O'Quinn v. Gaetz et al
Plaintiff: Chester O'Quinn
Defendant: Donald Gaetz, Thomas Spiller, S A Godinez, Louis Shicker, V Shah, Angie, A Rector, Mrs Peek, Pat Rensing, Mrs Markel, K Melvin, Christine Brown, Mr Blades, Mrs Stewart, Mr Wallace, Michelle Crews, Jody Gogetting, Janet Daugherty, Roderick Matticks, Nurse Amy, Nurse Abby and Officer Olmsted
Case Number: 3:2013cv01342
Filed: December 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING Motions for Summary Judgment 94 105 : The Court Grants the Motions for Summary Judgment 94 105 . Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/22/15. (ceg)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER ADOPTING Report and Recommendation 151 . Plaintiff's Notice or Open MOTION for Temporary Relief 144 is DENIED. Furthermore, the Court hereby imposes filing restrictions on Plaintiff. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/31/15. (mah)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 125 ) DENIES OQuinns open motion for relief (Doc. 120 ). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/23/2015. (jdh)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 117 ); DENIES OQuinns motion for an emergency injunction or temporary restraining order (Doc. 97 ); DENIES OQuinns motion for future and current temporary restraining order (Do c. 100 ); DENIES OQuinns motion for immediate emergency temporary restraining order and injunctive relief (Doc. 103 ); and DENIES OQuinns motion for current and future injunctive orders (Doc. 108 ). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/8/2014. (jdh)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ADOPTS the Report (Doc. 109 ) as MODIFIED by this order; and WARNS OQuinn that the Court may impose the recommended filing restriction without further notice should OQuinn file another motion in this case that is frivolous or not well supported by law and fact. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/18/2014. (jdh)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 85 ); and DENIES OQuinns motion for a temporary order (Doc. 78 ). The Court GRANTS the motion (Doc. 113 ) and ORDERS that OQuinn shall have up to and including November 14, 2014, to object. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/21/2014. (jdh)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 56 ); and DENIES OQuinns motion for a temporary restraining order (Doc. 15 ). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/14/14. (jdh)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, denying 12 MOTION of Notice of Intent, 14 MOTION to Exclude/Motion to Include, 9 MOTION for Leave to File, 13 MOTION to Stay, 11 MOTION to Compel. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/1/2014. (tjk)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. 1 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice for non-compliance with Rule 8(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file his amended complaint on or before March 4, 2014. Should Plaintiff fail to file an amended complaint within the allotted time, dismissal will become with prejudice. To enable Plaintiff to comply with this order, the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2014). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/28/2014. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Quinn v. Gaetz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Gaetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Spiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S A Godinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Shicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Rensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs Markel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Blades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Gogetting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Matticks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Amy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Abby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Olmsted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?