M, A.O. Smith Corporation, Joy Technologies, Inc., Mueller Steam Speciality Co., General Electric Company, Dezurik, Inc., Zurn Industries, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Ferro Engineering, Fluor Corporation, Honeywell, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Maremont Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Wabco Holdings, Inc., Watson McDaniel Company, Aurora Pump Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Graybar Electric Company Inc, Riley Stoker Corporation, Paccar Inc, McNally Industries LLC, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion, Grinnell Corporation, Asbestos Corporation Limited, Cleaver-Brooks, Thermwell Products Co. Inc., Harper International Corp. and Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01243
Filed: December 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Filing 1585 Letter from Madison County State Court acknowledging remand. (trb)
April 22, 2015 Filing 1584 Letter remanding case to Madison County State Court. (trb)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1583 ORDER OF REMAND: Case remanded to Madison County, Illinois. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/21/15. (ajr)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1582 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1556-60) and DISMISSES Defendants Trane U.S., Inc., Industrial Holding Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Georgia Pacific, LLC, or Velan Valve Corp. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/14/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1581 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1474, 1485-1498, 1520, 1522, 1525, 1529-1533 & 1535-1539) and DISMISSES defendants Coastal Refining & Marketing, Inc., Ferro Engineering, Foseco, Inc., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kennedy Valve Company, The Kraissel Company, Inc., Ladish Valve Company, LLC, Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., McCord Gasket Corporation, Milwaukee Valve Company, Navistar International, Atlantic Richfield Company, The Dow Chemical Company, Certainteed Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Rohm & Haas Company, ConocoPhillips Company and Ethyl Corporation. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/13/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1580 ORDER. The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. #1579 ) in which she seeks an extension of time to respond to Defendant Kvaerner U.S. Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1540 ). Plaintiff shall file her response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1540 ) on or before April 23, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/13/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 8, 2015 Filing 1579 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1540 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Integrated Memorandum in Support . (Romani, Allyson)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1578 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1501-1508, 1510-1513 & 1515) and DISMISSES defendants Pecora Corporation, RME Petroleum Company, Sargent & Lundy, LLC, The Sherwin Williams Company, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc. Swindell-Dressler International Co., Universal Refractories, Inc., Weil McLain, Welco Manufacturing Company, York International Corporation, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc., and Owens Illinois, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/8/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1577 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1518 ) and DISMISSES defendant Kitz Corporation of America. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/8/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1575 ORDER - The Court hereby VACATES the Order at Doc #1574 . Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/2/2015. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1574 VACATED - ORDER OF REMAND. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Remand (Doc. #1548 ) and REMANDS this case to the Third Judicial Circuit, Madison County, Illinois. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/2/15. (ajr) Modified on 4/2/2015 (kek).
April 1, 2015 Filing 1573 NOTICE re #916 and #1408 : The telephonic status conference set in #916 was reset to March 26, 2015 by Order #1408 . The Order did not specifically mention the cancelation of the 4/1/15 status conference: to prevent any (further) confusion, the 4/1/15 conference is hereby CANCELLED. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1572 ORDER. Any part objecting the dismissal of defendants ArvinMeritor, Inc., Maremont Corporation, The Wm Powell Company, or Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1567, 1568, 1570 & 1571) on or before April 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/1/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 31, 2015 Filing 1571 MOTION to Dismiss Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 5/4/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 31, 2015 Filing 1570 MOTION to Dismiss The WM. Powell Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 5/4/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 31, 2015 Filing 1569 NOTICE of Defendants Remaining in the Case (Romani, Allyson)
March 31, 2015 Filing 1568 MOTION to Dismiss Maremont Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 5/4/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 31, 2015 Filing 1567 MOTION to Dismiss ArvinMeritor, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 5/4/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1566 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS the Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1551 & 1552) and DISMISSES defendants Daniel International Corporation and Ref-Chem Corporation without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/27/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 26, 2015 Filing 1565 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/26/2015. Plaintiff has indicated that a number of Defendants, who have not been terminated from this action, have been dismissed or are no longer a part of this suit. The Court notes that various Defendants, like Bechtel Constr. Corp. and Arvinmeritor, Inc. have not been dismissed, are not the subject of a Motion to Dismiss, are represented by counsel, and have been highlighted by plaintiff as having been dismissed or the subject of such a motion. Plaintiff shall file, by March 31, 2015, a notice that includes a list of Defendants he believes are still in this case. Such a notice should include Defendants who have not been dismissed but which are the subject of a motion to dismiss (and indicate the document number of the motion). A status conference will be set upon the filing of the notice. (Court Reporter n/a.) (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 26, 2015 Filing 1564 NOTICE (Romani, Allyson)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1563 ORDER GRANTING #1555 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Kaitlyn N. Chenevert added for Resco Holdings, LLC. and attorneys Kenneth M. Nussbaumer, Thomas L. Orris, and Mary Rychnovsky terminated as to Resco Holdings, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 3/26/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1562 ORDER. Any party objecting to the dismissal of Defendants Trane U.S., Inc., Industrial Holding Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Georgia Pacific, LLC, or Velan Valve Corp. (Docs. 1556-60) shall file an objection on or before March 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/26/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 25, 2015 Filing 1561 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #1555 Motion to Substitute Attorney filed by Resco Holdings LLC. See attached document for specifics (mar)
March 25, 2015 Filing 1560 MOTION to Dismiss Velan Valve Corp. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 25, 2015 Filing 1559 MOTION to Dismiss Georgia Pacific, LLC f/k/a Georgia-Pacific Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 25, 2015 Filing 1558 MOTION to Dismiss Illinoit Tool Works, Inc., individually and as Successor-in-interest to Devcon Corp. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 25, 2015 Filing 1557 MOTION to Dismiss Industrial Holdings Corporation f/k/a The Carborundum Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 25, 2015 Filing 1556 MOTION to Dismiss Trane U.S., Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 24, 2015 Filing 1555 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Resco Holdings LLC. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
March 20, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1552 MOTION to Dismiss Ref-Chem Corporation, #1551 MOTION to Dismiss Daniel International Corporation. Responses due by 3/24/2015 (mar)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1554 ORDER. Any party objecting to the dismissal of defendants Daniel International Corporation or Ref-Chem Corporation (Docs. 1551 & 1552) shall file a response on or before March 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/20/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1553 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 1547) and DISMISSES defendant Crane Company. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/19/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 19, 2015 Filing 1552 MOTION to Dismiss Ref-Chem Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 19, 2015 Filing 1551 MOTION to Dismiss Daniel International Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/23/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1550 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #1541 & #1542 ) and DISMISSES defendants Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and Pharmacia Corporation. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/16/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1549 ORDER. Any party objecting to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 1547) Defendant Crane Company shall file a response on or before March 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/16/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 13, 2015 Filing 1548 Supplemental MOTION to Remand by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 13, 2015 Filing 1547 MOTION to Dismiss Crane Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/16/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 10, 2015 Filing 1546 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Charles Ford on behalf of Catalytic Construction Company, URS Energy & Construction, Inc., Washington Group International, Inc. (Ford, Benjamin)
March 10, 2015 Filing 1545 NOTICE of Appearance by Tucker Blaser on behalf of Catalytic Construction Company, URS Energy & Construction, Inc., Washington Group International, Inc. (Blaser, Tucker)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1544 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #1541 & #1542 ) defendants Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and Pharmacia Corporation. Any party objecting to the motions shall file a response on or before March 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/10/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1543 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1474, 1485 - 1498, 1520, 1522, 1525, 1527 1539) defendants Coastal Refining & Marketing, Inc., Ferro Engineering, Foseco, Inc., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kennedy Valve Company, The Kraissel Company, Inc., Ladish Valve Company, LLC, Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp., Lennox Industries, Inc., McCord Gasket Corporation, Milwaukee Valve Company, Navistar International, Atlantic Richfield Company, The Dow Chemical Company, Certainteed Corporation, Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Texaco, Inc., Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Rohm & Haas Company, ConocoPhillips Company and Ethyl Corporation. The Court previously dismissed Defendants Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., and Texaco, Inc. from this case (Doc. 1392). As such, the Court denies Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1527, 1528 & 1534) as moot. Any party objecting to the remaining motions (Docs. 1474, 1485 - 1498, 1520, 1522, 1525, 1529 - 1533 & 1535 1539) shall file a response on or before March 11, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/9/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 9, 2015 Filing 1542 MOTION to Dismiss Pharmacia Corporation fka Monsanto Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/13/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 9, 2015 Filing 1541 MOTION to Dismiss Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/13/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1540 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Integrated Memorandum in Support by Kvaerner U.S. Inc.. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jones, Kirra)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1539 MOTION to Dismiss Ethyl Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1538 MOTION to Dismiss ConocoPhillips Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1537 MOTION to Dismiss Rohm & Haas Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1536 MOTION to Dismiss Shell Oil Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1535 MOTION to Dismiss Shell Chemical Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1534 MOTION to Dismiss TEXACO, INC. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1533 MOTION to Dismiss Dana Companies, LLC by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1532 MOTION to Dismiss Union Carbide Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1531 MOTION to Dismiss Pfizer, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1530 MOTION to Dismiss Occidental Chemical Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1529 MOTION to Dismiss Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1528 MOTION to Dismiss Chevron USA, Inc by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1527 MOTION to Dismiss CHEVRON CORPORATION by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1526 ORDER. The Court previously dismissed defendant Exxon Mobile Corporation for lack of personal jurisdiction (Doc. #1451 ). As such, the Court hereby DENIES as moot Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss defendant Exxon Mobile Corporation (Doc. #1521 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/6/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 6, 2015 Filing 1525 MOTION to Dismiss CERTAINTEED CORPORATION by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1524 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1465 73) and DISMISSES defendants Alcoa, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Celanese Corporation, ChevronPhillips Company, LP, Clow Corporation, and CNA Holdings, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/6/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1523 ORDER. Having received no objection, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1476 1479, 1481, 1482 & 1484) and DISMISSES Defendants Columbia Boiler Company, Conwed Corporation, Cummins, Inc., Dap, Inc., Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dravo Corporation, and Eaton Corporation without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/6/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 6, 2015 Filing 1522 MOTION to Dismiss THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1521 MOTION to Dismiss EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1520 MOTION to Dismiss ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1519 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1518 ) defendant Kitz Corporation of America. Any party objecting to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1518 ) shall file a response on or before March 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/6/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 4, 2015 Filing 1518 MOTION to Dismiss Kitz Corporation of America by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1517 ORDER. Having received no objection to Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #1439 & #1456 ), the Court hereby GRANTS the motions (Docs. #1439 & #1456 ) and DISMISSES defendants Goodrich Corporation and Crosby Valve, LLC without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/4/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1516 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1501-1508, 1510-1513 & 1515) defendants Pecora Corporation, RME Petroleum Company, Sargent & Lundy, LLC, The Sherwin Williams Company, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Superior Boiler Works, Inc. Swindell-Dressler International Co., Universal Refractories, Inc., Weil McLain, Welco Manufacturing Company, York International Corporation, Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc., and Owens Illinois, Inc. Any party objecting to Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1501-1508, 1510-1513 & 1515) shall file a response on or before March 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/4/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 3, 2015 Filing 1515 MOTION to Dismiss Owens Illinois, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1514 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss defendants Nibco, Inc. and Valero Energy Corporation (Docs. #1500 & #1509 ). The Court previously dismissed defendants Nibco, Inc. (Doc. 1458) and Valero Energy Corporation (Doc. 1453) for lack of personal jurisdiction. As such, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motions (Docs. #1500 & #1509 ) as moot. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/3/15. (ajr, )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 3, 2015 Filing 1513 MOTION to Dismiss Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 3, 2015 Filing 1512 MOTION to Dismiss York International Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 3, 2015 Filing 1511 MOTION to Dismiss Welco Manufacturing Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 3, 2015 Filing 1510 MOTION to Dismiss Weil McLain by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 3, 2015 Filing 1509 MOTION to Dismiss Valero Energy Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 3, 2015 Filing 1508 MOTION to Dismiss UNIVERSAL REFRACTORIES INC by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 3, 2015 Filing 1507 MOTION to Dismiss SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL CO. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 3, 2015 Filing 1506 MOTION to Dismiss SUPERIOR BOILER WORKS INC by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 3, 2015 Filing 1505 MOTION to Dismiss SPRINKMANN SONS CORPORATION by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 3, 2015 Filing 1504 MOTION to Dismiss The Sherwin Williams Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1503 MOTION to Dismiss Sargent & Lundy, LLC by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1502 MOTION to Dismiss RME PETROLEUM COMPANY by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1501 MOTION to Dismiss Pecora Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1500 MOTION to Dismiss Nibco, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1499 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1476 - 1479, 1481 - 1484) Defendants Columbia Boiler Company, Conwed Corporation, Cummins, Inc., Dap, Inc., Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dravo Corporation, E.I. Dupont de Nemours Company, and Eaton Corporation. As this Court already dismissed defendant E.I. Dupont de Nemours Company from this case for lack of personal jurisdiction (Doc. #1444 ), Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1483 ) is DENIED as moot. Any party objecting to the remaining Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1476 1479, 1481, 1482 & 1484) shall file a response on or before March 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/2/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 2, 2015 Filing 1498 MOTION to Dismiss Navistar International by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1497 MOTION to Dismiss Milwaukee Valve Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1496 MOTION to Dismiss McCord Gasket Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1495 MOTION to Dismiss Lennox Industries, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1494 MOTION to Dismiss Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corp. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1493 MOTION to Dismiss Lattner Boiler Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1492 MOTION to Dismiss Ladish Valve Company, LLC by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1491 MOTION to Dismiss The Kraissl Co., Incorporated by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1490 MOTION to Dismiss Kennedy Valve Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1489 MOTION to Dismiss Kaiser Gypsun Company, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1488 MOTION to Dismiss Johnston Boiler Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1487 MOTION to Dismiss Hennessy Industries, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1486 MOTION to Dismiss Foseco, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1485 MOTION to Dismiss FERRO ENGINEERING, a division of OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Filing 1484 MOTION to Dismiss Eaton Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Filing 1483 MOTION to Dismiss E.I. Dupont de NEMOURS COMPANY by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Filing 1482 MOTION to Dismiss Dravo Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Filing 1481 MOTION to Dismiss Domco Products Texas, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Filing 1480 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Filing 1479 MOTION to Dismiss Dap, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Filing 1478 MOTION to Dismiss Cummins, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Filing 1477 MOTION to Dismiss Conwed Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Filing 1476 MOTION to Dismiss Columbia Boiler Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1475 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 1465 - 1473) defendants Alcoa, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Celanese Corporation, ChevronPhillips Company, LP, Clow Corporation, and CNA Holdings, Inc. Any party objecting to the motions shall file a response on or before March 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/27/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 27, 2015 Filing 1474 MOTION to Dismiss Coastal Refining & Marketing, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 27, 2015 Filing 1473 MOTION to Dismiss CNA HOLDINGS, INC. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1472 MOTION to Dismiss Clow Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1471 MOTION to Dismiss ChevronPhillips Company, LP by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1470 MOTION to Dismiss Celanese Corporation by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1469 MOTION to Dismiss Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Beazer East, Inc., f/k/a Koppers Industries, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1467 MOTION to Dismiss Baltimore Aircoil Company by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1466 MOTION to Dismiss API Heat Transfer, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1465 MOTION to Dismiss Alcoa, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 4/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1464 MOTION for Joinder to Georgia Pacific's Motion to Transfer by Ethyl Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1463 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Hurtt, Jr on behalf of Chevron Philips Co, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Rohm & Haas Co. (Hurtt, Robert)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1462 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua N. Worthington on behalf of Armstrong International Inc (Worthington, Joshua)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1461 ORDER granting #1460 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Vickie Thompson on behalf of Occidnetal Chemical Corporation. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 23, 2015 Filing 1460 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Vickie R. Thompson $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2543013 by on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation(as successor in interest to Durez Corporation). (Thompson, Vickie)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1459 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 1456) Defendant Crosby Valve, LLC. Any party objecting to the motion shall file a response on or before February 25, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/23/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1458 ORDER. The Court GRANTS NIBCO's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1140 ) and DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims against NIBCO without prejudice. (Amending Order (Doc. #1452 ) as to date only.). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/19/15. (ajr)
February 20, 2015 Filing 1457 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1452 Order. PDF Order at Doc 1452 contains an incorrect date. Corrected Order to be filed. This notice is for information only. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 20, 2015 Filing 1456 MOTION to Dismiss Crosby Valve, LLC by Billie Denton. Responses due by 3/26/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 AMENDED ORDER re 1438 Order and #1395 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Crosby Valve, Inc. Attorney Kaitlyn Chenevert TERMINATED as to Crosby Valve, Inc. only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 2/19/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1454 ORDER. The Court GRANTS Clow's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction (Doc. 1120) and DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims against Clow without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/19/15. (ajr)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1453 ORDER. The Court GRANTS Valero's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1130 ) and DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims against Valero without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/19/15. (ajr)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1452 STRICKEN - ORDER. The Court GRANTS NIBCO's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1140 ) and DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims against NIBCO without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/19/15. (ajr) Modified on 2/20/2015 (kek).
