Presley v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Valerie K. Presley
Defendant: Meadwestvaco Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Bucyrus International, Inc., Bucyrus Mining Equipment, Sealing Equipment Products Co., Inc., 3M, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Cameron International Corp., Trane US, Inc., Carver Pump Company, Crosby Valve & Gage Company, Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Bucyrus Erie, Crane Co., The Gorman-Rupp Company, Riley Power, Inc., Flowserve Corporation, Pneumo Abex Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., United Technologies Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., CNA Holdings, Inc., Illinois Tool Works, Inc., CBS Corporaton, Weil-Mclain Company, Excelsior Packing & Gaskets, CSX Railroad, Whitney Automotive Group, Inc., Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc, John Crane, Inc., Nash Engineering Company, Motion Controls Industries, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Borg Warner Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., L & N Railroad Company, Buffalo Pumps, Sepco Corporation, Greene Tweed & Co., Inc, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Oakfabco, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc., Young Group, LTD, J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co., Meade Corp., ABB, Inc., Owens-Illinois, Inc., Crown Holdings, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Elliott Company, I, A.W. Chesterton Company, Imo Industries, Inc., Altra Industrial Motion, Inc., Continental Teves, Inc., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., ITT Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, Cooper Industries, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, General Electric Company, Dover Corporation, Blackmer Division, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Dap, Inc., Lamons Gasket Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion, Ingalls Shipbuilding, Kelly Moore Paint Company, Viking Pumps, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Northrup Grumman, Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Taco, Inc., Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, York International Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Conwed Corporation, Chicago Gasket Company, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Commonwealth Edison Company, Arvinmeritor, Inc. and FMC Corporation
Case Number: 3:2014cv00712
Filed: June 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Williams
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Dismissal without Prejudice (Doc. #252 ). The Court has received no objection to the Motion. As such, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion (Doc. #252 ) and dismisses this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/5/15. (ajr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 19, 2014 Filing 252 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Valerie K. Presley. Responses due by 12/22/2014 (Hulla, Timothy)
October 14, 2014 Filing 251 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #241 Notice of Appearance filed by Viking Pumps, Inc., #236 Notice of Appearance filed by Excelsior Packing & Gaskets, #240 Notice of Appearance filed by Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., #239 Notice of Appearance filed by Taco, Inc., #243 Notice of Appearance filed by Warren Pumps, LLC, #242 Notice of Appearance filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, #238 Notice of Appearance filed by Riley Power, Inc., #235 Notice of Appearance filed by Dana Companies, LLC, #234 Notice of Appearance filed by Certain-Teed Corporation, #237 Notice of Appearance filed by Imo Industries, Inc. See attached document for specifics (tkm )
October 13, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M Kelly on behalf of Altra Industrial Motion, Inc. (Kelly, Patricia)
October 9, 2014 Filing 249 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Scheduling Discovery Hearing held on 10/9/2014. Timothy Hulla for Plaintiff. Ken Plotner, James Maschoff, Ben Thames, Ben Wilson, Leslie Offergeld, James Brodzik, Danielle Luisi, Jerry Warchol, Chris Lang, Brad Bultman, Agatha Peterfy, Undray Wilks, Sean Fergus, Laura Beasley, Ross Titzer, Kelly Libra, Pamela Gamble and Julie Fix Meyer for various defendants. Plaintiff counsel indicates that this case was inadvertently filed in St. Clair County before removal while a duplicate case raising the same claims had already been filed in Marengo County Alabama, been removed to federal court, and is now pending as an MDL in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Plaintiff will therefore be moving to dismiss the entire case without prejudice due the the pendency of the previously filed case. Defendants appearing do not object. The Court will not enter a scheduling order as this case will soon be dismissed. (Court Reporter n/a.) (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 9, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Motion Controls Industries, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
October 9, 2014 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc (Warchol, Jerome)
October 9, 2014 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
October 9, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Hill, Keith)
October 9, 2014 Filing 244 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The (Warchol, Jerome)
October 9, 2014 Filing 243 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kent L. Plotner on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Plotner, Kent) Modified on 10/14/2014 (tkm ).
October 9, 2014 Filing 242 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kent L. Plotner on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Plotner, Kent) Modified on 10/14/2014 (tkm ).
October 9, 2014 Filing 241 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kent L. Plotner on behalf of Viking Pumps, Inc. (Plotner, Kent) Modified on 10/14/2014 (tkm ).
