February 22, 2017 |
Filing
372
ORDER re 371 Status Conference: Additional Status Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 3:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 2/22/17. (sgp)
|
February 6, 2017 |
Filing
365
ORDER GRANTING 352 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by David C Gevas and GRANTING IN PART and DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART 355 MOTION to Replace Court Appointed Counsel filed by David C Gevas. Attorney Loretta K. Haggard an d Natalie J. Teague terminated. Final Pretrial and Trial dates VACATED. In person Status Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 10:30 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 2/6/17. (sgp)
|
February 1, 2017 |
Filing
361
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 303 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Ronald Skidmore, Nicki Malley, Kimberly Butler, and Richard Harrington. Summary judgment is GRANTED on Count 1 as to Defendant Skidmore and DENIED as to Defendants Malley, Butler, and Harrington. Summary judgment is GRANTED on Count 2; this claim is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety. And Count 5 is DISMISSED without prejudice. This matter will proceed to trial on Count 1 for deliberate indiff erence against Defendants Jeremy Butler, Nicki Malley, Kimberly Butler, and Richard Harrington. Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson is DIRECTED to set a telephonic conference prior to the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/1/17. (klh2)
|
March 29, 2016 |
Filing
318
ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 213 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Jeremy Butler, Robert Shearing, and Wexford Health Sources Inc. Specifically, summary judgment is DENIED as to J. Butler and Dr. Shearing on Count 1, bu t GRANTED in their favor on Count 2. Summary judgment is GRANTED in favor of Wexford on Counts 3 and 4; those Counts are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. Count 6 is DISMISSED without prejudice as to all Defendants. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/29/16. (klh2)
|
February 26, 2016 |
Filing
313
ORDER: DENYING 289 MOTION for Order to filed by David C Gevas, DENYING 290 MOTION to Compel filed by David C Gevas, DENYING 292 MOTION to Compel filed by David C Gevas, MOOTING 294 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply a s to 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David C Gevas, DENYING 306 MOTION to Compel filed by David C Gevas, GRANTING 308 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 303 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David C Gevas, DENYING 309 MOTION for Leave to File filed by David C Gevas. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 303 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Responses due by 3/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 2/26/16. (sgp)
|
October 1, 2015 |
Filing
274
VACATED PER ORDER DOC 276 : ORDER re Deposition Schedule: See Order for new schedule. Plaintiff's response to 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment due by 11/30/2015. Discovery deadline extended to 10/30/2015 for purposes of depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/1/15. (sgp)
|
August 27, 2015 |
Filing
259
ORDER re 250 and 258 setting deposition schedule and directing issuance of subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/27/15. (sgp)
|
August 18, 2015 |
Filing
250
ORDER VACATING 247 Order re Subpoenas and directing issuance of additional subpoenas. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/18/15. (sgp)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
247
ORDER re 231 Subpoenas filed by David C Gevas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/11/15. (sgp)
|
June 30, 2015 |
Filing
226
ORDER GRANTING 179 , GRANTING IN PART 180 , DENYING 181 , DENYING 183 , GRANTING 184 , DENYING 189 , DENYING 190 , DENYING 191 , DENYING 195 , DENYING 196 , DENYING 197 ,DENYING AS MOOT 198 , MOOTING 199 , TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT 205 , MOOTING 208 , DENYING 210 , DENYING 211 , GRANTING 216 , DENYING 217 , TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT 218 , TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT 220 , and GRANTING 223 . Action due by 7/10/2015 re Wexford/IDOC contract; Response to 205 MOTION to Compel and 218 MOTION to Compel due by 7/7/15; Response to 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment due by 8/3/2015; Dispositive motion filing deadline extended to 7/31/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/30/15. (sgp)
|
April 21, 2015 |
Filing
175
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 4/21/15. (sgp)
|
February 24, 2015 |
Filing
149
ORDER DENYING 65 84 88 ; MOOTING 94 103 ; DENYING 109 111 112 113 114 115 116 120 121 123 126 ; GRANTING 127 ; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 132 ; STRIKING 133 ; DENYING 134 135 ; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 137 ; DENYING 138 139 140 ; GRANTING 141 ; DENYING 142 143 144 145 ; GRANTING 146 . See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 2/24/15. (sgp)
|
December 18, 2014 |
Filing
108
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 95 96 97 98 99 100 101 102 Motions to Compel; DENYING WITH PREJUDICE 106 Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/18/14. (sgp)
|
December 2, 2014 |
Filing
93
ORDER ADOPTING 82 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/2/14. (klh2)
|
July 10, 2014 |
Filing
48
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 24 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel; DENYING AS MOOT 25 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DENYING 27 Motion to Appoint Expert; STRIKING 38 Motion to Copy; GRANTING 41 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 7/10/14. (sgp)
|
May 9, 2014 |
Filing
18
ORDER DENYING 8 Motion to Proceed without Written Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/9/14. (sgp)
|
April 9, 2014 |
Filing
5
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/9/2014. (tjk)
|