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1451 ORDER. The Court GRANTS Exxon's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1136 ) and DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims against Exxon without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/19/15. (ajr)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1450 ORDER granting #1447 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ashley Presson on behalf of Celanese Corporation. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1449 ORDER. The Court GRANTS BASF's Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Docs. #1115 & #1280 ) and DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims against BASF. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/19/15. (ajr)
February 18, 2015 Filing 1448 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edward Keeler, III on behalf of Sprinkmann Sons Corporation (Keeler, William)
February 18, 2015 Filing 1447 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ashley Presson $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2537777 by on behalf of Celanese Corporation. (Presson, Ashley)
February 18, 2015 Filing 1446 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Crosby Valve, LLC (identified in the complaint as Crosby Valve, Inc.) by Crosby Valve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tayyab, Julia)
February 18, 2015 Filing 1445 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 1434 Notice of Appearance filed by jpc as to Imo Industries, Inc. This is a test entry by the clerk's office. (myz)THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1444 ORDER. The Court GRANTS DuPont's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Doc. 1157) and DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims against DuPont without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/17/15. (ajr)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1443 ORDER granting #1420 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Moffatt G. McDonald on behalf of Daniel International Corporation; granting #1421 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney J. Andrew Atkins on behalf of Ethyl Corporation on 2/17/2015. (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1442 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on the Motion for Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Goodrich Corporation Only (Doc. #1439 ). Any party objecting to the motion shall file a response on or before February 23, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/17/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1441 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC's (MW Custom Papers) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Doc. #1365 ) to which Plaintiff Billie Denton has failed to timely respond. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c), the Court construes Plaintiff's failure to respond as an admission of the merits of the Motion. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motion (Doc. #1365 ) and DISMISSES MW Custom Papers without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/17/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 17, 2015 Filing 1440 SUPPLEMENT by Conoco Phillips Company. Supplement to #1190 Reply to Response to Motion, #1042 Motion to Dismiss . (Wolters, Kendra)
February 17, 2015 Filing 1439 MOTION to Dismiss for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Goodrich Corporation. Responses due by 3/23/2015 (Hill, Keith)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1438 ORDER GRANTING #1381 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Ameron International Corporation; GRANTING #1395 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Crosby Valve, Inc.; and, GRANTING #1406 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Records filed by Flowserve US Inc., J.A. Sexauer, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, York International Corporation, Welco Manufacturing Company, Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc. Attorney Lawrence S. Denk TERMINATED as to Ameron International Corporation; attorney McRay Judge II TERMINATED as to Crosby Valve, Inc.; and, attorney Justin A. Welply TERMINATED as to JA Sexauer, Flowserve US Inc., BorgWarner Morse TEC Inc., York International Corporation, Tuthill Corporation, and Welco Manufacturing Company. Counsel are DIRECTED, in the future, to file separate entries of appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 2/17/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 17, 2015 Filing 1437 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Wolters, Kendra)
February 17, 2015 Filing 1436 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Wolters, Kendra)
February 17, 2015 Filing 1435 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Wolters, Kendra)
February 16, 2015 Filing 1434 ENTRY STRICKEN - TEST ENTRY BY CLERK'S OFFICE - NOTICE of Appearance by jpc on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (jpc, ) Modified on 2/18/2015 (myz).
February 13, 2015 Filing 1433 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1432 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of The Fairbanks Company (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1431 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Lennox Industries, Inc. (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1430 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Conoco Phillips Company (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1429 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Sargent & Lundy LLC (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1428 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1427 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Riley Stoker Corporation (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1426 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1425 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Certainteed Corporation (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1424 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1423 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Bechtel Construction Company (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1422 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Bechtel Corporation (Wolters, Kendra)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1421 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J Andrew Atkins $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2534989 by on behalf of Ethyl Corporation. (Atkins, J)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1420 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Moffatt G. McDonald $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2534968 by on behalf of Daniel International Corporation. (McDonald, Moffatt)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1419 ORDER granting #1418 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Walter Gaylord on behalf of BASF Corporation. (jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 12, 2015 Filing 1418 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Walter Gaylord Lynch $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2534192 by on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Lynch, Walter)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1417 ORDER denying #1053 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/12/15. (ajr)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 ORDER Granting #1414 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Arthur R. Almquist (mar)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 11, 2015 Filing 1415 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Franklin on behalf of Baltimore Aircoil Company, Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Carborundum Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Kennedy Valve Company, a division of McWane, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation, American Standard, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation (Franklin, David)
February 11, 2015 Filing 1414 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Arthur R. Almquist $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2531854 by on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company. (Almquist, Arthur)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 ORDER granting #1410 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #1411 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barbara Jane Barron and Edward Wade Carpenter on behalf of Ref-Chem Corporation. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 ORDER granting #1409 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William D. Conner on behalf of Daniel International Corporation.. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 10, 2015 Filing 1411 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Subject to Special Appearance by Attorney Edward Wade Carpenter $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2531242 by on behalf of Ref-Chem Corporation. (Carpenter, Edward)
February 10, 2015 Filing 1410 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Subject to Special Appearance by Attorney Barbara Jane Barron $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2531161 by on behalf of Ref-Chem Corporation. (Barron, Barbara)
February 10, 2015 Filing 1409 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William D. Conner $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2531052 by on behalf of Daniel International Corporation. (Conner, William)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 ORDER re 1394 Discovery Dispute Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/26/2015 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. See Order for details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 2/9/15. (sgp)
February 6, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1042 MOTION to Dismiss, construed as a Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's First Amended Petition. Supplements due by 2/17/2015 (jaj)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 ORDER. In its Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1042 ), Defendant Conoco Phillips Company argues Plaintiff's Complaint must be dismissed because Plaintiff executed a Release. Release is an affirmative defense and thus not proper on a motion to dismiss. Deckard v. Gen. Motors Corp., 307 F.3d 556, 560 (7th Cir. 2002). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), the Court gives the parties notice that it will treat Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1042 ), as one for summary judgment under Rule 56. Accordingly, the parties will have until February 17, 2015, to supplement their respective motions and responses. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/5/15. (ajr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 4, 2015 Filing 1406 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Records by Borg Warner Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, J.A. Sexauer, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Welco Manufacturing Company, York International Corporation. (Welply, Justin)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 ORDER. The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer (Doc. #1399 ). Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion (Doc. #1396 ) on or before March 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/4/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1404 ORDER. Having received no objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Richards Industries, Inc., the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion (Doc. #1390 ) and DISMISSES Richards Industries, Inc. from this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/4/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 4, 2015 Filing 1403 NOTICE re #1402 Notice (Other), OF FILING DEFENDANT REF-CHEM CORPORATIONS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS (Starnes, William)
February 4, 2015 Filing 1402 NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING DEFENDANT REF-CHEM CORPORATIONS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exh B, Notice of Filing)(Starnes, William)
February 4, 2015 Filing 1401 MOTION for Joinder Motion to Join Georgia-Pacific's Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Tarkett Enterprises Inc.. (Veath, Beth)
February 3, 2015 Filing 1400 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1327 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Fanning, David)
February 3, 2015 Filing 1399 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Georgia Pacific's Motion to Transfer by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
February 3, 2015 Filing 1398 MOTION for Joinder Motion to Join Georgia-Pacific's Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Catalytic Construction Company, URS Corporation, Morrison Knudsen Corp.. (Burke, Kenneth)
February 3, 2015 Filing 1397 MOTION for Joinder Motion to Join Georgia-Pacific's Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Watson McDaniel Company. (Blaser, Tucker)
January 29, 2015 Filing 1396 MOTION to Transfer Case by Georgia-Pacific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Geraci, Carl)
January 28, 2015 Filing 1395 MOTION to Substitute Party by Crosby Valve, Inc.. (Tayyab, Julia)
January 28, 2015 Filing 1394 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference held on 1/27/2015. Order to issue. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 2/9/2015 (sgp).
January 27, 2015 Filing 1393 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference RESET for 1/27/2015 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. This is a change in time only. The dial in number for the conference call is 712-775-7031; the Meeting ID is 454-553-297.(sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1392 ORDER. Defendants Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, and Texaco, Inc. filed their Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1278 ) on December 17, 2014. Plaintiffs response was due on January 20, 2015, and Plaintiff has failed to timely respond. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c), the Court construes Plaintiff's failure to timely respond as an admission of the merits of Defendants' Motion. The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the Motion (Doc. #1278 ). The Court GRANTS the Motion to the extent it DISMISSES the claims against Defendants Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, and Texaco, Inc. without prejudice. The Court DENIES the Motion to the extent it seeks costs and fees. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/27/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1391 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #1390 ) Defendant Richards Industries, Inc. Any party objecting to the motion shall file a response on or before February 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/27/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 26, 2015 Filing 1390 MOTION to Dismiss Richards Industries, Inc. by Billie Denton. Responses due by 3/2/2015 (Romani, Allyson)
January 23, 2015 Filing 1389 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1327 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1388 ORDER re 1387 Notice of Hearing: By way of clarification, the discovery dispute conference will be conducted telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/23/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 23, 2015 Filing 1387 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 1/27/2015 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Plaintiff indicates that there is a dispute as to certain scheduling matters. Plaintiff to initiate the conference call. If Plaintiff elects to use a call in number, he is directed to email such information to sona_patel@ilsd.uscourts.gov.(sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 23, 2015 Filing 1386 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1280 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
January 21, 2015 Filing 1385 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Lattner Boiler Company (Wolters, Kendra)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 ORDER granting #1382 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher N. Wahl on behalf of Swindell-Dressler International Co. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 14, 2015 Filing 1383 Answer to #1224 Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Swindell-Dressler International Co...(Wahl, Christopher)
January 14, 2015 Filing 1382 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher N. Wahl $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2502744 by on behalf of Swindell-Dressler International Co... (Wahl, Christopher)
January 13, 2015 Filing 1381 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Ameron International Corporation. (Schaberg, John) Modified docket title per attorney's office call on 1/14/2015 (lmb).
January 9, 2015 Filing 1380 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clow Corporation. (Geraci, Carl)
January 9, 2015 Filing 1379 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Clow Corporation (Geraci, Carl)
January 6, 2015 Filing 1378 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Answer to Anticipated, CROSSCLAIM By Defendant against All Plaintiffs by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Newport, Michael)
January 6, 2015 Filing 1377 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Anticipated, CROSSCLAIM by Defendant against All Plaintiffs by Johnston Boiler Company.(Newport, Michael)
January 6, 2015 Filing 1376 NOTICE by Kitz Corporation of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss)(Zahalsky, Debra)
January 6, 2015 Filing 1375 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kitz Corporation of America. (Zahalsky, Debra)
January 6, 2015 Filing 1374 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Brown, Jr on behalf of Kitz Corporation of America (Brown, Joseph)
January 6, 2015 Filing 1373 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra K. Zahalsky on behalf of Kitz Corporation of America (Zahalsky, Debra)
January 2, 2015 Filing 1372 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint (SECOND) Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Sepco Corporation.(Hood, Jeffrey)
December 31, 2014 Filing 1371 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Second and Affirmative Defenses by John Crane, Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
December 30, 2014 Filing 1370 Defendant Ameron International Corporations ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated, CROSSCLAIM by Defendant against All Plaintiffs by Ameron International Corporation.(Dauphin, Michael)
December 30, 2014 Filing 1369 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Celanese Corporation.(Thames, Earl)
December 30, 2014 Filing 1368 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1366 Affirmative Defenses filed by Celanese Corporation. See attached document for specifics (rah)
December 30, 2014 Filing 1367 Chicago Pneumatic's ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC.(Offergeld, Leslie)
December 29, 2014 Filing 1366 STRICKEN - Affirmative Defenses to and Answer to Plaintiff's Second #1224 Amended Complaint by Celanese Corporation. (Thames, Earl) Modified on 12/30/2014 (rah).