October 9, 2014 Filing 240 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kent L. Plotner on behalf of Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Plotner, Kent) Modified on 10/14/2014 (tkm ).
October 9, 2014 Filing 239 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kent L. Plotner on behalf of Taco, Inc. (Plotner, Kent) Modified on 10/14/2014 (tkm ).
October 9, 2014 Filing 238 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kent L. Plotner on behalf of Riley Power, Inc. (Plotner, Kent) Modified on 10/14/2014 (tkm ).
October 9, 2014 Filing 237 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kent L. Plotner on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Plotner, Kent) Modified on 10/14/2014 (tkm ).
October 9, 2014 Filing 236 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kent L. Plotner on behalf of Excelsior Packing & Gaskets (Plotner, Kent) Modified on 10/14/2014 (tkm ).
October 9, 2014 Filing 235 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kent L. Plotner on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Plotner, Kent) Modified on 10/14/2014 (tkm ).
October 9, 2014 Filing 234 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Kent L. Plotner on behalf of Certain-Teed Corporation (Plotner, Kent) Modified on 10/14/2014 (tkm ).
October 2, 2014 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Connolly on behalf of Eaton Hydraulics, LLC (Connolly, Brian)
October 2, 2014 Filing 232 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #231 Notice of Appearance filed by Eaton Hydraulics, LLC. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
October 1, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Connolly on behalf of Eaton Hydraulics, LLC (Connolly, Brian)
October 1, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Lang on behalf of Eaton Hydraulics, LLC (Lang, Christopher)
October 1, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(individually and on behalf of Square D Company) (Jones, Kirra)
October 1, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
October 1, 2014 Filing 227 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(individually and on behalf of Square D Company). (Hardee, Kathleen)
October 1, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(individually and on behalf of Square D Company) (Hardee, Kathleen)
October 1, 2014 Filing 225 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
October 1, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
October 1, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Hulla on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hulla, Timothy)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER. The Court GRANTS The Gorman-Rupp Company's Motion to Withdraw Answer (Doc. #179 ) and pursuant to Presley's Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. #220 ) The Gorman-Rupp Company is dismissed from this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/18/14. (ajr)
September 17, 2014 Filing 221 STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT) as to Defendant Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. (Hipskind, John)
September 16, 2014 Filing 220 STIPULATION of Dismissal by The Gorman-Rupp Company. (Offergeld, Leslie)
September 15, 2014 Filing 219 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 10/9/2014 at 2:30 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)
September 12, 2014 Filing 218 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2015 at 10:30 AM and Jury Trial set for 12/14/2015 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/12/2014. (kek)
September 5, 2014 Filing 217 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Gasket Corporation. (Bronsky, A.)
September 5, 2014 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by A. J. Bronsky on behalf of General Gasket Corporation (Bronsky, A.)
September 2, 2014 Filing 215 CROSSCLAIM Answer to All Cross-claims and Counterclaims of Any Other Defendant and Cross-claims for Contribution or Indemnity against All Defendants, filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc..(Griebel, Erin)
September 2, 2014 Filing 214 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #210 Notice of Appearance. Document was filed and linked to all Defendants in error. Document refiled correctly at #213 . (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 2, 2014 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of General Electric Company (Fournie, Raymond)
September 2, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of General Electric Company (Meyer, Julie)
September 2, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of General Electric Company (King, Melanie)
September 2, 2014 Filing 210 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of All Defendants (Fournie, Raymond) Modified on 9/2/2014 (jaj).
