Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Kinnard et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Guenlen L Kinnard and A & J Kinnard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00094
Filed: January 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas G. Maag terminated. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/21/14. (klh, )
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying at this time the 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/24/14. (klh, )
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Set Aside Default. Default Judgment set aside as to defendant Kinnard, individually. See Order for details.. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/27/14. (klh, )
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Default Judgment and ORDER granting 15 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 4/14/14. (klh, )
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying at this time 13 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court ALLOWS plaintiff up to and April 22, 2014 to file new motion. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 4/8/14. (klh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Kinnard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guenlen L Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & J Kinnard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Zane D. Smith
Represented By: Andre Ordeanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?