December 29, 2014 Filing 1365 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by MW Custom Papers LLC. Responses due by 2/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Huelsmann, Brian)
December 26, 2014 Filing 1364 Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company's (incorrectly sued as Metso Minerals Industries, Inc. as Successor-in-interest to Keeler/Dorr-Boiler Company) Affirmative Defeenses and ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against all defendants, and Answer to all Cross-claims of all defendants against Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company (incorrectly sued as Metso Mineral Industries, Inc. as Successor -in-interest to Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company) and against Metso Minerals Industries, Inc.(as successor in interest to Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Co.) by Metso Minerals Industries, Inc.(as successor in interest to Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Co.).(Pikel, Howard)
December 26, 2014 Filing 1363 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard J. Pikel on behalf of Metso Minerals Industries, Inc.(as successor in interest to Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Co.) (Pikel, Howard)
December 26, 2014 Filing 1362 Atlantic Richfield Company's Affirmative defenses and ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM of Atlantic Richfield Company against all defendants, Answer to all defendants' cross-claims against Atlantic Richfield Company by Atlantic Richfield Company.(Pikel, Howard)
December 26, 2014 Filing 1361 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard J. Pikel on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company (Pikel, Howard)
December 26, 2014 Filing 1360 BP Products North America, Inc's Affirmative defenses and ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against all defendants, Answer to all Cross-claims against BP Products North America, Inc. by BP Products North America, Inc..(Pikel, Howard)
December 26, 2014 Filing 1359 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard J. Pikel on behalf of BP Products North America, Inc. (Pikel, Howard)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1358 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to All Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1357 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint at law and All Cross-Claims by Cummins Inc..(Pozan, Kyle)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1356 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Pozan on behalf of Cummins Inc. (Pozan, Kyle)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1355 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Pozan on behalf of Alcoa Inc (Pozan, Kyle)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1354 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Alcoa Inc.(Pozan, Kyle)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1353 Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Answer to all Cross-Claims by Cleaver-Brooks.(Hudgens, Meredith)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1352 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps LLC.(Hill, Keith)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1351 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Imo Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1350 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Goodrich Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1349 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1348 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Lattner Boiler Company.(Hill, Keith)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1347 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Buffalo Air Handling.(Hill, Keith)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 ORDER STRIKING Answer to Amended Complaint (Doc. #1339 ). Attorney Christopher Wahl has failed to either file a motion to appear pro hac vice in this case or be admitted generally to the District Court for the Southern District of Illinois. As such, the Court STRIKES the defendant Swindell-Dressler International Co.'s Answer to Amended Complaint (Doc. #1339 ) filed by Attorney Christopher Wahl. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/23/14. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 23, 2014 Filing 1345 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by The Fairbanks Company.(Hill, Keith)
December 23, 2014 Filing 1344 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Certainteed Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
December 23, 2014 Filing 1343 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and AFfirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Dana Companies, LLC.(Hill, Keith)
December 23, 2014 Filing 1342 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
December 23, 2014 Filing 1341 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Lennox Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
December 23, 2014 Filing 1340 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Riley Stoker Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
December 23, 2014 Filing 1339 STRICKEN AT Doc. 1346 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Swindell-Dressler International Co...(Wahl, Christopher) Modified on 12/23/2014 (ajr, ).
December 23, 2014 Filing 1338 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher N. Wahl on behalf of Swindell-Dressler International Co.. (Wahl, Christopher)
December 23, 2014 Filing 1337 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by International Paper Company.(Finnigan, Mindy)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1336 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint Second amended, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company).(Bronsky, A.)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1335 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Oakfabco, Inc..(Ward, John)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1334 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1333 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Copes-Vulcan, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1332 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Pharmacia Corporation.(Ault, Jordan)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1331 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint And Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint,, CROSSCLAIM And Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Sargent & Lundy LLC.(Hill, Keith)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1330 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended by The WM Powell Company.(Newton, L.)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1329 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Alexa Newton on behalf of The WM Powell Company (Newton, L.)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1328 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
December 20, 2014 Filing 1327 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Exxon Mobile Corporation. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Fanning, David)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1326 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Weil McLain.(Cook, Samuel)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1325 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Plastics Engineering Company.(Cook, Samuel)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1324 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.(Cook, Samuel)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1323 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Dezurik, Inc..(Cook, Samuel)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1322 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Aurora Pump Company.(Cook, Samuel)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1321 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Joy Technologies, Inc..(Weinberger, Amanda)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1320 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Gardner Denver Inc.(Weinberger, Amanda)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1319 ORDER re #1224 Amended Complaint filed by Billie Denton: It has come to the Court's understanding that there has been some technical difficulties experienced by the parties in filing timely responsive pleadings. In light of these difficulties, the Court will consider, as timely filed, responsive pleadings filed within 48 hours after the deadline. If any party requires any further relief, they may file a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/19/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 19, 2014 Filing 1318 Shell Oil Company (also improperly sued as Shell Chemical Company)'s ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defense to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition and Answer to All Cross Claims by Shell Oil Company.(Shultz, James)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1317 Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint Anticipated Cross-Claims by Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc..(Dauphin, Michael)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1316 Defendant Welco Manufacturing Company's ANSWER to Complaint to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Welco Manufacturing Company.(Welply, Justin)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1315 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Zurn Industries, Inc..(Weinberger, Amanda)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1314 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1306 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc., #1305 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. See attached document for specifics (rah)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1313 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1293 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by Welco Manufacturing Company. See attached document for specifics (rah)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1312 Defendant Tuthill Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Tuthill Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1311 Defendant York International Corporations ANSWER to Complaint to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, CROSSCLAIM Affirmative Defenses, CrossClaims, Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by York International Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1310 Defendant Borg Warner Morse TEC Inc's ANSWER to Complaint to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc..(Welply, Justin)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1309 Defendant Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Edward Vavle, Inc and Rockwell Manufacturing Company's ANSWER to Complaint to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Flowserve US Inc..(Welply, Justin)
December 19, 2014 Filing 1308 Defendant JA Sexauer, Inc's ANSWER to Complaint to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by J.A. Sexauer, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1307 Hennessy Industries, Inc. ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1306 STRICKEN - API Heat Transfer, Inc. ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie) Modified on 12/19/2014 (rah).
December 18, 2014 Filing 1305 STRICKEN - API Heat Transfer, Inc. ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie) Modified on 12/19/2014 (rah).
December 18, 2014 Filing 1304 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Natkin Service Co..(Toohey, James)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1303 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1302 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by McNally Industries LLC.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1301 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by FMC Corporation.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1300 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Crosby Valve, Inc..(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1299 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by McCord Gasket Company.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1298 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Geraci, Carl)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1297 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Dap, Inc..(Weinberger, Amanda)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1296 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Dap, Inc..(Weinberger, Amanda)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1295 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Georgia-Pacific Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1294 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Foseco, Inc..(Chessler, Michael)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1293 STRICKEN - Defendant Welco Manufacturing Company's ANSWER to Complaint to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, CROSSCLAIM Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against Welco Manufacturing Company by Welco Manufacturing Company.(Welply, Justin) Modified on 12/19/2014 (rah).
December 18, 2014 Filing 1292 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Kennedy Valve Company, a division of McWane.(Geraci, Carl)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1291 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Nalco Company.(Wilson, Benjamin)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1290 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Company.(Geraci, Carl)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1289 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation.(Wilson, Benjamin)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1288 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Illinois Tool Works, Inc..(Chessler, Michael)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1287 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1286 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Wilson, Benjamin)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. #1271 ), defendant Santa Fe Braun, Inc. is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/18/14. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 18, 2014 Filing 1284 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Baltimore Aircoil Company.(Geraci, Carl)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1283 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Trane US, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 ORDER re #922 GRANTING MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Service filed by Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Canada. Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/18/14. (ajr)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1281 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by BASF Corporation.(Kilpatrick, Joseph)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1280 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BASF Corporation. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kilpatrick, Joseph)
December 17, 2014 Filing 1279 Defendant Armstrong International Incs ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, First CROSSCLAIM to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants by Armstrong International Inc.(Storm, Carla)
December 17, 2014 Filing 1278 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Texaco, Inc.. Responses due by 1/20/2015 (Varney, Robert)
December 17, 2014 Filing 1277 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended by Superior Boiler Works, Inc..(Denk, Lawrence)
December 17, 2014 Filing 1276 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended by Milwaukee Valve Co..(Denk, Lawrence)
December 17, 2014 Filing 1275 Amended ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pfizer, Inc..(Voss, Andrew)
December 16, 2014 Filing 1274 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John McEnaney on behalf of Billie Denton (McEnaney, Andrew)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1273 ORDER granting #1258 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew John McEnaney on behalf of Plaintiff (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 16, 2014 Filing 1272 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Coastal Refining and Marketing, Inc..(Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
December 16, 2014 Filing 1271 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Santa Fe Braun, Inc.. (Tayyab, Julia)
December 16, 2014 Filing 1270 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Pfizer, Inc..(Voss, Andrew)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 ORDER granting #1156 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/16/14. (ajr)
December 16, 2014 Filing 1268 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RME Petroleum Company.(Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
December 16, 2014 Filing 1267 SPRINKMANN SONS CORPORATION'S ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES,, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Sprinkmann Sons Corporation.(Vantine, Marcie)
December 16, 2014 Filing 1266 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Resco Holdings LLC.(Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1265 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint / 2nd Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and its Answer to all Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other against All Defendants by Navistar International Corporation.(Jones, Kirra)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1264 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint / 2nd Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and its Answer to all Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other against All Defendants by Kvaerner U.S. Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1263 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint / 2nd Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Cross-Claims for Contribution or Indemnity and its Answer to all Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1262 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Treco Construction Services, Inc..(Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1261 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Brand Insulations, Inc..(Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1260 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Catalytic Construction Company, URS Energy & Construction, Inc., Washington Group International, Inc..(Burke, Kenneth)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1259 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss by MW Custom Papers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Huelsmann, Brian)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1258 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew John McEnaney $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2476600 by on behalf of Billie Denton. (McEnaney, Andrew)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1257 The Nash Engineering Company's ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Nash Engineering Company.(Foster, Margaret)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1256 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint second amended Petition, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC.(Bronsky, A.)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1255 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1254 Answer to Complaint filed by Nash Engineering Company. The document is to contain the original signature or s/ of the attorney. Docket entry STRICKEN as ordered by the Court. Document must be re-filed. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 12, 2014 Filing 1254 ENTRY STRICKEN: The Nash Engineering Company's ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Nash Engineering Company.(Foster, Margaret) Modified on 12/15/2014 (trb).
December 12, 2014 Filing 1253 Armstrong Pumps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Armstrong Pumps, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1252 The Kraissl Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Kraissel Company, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1251 TA COMPANY, f/k/a THE AUSTIN COMPANY ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by TA Company.(Foster, Margaret)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1250 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Ethyl Corporation.(Bash, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1249 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1248 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Zurn Industries, Inc. (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1247 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Bash, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1246 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by The Dow Chemical Company.(Bash, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1245 RESPONSE filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1244 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1243 Notice of Appearance filed by Zurn Industries, Inc. Filer selected defendant Zurn Industries, Inc.; however, the document states that the Notice of Appearance is for Joy Technologies, Inc. Docket entry STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. Document must be re-filed. (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 12, 2014 Filing 1243 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Zurn Industries, Inc. (Weinberger, Amanda) Modified on 12/12/2014 (tkm ).
December 12, 2014 Filing 1242 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Joy Technologies, Inc. (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1241 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended and All Cross-Claims by Fort Kent Holdings, Inc..(Pozan, Kyle)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1240 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Weinberger on behalf of Gardner Denver Inc (Weinberger, Amanda)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1239 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint (Second) by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion.(Bultman, Bradley)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1238 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint (Second) by Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1237 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint (Second) by Flowserve Corporation F/K/A.(Bultman, Bradley)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1236 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint (Second) by Dravo Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1235 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint (Second) by BW/IP, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
December 10, 2014 Filing 1234 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to all Cross-claims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Kidd, Anita)
December 10, 2014 Filing 1233 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-claims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Chicago Bridge & Iron Company.(Kidd, Anita)
December 9, 2014 Filing 1232 Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc..(Cross, William)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1231 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and all cross claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Nooter Corporation.(Nieder, Douglas)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1230 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and all cross claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Daniel International Corporation.(Starnes, William)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1229 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and all cross claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Constructors International, Inc..(Starnes, William)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1228 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and all cross claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Corporation.(Starnes, William)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1227 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and all cross claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc..(Starnes, William)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1226 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and all cross claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Starnes, William)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1225 ANSWER to #1224 Amended Complaint and all crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ref-Chem Corporation.(Starnes, William)
December 4, 2014 Filing 1224 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Billie Denton.(Romani, Allyson)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 ORDER GRANTING #1165 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Billie Denton: No objection having been filed, Plaintiff to file amended pleading by 12/5/14. The parties will note that the filing of the amended complaint WILL NOT automatically moot the pending motions to dismiss, which will be considered by the District Court; GRANTING #1221 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Burnham, LLC, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Conwed Corporation: Attorney Kevin T. Dawson terminated as the attorney for the moving Defendants and Spence Engineering Co., Inc. (which was not included in the Motion but which also was represented by Mr. Dawson); GRANTING #1185 MOTION for Leave to File Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order regarding CrossClaims, etc. filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC.: Defendant Bridgstone Amercias Tire Operations, LLC to file Notice by 12/7/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/2/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 2, 2014 Filing 1222 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1217 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Goodrich Corporation. See attached document for specifics (slh)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1221 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (Dawson, Kevin)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1220 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. This matter comes before the Court on defendant Cleaver-Brooks' Motion to Strike Amended Complaint (Doc. #1156 ). Plaintiff has failed to file a timely response. The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE on or before December 12, 2014, why it should not construe Plaintiff's failure to respond as an admission of the merits of the motion. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/1/14. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1219 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. This matter comes before the Court on Defendant Goodyear Canada, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Service (Doc. #922 ). Plaintiff has failed to file a timely response. As such, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE on or before December 12, 2014, why it should not construe Plaintiff's failure to timely respond as an admission of the merits of the motion. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/1/14. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1218 ORDER denying #1114 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/1/14. (ajr)
November 26, 2014 Filing 1217 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 1222 - STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Goodrich Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
November 26, 2014 Filing 1216 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1215 Notice (Other) filed by Exxon Mobile Corporation. Document relates to Discovery which violates this Court's Local Rule 26.1(b), no discovery materials shall be filed. Docket entry STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. No further action required by the filer as to this document.(tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 25, 2014 Filing 1215 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE by Exxon Mobile Corporation Certificate of Service on its Response to Plaintiffs Interrogatories and Request for Production (Fanning, David) Modified on 11/26/2014 (tkm ).