August 29, 2014 Filing 209 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arvinmeritor, Inc.. (Johnson, Dayna)
August 29, 2014 Filing 208 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Johnson, Dayna)
August 29, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE of Appearance by Dayna L. Johnson on behalf of Arvinmeritor, Inc. (Johnson, Dayna)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #121 Motion regarding crossclaims and counterclaims. See order for specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 8/27/2014. (anj)
August 26, 2014 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle R. Luisi on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Luisi, Danielle)
August 26, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle R. Luisi on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Luisi, Danielle)
August 26, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle R. Luisi on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Luisi, Danielle)
August 26, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Following consultation with the transferee court, the Clerk of the Panel has determined the listed action(s) is not appropriate for inclusion in this MDL. See Rule 7.1(b)(i).Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi, on 8/26/2014. (cjo)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 163 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings shall bear the casce number 14-712-SMY-SCW. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/21/14. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 20, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of York International Corporation (Maschhoff, James)
August 20, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of ABB, Inc. (Maschhoff, James)
August 20, 2014 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Borg Warner Corporation (Maschhoff, James)
August 19, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE by Crane Co. Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action)(Wilson, Benjamin)
August 15, 2014 Filing 196 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The. Amendment to #129 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Baker, Alexander)
August 5, 2014 Filing 195 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bucyrus Mining Equipment identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar Inc. for Bucyrus Mining Equipment. (Volkman, Karen)
August 5, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #193 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bucyrus Mining Equipment. Party filer selected in cm/ecf is inconsistent with the filer referenced on the pdf document. Further, the party referenced in the pdf is not a party to this case.(cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 4, 2014 Filing 193 STRICKEN - Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bucyrus Mining Equipment identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar Inc. for Bucyrus Mining Equipment. (Volkman, Karen) Modified on 8/5/2014 (cjo).
August 4, 2014 Filing 192 Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and to all Cross-Claims by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc..(Hudgens, Meredith)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #188 Motion for Leave to File. Answer to be filed by August 7, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/31/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 30, 2014 Filing 190 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of the Same by Chicago Gasket Company. Responses due by 9/2/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Callaghan, Amy)
July 30, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Marie Callaghan on behalf of Chicago Gasket Company (Callaghan, Amy)
July 29, 2014 Filing 188 First MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Out of Time by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Hudgens, Meredith)
July 28, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #185 Motion for Leave to File filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. The signature on a document and login/password of the attorney should be the same- Erin Griebel s/ the document. Login/password used was for Meredith Hudgens. Document must be re-filed.(trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 25, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Renee Griebel on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Griebel, Erin)
July 25, 2014 Filing 185 ENTRY STRICKEN: First MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Out of Time by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Hudgens, Meredith)
July 25, 2014 Filing 184 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Hudgens, Meredith)
July 25, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith S Hudgens on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Hudgens, Meredith)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #108 Motion to join in notice of removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 7/24/2014. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 24, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #179 Motion to Withdraw filed by The Gorman-Rupp Company, #180 Motion to Withdraw filed by Carver Pump Company. See attached document for specifics. (bkl)
July 23, 2014 Filing 180 MOTION to Withdraw #95 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim to file Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12 (b)(6) by Carver Pump Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Offergeld, Leslie)
July 23, 2014 Filing 179 MOTION to Withdraw #98 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim to file Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12 (b)(6) by The Gorman-Rupp Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Offergeld, Leslie)
July 21, 2014 Filing 178 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #176 Motion to Dismiss filed by Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc. Document is a duplicate of document 177 with the exception of the certificate of service. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 18, 2014 Filing 177 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of the Same by Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc. Responses due by 8/21/2014 (Baker, Alexander)
July 18, 2014 Filing 176 STRICKEN: Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of the Same by Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc. Responses due by 8/21/2014 (Baker, Alexander)
July 18, 2014 Filing 175 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum In Support of the Same by A.W. Chesterton Company. Responses due by 8/21/2014 (Baker, Alexander)
July 18, 2014 Filing 174 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.W. Chesterton Company. (Baker, Alexander)
July 18, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Baker on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (Baker, Alexander)
July 18, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #169 Motion to Dismiss filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The, #170 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc., #171 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Motion Controls Industries, Inc.. See attached document for specifics. (jaj)
July 18, 2014 Filing 171 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of the Same by Motion Controls Industries, Inc.. (Baker, Alexander)
July 17, 2014 Filing 170 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of the Same ( Responses due by 8/21/2014), MOTION to Amend/Correct by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Baker, Alexander)
