Watts v. 84 Lumber Company et al
Plaintiff: Steven Watts
Defendant: 84 Lumber Company, Asbestos Corporation LTD., Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., Burnham LLC, Cameron International Corp., Carrier Corporation, Carver Pump Company, Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Cicor Instrumentation Technologies, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Crane Co., Excelsior Packing & Gaskets, Flowserve Corporation, FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion, Gardner Denver, Inc., Georgia Pacific, LLC, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Icon Management Services, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Metallo Gasket Company, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Oakfabco, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Patterson Pump Company, Pneumo Abex LLC, Riley Power, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Trane US, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Viking Pumps, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weil-McLain, William Powell Company, York International Corporation and Zurn Industries, LLC
Cross_claimant: Carver Pump Company, Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., York International Corporation, Johnson Controls, Inc., 84 Lumber Company, Georgia Pacific, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., Pneumo Abex LLC, Imo Industries, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Riley Power, Inc., Excelsior Packing & Gaskets, Warren Pumps, LLC, Viking Pumps, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable LLC and Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Cross_defendant: Steven Watts, Carver Pump Company, 84 Lumber Company, Asbestos Corporation LTD., Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc., Burnham LLC, Cameron International Corp., Carrier Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC, Cicor Instrumentation Technologies, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Crane Co., Excelsior Packing & Gaskets, FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion, Gardner Denver, Inc., Georgia Pacific, LLC, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Icon Management Services, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Metallo Gasket Company, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Oakfabco, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Patterson Pump Company, Pneumo Abex LLC, RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, Riley Power, Inc., Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc., Trane US, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Viking Pumps, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weil-McLain, William Powell Company, York International Corporation and Zurn Industries, LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00327
Filed: March 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER DENYING 407 Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Viking Pumps, Inc. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/16/2016. (mah)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER re Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/12/2016. (mah)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER DENYING 410 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/8/2016. (mah)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER DENYING 465 Motion to Alter Judgment Or Amend Order Denying Excelsior's Motion for Summary Judgment Based On Plaintiff's Newly Filed Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures filed by Excelsior Packing & Gaskets. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/1/2016. (mah)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER DENYING 447 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/29/2016. (mah)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER DENYING Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Excelsior Packing & Gaskets 362 . Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/28/2016. (mah)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Summary Judgment by Asbestos Corporation LTD [Doc. 334]. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/22/2016. (mah)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Voluntary Dismissal [Doc. 339]. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/23/15. (mah)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Voluntary Dismissal [Doc. 339]. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/22/15. (mah)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/16/2015. (rlw)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT IN PART 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. MOOTING 53 , 57 , 61 , 117 , 118 , 119 , 120 , 121 , 122 , 123 , 124 , 154 , 158 , 163 . DENYING IN PART AND MOOTING IN PART 72 Motion for More Definite Statement; and TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT 114 Motion pursuant to Rule 5(c)(1)(B) pending review of proposed orders submitted to chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/20/14. (sgp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. 84 Lumber Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Watts
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Represented By: Stephanie L. Gold
Represented By: Eric D. Jackstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 84 Lumber Company
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cicor Instrumentation Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excelsior Packing & Gaskets
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston Boiler Company
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metallo Gasket Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakfabco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSCC Wire & Cable LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-McLain
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: 84 Lumber Company
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Excelsior Packing & Gaskets
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Viking Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: RSCC Wire & Cable LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Steven Watts
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Represented By: Stephanie L. Gold
Represented By: Eric D. Jackstadt
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Represented By: Stephanie L. Gold
Represented By: Eric D. Jackstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: 84 Lumber Company
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Asbestos Corporation LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Burnham LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Cameron International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Cicor Instrumentation Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Excelsior Packing & Gaskets
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Icon Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Johnston Boiler Company
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Metallo Gasket Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Oakfabco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Patterson Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: RSCC Wire & Cable LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Represented By: Michael J Chessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Viking Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Weil-McLain
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?