November 24, 2014 Filing 1214 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth on behalf of Billie Denton (Shuttlesworth, Robert)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 ORDER Granting #1211 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth (mar)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 19, 2014 Filing 1212 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Brodzik on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Howden North America, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Brodzik, James)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1211 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Eugene Shuttlesworth $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2454084 by on behalf of Billie Denton. (Shuttlesworth, Robert)
November 17, 2014 Filing 1210 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1157 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by E.I. DuPont De Nemours Company. (Schaecher, Corey)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1209 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1136 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Exxon Mobile Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fanning, David)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1208 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Plastics Engineering Company (Cook, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1207 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Weil McLain (Cook, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1206 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Greene Tweed & Co., Inc (Cook, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1205 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Dezurik, Inc. (Cook, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1204 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Cook on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Cook, Samuel)
November 3, 2014 Filing 1203 NOTICE by Chevron Philips Co Certificate of Compliance on its Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production and Response to Plaintiff's Interrogatories (Zellmer, Mark)
November 3, 2014 Filing 1202 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1157 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
October 31, 2014 Filing 1201 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1140 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NIBCO INC.'S Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement of Jurisdictional Facts Defendant NIBCO INC.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Response to its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Nibco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Toohey, James)
October 29, 2014 Filing 1200 NOTICE by Joy Technologies, Inc. Certificate of Service on its Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production and Response to Plaintiff's Interrogatories (Cantieri, Michael)
October 29, 2014 Filing 1199 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley N. Ritter on behalf of Billie Denton (Ritter, Bradley)
October 29, 2014 Filing 1198 REPLY to Response to Motion re #894 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MW Custom Papers LLC. (Huelsmann, Brian)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 ORDER granting #1196 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bradley N. Ritter on behalf of Billie Denton. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 28, 2014 Filing 1196 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bradley N. Ritter $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2433693 by on behalf of Billie Denton. (Ritter, Bradley)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1195 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1130 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1194 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1120 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1136 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1192 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1140 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NIBCO INC.'S Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement of Jurisdictional Facts filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1191 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1115 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction BASF Corporation filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
October 24, 2014 Filing 1190 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1042 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition filed by Conoco Phillips Company. (Hill, Keith)
October 23, 2014 Filing 1189 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1114 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First Amended Complaint filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1188 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1042 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition ConocoPhillips filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
October 15, 2014 Filing 1187 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1053 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1186 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #1179 Notice of Appearance filed by Pecora Corporation, #1180 Notice of Appearance filed by Research-Cottrell, Inc., #1178 Notice of Appearance filed by Research-Cottrell, Inc., #1182 Notice of Appearance filed by Ladish Valve Company, LLC, #1181 Notice of Appearance filed by Mueller Steam Speciality Co.. See attached document for specifics. (jaj)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1185 MOTION for Leave to File Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order regarding CrossClaims, etc. by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order)(Bronsky, A.)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1184 NOTICE by Hennessy Industries, Inc. to Join the Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1183 NOTICE by API Heat Transfer, Inc. to Join the Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Attachments: #1 Certificate)(Jones, Stephanie)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1182 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Ladish Valve Company, LLC (Telthorst, James)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1181 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Mueller Steam Speciality Co.(a division of Watts Water Technologies, Inc.) (Telthorst, James)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1180 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Research-Cottrell, Inc. (Telthorst, James)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1179 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Pecora Corporation (Telthorst, James)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1178 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Telthorst on behalf of Research-Cottrell, Inc. (Telthorst, James) Modified on 10/14/2014 (jaj).
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #1171 Motion to Substitute Attorney, #1172 Motion to Substitute Attorney, AND #1173 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Ms. Kelly and Mr. Page are directed to file (one) Motion for Substitution of Counsel that sets forth each Defendant, by name, for which Ms. Kelly seeks to enter an appearance and for which Mr. Page seeks to withdraw his appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/9/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 ORDER GRANTING #1007 #1008 #1034 #1036 #1038 #1108 and #1111 . Notices filed by Honeywell International, Inc. Kvaerner U.S. Inc., Navistar International Corporation, and Oakfabco, Inc. are deemed timely filed. Defendants Hennessy Industries, Inc., API Heat Transfer, Inc., and Ferro Engineering to file their notices by October 14, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/9/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 ORDER GRANTING #1160 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin F. O'Malley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/9/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 8, 2014 Filing 1174 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #1173 Motion to Substitute Attorney filed by Ladish Valve Company, LLC, #1172 Motion to Substitute Attorney filed by Mueller Steam Speciality Co., #1171 Motion to Substitute Attorney filed by Research-Cottrell, Inc. See attached document for specifics (mar)
October 7, 2014 Filing 1173 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Ladish Valve Company, LLC. (Kelly, Patricia)
October 7, 2014 Filing 1172 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mueller Steam Speciality Co.(a division of Watts Water Technologies, Inc.). (Kelly, Patricia)
October 7, 2014 Filing 1171 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Research-Cottrell, Inc.. (Kelly, Patricia)
October 4, 2014 Filing 1170 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and Defenses by John Crane, Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
October 3, 2014 Filing 1169 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC.(Bronsky, A.) Modified on 10/6/2014 (tkm ).
October 2, 2014 Filing 1168 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Billie Denton (Romani, Allyson)
October 2, 2014 Filing 1167 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Billie Denton (Romani, Allyson)
October 2, 2014 Filing 1166 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1161 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Billie Denton, #1163 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. See attached document for specifics (tkm )
September 30, 2014 Filing 1165 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Billie Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
September 30, 2014 Filing 1164 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and Crossclaims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC.(Offergeld, Leslie)
September 30, 2014 Filing 1163 ENTRY STRICKEN - ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC.(Bronsky, A.) Modified on 10/2/2014 (tkm ).
September 30, 2014 Filing 1162 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Billie Denton (Romani, Allyson)
September 30, 2014 Filing 1161 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Billie Denton (McLeod, Matthew) Modified on 10/2/2014 (tkm ).
September 29, 2014 Filing 1160 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Pfizer, Inc.. (O'Malley, Kevin)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1159 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Voss on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Voss, Andrew)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1158 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , Answer to All Cross-Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Oakfabco, Inc..(Ward, John)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1157 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by E.I. DuPont De Nemours Company. Responses due by 11/3/2014 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Schaecher, Corey)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1156 MOTION to Strike #1009 Amended Complaint counts II and VII and memorandum in support by Cleaver-Brooks. (Griebel, Erin)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1155 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Cleaver-Brooks.(Griebel, Erin)
September 25, 2014 Filing 1154 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by International Paper Company.(Finnigan, Mindy)
September 24, 2014 Filing 1153 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. McLeod on behalf of Billie Denton (McLeod, Matthew)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 ORDER granting #1117 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew B. McLeod on behalf of Plaintiff Billie Denton (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 23, 2014 Filing 1151 The Nash Engineering Company's ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Nash Engineering Company.(Foster, Margaret)
September 23, 2014 Filing 1150 Armstrong Pumps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Armstrong Pumps, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
September 23, 2014 Filing 1149 The Kraissl Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Kraissel Company, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
September 23, 2014 Filing 1148 TA COMPANY, f/k/a THE AUSTIN COMPANY ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by TA Company.(Foster, Margaret)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1147 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Crosby Valve, Inc..(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1146 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by McNally Industries LLC.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1145 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1144 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1143 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by FMC Corporation.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1142 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Nalco Company.(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1141 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Kennedy Valve Company, a division of McWane.(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1140 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NIBCO INC.'S Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement of Jurisdictional Facts by Nibco, Inc.. Responses due by 10/27/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Toohey, James)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1139 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by McCord Gasket Company.(Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1138 Fischbach LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, Crossclaim, and Answer to Crossclaims ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Natkin Service Co..(Toohey, James)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1137 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Chevron Philips Co.(Hansell, Erik)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1136 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Exxon Mobile Corporation. Responses due by 10/27/2014 (Fanning, David)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1135 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Fort Kent Holdings, Inc..(Pozan, Kyle)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1134 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint at Law and Cross-Claims by Zurn Industries, Inc..(Irwin, William)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1133 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint at Law and Cross-Claims by Joy Technologies, Inc..(Irwin, William)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1132 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint at Law and Cross-Claims by Gardner Denver Inc.(Irwin, William)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1131 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Dap, Inc..(Irwin, William)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1130 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by Valero Energy Corporation. Responses due by 10/27/2014 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ethan A. Jones Affidavit)(Campbell, Travis)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1129 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Baltimore Aircoil Company.(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1128 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1127 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1126 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Georgia-Pacific Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1125 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Foseco, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1124 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Illinois Tool Works, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1123 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Company.(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1122 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1121 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Trane US, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1120 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction by Clow Corporation. Responses due by 10/27/2014 (Geraci, Carl)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1119 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Catalytic Construction Company, URS Energy & Construction, Inc., Washington Group International, Inc..(Burke, Kenneth)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1118 Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Separate Defendant Occidental to Plaintiffs' First Amened Complaint ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Occidental Chemical Corporation(as successor in interest to Durez Corporation).(Zellmer, Mark)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1117 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew B. McLeod $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2401199 by on behalf of Billie Denton. (McLeod, Matthew)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1116 Defendant Rohm and Haas Company's ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff by Rohm and Haas Company.(Smith, Mark)
September 22, 2014 Filing 1115 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BASF Corporation. Responses due by 10/27/2014 (Kilpatrick, Joseph)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1114 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First Amended Complaint by MW Custom Papers LLC. Responses due by 10/23/2014 (Huelsmann, Brian)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1113 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc..(Cross, William)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1112 NOTICE by Oakfabco, Inc. to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Ward, John)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1111 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Notice to Join In Defandants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross Claims, Answers to Cross Claims, and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Ward, John)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1110 NOTICE by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company) to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Bronsky, A.)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1109 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company).(Bronsky, A.)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1108 MOTION for Leave to File its Notice to Join Defendants' Agreed Order regarding CrossClaims, Answer to CrossClaims and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice)(Bronsky, A.)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1107 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff, Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Watson McDaniel Company.(Blaser, Tucker)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1106 NOTICE by Sargent & Lundy LLC re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1105 NOTICE by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1104 NOTICE by Riley Stoker Corporation re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1103 NOTICE by Parker-Hannifin Corporation re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1102 NOTICE by Lennox Industries, Inc. re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1101 NOTICE by Lattner Boiler Company re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1100 NOTICE by Goodrich Corporation re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1099 NOTICE by The Fairbanks Company re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1098 NOTICE by Dana Companies, LLC re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1097 NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Buffalo Air Handling re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1096 NOTICE by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1095 NOTICE by Certainteed Corporation re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1094 Defendant Nooter Corporation's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , Cross-Claims Against All Defendants, and Answer to All Cross-Claims by Nooter Corporation.(Nieder, Douglas)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1093 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Sargent & Lundy LLC.(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1092 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Answer to All Cross-Claims by Shell Oil Company.(Shultz, James)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1091 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Buffalo Air Handling.(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1090 NOTICE of Appearance by James R Shultz on behalf of Shell Oil Company (Shultz, James)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1089 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Certainteed Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1088 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Dana Companies, LLC.(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1087 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by The Fairbanks Company.(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1086 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Goodrich Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1085 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Imo Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1084 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Lattner Boiler Company.(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1083 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1027 Notice (Other) filed by General Electric Company. Filer contacted the clerk's office to inform them of an error made at Doc. 1027 and that they refiled document correctly at Doc. 1028. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 18, 2014 Filing 1082 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Lennox Industries, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1081 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1080 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Riley Stoker Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1079 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by The WM Powell Company.(Newport, Michael)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1078 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1077 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Warren Pumps LLC.(Hill, Keith)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1076 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Johnston Boiler Company.(Newport, Michael)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1075 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Simpson Timber Company.(Newport, Michael)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1074 Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Anticipated Cross Claims and ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Newport, Michael)
September 17, 2014 Filing 1073 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint at Law and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Carrier Corporation.(Stevens, Kyler)
September 17, 2014 Filing 1072 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
September 17, 2014 Filing 1071 Thiem Corporation as Successor By Merger to Universal Refractories Corporation, Individually and Incorrectly Named as Universal Refractories, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Universal Refactories, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
September 17, 2014 Filing 1070 Beazer East, Inc., Individually and Incorrectly Named Beazer East, Inc f/k/a Koppers Industries, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Beazer East, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