July 17, 2014 Filing 169 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of the Same by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The. Responses due by 8/21/2014 (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 168 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 167 MEMORANDUM in Support re #165 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 735 ILCS 5/2-619(4) - (5) filed by Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc. (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 166 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 165 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 735 ILCS 5/2-619(4) - (5) by Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 164 MOTION to Dismiss by Gardner Denver, Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 163 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Victoria Tzall on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 161 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 160 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc. (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 159 MOTION to Dismiss by Zurn Industries, LLC. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Baker on behalf of Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 157 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Victoria Tzall on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 155 MEMORANDUM in Support re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to 735 ILCS 5/2-619 filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 154 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dap, Inc.. (Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 153 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to 735 ILCS 5/2-619 by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 152 MOTION to Dismiss by Dap, Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 151 ANSWER to Complaint and all Cross-Claims by Dap, Inc..(Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Victoria Tzall on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Tzall, Madeline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 149 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motion Controls Industries, Inc.. (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Baker on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 147 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weil-Mclain Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 146 MOTION to Dismiss by Weil-Mclain Company. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 145 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by Weil-Mclain Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Weil-Mclain Company (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 143 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BW/IP International, Inc., f/k/a Byron Jackson Pump Division and Pacific Pumps), Flowserve Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 142 MOTION to Dismiss by Flowserve Corporation(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BW/IP International, Inc., f/k/a Byron Jackson Pump Division and Pacific Pumps), Flowserve Corporation. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 141 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by Flowserve Corporation(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BW/IP International, Inc., f/k/a Byron Jackson Pump Division and Pacific Pumps), Flowserve Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Flowserve Corporation(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BW/IP International, Inc., f/k/a Byron Jackson Pump Division and Pacific Pumps), Flowserve Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 139 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greene Tweed & Co., Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 138 MOTION to Dismiss by Greene Tweed & Co., Inc. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 137 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.(Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Greene Tweed & Co., Inc (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 135 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BW/IP International, Inc., f/k/a Byron Jackson Pump Division and Pacific Pumps), Flowserve Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 134 MOTION to Dismiss by Flowserve Corporation(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BW/IP International, Inc., f/k/a Byron Jackson Pump Division and Pacific Pumps), Flowserve Corporation. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 133 ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross Claims by Flowserve Corporation(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BW/IP International, Inc., f/k/a Byron Jackson Pump Division and Pacific Pumps), Flowserve Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Flowserve Corporation(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BW/IP International, Inc., f/k/a Byron Jackson Pump Division and Pacific Pumps), Flowserve Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
July 15, 2014 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM in Support re #130 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to 735 ILCS 5/2-619 filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The. (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 130 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to 735 ILCS 5/2-619 by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 129 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The. (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Baker on behalf of Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 127 MEMORANDUM in Support re #126 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to 735 ILCS 5/2-619 filed by Motion Controls Industries, Inc.. (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 126 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to 735 ILCS 5/2-619 by Motion Controls Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 125 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motion Controls Industries, Inc.. (Baker, Alexander)
July 15, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Baker on behalf of Motion Controls Industries, Inc. (Baker, Alexander)
July 10, 2014 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation (Orris, Thomas)
July 10, 2014 Filing 122 Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pneumo Abex Corporation.(Titzer, Ross)
July 10, 2014 Filing 121 MOTION for institution of denials under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(b) by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Titzer, Ross)
July 10, 2014 Filing 120 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Titzer, Ross)
July 10, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross S. Titzer on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation (Titzer, Ross)
July 10, 2014 Filing 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by York International Corporation. Responses due by 8/14/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Smith, Gary)
July 10, 2014 Filing 117 Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls, Inc. for York International Corporation. (Smith, Gary)
July 10, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of York International Corporation (Smith, Gary)
July 10, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of York International Corporation (Welply, Justin)
July 10, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Ward on behalf of York International Corporation (Ward, Donald)
July 10, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of York International Corporation (Hatch, Mary)
July 10, 2014 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by Borg Warner Corporation. Responses due by 8/14/2014 (Smith, Gary)
July 10, 2014 Filing 111 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Borg Warner Corporation. (Smith, Gary)
July 10, 2014 Filing 110 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
July 10, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Crane Co. (Wilson, Benjamin)