September 17, 2014 Filing 1069 Defendant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint at Law and Cross-Claims by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc..(Stevens, Kyler)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1068 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and All Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Starnes, William)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1067 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and All Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc..(Starnes, William)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1066 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and All Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Corporation.(Starnes, William)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1065 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Columbia Boiler Company.(Stevens, Kyler)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1064 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and All Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fluor Constructors International, Inc..(Starnes, William)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1063 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and All Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Daniel International Corporation.(Starnes, William)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1062 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company.(Stevens, Kyler)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1061 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and all Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ref-Chem Corporation.(Starnes, William)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1060 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution against A.O. Smith Corporation, API Heat Transfer, Inc., AWC 1997 Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ajax Magnethermic Corp., Alcoa Inc, Allied Manufacturing Company, American Optical Corporation, Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong International Inc, Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Arvinmeritor Inc, Asbestos Corporation Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, Aurora Pump Company, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., BASF Corporation, BF Shaw, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Beazer East, Inc., Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Incorporated, Blue M, Bonney Forge Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Buffalo Air Handling, Burnham, LLC, CBS Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Catalytic Construction Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Celanese Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Chevron Corporation, Chevron Philips Co, Chevron USA, Inc., Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Cleaver-Brooks, Clow Corporation, Coastal Refining and Marketing, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company, Compudyne Corporation, Conoco Phillips Company, Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Crane Company, Crosby Valve, Inc., Crown Cork & Seal USA Inc, Cummins Inc., Dal-Tile Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Daniel International Corporation, Dap, Inc., Dewitt Products Co., Dezurik, Inc., Domco Products Texas, Inc., Dravo Corporation, Duro Dyne Corporation, Eastern Products Corp., E.I. DuPont De Nemours Company, EEIC, Inc, Eaton Corporation, Elof Hansson USA Inc., Ericsson, Inc., Essex Specialty Products, LLC, Ethyl Corporation, Exxon Mobile Corporation, FMC Corporation, Ferro Engineering, Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve Corporation F/K/A, Flowserve US Inc., Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Corporation, Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion, Gardner Denver Inc, General Cable Industries, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Canada. Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Graybar Electric Company Inc, Greene Tweed & Co., Inc, Grimes Aeropsace Corporation, Grinnell Corporation, Gulf Oil Corporation, Harper International Corp., Hennessy Industries, Inc., Hitachi America LTD, Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., ITT Controls, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, International Paper Company, J.A. Sexauer, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Joy Technologies, Inc., KCG, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Kennedy Valve Company, a division of McWane, Kitz Corporation, Kraissel Company, Inc., Kunkle Valve, Kvaerner U.S. Inc., Ladish Valve Company, LLC, Lattner Boiler Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation, Lennox Industries, Inc., Lindberg, MW Custom Papers LLC, Maremont Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, McNally Industries LLC, Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metso Minerals Industries, Inc., Milwaukee Valve Co., Mine Safety Appliances Co., Mitsubishi Electric USA, Inc., Motion Control Industries, Inc., Mueller Steam Speciality Co., NRG Texas Power, NRG Texas Power, LLC, Nalco Company, Nash Engineering Company, Natkin Service Co., Navistar International Corporation, Neles-Jamesbury, Inc., Nibco, Inc., Nooter Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Paccar Inc, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo Abex LLC, RME Petroleum Company, Ref-Chem Corporation, Resco Holdings LLC, Research-Cottrell, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Richards Industries, Inc., Riley Stoker Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm & Haas Co., Rohm and Haas Company, SB Decking, Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Santa Fe Braun, Inc., Sargent & Lundy LLC, Schnieder Electric USA, Inc., Seco Warwick Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Sherwin Williams Company, The, Shintech, Inc., Simpson Timber Company, Spence Engineering Co., Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Co.., TA Company, Texaco, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, The Fairbanks Company, The J.R. Clarkson Company, The WM Powell Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Thermwell Products Co. Inc., Trane US, Inc., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, URS Energy & Construction, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refactories, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Wabco Holdings, Inc., Wallace Industries, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Washington Group International, Inc., Watson McDaniel Company, Weil McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, XEF, Inc., York International Corporation, Zurn Industries, Inc., Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. by ITT Corporation.(Rogers, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1059 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Dravo Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1058 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion.(Bultman, Bradley)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1057 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Flowserve Corporation F/K/A.(Bultman, Bradley)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1056 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1055 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by BW/IP, Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1054 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pfizer, Inc..(O'Malley, Kevin)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1053 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Texaco, Inc.. Responses due by 10/20/2014 (Varney, Robert)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1052 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1047 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, filed by Welco Manufacturing Company. Document stricken at the request of the filer. Document is re-filed at document # 1049. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 15, 2014 Filing 1051 Defendant York International Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to All Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by York International Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
September 15, 2014 Filing 1050 Defendant J.A. Sexauer Inc's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to All Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by J.A. Sexauer, Inc..(Welply, Justin)
September 15, 2014 Filing 1049 Defendant Tuthill Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Tuthill Corporation.(Welply, Justin)
September 15, 2014 Filing 1048 Defendant Welco Manufacturing Company's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Welco Manufacturing Company.(Welply, Justin)
September 15, 2014 Filing 1047 ENTRY STRICKEN: Defendant Tuthill Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Welco Manufacturing Company.(Welply, Justin)
September 15, 2014 Filing 1046 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Owens-Illinois, Inc..(Watson, Brian)
September 15, 2014 Filing 1045 Defendant Flowserve US Inc solely as successor to Edward Valve and Rockwell Manufacturing Company's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Flowserve US Inc..(Welply, Justin)
September 15, 2014 Filing 1044 Defendant Borg Warner Morse TEC Inc's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to all Cross Claims, and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc..(Welply, Justin)
September 15, 2014 Filing 1043 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to All Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
September 12, 2014 Filing 1042 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition by Conoco Phillips Company. Responses due by 10/17/2014 (Hill, Keith)
September 12, 2014 Filing 1041 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles)
September 12, 2014 Filing 1040 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles)
September 11, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Sprinkmann Sons Corporation. (See Doc. #1029 for complete PDF document) Filer failed to additionally select "Crossclaim" upon docketing.(lmb)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1039 NOTICE by Navistar International Corporation re #1038 MOTION for Leave to File Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims as Filed by Co-Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, et al. (Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1038 MOTION for Leave to File Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims as Filed by Co-Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, et al. by Navistar International Corporation. (Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1037 NOTICE by Kvaerner U.S. Inc. re #1036 MOTION for Leave to File Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims as Filed by Co-Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, et al. (Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1036 MOTION for Leave to File Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims as Filed by Co-Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, et al. by Kvaerner U.S. Inc.. (Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1035 NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. re #1034 MOTION for Leave to File Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims as Filed by Co-Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, et al. (Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1034 MOTION for Leave to File Notice to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims as Filed by Co-Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, et al. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Jones, Kirra)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1033 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by The Dow Chemical Company.(Zimmerman, Justin)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1032 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Ethyl Corporation.(Zimmerman, Justin)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1031 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Zimmerman, Justin)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1030 NOTICE by Watson McDaniel Company to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses (Blaser, Tucker)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1029 SPRINKMANN SONS CORPORATION'S ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Sprinkmann Sons Corporation.(Vantine, Marcie)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1028 NOTICE by Chicago Bridge & Iron Company re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice to Join Defendant's Agreed Order (Fournie, Raymond)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1027 ENTRY STRICKEN: NOTICE by General Electric Company re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Defendant's Agreed Order (Fournie, Raymond) Modified on 9/18/2014 (lmb).
September 11, 2014 Filing 1026 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1025 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Copes-Vulcan, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1024 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice to Join Defendant's Agreed Order (Fournie, Raymond)
September 10, 2014 Filing 1023 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
September 10, 2014 Filing 1022 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint Answers to All Cross-Claims and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Maremont Corporation.(Barke, Ryan)
September 10, 2014 Filing 1021 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
September 10, 2014 Filing 1020 NOTICE by Catalytic Construction Company, URS Energy & Construction, Inc., Washington Group International, Inc. to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses (Burke, Kenneth)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1019 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Armstrong International Inc.(Storm, Carla)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1018 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Coastal Refining and Marketing, Inc..(Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1017 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RME Petroleum Company.(Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1016 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Treco Construction Services, Inc..(Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1015 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Resco Holdings LLC.(Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1014 ANSWER to #1009 Amended Complaint by Brand Insulations, Inc..(Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1013 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Nussbaumer on behalf of Coastal Refining and Marketing, Inc. (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1012 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Nussbaumer on behalf of RME Petroleum Company (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1011 NOTICE by Domco Products Texas, Inc. to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Veath, Beth)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1010 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, Answers to All Cross-Claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Domco Products Texas, Inc..(Veath, Beth)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1009 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants.(Romani, Allyson)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1008 MOTION for Leave to File NOTICE TO JOIN THE AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS OUT OF TIME by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NOTICE TO JOIN THE AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS)(Jones, Stephanie)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1007 MOTION for Leave to File NOTICE TO JOIN THE AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS OUT OF TIME by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NOTICE TO JOIN THE AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS)(Jones, Stephanie)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 ORDER RESETTING HEARINGS: In light of the recent case reassignment to Judge Staci M. Yandle, the Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 1/6/2016 at 9:30 AM and Jury Trial will remain SET for 1/25/2016 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/8/2014. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 8, 2014 Filing 1005 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #932 Notice (Other) filed by Exxon Mobile Corporation. Discovery materials are not filed with the Court, but submitted to the parties. In this regard, a Certificate of Service for any discovery, including Initial Disclosures, need not be filed with the Court.(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 5, 2014 Filing 1004 NOTICE by Sepco Corporation TO JOIN THE AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS (Fergus, Sean)
September 5, 2014 Filing 1003 NOTICE by John Crane, Inc. TO JOIN THE AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS (Fergus, Sean)
September 5, 2014 Filing 1002 NOTICE by Universal Refactories, Inc. to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Stevens, Kyler)
September 5, 2014 Filing 1001 NOTICE by Beazer East, Inc. to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Stevens, Kyler)
September 5, 2014 Filing 1000 NOTICE by Carrier Corporation to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Stevens, Kyler)
September 5, 2014 Filing 999 NOTICE by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Stevens, Kyler)
September 5, 2014 Filing 998 NOTICE by Eaton Corporation re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Connolly, Brian)
September 5, 2014 Filing 997 NOTICE by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. To Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Stevens, Kyler)
September 5, 2014 Filing 996 NOTICE by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Cross, William)
September 5, 2014 Filing 995 NOTICE by Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Stevens, Kyler)
September 5, 2014 Filing 994 NOTICE by TA Company to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Foster, Margaret)
September 5, 2014 Filing 993 NOTICE by Armstrong Pumps, Inc. to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Foster, Margaret)
September 5, 2014 Filing 992 NOTICE by Kraissel Company, Inc. to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Foster, Margaret)
September 5, 2014 Filing 991 NOTICE by Sprinkmann Sons Corporation TO JOIN DEFENDANTS' AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS (Kernell, Thomas)
September 5, 2014 Filing 990 NOTICE by NRG Texas Power as purported successor-in-intered to HoustonLighting and Power Company to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crosslcaims (Stevens, Kyler)
September 5, 2014 Filing 989 NOTICE by Nash Engineering Company to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Foster, Margaret)
September 5, 2014 Filing 988 NOTICE by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crosslcaims (Stevens, Kyler)
September 5, 2014 Filing 987 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answes to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Joley, Charles)
September 5, 2014 Filing 986 NOTICE by The WM Powell Company to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Dauphin, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Filing 985 NOTICE by Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Dauphin, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Filing 984 NOTICE by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Dauphin, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Filing 983 NOTICE by Superior Boiler Works, Inc. to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Dauphin, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Filing 982 JOINDER by Pfizer, Inc.. Joinder in #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, . (O'Malley, Kevin)
September 5, 2014 Filing 981 NOTICE by Baltimore Aircoil Company, Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Kennedy Valve Company, a division of McWane, MW Custom Papers LLC, Nalco Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Wabco Holdings, Inc. to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Wilson, Benjamin)
September 5, 2014 Filing 980 NOTICE by Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross-Claims, Answers to Cross-Claims and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims (Dawson, Kevin)
September 5, 2014 Filing 979 NOTICE by Simpson Timber Company to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Dauphin, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Filing 978 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Conwed Corporation by Conwed Corporation.(Graber, Dennis)
September 5, 2014 Filing 977 NOTICE by Milwaukee Valve Co. to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Dauphin, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Filing 976 ANSWER to Complaint by Howden North America, Inc..(Graber, Dennis)
September 5, 2014 Filing 975 ANSWER to Complaint by Goulds Pumps Incorporated.(Graber, Dennis)
September 5, 2014 Filing 974 NOTICE by Johnston Boiler Company to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Dauphin, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Filing 973 Defendant Burnham, LLC ANSWER to Complaint by Burnham, LLC.(Graber, Dennis)
September 5, 2014 Filing 972 NOTICE by Armstrong International Inc to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Dauphin, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Filing 971 NOTICE by Valero Energy Corporation re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Campbell, Travis)
September 5, 2014 Filing 970 NOTICE by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC Notice to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Re: Crossclaims (Dahlmann, Donald)
September 5, 2014 Filing 969 NOTICE by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC Notice to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Re: Crossclaims (Dahlmann, Donald)
September 5, 2014 Filing 968 NOTICE by Ameron International Corporation to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crosslcaims (Dauphin, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Filing 967 NOTICE by Crosby Valve, Inc., FMC Corporation, McCord Gasket Company, McNally Industries LLC, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
September 5, 2014 Filing 966 NOTICE by Exxon Mobile Corporation to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Fanning, David)
September 5, 2014 Filing 965 NOTICE by Rohm & Haas Co., Rohm and Haas Company to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Smith, Mark)
September 5, 2014 Filing 964 NOTICE by Coastal Refining and Marketing, Inc. TO JOIN AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 5, 2014 Filing 963 NOTICE by Celanese Corporation re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Thames, Earl)
September 5, 2014 Filing 962 NOTICE by RME Petroleum Company TO JOIN AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 5, 2014 Filing 961 NOTICE by Welco Manufacturing Company re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Maschhoff, James)
September 5, 2014 Filing 960 NOTICE by Tuthill Corporation re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Maschhoff, James)
September 5, 2014 Filing 959 NOTICE by Treco Construction Services, Inc. TO JOIN AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 5, 2014 Filing 958 NOTICE by York International Corporation re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to CrossClaims (Maschhoff, James)
September 5, 2014 Filing 957 NOTICE by Resco Holdings LLC TO JOIN AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 5, 2014 Filing 956 NOTICE by Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc. re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Maschhoff, James)
September 5, 2014 Filing 955 NOTICE by Flowserve US Inc. re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Maschhoff, James)
September 5, 2014 Filing 954 NOTICE by Brand Insulations, Inc. NOTICE TO JOIN AGREED ORDER REGARDING CROSSCLAIMS, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSSCLAIMS (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
September 5, 2014 Filing 953 NOTICE by J.A. Sexauer, Inc. re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Maschhoff, James)
September 5, 2014 Filing 952 NOTICE by Fluor Corporation to Join in Defendants' Amended Order re: Crossclaims (Starnes, William)
September 5, 2014 Filing 951 NOTICE by Fluor Daniel Illinois, Inc. to Join in Defendants' Agreed Order re: Crossclaims (Starnes, William)
September 5, 2014 Filing 950 NOTICE by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. to join in Agreed Order re: Crossclaims (Starnes, William)
September 4, 2014 Filing 949 NOTICE by Nooter Corporation re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, (Nieder, Douglas)
September 4, 2014 Filing 948 REPLY to Response to Motion re #894 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MW Custom Papers LLC. (Huelsmann, Brian)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 947 ORDER GRANTING #927 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, and GRANTING #927 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Troy D. Hoyt terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/4/2014. (nms) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 4, 2014 Filing 946 NOTICE by International Paper Company to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Finnigan, Mindy)
September 4, 2014 Filing 945 NOTICE of Appearance by A. J. Bronsky on behalf of Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (Bronsky, A.)
September 4, 2014 Filing 944 NOTICE by Daniel International Corporation to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Starnes, William)
September 4, 2014 Filing 943 NOTICE by Fluor Constructors International, Inc. to Join Defendants Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims (Starnes, William)
September 4, 2014 Filing 942 NOTICE by Ref-Chem Corporation Notice to Join Defendants' Agreed Order re: Crossclaims (Starnes, William)
September 3, 2014 Filing 941 JOINDER by Occidental Chemical Corporation(as successor in interest to Durez Corporation). Joinder in #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, . (Zellmer, Mark)
September 3, 2014 Filing 940 NOTICE by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Texaco, Inc. Notice to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Varney, Robert)
September 3, 2014 Filing 939 NOTICE by Chevron Philips Co re #916 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Hansell, Erik)
September 3, 2014 Filing 938 NOTICE by BASF Corporation to Join Agreed Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims & Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims (Kilpatrick, Joseph)
September 3, 2014 Filing 937 NOTICE by E.I. DuPont De Nemours Company to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross-Claims, Answers to Cross-Claims, and Affirmative Defenses to Cross-Claims (Schaecher, Corey)
September 3, 2014 Filing 936 NOTICE by Burnham, LLC Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross-Claims, Answers to Cross-Claims and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims (Dawson, Kevin)
September 3, 2014 Filing 935 NOTICE by Howden North America, Inc. Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross-Claims, Answers to Cross-Claims and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims (Dawson, Kevin)
September 3, 2014 Filing 934 NOTICE by Conwed Corporation Join Defendants' Agreed Order regarding Cross-Claims, Answers to Cross-Claims and Affirmative Defenses to Cross-Claims (Dawson, Kevin)
September 3, 2014 Filing 933 NOTICE by Goulds Pumps Incorporated to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross-Claims, Answers to Cross Claims and Affirmative Defenses to Cross Claims (Dawson, Kevin)
September 2, 2014 Filing 932 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE by Exxon Mobile Corporation Certificate of Service of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) (Fanning, David) Modified on 9/8/2014 (jaj).
September 2, 2014 Filing 931 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Fanning on behalf of Exxon Mobile Corporation (Fanning, David)
September 2, 2014 Filing 930 NOTICE by Cleaver-Brooks to Join Defendants' Agreed Order Regarding Cross-Claims, Answers to Cross-Claims, and Affirmative Defenses to Cross-Claims (Griebel, Erin)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 929 ORDER TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #927 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and, #927 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Bronsky is INSTRUCTED to enter his appearance by separate docket entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/2/2014. (nms) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 29, 2014 Filing 928 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Hood on behalf of Sepco Corporation (Hood, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2014 Filing 927 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Hoyt, Troy)
August 29, 2014 Filing 926 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #924 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Robert Frazior Denton. See attached document for specifics (mar)
August 28, 2014 Filing 925 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #920 Amended Complaint filed by Robert Frazior Denton. Filer was not given leave to file said proposed amended complaint. Filer should file a motion to amend and email the proposed amended complaint to the appropriate judge's proposed documents email box.(lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 28, 2014 Filing 924 STRICKEN AT DOC. 926 - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robert Frazior Denton.(Romani, Allyson) Modified on 8/29/2014 (mar).
August 28, 2014 Filing 923 RESPONSE in Opposition re #894 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
August 28, 2014 Filing 922 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Service by Goodyear Canada. Inc.. Responses due by 10/2/2014 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Caroline Pajot in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Stevens, Kyler)
August 28, 2014 Filing 921 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Goodyear Canada. Inc. (Stevens, Kyler)
August 26, 2014 Filing 920 ENTRY STRICKEN: AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Frazior Denton.(Romani, Allyson) Modified on 8/28/2014 (lmb).
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 919 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 163 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 13-1243-SMY-DGW. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/21/14. (car)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 25, 2014 Filing 918 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Renee Griebel on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks (Griebel, Erin)
August 22, 2014 Filing 917 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Flowserve US Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER GRANTING #352 MOTION to have all Counterclaims Deemed Filed and Answered Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5(C)(1)(B), Alternatively MOTION to Continue Deadlines to Answer and File Counterclaims filed by Union Carbide Corporation, Honeywell, Inc., Essex Specialty Products, LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, Graybar Electric Company Inc, Ethyl Corporation; GRANTING #452 MOTION To Have All Counterclaims Deemed Filed And Answered Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5(C)(1)(B), Alternatively, Motion To Continue Deadlines To Answer And File Counterclaims filed by Union Carbide Corporation, Honeywell, Inc., Essex Specialty Products, LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, Graybar Electric Company Inc, Ethyl Corporation; GRANTING #731 Proposed MOTION for Discovery filed by Robert Frazior Denton. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/1/2015 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/21/14. (sgp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2014: #1 Rule 5(c)(1)(B) Stipulation) (sgp, ).
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER MOOTING #114 #180 #368 #539 #760 #818 #823 #845 #857 #858 #859 #864 #894 . GRANTING #807 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nooter Corporation, GRANTING #832 MOTION for Leave to File responsive pleadings (Unopposed) filed by Nibco, Inc., GRANTING #836 MOTION for Extension of Time to File responsive pleadings (Unopposed) filed by Natkin Service Co. GRANTING #888 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Robert Frazior Denton. GRANTING #791 MOTION re #780 Notice of Appearance, #781 Notice of Appearance, #783 Notice (Other), #782 Notice of Appearance to Remove Designation of Counsel filed by Kitz Corporation: AttorneyS Debra K. Zahalsky; Joseph R. Brown, Jr and Christopher P. Threlkeld terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/21/14. (sgp)
August 21, 2014 Filing 914 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 913 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 912 ORDER GRANTING #779 Motion for Extension of Time; GRANTING #815 Motion for Extension of Time; GRANTING #870 Motion for Joinder; GRANTING #871 Motion for Joinder; GRANTING #872 Motion for Joinder; GRANTING #874 Motion for Joinder; GRANTING #892 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/21/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 21, 2014 Filing 911 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of J.A. Sexauer, Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 910 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of York International Corporation (Maschhoff, James)
August 20, 2014 Filing 909 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 15, 2014 Filing 908 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Amendment to #361 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Stevens, Kyler)
August 14, 2014 Filing 907 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #906 Notice (Other) filed by Sprinkmann Sons Corporation. See attached document for specifics (mar)
August 13, 2014 Filing 906 STRICKEN AT DOC. 907 - NOTICE by Sprinkmann Sons Corporation of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Kernell, Thomas) Modified on 8/14/2014 (mar).
August 13, 2014 Filing 905 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #901 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Robert Frazior Denton. Incorrect case number indicated on document. The document was refiled at document 902. No further action required by the filer. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 11, 2014 Filing 904 RESPONSE in Opposition re #845 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction Clow Corporation filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
August 11, 2014 Filing 903 RESPONSE in Opposition re #818 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Valero Energy Corporation filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
August 11, 2014 Filing 902 RESPONSE in Opposition re #823 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Ladish Valve Company, L.L.C. filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
August 11, 2014 Filing 901 ENTRY STRICKEN: RESPONSE in Opposition re #823 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Ladish Valve Company, LLC filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
August 5, 2014 Filing 900 Transcript of Motion Hearing, a.m. session held on June 13, 2014, before Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Barbara Kniepmann, Telephone number 1-618-482-9482. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2014. (bkk, )
July 29, 2014 Filing 899 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Hoyt, Troy)
July 28, 2014 Filing 898 RESPONSE in Opposition re #760 MOTION to Dismiss Answers and Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Dismiss/Transfer Based Upon the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens Rohm & Haas Company filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 25, 2014 Filing 897 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES - Deadlines regarding filing fee and Motions regarding exhaustion of administrative remedies were set inadvertently in the wrong case and have been terminated. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 25, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Action due by 10/3/2014 (Plaintiff to pay initial partial filing fee of $3.33). Dispositive Motions re Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies due by 11/7/2014. (kek)
July 25, 2014 Filing 896 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #895 Response to Motion filed by Trane US, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, #894 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MW Custom Papers LLC. See attached document for specifics (kek)
July 24, 2014 Filing 895 RESPONSE to Motion re #731 Proposed MOTION for Discovery with consent filed by Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc.. (Geraci, Carl) Modified on 7/25/2014 (kek).
July 24, 2014 Filing 894 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction, by MW Custom Papers LLC. Responses due by 8/28/2014 (Huelsmann, Brian) Modified on 7/25/2014 (kek).
July 24, 2014 Filing 893 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Huelsmann on behalf of MW Custom Papers LLC (Huelsmann, Brian)
July 17, 2014 Filing 892 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc.. (Geraci, Carl)
July 17, 2014 Filing 891 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. DuPont De Nemours Company. (Schaecher, Corey)
July 15, 2014 Filing 890 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nooter Corporation. (Nieder, Douglas)
July 14, 2014 Filing 889 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobile Corporation. (Morris, H.)
July 14, 2014 Filing 888 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 14, 2014 Filing 887 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer, Inc.. (O'Malley, Kevin)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 886 ORDER granting #861 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Troy D. Hoyt on behalf of Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (myz)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 14, 2014 Filing 885 RESPONSE in Opposition re #591 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Ajax Magnethermic Corporation filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 14, 2014 Filing 884 RESPONSE in Opposition re #590 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Bird Incorporated filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 14, 2014 Filing 883 RESPONSE in Opposition re #589 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Chicago Bridge & Iron filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 14, 2014 Filing 882 RESPONSE in Opposition re #588 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) General Electric Company filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 10, 2014 Filing 881 Armstrong Pumps, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Armstrong Pumps, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
July 10, 2014 Filing 880 The Kraissl Company, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Kraissel Company, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
July 10, 2014 Filing 879 RESPONSE in Opposition re #864 MOTION for More Definite Statement Ingersoll-Rand Company, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Trane U.S., Inc., Velan Valve Corp., Nalco Company and Wabco Holdings, Inc. filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 10, 2014 Filing 878 RESPONSE in Opposition re #859 MOTION for More Definite Statement Baltimore Aircoil Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Industrial Holdings Corporation & Kennedy Valve Co. filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 10, 2014 Filing 877 The Nash Engineering Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Nash Engineering Company.(Foster, Margaret)
July 10, 2014 Filing 876 RESPONSE in Opposition re #858 MOTION for More Definite Statement Illinois Tool Works, Inc. filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 10, 2014 Filing 875 RESPONSE in Opposition re #857 MOTION for More Definite Statement Lear Siegler Diversified holdings Corp. filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 10, 2014 Filing 874 MOTION for Joinder CO-DEFENDANT'S JOINT MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION/REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME by Sprinkmann Sons Corporation. (Kernell, Thomas)
July 9, 2014 Filing 873 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Paper Company. (Finnigan, Mindy)
July 9, 2014 Filing 872 MOTION for Joinder of Co-Defendants' Joint Motion for Additonal Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion/Request for Consolidated Discovery by Domco Products Texas, Inc.. (Veath, Beth)
July 9, 2014 Filing 871 MOTION for Joinder of Co-Defendants' Joint Motion for Additonal Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion/Request for Consolidated Discovery by Watson McDaniel Company. (Blaser, Tucker)
July 9, 2014 Filing 870 MOTION for Joinder of Co-Defendants' Joint Motion for Additonal Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion/Request for Consolidated Discovery by Catalytic Construction Company, URS Energy & Construction, Inc., Washington Group International, Inc.. (Burke, Kenneth)
July 9, 2014 Filing 869 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Baltimore Aircoil Company, Crane Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation (Wilson, Benjamin)
July 8, 2014 Filing 868 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey M. Schaecher on behalf of E.I. DuPont De Nemours Company (Schaecher, Corey)
July 8, 2014 Filing 867 NOTICE of Appearance by James V. O'Brien on behalf of E.I. DuPont De Nemours Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Brien, James)
July 8, 2014 Filing 866 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Richards Industries, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 8, 2014 Filing 865 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy D Hoyt on behalf of Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (Hoyt, Troy)
July 8, 2014 Filing 864 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company, MW Custom Papers LLC, Nalco Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Wabco Holdings, Inc.. (Geraci, Carl)
July 8, 2014 Filing 863 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valero Energy Corporation. (Campbell, Travis)
July 8, 2014 Filing 862 NOTICE of Appearance by James V Tomaska on behalf of Nibco, Inc. (Tomaska, James)
July 8, 2014 Filing 861 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyTroy D Hoyt $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2338131 by on behalf of Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Hoyt, Troy)
July 8, 2014 Filing 860 NOTICE of Appearance by James V Tomaska on behalf of Natkin Service Co. (Tomaska, James)
July 8, 2014 Filing 859 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Baltimore Aircoil Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Kennedy Valve Company, a division of McWane. (Geraci, Carl)
July 8, 2014 Filing 858 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Illinois Tool Works, Inc.(individually and as successor in interest to Devcon Corp.). (Geraci, Carl)
July 8, 2014 Filing 857 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation. (Geraci, Carl)
July 8, 2014 Filing 856 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #819 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Sherwin Williams Company, The, #843 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Robert Frazior Denton, #838 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Robert Frazior Denton, #837 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Robert Frazior Denton, #842 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Robert Frazior Denton, #821 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Valero Energy Corporation, #840 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Robert Frazior Denton, #841 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Robert Frazior Denton. See attached document for specifics. (kek)
July 8, 2014 Filing 855 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of MW Custom Papers LLC, Nalco Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Wabco Holdings, Inc. (Geraci, Carl)
July 8, 2014 Filing 854 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. (Szlanfucht, David)
July 8, 2014 Filing 853 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Illinois Tool Works, Inc.(individually and as successor in interest to Devcon Corp.), Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Kennedy Valve Company, a division of McWane, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation (Geraci, Carl)
July 8, 2014 Filing 852 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Baltimore Aircoil Company, Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation (Geraci, Carl)
July 8, 2014 Filing 851 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery G. Chrones on behalf of Nibco, Inc. (Chrones, Jeffery)
July 8, 2014 Filing 850 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery G. Chrones on behalf of Natkin Service Co. (Chrones, Jeffery)
July 7, 2014 Filing 849 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crosby Valve, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Pentair PLC for Crosby Valve, Inc.. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 848 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC identifying Other Affiliate Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) Holding, Inc. for Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 847 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McNally Industries LLC. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 846 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 845 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction by Clow Corporation. Responses due by 8/11/2014 (Geraci, Carl)
July 7, 2014 Filing 844 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McCord Gasket Company identifying Corporate Parent Textron Inc. for McCord Gasket Company. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 843 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 856 - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Richards Industries, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/8/2014 (kek).
July 7, 2014 Filing 842 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 856 - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/8/2014 (kek).
July 7, 2014 Filing 841 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 856 - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Natkin Service Company by Robert Frazior Denton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/8/2014 (kek).
July 7, 2014 Filing 840 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 856 - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant ITT Controls, as successor in interest to McDonnell & Miller by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/8/2014 (kek).