July 10, 2014 Filing 108 MOTION Motion to Join by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Part 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Part 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Part 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Part 1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Part 2, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Part 3, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Part 4)(Wilson, Benjamin)
July 10, 2014 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by ABB, Inc.. Responses due by 8/14/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Smith, Gary)
July 10, 2014 Filing 106 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABB, Inc.. (Smith, Gary)
July 10, 2014 Filing 105 MOTION to Dismiss by Crane Co.. Responses due by 8/14/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MSJ, #2 Exhibit Saint Clair Complaint)(Wilson, Benjamin)
July 10, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of ABB, Inc. (Smith, Gary)
July 10, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of ABB, Inc. (Welply, Justin)
July 10, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of ABB, Inc. (Hatch, Mary)
July 9, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Christopher Collier on behalf of CNA Holdings, Inc. (Collier, Stephen)
July 9, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE by CNA Holdings, Inc. Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Thames, Earl)
July 9, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Earl B. Thames, Jr on behalf of CNA Holdings, Inc. (Thames, Earl)
July 8, 2014 Filing 98 ANSWER to Complaint and Cross Claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Gorman-Rupp Company.(Offergeld, Leslie)
July 8, 2014 Filing 97 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Gorman-Rupp Company.(Offergeld, Leslie)
July 8, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie G. Offergeld on behalf of The Gorman-Rupp Company (Offergeld, Leslie)
July 7, 2014 Filing 95 Carver Pump's ANSWER to Complaint and Cross-Claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Carver Pump Company.(Offergeld, Leslie)
July 7, 2014 Filing 94 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Carver Pump Company.(Offergeld, Leslie)
July 7, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie G. Offergeld on behalf of Carver Pump Company (Offergeld, Leslie)
July 3, 2014 Filing 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Excelsior Packing & Gaskets. (Hill, Keith)
July 3, 2014 Filing 91 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Babcock Power Inc. a Delaware Corporation for Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
July 3, 2014 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dana Companies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dana Holding Corporation for Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Dana Companies, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
July 3, 2014 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
July 3, 2014 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain-Teed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France for Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
July 3, 2014 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Houdaille Industries, Inc. for Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
July 3, 2014 Filing 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imo Industries, Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Deleval Turbine, Inc.) identifying Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent Imo Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
July 3, 2014 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Pump Group for Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
July 2, 2014 Filing 84 Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #57 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #57 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #57 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #57 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #57 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #57 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #57 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #57 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #51 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #50 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #62 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #57 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM For Contributions against All Defendants by John Crane, Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
July 2, 2014 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts IV and V Spoliation Claims by John Crane, Inc.. Responses due by 8/4/2014 (Fergus, Sean)
July 2, 2014 Filing 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane, Inc.. (Fergus, Sean)
July 2, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Fergus on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Fergus, Sean)
July 2, 2014 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by Bucyrus Mining Equipment. Responses due by 8/4/2014 (Volkman, Karen)
July 2, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen M. Volkman on behalf of Bucyrus Mining Equipment (Volkman, Karen)
July 2, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan on behalf of Bucyrus Mining Equipment (Cowan, Tracy)
July 1, 2014 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint Counterclaims and Cross-Claims for Contribution and Affirmative and Other Defenses to All Counterclaims and Cross-Claims for Contribution and Jury Demand by Northrup Grumman.(Huelsmann, Brian)
June 30, 2014 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Joley, Charles)
June 30, 2014 Filing 75 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Joley, Charles)
June 30, 2014 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Joley, Charles)
June 30, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Joley on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Joley, Charles)
June 27, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by General Electric Company. Responses due by 7/31/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Kidd, Anita)
June 27, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of General Electric Company (Kidd, Anita)
June 27, 2014 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Ward, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE by Oakfabco, Inc. of Filing Motion to Adopt State Court Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Oakfabco's Motion to Adopt State Court Motions)(Ward, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Ward on behalf of Oakfabco, Inc. (Ward, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #39 Motion for Leave to File filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. Motion is a duplicate filing of the Motion at document 38. Docket entry STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. No further action required by the filer as to this document. (tkm )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 27, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan on behalf of Oakfabco, Inc. (Cowan, Tracy)
June 27, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor A. Sondag on behalf of Conwed Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Sondag, Trevor)
June 26, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of ITT Corporation (Wilks, Undray)
June 26, 2014 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT Corporation. (Rogers, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2014 Filing 62 ITT Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against CNA Holdings, Inc., CSX Railroad, Cameron International Corp., Carver Pump Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Certain-Teed Corporation, Chicago Gasket Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Commonwealth Edison Company, Continental Teves, Inc., Conwed Corporation, Cooper Industries, LLC, Crane Co., Crosby Valve & Gage Company, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Crown Holdings, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Dap, Inc., Dover Corporation, Blackmer Division, Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc, Eaton Corporation, Eaton Hydraulics, LLC, Elliott Company, I, Excelsior Packing & Gaskets, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BW/IP International, Inc., f/k/a Byron Jackson Pump Division and Pacific Pumps), Flowserve Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, General Gasket Corporation, Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The, The Gorman-Rupp Company, Greene Tweed & Co., Inc, Honeywell International, Inc., ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Ingalls Shipbuilding, Ingersoll-Rand Company, J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co., John Crane, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, L & N Railroad Company, Lamons Gasket Company, Meadwestvaco Corp., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Motion Controls Industries, Inc., Nash Engineering Company, Northrup Grumman, 3M, A.W. Chesterton Company, ABB, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Altra Industrial Motion, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Borg Warner Corporation, Bucyrus International, Inc., Bucyrus Mining Equipment, CBS Corporaton, Oakfabco, Inc., Owens-Illinois, Inc., Pneumo Abex Corporation, Riley Power, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Co., Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Taco, Inc., Trane US, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Viking Pumps, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weil-Mclain Company, Whitney Automotive Group, Inc., York International Corporation, Young Group, LTD, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC by ITT Corporation.(Rogers, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Rogers on behalf of ITT Corporation (Rogers, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction) by Meadwestvaco Corp.. Responses due by 7/31/2014 (Huelsmann, Brian)
June 26, 2014 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law by Illinois Tool Works, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2014 (Huelsmann, Brian)
June 26, 2014 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to CounterClaims and Cross Claims for Contribution and Jury Demand by Meadwestvaco Corp..(Huelsmann, Brian)
June 26, 2014 Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses, Answer to Any CounterClaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Illinois Tool Works, Inc..(Huelsmann, Brian)
June 26, 2014 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meadwestvaco Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Meadwestvaco Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Capital World Investors, Inc for Meadwestvaco Corp.. (Huelsmann, Brian)
June 26, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Huelsmann on behalf of Meadwestvaco Corp. (Huelsmann, Brian)
June 26, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Huelsmann on behalf of Illinois Tool Works, Inc. (Huelsmann, Brian)
June 26, 2014 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses, Answer to Any CounterClaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Trane US, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses, Answer to Any CounterClaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses, Answer to Any CounterClaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Georgia-Pacific, LLC.(Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses, Answer to Any CounterClaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Caterpillar, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses, Answer to Any CounterClaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cameron International Corp..(Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law by Cameron International Corp., Caterpillar, Inc., Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2014 (Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Trane US, Inc.. (Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia-Pacific, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Georgia-Pacific Holdings, LLC for Georgia-Pacific, LLC. (Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Caterpillar, Inc.. (Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cameron International Corp.. (Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Cameron International Corp., Caterpillar, Inc., Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc. (Geraci, Carl)
June 26, 2014 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Motion to Dismiss by Dana Companies, LLC. (Pinter, Gary)
June 26, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Cameron International Corp., Caterpillar, Inc., Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc. (Wilson, Benjamin)
June 26, 2014 Filing 39 ENTRY STRICKEN - MOTION for Leave to File Supplment Motion to Dismiss by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hill, Keith) Modified on 6/27/2014 (tkm ).
June 26, 2014 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Motion to Dismiss by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hill, Keith)
June 26, 2014 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hill, Keith)
June 26, 2014 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Certain-Teed Corporation, Excelsior Packing & Gaskets, Imo Industries, Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Deleval Turbine, Inc.), Riley Power, Inc., Taco, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hill, Keith)
June 26, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Certain-Teed Corporation (Hill, Keith)
June 26, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Excelsior Packing & Gaskets (Hill, Keith)
June 26, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Deleval Turbine, Inc.) (Hill, Keith)
June 26, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Riley Power, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
June 26, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Taco, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
June 26, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
June 26, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Hill, Keith)
June 26, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Viking Pumps, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
June 26, 2014 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Responses due by 7/31/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cloud, Patrick)
June 26, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Cloud on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Cloud, Patrick)
June 25, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Northrup Grumman. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Huelsmann, Brian)
June 25, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Huelsmann on behalf of Northrup Grumman (Huelsmann, Brian)
June 25, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Dana Companies, LLC. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pinter, Gary)
June 25, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Smith on behalf of Borg Warner Corporation (Smith, Gary)
June 25, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann Hatch on behalf of Borg Warner Corporation (Hatch, Mary)
June 25, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Ward on behalf of Borg Warner Corporation (Ward, Donald)
June 25, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Borg Warner Corporation (Welply, Justin)
June 25, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Warren Pumps, LLC. Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Hill, Keith)
June 25, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Ybarra on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Ybarra, David)
June 25, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Pinter, Gary)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge David R. Herndon recused. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/24/14. (cekf)