July 7, 2014 Filing 839 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Kunkle Valve (Tayyab, Julia)
July 7, 2014 Filing 838 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 856 - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant EI DuPont de Nemours Company by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/8/2014 (kek).
July 7, 2014 Filing 837 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 856 - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 7/8/2014 (kek).
July 7, 2014 Filing 836 MOTION for Extension of Time to File responsive pleadings (Unopposed) by Natkin Service Co.. (Toohey, James)
July 7, 2014 Filing 835 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Toohey on behalf of Natkin Service Co. (Toohey, James)
July 7, 2014 Filing 834 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TA Company. (Foster, Margaret)
July 7, 2014 Filing 833 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of TA Company (Foster, Margaret)
July 7, 2014 Filing 832 MOTION for Leave to File responsive pleadings (Unopposed) by Nibco, Inc.. (Toohey, James)
July 7, 2014 Filing 831 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Toohey on behalf of Nibco, Inc. (Toohey, James)
July 7, 2014 Filing 830 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Conoco Phillips Company.(Zellmer, Mark)
July 7, 2014 Filing 829 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Zellmer on behalf of Conoco Phillips Company (Zellmer, Mark)
July 7, 2014 Filing 828 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Chevron Philips Co.(Zellmer, Mark)
July 7, 2014 Filing 827 ANSWER to Complaint by Swindell-Dressler International Co...(Hays, Keith)
July 7, 2014 Filing 826 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Zellmer on behalf of Chevron Philips Co (Zellmer, Mark)
July 7, 2014 Filing 825 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Hays on behalf of Swindell-Dressler International Co.. (Hays, Keith)
July 7, 2014 Filing 824 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn N. Chenevert on behalf of Crosby Valve, Inc., FMC Corporation, McNally Industries LLC(as successor in interest to Northern Pump), Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 823 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ladish Valve Company, LLC. Responses due by 8/11/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Page, David)
July 7, 2014 Filing 822 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Page on behalf of Ladish Valve Company, LLC (Page, David)
July 7, 2014 Filing 821 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 856 - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES Valero's Corporate Disclosure by Valero Energy Corporation.(Campbell, Travis) Modified on 7/8/2014 (kek).
July 7, 2014 Filing 820 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn N. Chenevert on behalf of McCord Gasket Company (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
July 7, 2014 Filing 819 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 856 - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sherwin Williams Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Bruegger, John) Modified on 7/8/2014 (kek).
July 7, 2014 Filing 818 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by Valero Energy Corporation. Responses due by 8/11/2014 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tyler Mercer)(Campbell, Travis)
July 7, 2014 Filing 817 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Herbert Campbell on behalf of Valero Energy Corporation (Campbell, Travis)
July 7, 2014 Filing 816 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #807 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nooter Corporation. Filer attached proposed Answer as an Exhibit. Proposed documents do not get electronically filed, but rather sent to the appropriate Judge's e-mail address for proposed documents/orders. Notice to Errors for informational purposes only. No further action required by the filer as to this document. (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 3, 2014 Filing 815 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc.. (Geraci, Carl)
July 3, 2014 Filing 814 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nash Engineering Company. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 813 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of Nash Engineering Company (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 812 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kraissel Company, Inc.. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 811 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of Kraissel Company, Inc. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 810 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong Pumps, Inc.. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 809 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Foster, Margaret)
July 3, 2014 Filing 808 Defendant Nooter Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Nooter Corporation.(Nieder, Douglas)
July 3, 2014 Filing 807 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nooter Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nieder, Douglas)
July 3, 2014 Filing 806 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Buffalo Air Handling.(Hill, Keith)
July 3, 2014 Filing 805 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Buffalo Air Handling (Hill, Keith)
July 3, 2014 Filing 804 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kelly Moore Paint Company by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
July 2, 2014 Filing 803 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Nieder on behalf of Nooter Corporation (Nieder, Douglas)
July 2, 2014 Filing 802 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Maassen on behalf of Shintech, Inc. (Maassen, Stephen)
July 2, 2014 Filing 801 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Szlanfucht on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Szlanfucht, David)
July 2, 2014 Filing 800 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Maassen on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal USA Inc (Maassen, Stephen)
July 2, 2014 Filing 799 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Maassen on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal USA Inc (Maassen, Stephen)
July 2, 2014 Filing 798 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of The J.R. Clarkson Company (Tayyab, Julia)
July 2, 2014 Filing 797 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Grinnell Corporation (Tayyab, Julia)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER re Stipulations of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 7/2/14. (sgp)
July 2, 2014 Filing 795 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The WM Powell Company. (Newport, Michael)
July 2, 2014 Filing 794 Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Anticipated Cross-Claims and ANSWER to Complaint by The WM Powell Company.(Newport, Michael)
July 2, 2014 Filing 793 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Newport on behalf of The WM Powell Company (Newport, Michael)
July 1, 2014 Filing 792 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of The WM Powell Company (Dauphin, Michael)
July 1, 2014 Filing 791 MOTION re #780 Notice of Appearance, #781 Notice of Appearance, #783 Notice (Other), #782 Notice of Appearance to Remove Designation of Counsel by Kitz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of James Walther)(Zahalsky, Debra)
June 30, 2014 Filing 790 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Fischer on behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Fischer, Matthew)
June 30, 2014 Filing 789 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Casmere on behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Casmere, Edward)
June 30, 2014 Filing 788 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owens-Illinois, Inc.. (Watson, Brian)
June 30, 2014 Filing 787 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian O'Connor Watson on behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Watson, Brian)
June 30, 2014 Filing 786 RESPONSE in Opposition re #539 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 27, 2014 Filing 785 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Ward on behalf of Oakfabco, Inc. (Ward, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 784 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Brummond on behalf of Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. (Brummond, Robert)
June 26, 2014 Filing 783 ENTRY STRICKEN SEE ORDER 915 - NOTICE by Kitz Corporation Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court MTD)(Zahalsky, Debra) Modified on 8/25/2014 (tkm ).
June 26, 2014 Filing 782 ENTRY STRICKEN SEE ORDER 915 - NOTICE of Appearance by Debra K. Zahalsky on behalf of Kitz Corporation (Zahalsky, Debra) Modified on 8/25/2014 (tkm ).
June 26, 2014 Filing 781 ENTRY STRICKEN SEE ORDER 915 - NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Brown, Jr on behalf of Kitz Corporation (Brown, Joseph) Modified on 8/25/2014 (tkm ).
June 26, 2014 Filing 780 ENTRY STRICKEN SEE ORDER 915- NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Threlkeld on behalf of Kitz Corporation (Threlkeld, Christopher) Modified on 8/25/2014 (tkm ).
June 24, 2014 Filing 779 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Sherwin Williams Company, The. (Bruegger, John)
June 24, 2014 Filing 778 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #760 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Rohm and Haas Company. See attached document for specifics (mar)
June 24, 2014 Filing 777 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #747 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Howden North America, Inc. Filer incorrectly added Howden North America, Inc., as Corporate Parent and should have added Colfax Corporation. Docket entry has been corrected. No further action required by filer. (mar)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 24, 2014 Filing 776 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #763 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Treco Construction Services, Inc., and #759 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Resco Holdings LLC. See attached document for specifics (mar)
June 24, 2014 Filing 775 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Hipskind on behalf of Maremont Corporation (Hipskind, John)
June 24, 2014 Filing 774 RESPONSE to #649 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Hitachi America LTD. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 24, 2014 Filing 773 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Nussbaumer on behalf of Treco Construction Services, Inc. (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
June 24, 2014 Filing 772 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Nussbaumer on behalf of Resco Holdings LLC (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
June 24, 2014 Filing 771 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Resco Holdings LLC (Orris, Thomas)
June 24, 2014 Filing 770 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Treco Construction Services, Inc. (Orris, Thomas)
June 23, 2014 Filing 769 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation.(Kilpatrick, Joseph)
June 23, 2014 Filing 768 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pharmacia Corporation.(Ault, Jordan)
June 23, 2014 Filing 767 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Occidental Chemical Corporation(as successor in interest to Durez Corporation).(Zellmer, Mark)
June 23, 2014 Filing 766 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Rohm & Haas Co..(Zellmer, Mark)
June 23, 2014 Filing 765 RESPONSE in Opposition re #522 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc. filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 23, 2014 Filing 764 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Treco Construction Services, Inc.. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 763 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 776 - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES Initial Disclosure by Treco Construction Services, Inc..(Rychnovsky, Mary) Modified on 6/24/2014 (mar).
June 23, 2014 Filing 762 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Treco Construction Services, Inc..(Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 761 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary D. Rychnovsky on behalf of Treco Construction Services, Inc. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 760 MOTION to Dismiss Answers and Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Dismiss/Transfer Based Upon the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens by Rohm and Haas Company. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zellmer, Mark)
June 23, 2014 Filing 759 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 776 - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES Initial Disclosure by Resco Holdings LLC.(Rychnovsky, Mary) Modified on 6/24/2014 (mar).
June 23, 2014 Filing 758 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resco Holdings LLC. (Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 757 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Resco Holdings LLC.(Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 756 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary D. Rychnovsky on behalf of Resco Holdings LLC (Rychnovsky, Mary)
June 23, 2014 Filing 755 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pfizer, Inc..(O'Malley, Kevin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 754 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin F. O'Malley on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (O'Malley, Kevin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 753 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Bauman on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Howden North America, Inc., Spence Engineering Co., Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Bauman, Mark)
June 23, 2014 Filing 752 RESPONSE to #647 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by General Cable Industries, Inc.. (Bronsky, A.)
June 23, 2014 Filing 751 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal withour Prejudice filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Thames, Earl)
June 23, 2014 Filing 750 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Jagadich on behalf of Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. (Jagadich, Adam)
June 23, 2014 Filing 749 RESPONSE to #643 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Ericsson, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 23, 2014 Filing 748 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Motion Control Industries, Inc.. (Stevens, Kyler)
June 23, 2014 Filing 747 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Howden North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Howden North America, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin) Modified on 6/24/2014 (mar).
June 23, 2014 Filing 746 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (Graber, Dennis)
June 20, 2014 Filing 745 ANSWER to Crossclaim (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and Answer to All Cross-Claims) by Fort Kent Holdings, Inc..(Pozan, Kyle)
June 20, 2014 Filing 744 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Pozan on behalf of Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. (Pozan, Kyle)
June 20, 2014 Filing 743 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burnham, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Burnham Holdings, Inc. for Burnham, LLC. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 20, 2014 Filing 742 NOTICE re 686 Motion Hearing (amended Minutes): At the hearing held on June 13, 2014, attorney Undray Wilks was present on behalf of his client(s). (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 20, 2014 Filing 741 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #731 Motion for Discovery filed by Robert Frazior Denton. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
June 20, 2014 Filing 740 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by Paccar Inc.(Bultman, Bradley)
June 20, 2014 Filing 739 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Paccar Inc (Bultman, Bradley)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 738 ORDER MOOTING #43 Motion for More Definite Statement; MOOTING #45 Motion for More Definite Statement; DENYING #62 Motion to Remand; TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #114 Motion to Dismiss; TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #180 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; MOOTING #349 Motion for More Definite Statement; TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #352 Motion; TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #368 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #452 Motion ; MOOTING #498 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; MOOTING #522 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #539 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING #540 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; GRANTING #560 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; MOOTING #588 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; MOOTING #589 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; MOOTING #590 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; MOOTING #591 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/20/14. (sgp)
June 19, 2014 Filing 737 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
June 19, 2014 Filing 736 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
June 19, 2014 Filing 735 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Flowserve Corporation(as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
June 19, 2014 Filing 734 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation F/K/A. (Bultman, Bradley)
June 19, 2014 Filing 733 ANSWER to Complaint and All Croos Claims by Flowserve Corporation F/K/A.(Bultman, Bradley)
June 19, 2014 Filing 732 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Flowserve Corporation F/K/A (Bultman, Bradley)
June 19, 2014 Filing 731 MOTION for Discovery by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson) Modified on 6/20/2014 (bkl).
June 19, 2014 Filing 730 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles)
June 19, 2014 Filing 729 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman on behalf of Ethyl Corporation (Zimmerman, Justin)
June 19, 2014 Filing 728 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company (Zimmerman, Justin)
June 19, 2014 Filing 727 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Zimmerman, Justin)
June 19, 2014 Filing 726 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudce filed by SB Decking, Inc.. (Owens, Kevin)
June 19, 2014 Filing 725 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison K. Sonneveld on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Schnieder Electric USA, Inc. (Sonneveld, Allison)
June 19, 2014 Filing 724 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Schnieder Electric USA, Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
June 19, 2014 Filing 723 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 19, 2014 Filing 722 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Schnieder Electric USA, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 19, 2014 Filing 721 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 19, 2014 Filing 720 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #702 Notice of Appearance filed by Schnieder Electric USA, Inc. See attached document for specifics. (mar)
June 19, 2014 Filing 719 STIPULATION of Dismissal Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 718 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison K. Sonneveld on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation, Kvaerner U.S. Inc., Navistar International Corporation (Sonneveld, Allison)
June 19, 2014 Filing 717 STIPULATION of Dismissal Paccar, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 716 STIPULATION of Dismissal Metallo Gasket Co. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 715 STIPULATION of Dismissal Harper International Corp. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 714 STIPULATION of Dismissal Grimes Aerospace Corporation by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 713 STIPULATION of Dismissal Eloff Hansson USA, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 712 STIPULATION of Dismissal Eastern Products Corp. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 711 STIPULATION of Dismissal Duro Dyne Corporation by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 710 STIPULATION of Dismissal Asbestos Corporation Limited by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 709 STIPULATION of Dismissal Cooper Industries, LLC by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 708 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation, Kvaerner U.S. Inc., Navistar International Corporation (Jones, Kirra)
June 19, 2014 Filing 707 STIPULATION of Dismissal American Optical Corporation by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 706 STIPULATION of Dismissal Wallace Industries, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 705 STIPULATION of Dismissal Dal-Tile Corporation by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 19, 2014 Filing 704 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation, Kvaerner U.S. Inc., Navistar International Corporation (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 18, 2014 Filing 703 RESPONSE To Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Schnieder Electric USA, Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
June 18, 2014 Filing 702 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 720 - NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Schnieder Electric USA, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen) Modified on 6/19/2014 (mar).
June 18, 2014 Filing 701 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #699 Notice of Appearance filed by Navistar International Corporation. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 700 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/12/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/27/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2016 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Jury Trial set for 1/25/2016 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/17/14. (sgp)
June 17, 2014 Filing 699 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Navistar International Corporation (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 698 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Navistar International Corporation (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 697 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Kvaerner U.S. Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 696 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole E. Rice on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Howden North America, Inc., Spence Engineering Co., Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Rice, Nicole)
June 17, 2014 Filing 695 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Bonney Forge Corporation (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 694 SPRINKMANN SONS COPORATION'S ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Sprinkmann Sons Corporation.(Vantine, Marcie)
June 17, 2014 Filing 693 Spence Engineering, Co. ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Spence Engineering Co., Inc..(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 692 Howden North America, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Howden North America, Inc..(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 691 Conwed Corporation ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Conwed Corporation.(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 690 Burnham, LLC ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Burnham, LLC.(Graber, Dennis)
June 17, 2014 Filing 689 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conwed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Leucadia, LLC for Conwed Corporation. (Graber, Dennis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 688 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Schnieder Electric USA, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 687 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Dobbels on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Dobbels, Dennis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 686 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2014 re #43 #45 #62 #114 #180 #349 #352 #368 #452 #498 #522 #539 #540 #560 #588 #589 #590 #591 . (Court Reporter Barb Kniepmann.) Attorneys present: Jordan Ault, Laura Beasley,Tucker Blaser,Bradley R. Bultman,Michael Dauphin,Kevin Dawson,Sean P. Fergus,Mindy Finnigan,Carl J. Geraci,Keith B. Hill,Will Irwin,Melanie King,Julie Fix Meyer,David Page,Gary C. Pinter,Allyson Romani, Gary L. Smith,Allison K. Sonneveld,William B. Starnes,Ross Titzer,Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.,Benjamin Wilson,Mark G. Zellmer. Order on Motions and Scheduling Order to issue. If an attorney was present but does not appear on the above list he/she to contact chambers by June 18, 2014. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 16, 2014 Filing 685 STIPULATION of Dismissal Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 684 STIPULATION of Dismissal Paccar, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 683 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Spence Engineering Co., Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 682 STIPULATION of Dismissal Metallo Gasket Co. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 681 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Howden North America, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 680 STIPULATION of Dismissal Harper International Corp. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 679 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Goulds Pumps Incorporated (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 678 STIPULATION of Dismissal Grimes Aerospace Corp. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 677 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 676 STIPULATION of Dismissal Elof Hansson USA, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 675 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Conwed Corporation (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 674 STIPULATION of Dismissal Eastern Products Corp. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 673 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Burnham, LLC (Dawson, Kevin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 672 STIPULATION of Dismissal Duro Dyne Corporation by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 671 STIPULATION of Dismissal Cooper Industries, LLC by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 670 STIPULATION of Dismissal Avocet Enterprises by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 669 STIPULATION of Dismissal Abestos Corporation Limited by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 16, 2014 Filing 668 STIPULATION of Dismissal American Optical Corporation by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 13, 2014 Filing 667 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor A. Sondag on behalf of Burnham, LLC, Conwed Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Howden North America, Inc., Spence Engineering Co., Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Sondag, Trevor)
June 13, 2014 Filing 666 STIPULATION of Dismissal XEF, Inc by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 13, 2014 Filing 665 STIPULATION of Dismissal Wabco Holdings, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 13, 2014 Filing 664 STIPULATION of Dismissal Viking Pump, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 13, 2014 Filing 663 STIPULATION of Dismissal Thermwell Products Co., Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 13, 2014 Filing 662 STIPULATION of Dismissal Spence Engineering Co., Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 13, 2014 Filing 661 STIPULATION of Dismissal Simpson Timber Company by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 13, 2014 Filing 660 STIPULATION of Dismissal Seco Warwick Corp. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 13, 2014 Filing 659 STIPULATION of Dismissal Schneider Electric USA, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 13, 2014 Filing 658 STIPULATION of Dismissal SB Decking, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 13, 2014 Filing 657 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by International Paper Company.(Finnigan, Mindy)
June 12, 2014 Filing 656 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rockwell Automation, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 655 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rheem Manufacturing Co. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 654 STIPULATION of Dismissal Motion Control Industries, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 653 STIPULATION of Dismissal Lindberg by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 652 STIPULATION of Dismissal Mitsubishi Electric USA, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 651 STIPULATION of Dismissal KCG, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 650 STIPULATION of Dismissal Honeywell, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 649 STIPULATION of Dismissal Hitachi America, LTD by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 648 STIPULATION of Dismissal Graybar Electric Company, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 647 STIPULATION of Dismissal General Cable Industries, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 646 STIPULATION of Dismissal General Cable Industries, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 645 STIPULATION of Dismissal Essex Specialty Products, LLC by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 644 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defense and Jury Demand by Sepco Corporation.(Fergus, Sean)
June 12, 2014 Filing 643 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ericsson, Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 642 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 641 STIPULATION of Dismissal Dewitt Products Co. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 640 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of NRG Texas Power (Warchol, Jerome) Docket text modified to add amended on 6/24/2014 (lmb).
June 12, 2014 Filing 639 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of NRG Texas Power (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 638 RESPONSE in Opposition re #498 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) Rohm & Haas Company filed by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 637 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Universal Refactories, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 636 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Columbia Boiler Company (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 635 STIPULATION of Dismissal Compudyne Corporation by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 634 STIPULATION of Dismissal Caterpillar Inc. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 633 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Beazer East, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 632 STIPULATION of Dismissal Bonney Forge Corporation by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 631 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 630 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 629 STIPULATION of Dismissal Blue M by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 628 STIPULATION of Dismissal Bird Incorporated by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 627 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Kennedy Valve Company, a division of McWane, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation, MW Custom Papers LLC, Nalco Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Wabco Holdings, Inc. (Geraci, Carl)
June 12, 2014 Filing 626 STIPULATION of Dismissal AWC 1997 Corporation by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 625 STIPULATION of Dismissal A.O. Smith Corporation by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 624 STIPULATION of Dismissal Allied Manufacturing Company by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 623 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ajax Magnethermic Corp. by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 12, 2014 Filing 622 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 621 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 620 DOCKET ANNOTATION - Docket Sheet has been modified to reflect the proper name spelling of Defendant Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (kek)
June 12, 2014 Filing 619 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Motion Control Industries, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 618 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Hitachi America LTD (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 617 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (Warchol, Jerome)
June 12, 2014 Filing 616 NOTICE OF ERRORS re #592 Notice of Appearance filed by BASF Corporation. NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS, striking #593 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by BASF Corporation, #597 Notice of Appearance. See attached document for specifics.(kek)
June 12, 2014 Filing 615 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
June 12, 2014 Filing 614 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K Beasley on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Beasley, Laura)
June 11, 2014 Filing 613 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Lennox Industries, Inc. (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 612 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of The Fairbanks Company (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 611 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 610 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 609 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 608 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Sargent & Lundy LLC (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 607 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Saint-Gobrain Abrasives, Inc. (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 606 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Riley Stoker Corporation (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 605 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Seco Warwick Corporation (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 604 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Lattner Boiler Company (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 603 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 602 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 601 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 600 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 599 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Certainteed Corporation (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 598 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Bechtel Construction Company (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 597 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 616 - NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Kennedy Valve Company, a division of McWane, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation, MW Custom Papers LLC, Nalco Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Wabco Holdings, Inc. (Geraci, Carl) Modified on 6/12/2014 (kek).
June 11, 2014 Filing 596 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Conoco Phillips Company (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 595 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Bechtel Corporation (Pinter, Gary)
June 11, 2014 Filing 594 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Baltimore Aircoil Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Clow Corporation, Crane Company, Foseco, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Kennedy Valve Company, a division of McWane, Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation, MW Custom Papers LLC, Nalco Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Wabco Holdings, Inc. (Wilson, Benjamin)
June 11, 2014 Filing 593 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 616 - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BASF Corporation.(Kilpatrick, Joseph) Modified on 6/12/2014 (kek).
June 11, 2014 Filing 592 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A Kilpatrick on behalf of BASF Corporation (Kilpatrick, Joseph)
June 10, 2014 Filing 591 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Ajax Magnethermic Corp.. Responses due by 7/14/2014 (Fournie, Raymond)
June 10, 2014 Filing 590 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Bird Incorporated. Responses due by 7/14/2014 (Fournie, Raymond)
June 10, 2014 Filing 589 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Chicago Bridge & Iron Company. Responses due by 7/14/2014 (Fournie, Raymond)
June 10, 2014 Filing 588 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by General Electric Company. Responses due by 7/14/2014 (Fournie, Raymond)
June 10, 2014 Filing 587 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Cable Industries, Inc..(Bronsky, A.)
June 10, 2014 Filing 586 NOTICE of Appearance by A. J. Bronsky on behalf of General Cable Industries, Inc. (Bronsky, A.)
June 10, 2014 Filing 585 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (Graber, Dennis)
June 10, 2014 Filing 584 Goulds Pumps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Goulds Pumps Incorporated.(Graber, Dennis)
June 9, 2014 Filing 583 NOTICE by CBS Corporation Joint Report of the Parties and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Proposed Order)(Dauphin, Michael)
June 9, 2014 Filing 582 CROSSCLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTIONS AND ANSWER TO ANTICIPATED CROSS-CLAIMS against All Defendants, filed by Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
June 9, 2014 Filing 581 CROSSCLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTIONS AND ANSWER TO ANTICIPATED CROSS-CLAIMS against All Defendants, filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Stephanie)
June 9, 2014 Filing 580 STIPULATION of Dismissal Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC by Robert Frazior Denton. (Romani, Allyson)
June 9, 2014 Filing 579 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of York International Corporation (Welply, Justin)
June 9, 2014 Filing 578 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Welply, Justin)
June 9, 2014 Filing 577 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Welply, Justin)
June 9, 2014 Filing 576 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Flowserve US Inc. (Welply, Justin)
June 9, 2014 Filing 575 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc. (Welply, Justin)
June 6, 2014 Filing 574 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sprinkmann Sons Corporation. (Kernell, Thomas)
June 6, 2014 Filing 573 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Dewitt Products Co. (Dauphin, Michael)
June 6, 2014 Filing 572 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #565 Answer to Complaint filed by Navistar International Corporation, #566 Answer to Complaint filed by Bonney Forge Corporation, #567 Answer to Complaint filed by Schnieder Electric USA, Inc., #568 Answer to Complaint filed by Kvaerner U.S. Inc., #569 Answer to Complaint filed by Honeywell International, Inc. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
June 5, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (See Doc. #569 for complete PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket - see NOE #572 .(bkl)
June 5, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Kvaerner U.S. Inc. (See Doc. #568 for complete PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket - see NOE #572 .(bkl)
June 5, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Schnieder Electric USA, Inc. (See Doc. #567 for complete PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket - see NOE #572 .(bkl)
June 5, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Bonney Forge Corporation. (See Doc. #566 for complete PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket sheet - see NOE #572 .(bkl)
June 5, 2014 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Navistar International Corporation. (See Doc. #565 for complete PDF document). Entry docketed to correct parties on docket -- see NOE #572 .(bkl)
June 5, 2014 Filing 571 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pharmacia Corporation. (Ault, Jordan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 570 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan T. Ault on behalf of Pharmacia Corporation (Ault, Jordan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 569 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against all Defendants and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Honeywell International, Inc.(Jones, Kirra) Modified on 6/6/2014 (bkl).
June 5, 2014 Filing 568 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,CROSSCLAIM against all Defendants and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Kvaerner U.S. Inc.(Jones, Kirra) Modified on 6/6/2014 (bkl).
June 5, 2014 Filing 567 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against all Defendants and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant; by Schnieder Electric USA, Inc.(Jones, Kirra) Modified on 6/6/2014 (bkl).
June 5, 2014 Filing 566 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against all Defendants and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Bonney Forge Corporation.(Jones, Kirra) Modified on 6/6/2014 (bkl).
June 5, 2014 Filing 565 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against all Defendants and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant by Navistar International Corporation.(Jones, Kirra) Modified on 6/6/2014 (bkl).
June 4, 2014 Filing 564 CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims against All Defendants, filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Texaco, Inc..(Varney, Robert)
June 3, 2014 Filing 563 CROSSCLAIM for Contibution or Indemnity and Answer to All Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of any other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Vanderbilt Minerals LLC.(Eisenberg, Brent)
June 3, 2014 Filing 562 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. (Eisenberg, Brent)
June 3, 2014 Filing 561 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Vanderbilt Minerals LLC.(Eisenberg, Brent)
June 3, 2014 Filing 560 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. (Eisenberg, Brent)
June 3, 2014 Filing 559 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Eisenberg on behalf of Vanderbilt Minerals LLC (Eisenberg, Brent)
June 2, 2014 Filing 558 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Thermwell Products Co. Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
June 2, 2014 Filing 557 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel)
June 2, 2014 Filing 556 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 30, 2014 Filing 555 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Filing 554 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Occidental Chemical Corporation.(Zellmer, Mark)
May 30, 2014 Filing 553 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Zellmer on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation (Zellmer, Mark)
May 30, 2014 Filing 552 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Copes-Vulcan, Inc..(McGrath, Daniel)
May 30, 2014 Filing 551 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Copes-Vulcan, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 29, 2014 Filing 550 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcie J. Vantine on behalf of Sprinkmann Sons Corporation (Vantine, Marcie)
May 29, 2014 Filing 549 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcie J. Vantine on behalf of Allied Manufacturing Company (Vantine, Marcie)
May 29, 2014 Filing 548 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied Manufacturing Company. (Kernell, Thomas)
May 29, 2014 Filing 547 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Superior Boiler Works, Inc. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 29, 2014 Filing 546 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Kernell on behalf of Allied Manufacturing Company (Kernell, Thomas)
May 29, 2014 Filing 545 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Co. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 29, 2014 Filing 544 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Kernell on behalf of Sprinkmann Sons Corporation (Kernell, Thomas)
May 29, 2014 Filing 543 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Ameron International Corporation (Dauphin, Michael)
May 28, 2014 Filing 542 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ferro Engineering(a division of Oglebay Norton Company) identifying Corporate Parent Oglebay Norton Company for Ferro Engineering. (Bronsky, A.)
May 27, 2014 Filing 541 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Texaco, Inc.. (Varney, Robert)
May 27, 2014 Filing 540 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responsive Pleadings by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Texaco, Inc.. (Varney, Robert)
May 27, 2014 Filing 539 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Texaco, Inc.. Responses due by 6/30/2014 (Varney, Robert)
May 27, 2014 Filing 538 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #535 Notice of Appearance filed by Atty. Varney. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
May 27, 2014