June 24, 2014 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Brodzik, James)
June 24, 2014 Filing 13 Goulds Pumps, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Brodzik, James)
June 24, 2014 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conwed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Leucadia, LLC for Conwed Corporation. (Brodzik, James)
June 24, 2014 Filing 11 Conwed Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Conwed Corporation.(Brodzik, James)
June 24, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Brodzik on behalf of Conwed Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Brodzik, James)
June 24, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole E. Rice on behalf of Conwed Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Rice, Nicole)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael J. Reagan recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge David R. Herndon for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 06/23/14. (dkd)
June 23, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Conwed Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
June 23, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Dawson on behalf of Conwed Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Dawson, Kevin)
June 23, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Bauman on behalf of Conwed Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Bauman, Mark)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge J. Phil Gilbert recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael J. Reagan for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/20/2014. (jdh)
June 19, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Warren Pumps, LLC from St. Clair County, case number 14-L-146. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F-1, #8 Exhibit F-2, #9 Exhibit F-3, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J-1, #14 Exhibit J-2, #15 Exhibit J-3, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit O, #21 Exhibit P-1, #22 Exhibit P-2, #23 Exhibit P-3, #24 Exhibit P-4, #25 Exhibit P-5, #26 Exhibit P-6, #27 Exhibit P-7A, #28 Exhibit P-7B, #29 Exhibit P-8, #30 Exhibit P-9, #31 Exhibit P-10, #32 Exhibit P-11, #33 Exhibit P-12, #34 Exhibit P-13, #35 Exhibit P-14, #36 Exhibit P-15A, #37 Exhibit P-15B, #38 Exhibit P-16, #39 Exhibit P-17, #40 Exhibit P-18, #41 Exhibit P-19, #42 Exhibit P-20, #43 Exhibit P-21, #44 Exhibit P-22A, #45 Exhibit P-22B, #46 Exhibit P-23, #47 Exhibit P-24, #48 Exhibit P-25A, #49 Exhibit P-25B, #50 Exhibit P-26, #51 Exhibit P-27, #52 Exhibit P-28, #53 Exhibit P-29, #54 Exhibit P-30, #55 Exhibit P-31, #56 Exhibit P-32A, #57 Exhibit P-32B, #58 Exhibit P-33)(Hill, Keith)
June 19, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation from St. Clair County, case number 14-L-146. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2323018) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Hill, Keith)
June 19, 2014 Filing 1 Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 14-712-JPG-SCW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(anm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Presley v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadwestvaco Corp.
Represented By: Brian J. Huelsmann
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Patrick D. Cloud
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucyrus International, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucyrus Mining Equipment
Represented By: Karen M. Volkman
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealing Equipment Products Co., Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Represented By: Alexander J. Baker
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve & Gage Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucyrus Erie
Represented By: Karen M. Volkman
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Gasket Corporation
Represented By: A. J. Bronsky
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Meredith S Hudgens
Represented By: Erin Renee Griebel
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Collier
Represented By: Earl B. Thames, Jr.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Tool Works, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Huelsmann
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporaton
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-Mclain Company
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excelsior Packing & Gaskets
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Railroad
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Represented By: Alexander J. Baker
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Controls Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Represented By: Alexander J. Baker
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg Warner Corporation
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L & N Railroad Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Patrick D. Cloud
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepco Corporation
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Co., Inc
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakfabco, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Ward
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Gary C. Pinter
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Group, LTD
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meade Corp.
Represented By: Brian J. Huelsmann
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc.
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Madeline V. Tzall
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Danielle R. Luisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprinkmann Sons Corporation
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: David W. Ybarra
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company, I
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Alexander J. Baker
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altra Industrial Motion, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia M. Kelly
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Teves, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Rogers
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, LLC
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Charles L. Joley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Corporation, Blackmer Division
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Kevin T. Dawson
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dap, Inc.
Represented By: Madeline V. Tzall
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Danielle R. Luisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamons Gasket Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingalls Shipbuilding
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Moore Paint Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Madeline V. Tzall
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Danielle R. Luisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Hydraulics, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Connolly
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup Grumman
Represented By: Brian J. Huelsmann
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Donald W. Ward
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Represented By: Mary Ann Hatch
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conwed Corporation
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Kevin T. Dawson
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Gasket Company
Represented By: Amy Marie Callaghan
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Represented By: Alexander J. Baker
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Edison Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Represented By: Dayna L. Johnson
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie K. Presley
Represented By: Laci Marie Whitley
Represented By: Timothy P. Hulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?